Applera Corporation v. Michigan Diagnostics, LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-10547
District Judge George A. OToole, Jr, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 11, 2017 at 11:21 PM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Applera Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Donnelly, Conroy & Gelhaar, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED T. Christopher Donnelly +1 617 720 2880 +1 617 720 3554 tcd@dcglaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam B. Ziegler +1 617 720 2880 +1 617 720 3554 abz@dcglaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Krokidas & Bluestein LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jill Brenner Meixel +1 617 482 7211 jmeixel@kb-law.com
No Logo Michigan Diagnostics, LLC, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Iandiorio & Teska

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roy J. Coleman +1 781 890 5678 +1 781 890 1150 rcoleman@iandiorio.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kirk C. Teska +1 781 890 5678 +1 781 890 1150 kirk@iandiorio.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Weintraub Group PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David L. Oppenhuizen +1 248 865 9430 +1 248 865 9436 doppenhuizen@weintraubgroup.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Arnold S. Weintraub +1 248 809 2005 +1 248 996 8405 aweintraub@weintraubgroup.com
v.
No Logo Brij P. Giri, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by The Weintraub Group PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Arnold S. Weintraub +1 248 809 2005 +1 248 996 8405 aweintraub@weintraubgroup.com
No Logo Michigan Diagnostics, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Iandiorio & Teska

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roy J. Coleman +1 781 890 5678 +1 781 890 1150 rcoleman@iandiorio.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kirk C. Teska +1 781 890 5678 +1 781 890 1150 kirk@iandiorio.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nutter, McClennen & Fish, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/08/2008, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott E Erlich +1 617 439 2965 +1 617 310 9965 serlich@nutter.com
TERMINATED: 07/08/2008, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric N. Shor +1 617 439 2734 +1 617 310 9734 eshor@nutter.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Weintraub Group PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David L. Oppenhuizen +1 248 865 9430 +1 248 865 9436 doppenhuizen@weintraubgroup.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Arnold S. Weintraub +1 248 809 2005 +1 248 996 8405 aweintraub@weintraubgroup.com
No Logo Applera Corporation, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Donnelly, Conroy & Gelhaar, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED T. Christopher Donnelly +1 617 720 2880 +1 617 720 3554 tcd@dcglaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam B. Ziegler +1 617 720 2880 +1 617 720 3554 abz@dcglaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Krokidas & Bluestein LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jill Brenner Meixel +1 617 482 7211 jmeixel@kb-law.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1338
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (122) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 9/17/2009, Entered: None
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice and [Proposed] Order by Applera Corporation. (Donnelly, T.) (Entered: 09/17/2009)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 9/8/2009, Entered: None
    Joint MOTION to Continue Hearing currently scheduled for 09/09/09 (and deadline for Defendants' filing of Preliminary Disclosures to coincide with new date) to 09/16/09 by Applera Corporation.(Ziegler, Adam) (Entered: 09/08/2009)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 8/18/2009, Entered: None
      Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to September 9, 2009 to File Preliminary Disclosures by Brij P. Giri, Michigan Diagnostics, LLC.(Weintraub, Arnold) (Entered: 08/18/2009)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 5/15/2009, Entered: None
        Joint MOTION to Continue Hearing Date and Disclosure Deadline to a 90 Day Extention by Applera Corporation.(Ziegler, Adam) (Entered: 05/15/2009)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 4/21/2009, Entered: None
          MOTION to Continue Motion Hearing to June 2009 by Michigan Diagnostics, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Status Conference issued by Eastern District of Michigan, # 2 Letter dated 4/17/09 re unopposed scheduling request) *** These documents were filed electronically as letters. See #118 & 119.(Edge, Eugenia) (Entered: 04/21/2009)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 4/21/2009, Entered: None
            REPLY to Response to 114 MOTION to Dismiss under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Brij P. Giri, Michigan Diagnostics, LLC. (Oppenhuizen, David) (Entered: 04/21/2009)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 4/17/2009, Entered: None
              Letter/request (non-motion) from Arnold S. Weintraub. (Weintraub, Arnold) (Entered: 04/17/2009)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 4/16/2009, Entered: None
                Letter/request (non-motion) from Arnold S. Weintraub. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Notice to Appear for Scheduling Conference)(Weintraub, Arnold) (Entered: 04/16/2009)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 4/3/2009, Entered: None
                  MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Brij P. Giri, Michigan Diagnostics, LLC.(Weintraub, Arnold) (Entered: 04/03/2009)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 3/26/2009, Entered: None
                    Opposition re 114 MOTION to Dismiss under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Applera Corporation. (Ziegler, Adam) (Entered: 03/26/2009)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 3/12/2009, Entered: None
                      MEMORANDUM in Support re 114 MOTION to Dismiss under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Brij P. Giri, Michigan Diagnostics, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A - USPTO Continuity Sheet, # 3 Exhibit B - Cover sheet of U.S. Patent No. 6,514,717, # 4 Exhibit C - Cover sheet of U.S. Patent No. 6,322,727, # 5 Exhibit D - Cover sheet of U.S. Patent No. 6,104,024, # 6 Exhibit E - Cover sheet of U.S. Patent No. 5,145,772, # 7 Exhibit F - Cover sheet of U.S. Patent No. 5,707,559, # 8 Exhibit G - Cover sheet of U.S. Patent No. 5,891,626, # 9 Exhibit H - Cover sheet of U.S. Patent No. 5,605,795, # 10 Exhibit I - Cover sheet of U.S. Patent No. 6,555,698, # 11 Exhibit J - Cover sheet of U.S. Patent No. 5,004,565, # 12 Exhibit K - Cover sheet of U.S. Patent No. 4,952,707, # 13 Exhibit L - 5,004,565 and 5,707,559 composition comparison, # 14 Exhibit M - 5,004,565 and 5,891,626 composition comparison, # 15 Exhibit N - 4,952,707 and 5,605,795 composition comparison, # 16 Exhibit O - 5,004,565 and 6,555,698 composition comparison, # 17 Exhibit P - 5,004,565 and 5,145,772 composition comparison, # 18 Exhibit Q - 5,004,565 and 6,104,024 composition comparison, # 19 Exhibit R - 5,004,565 and 6,322,727 composition comparison, # 20 Exhibit S - 4,952,707 and 6,514,717 composition comparison)(Weintraub, Arnold) (Entered: 03/12/2009)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 3/12/2009, Entered: None
                        MOTION to Dismiss under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) by Brij P. Giri, Michigan Diagnostics, LLC.(Weintraub, Arnold) (Entered: 03/12/2009)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 3/2/2009, Entered: None
                          Document disclosure by Applera Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Ziegler, Adam) (Entered: 03/02/2009)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 2/26/2009, Entered: None
                            Document disclosure by Applera Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Ziegler, Adam) (Entered: 02/26/2009)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 2/6/2009, Entered: None
                              STIPULATION to Extend Deadline for Filing Answer to Second Amended Complaint by Brij P. Giri, Michigan Diagnostics, LLC. (Oppenhuizen, David) (Entered: 02/06/2009)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 2/2/2009, Entered: None
                                Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against Michigan Diagnostics, LLC , Leave to File Granted on January 27, 2009, filed by Applera Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(Ziegler, Adam) (Entered: 02/02/2009)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 1/27/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  Judge George A. OToole, Jr: OPINION AND ORDER entered granting 28 Motion to Dismiss; granting 66 Motion for Leave to File; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Lyness, Paul) (Entered: 01/27/2009)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 1/22/2009, Entered: None
                                    DECLARATION re 107 Opposition to Motion by Applera Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Ziegler, Adam) (Entered: 01/22/2009)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 1/22/2009, Entered: None
                                      Opposition re 105 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Applera Corporation. (Ziegler, Adam) (Entered: 01/22/2009)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 1/15/2009, Entered: None
                                        BRIEF in Support re 105 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Michigan Diagnostics, LLC. (Edge, Eugenia) (Entered: 01/15/2009)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 1/8/2009, Entered: None
                                          MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Michigan Diagnostics, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Applied Biosystems' Interrogatory Response, # 2 Exhibit B - Claim Construction and idenfication of MDH product, # 3 Exhibit C - USPTO printout of expiration of '024 patent, # 4 Exhibit D - Archived webpages, # 5 Exhibit E - Archived webpages, # 6 Exhibit F - Deposition testimony)(Weintraub, Arnold) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/15/2009: # 7 MAIN DOCUMENT - MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT) (Edge, Eugenia). (Entered: 01/08/2009)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 1/7/2009, Entered: None
                                            RESPONSE to Motion re 103 MOTION to attend status conference scheduled for 1/12/09 filed by Applera Corporation. (Edge, Eugenia) (Entered: 01/07/2009)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 1/6/2009, Entered: None
                                              MOTION to Attend Status Conference scheduled for 1/12/09 by Michigan Diagnostics, LLC.(Edge, Eugenia) (Entered: 01/07/2009)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 1/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                Response to Defendant's Request to Attend Status Conference Telephonically/ Response by Applera Corporation to 101 Letter/request (non-motion). (Ziegler, Adam) (Entered: 01/07/2009)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 1/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                  Letter/request (non-motion) from David Oppenhuizen requesting the Court's permission to attend the Status Conference via telephone. (Oppenhuizen, David) (Entered: 01/06/2009)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 12/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Applera Corporation. (Ziegler, Adam) (Entered: 12/17/2008)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 10/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                      Joint MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order by Applera Corporation.(Donnelly, T.) (Entered: 10/31/2008)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 9/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                        Letter/request (non-motion) from T. Christopher Donnelly. (Donnelly, T.) (Entered: 09/24/2008)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 9/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                          Letter/request (non-motion) from Arnold S. Weintraub. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Article from Boston.com)(Weintraub, Arnold) (Entered: 09/23/2008)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 9/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                            Letter/request (non-motion) from T. Christopher Donnelly. (Donnelly, T.) (Entered: 09/23/2008)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 8/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                              Letter/request (non-motion) from David Oppenhuizen regarding case scheduling in response to Mr. Donnelly's letter of 8/15/08. (Oppenhuizen, David) (Entered: 08/15/2008)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 8/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                Letter/request (non-motion) from T. Christopher Donnelly regarding case schedule in response to letter from Arnold Weintraub dated August 14, 2008. (Donnelly, T.) (Entered: 08/15/2008)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                  FAXED Letter/request (non-motion) from Arnold Weintraub re modifications to scheduling order. (Edge, Eugenia) (Entered: 08/14/2008)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 7/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                    RESPONSE to Motion re 82 Second MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Michigan Diagnostics, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Oppenhuizen, David) (Entered: 07/25/2008)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                      DECLARATION re 86 Third MOTION to Compel Discovery by Applera Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O)(Ziegler, Adam) (Entered: 07/11/2008)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support re 86 Third MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Applera Corporation. (Ziegler, Adam) (Entered: 07/11/2008)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                          Third MOTION to Compel Discovery by Applera Corporation.(Ziegler, Adam) (Entered: 07/11/2008)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                            MOTION to Seal Information Designated "Highly Confidential" by Michigan Diagnostics by Applera Corporation.(Ziegler, Adam) (Entered: 07/11/2008)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                              DECLARATION re 82 Second MOTION to Compel Discovery by Applera Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Ziegler, Adam) (Entered: 07/11/2008)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Support re 82 Second MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Applera Corporation. (Ziegler, Adam) (Entered: 07/11/2008)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                  Second MOTION to Compel Discovery by Applera Corporation.(Ziegler, Adam) (Entered: 07/11/2008)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                    Brief in Support re 68 Emergency MOTION to Continue June 25th Motion Hearing to July 24, 2008 filed by Michigan Diagnostics, LLC. (Edge, Eugenia) (Entered: 07/10/2008)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 7/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                      DECLARATION re 79 Reply to Response to Motion for Leave to Amend by Applera Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Ziegler, Adam) (Entered: 07/09/2008)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 7/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                        REPLY to Response to 66 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint (Leave to File Granted on July 8, 2008) filed by Applera Corporation. (Ziegler, Adam) (Entered: 07/09/2008)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                          NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Eric N. Shor (Shor, Eric) (Entered: 07/07/2008)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                            NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Scott E Erlich (Erlich, Scott) (Entered: 07/07/2008)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                              Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Further Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend by Applera Corporation.(Ziegler, Adam) (Entered: 07/07/2008)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Eric N. Shor on behalf of Michigan Diagnostics, LLC (Shor, Eric) (Entered: 07/03/2008)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Scott E Erlich on behalf of Michigan Diagnostics, LLC (Erlich, Scott) (Entered: 07/03/2008)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 7/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re 66 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Michigan Diagnostics, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit Weintraub Declaration)(Oppenhuizen, David) Modified on 7/3/2008 (Edge, Eugenia). (Entered: 07/02/2008)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 6/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                      RESPONSE to Motion re 64 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Michigan Diagnostics, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Oppenhuizen, David) (Entered: 06/24/2008)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 6/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to July 21, 2008 to File Response/Reply as to 66 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Michigan Diagnostics, LLC.(Oppenhuizen, David) (Entered: 06/20/2008)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 6/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                          DECLARATION re 69 Opposition to Motion for Continuation by Michigan Diagnostics, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Oppenhuizen, David) (Entered: 06/19/2008)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 6/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Opposition re 68 Emergency MOTION to Continue June 25th Motion Hearing to July 24, 2008 filed by Applera Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Ziegler, Adam) (Entered: 06/19/2008)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 6/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Emergency MOTION to Continue June 25th Motion Hearing to July 24, 2008 by Michigan Diagnostics, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Oppenhuizen, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/10/2008: # 6 Emergency Motion) (Edge, Eugenia). (Entered: 06/18/2008)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 6/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Support re 66 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Applera Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Part 1, # 2 Exhibit A - Part 2, # 3 Exhibit A - Part 3, # 4 Exhibit A - Part 4, # 5 Exhibit A - Part 5)(Ziegler, Adam) (Entered: 06/18/2008)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 6/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Applera Corporation.(Ziegler, Adam) (Entered: 06/18/2008)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Brief in Reply to Applera's Response to the Motion for Protective Order by Michigan Diagnostics, LLC.(Oppenhuizen, David) (Entered: 06/12/2008)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 6/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      MOTION for Attorney's Fees and Costs Incurred in Opposing Withdrawn Motion to Disqualify by Applera Corporation.(Ziegler, Adam) Modified on 6/12/2008 (Edge, Eugenia). (Entered: 06/10/2008)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 6/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Withdrawal of motion: 39 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel filed by Michigan Diagnostics, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Dr. Brij Giri)(Oppenhuizen, David) (Entered: 06/09/2008)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          DECLARATION re 61 Opposition to Motion (Declaration of Adam B. Ziegler) by Applera Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Ziegler, Adam) (Entered: 06/02/2008)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Opposition re 51 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Applera Corporation. (Ziegler, Adam) (Entered: 06/02/2008)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 5/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Withdrawal of motion: 57 MOTION to Seal filed by Applera Corporation.. (Ziegler, Adam) (Entered: 05/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 5/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                DECLARATION re 52 Opposition to Motion (Supplemental Declaration of Adam B. Ziegler) by Applera Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Ziegler, Adam) (Entered: 05/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 5/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to Motion re 57 MOTION to Seal filed by Michigan Diagnostics, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Email Correspondance)(Oppenhuizen, David) (Entered: 05/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 5/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Seal by Applera Corporation.(Ziegler, Adam) (Entered: 05/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION re 52 Opposition to Motion (Declaration of Steven B. Kelber) by Applera Corporation. (Ziegler, Adam) (Entered: 05/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION re 52 Opposition to Motion (Declaration of Kurtis D. MacFerrin) by Applera Corporation. (Ziegler, Adam) (Entered: 05/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION re 52 Opposition to Motion (Declaration of Adam B. Ziegler) by Applera Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Ziegler, Adam) (Entered: 05/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION re 52 Opposition to Motion (Declaration of T. Christopher Donnelly) by Applera Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-1, # 2 Exhibit A-2, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F)(Ziegler, Adam) (Entered: 05/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Opposition re 39 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel filed by Applera Corporation. (Ziegler, Adam) (Entered: 05/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Protective Order by Michigan Diagnostics, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(Oppenhuizen, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/28/2008: # 5 Corrected Document) (Edge, Eugenia). (Entered: 05/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to 44 MOTION to Compel (filed with leave of Court granted on May 7, 2008) filed by Michigan Diagnostics, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Appendix A, # 5 Supplement Weintraub Declaration)(Oppenhuizen, David) (Entered: 05/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Brief in Reply to Applera Corporation's Response to Michigan Diagnostics, LLC's Motion to Compel by Michigan Diagnostics, LLC.(Oppenhuizen, David) (Entered: 05/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION re 47 Opposition to Motion by Applera Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Ziegler, Adam) (Entered: 05/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Opposition re 44 MOTION to Compel filed by Applera Corporation. (Ziegler, Adam) (Entered: 05/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to 42 Emergency MOTION to Stay filed by Michigan Diagnostics, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Email correspondance)(Oppenhuizen, David) (Entered: 04/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Opposition re 42 Emergency MOTION to Stay filed by Applera Corporation. (Ziegler, Adam) (Entered: 04/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Compel by Michigan Diagnostics, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D)(Oppenhuizen, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/28/2008: # 6 Main Document) (Edge, Eugenia). (Entered: 04/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to May 21, 2008 to File Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Disqualify Plaintiff's Counsel by Applera Corporation.(Ziegler, Adam) (Entered: 04/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Emergency MOTION to Stay by Michigan Diagnostics, LLC.(Oppenhuizen, David) (Entered: 04/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Amended MEMORANDUM in Support re 39 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel filed by Michigan Diagnostics, LLC. (Oppenhuizen, David) (Entered: 04/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Dr. Brij P. Giri re 39 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel by Michigan Diagnostics, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Errata 1 - Dr. Giri's Notebook, # 2 Exhibit 2 - October 10, 1993 letter, # 3 Exhibit 3 - January 10, 1994 letter, # 4 Exhibit 4 - February 11, 1994 letter, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Dr. Giri's 1993 affidavit)(Oppenhuizen, David) (Entered: 04/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Disqualify Counsel by Michigan Diagnostics, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A - '727 patent, # 3 Exhibit B - '717 patent, # 4 Exhibit C -, # 5 Exhibit D - Title sheet, # 6 Exhibit E - Title Sheet, # 7 Exhibit F - Letters to Wayne State University, # 8 Exhibit G - Mr. Donnelly's depostion of Dr. Giri, # 9 Exhibit H - 1993 Affidavit of Dr. Giri)(Oppenhuizen, David) (Entered: 04/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to Motion re 36 MOTION to Compel Defendant Michigan Diagnostics LLC's Production of Documents filed by Michigan Diagnostics, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A - USPTO website, # 3 Exhibit B - Admission of Expiration, # 4 Exhibit C - Patent subject matter)(Oppenhuizen, David) (Entered: 04/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support re 36 MOTION to Compel Defendant Michigan Diagnostics LLC's Production of Documents filed by Applera Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Ziegler, Adam) (Entered: 04/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Compel Defendant Michigan Diagnostics LLC's Production of Documents by Applera Corporation.(Ziegler, Adam) (Entered: 04/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Supplemental REPLY to Response to 28 First MOTION to Dismiss (Motion to Dismiss Michigan Diagnostics' Counterclaims) filed by Applera Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Ziegler, Adam) (Entered: 03/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/13/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  Amended RESPONSE to Motion re 28 First MOTION to Dismiss (Motion to Dismiss Michigan Diagnostics' Counterclaims) filed by Michigan Diagnostics, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A - February 25, 2008 letter, # 3 Exhibit B - March 7, 2008 email, # 4 Exhibit C - March 11, 2008 email, # 5 Exhibit D - March 12, 2008 email)(Oppenhuizen, David) (Entered: 03/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to 28 First MOTION to Dismiss (Motion to Dismiss Michigan Diagnostics' Counterclaims) filed by Applera Corporation. (Ziegler, Adam) (Entered: 02/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to Motion re 28 First MOTION to Dismiss (Motion to Dismiss Michigan Diagnostics' Counterclaims) filed by Michigan Diagnostics, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A - July 13, 2006 Letter, # 3 Exhibit B - August 16, 2006 Letter, # 4 Exhibit C - August 31, 2006 Letter, # 5 Exhibit D - September 15, 2006 Letter, # 6 Exhibit E - December 5, 2006 Letter)(Oppenhuizen, David) (Entered: 02/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        Judge George A. OToole, Jr: STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER entered. re 30 Proposed Document(s) submitted filed by Michigan Diagnostics, LLC (Lyness, Paul) Modified on 1/30/2008 (Edge, Eugenia). (Entered: 01/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          Proposed Document(s) submitted by Michigan Diagnostics, LLC. Document received: Proposed Protective Order. (Oppenhuizen, David) (Entered: 01/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support re 28 First MOTION to Dismiss (Motion to Dismiss Michigan Diagnostics' Counterclaims) filed by Applera Corporation. (Ziegler, Adam) (Entered: 01/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              First MOTION to Dismiss (Motion to Dismiss Michigan Diagnostics' Counterclaims) by Applera Corporation.(Ziegler, Adam) (Entered: 01/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION Local Rule 16(d)(3) Certification by Michigan Diagnostics. (Oppenhuizen, David) (Entered: 01/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION (Local Rule 16(d)(3) Certification by Applera Corporation). (Ziegler, Adam) (Entered: 01/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Stipulated Protective Order)(Oppenhuizen, David) (Entered: 01/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to 1 Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Applera Corporation by Michigan Diagnostics, LLC.(Coleman, Roy) (Entered: 01/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter/request (non-motion) from Adam B. Ziegler notifying the court that this case and 07-12189-MLW are related matters, FILED. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment to letter)(Boyce, Kathy) (Entered: 12/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/11/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Scheduling ConferenceScheduling Conference set for 1/28/2008 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9 before Judge George A. O'Toole Jr.. Please mark your calendars accordingly. (Lyness, Paul) (Entered: 12/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/11/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Judge George A. O'Toole Jr.: OPINION AND ORDER entered denying 6 Motion to Dismiss; denying 14 Motion to Compel. As required by Rule 26(f), the parties must confer "as soon as practicable and in any event at least 21 days before a scheduling conference is held or a scheduling order is due..." The motion to dismiss or transfer having been resolved, a date for a scheduling conference will be set and the parties will confer in due course. (Lyness, Paul) (Entered: 12/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter/request (non-motion) from T. Christopher Donnelly, counsel form Plaintiff Applera Corp. informing Court of decision in E.D.Mich case regarding defendant Michigan Diagnostic, LLC's motion to dismiss or transfer for improper venue. under advisement herein (Docket No. 6, 10). (Donnelly, T.) (Entered: 11/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/23/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Kirk C. Teska on behalf of Michigan Diagnostics, LLC (Teska, Kirk) (Entered: 10/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Arnold Weintraub Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1659011. by Michigan Diagnostics, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Coleman, Roy) (Entered: 09/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of David Oppenhuizen Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1658964. by Michigan Diagnostics, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Coleman, Roy) (Entered: 09/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re 14 MOTION to Compel Defendant's Participation in a Rule 26(f) Conference filed by Michigan Diagnostics, LLC. (Coleman, Roy) (Entered: 09/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION re 14 MOTION to Compel Defendant's Participation in a Rule 26(f) Conference (Declaration of Adam B. Ziegler) by Applera Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Ziegler, Adam) (Entered: 08/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Compel Defendant's Participation in a Rule 26(f) Conference by Applera Corporation.(Ziegler, Adam) (Entered: 08/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/23/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE (of Request for Hearing) by Applera Corporation re 6 First MOTION to Dismiss For Improper Venue, Or In The Alternative To Transfer Venure Under F.R.C.P 12(b)(3) (Ziegler, Adam) Modified on 8/24/2007 (Edge, Eugenia). (Entered: 08/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/17/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION ( of John Voyta) re 10 Opposition to Motion by Applera Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F)(Donnelly, T.) Modified on 8/19/2007 (Edge, Eugenia). (Entered: 08/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/17/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION( of T. Christopher Donnelly) re 10 Opposition to Motion by Applera Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D)(Donnelly, T.) Modified on 8/19/2007 (Edge, Eugenia). (Entered: 08/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/17/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Opposition re 6 First MOTION to Dismiss For Improper Venue, Or In The Alternative To Transfer Venure Under F.R.C.P 12(b)(3) filed by Applera Corporation. (Donnelly, T.) (Entered: 08/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Adam B. Ziegler on behalf of Applera Corporation (Ziegler, Adam) (Entered: 08/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/6/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Michigan Diagnostics, LLC. (Coleman, Roy) (Entered: 08/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Michigan Diagnostics, LLC to 6 First MOTION to Dismiss For Improper Venue, Or In The Alternative To Transfer Venure Under F.R.C.P 12(b)(3). (Coleman, Roy) (Entered: 08/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          First MOTION to Dismiss For Improper Venue, Or In The Alternative To Transfer Venure Under F.R.C.P 12(b)(3) by Michigan Diagnostics, LLC.(Coleman, Roy) (Entered: 08/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Roy J. Coleman on behalf of Michigan Diagnostics, LLC (Coleman, Roy) (Entered: 08/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/23/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed Michigan Diagnostics, LLC served on 7/16/2007, answer due 8/6/2007. (Edge, Eugenia) (Entered: 07/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED COMPLAINT against Applera Corporation with Jury Demand, filed by Applera Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)(Donnelly, T.) (Entered: 04/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPORT on the filing of patent case. (Patch, Christine) (Entered: 03/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT against Michigan Diagnostics, LLC , filed by Applera Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Patch, Christine) (Entered: 03/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 29 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?