Trump Marks Real Estate LLC. v. Cap Cana S.A. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:12-cv-06440
District Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 19, 2017 at 12:50 AM EST (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
Trump Marks Real Estate LLC Trump Marks Real Estate LLC, Plaintiff

Represented by Belkin Burden Wenig & Goldman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey L. Goldman +1 212 867 4466 +1 212 297 1859 jgoldman@bbwg.com
v.
No Logo Abraham Hazoury, Defendant

Represented by Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Juan Alberto Arteaga +1 212 455 2000 +1 212 455 2502 jarteaga@stblaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Thomas Russell, Jr. +1 212 455 2000 +1 212 455 2502 wrussell@stblaw.com
No Logo Cap Cana S.A., Defendant

Represented by Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Juan Alberto Arteaga +1 212 455 2000 +1 212 455 2502 jarteaga@stblaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Thomas Russell, Jr. +1 212 455 2000 +1 212 455 2502 wrussell@stblaw.com
No Logo Catherine Kury Hazoury, Defendant

Represented by Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Juan Alberto Arteaga +1 212 455 2000 +1 212 455 2502 jarteaga@stblaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Thomas Russell, Jr. +1 212 455 2000 +1 212 455 2502 wrussell@stblaw.com
No Logo Fernando Hazoury, Defendant

Represented by Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Juan Alberto Arteaga +1 212 455 2000 +1 212 455 2502 jarteaga@stblaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Thomas Russell, Jr. +1 212 455 2000 +1 212 455 2502 wrussell@stblaw.com
No Logo GEORGE SPENCER, Defendant

Represented by Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Juan Alberto Arteaga +1 212 455 2000 +1 212 455 2502 jarteaga@stblaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Thomas Russell, Jr. +1 212 455 2000 +1 212 455 2502 wrussell@stblaw.com
No Logo Michel Rodriguez, Defendant

Represented by Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Juan Alberto Arteaga +1 212 455 2000 +1 212 455 2502 jarteaga@stblaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Thomas Russell, Jr. +1 212 455 2000 +1 212 455 2502 wrussell@stblaw.com
No Logo Michell Vargas, Defendant

Represented by Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Juan Alberto Arteaga +1 212 455 2000 +1 212 455 2502 jarteaga@stblaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Thomas Russell, Jr. +1 212 455 2000 +1 212 455 2502 wrussell@stblaw.com
No Logo Ricardo Hazoury, Defendant

Represented by Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Juan Alberto Arteaga +1 212 455 2000 +1 212 455 2502 jarteaga@stblaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Thomas Russell, Jr. +1 212 455 2000 +1 212 455 2502 wrussell@stblaw.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332oc
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
  Entries (32) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 32 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff and Defendants, subject to the approval of the Court, as follows: 1. The above-captioned action is dismissed with prejudice, pursuant to Rule 41 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, without costs or fees, except as provided in the Settlement Agreement. 2. The parties request that the Court retain jurisdiction of the above-captioned action solely for the purpose of enforcing the terms and obligations of the Settlement Agreement, and the parties consent and waive all objections to said jurisdiction. Attached hereto as Exhibit B is a proposed Order of Dismissal. 3. In the event a party fails to comply with the terms and obligations under the Settlement Agreement, either party may move to restore this action to the Court's calendar to seek all appropriate relief including enforcement of the terms and obligations under the Settlement Agreement. 4. Facsimile signatures herein shall be deemed originals, and this Stipulation may be signed in counterparts. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 7/9/2013) (ft) Modified on 7/10/2013 (ft). (Entered: 07/10/2013)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER AUTHORIZING WITHDRAWAL OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, that Defendants' motion to dismiss is withdrawn without prejudice to Defendants' ability to reinstate said motion should the Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal not be approved and so-ordered by the Court. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 7/9/2013) (ft) (Entered: 07/10/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from William T. Russell, Jr. dated 2/20/2013 re: counsel for Defendant write to update the Court on the status of the parties' settlement discussions and to request a twenty-one day extension for Defendants to submit their reply memoranda of law in support of their pending motions to dismiss from February 21, 2013 to March 14, 2013. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 2/25/2013) (pl) (Entered: 02/26/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from William T. Russell, Jr. dated 2/1/2013 re: Defense counsel writes to request a fourteen day extension to submit Defendants' reply memorandum in support of pending motions to dismiss. Plaintiff has consented to Defendants' requested extension. Under the Court's Scheduling Order, Defendant's reply papers are presently due February 7, 2013. Defendants ask that this deadline be extended until February 21, 2013. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered., ( Replies due by 2/21/2013.) (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 2/4/2013) (ago) (Entered: 02/05/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None
          FIRST MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 13 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint.. Document filed by Trump Marks Real Estate LLC.. (Samuels, Andrew) (Entered: 01/17/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank 27 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None
            DECLARATION of Eric F. Trump in Opposition re: 13 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint.. Document filed by Trump Marks Real Estate LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B-C, # 3 Exhibit D-F, # 4 Exhibit G-J, # 5 Exhibit K, # 6 Exhibit L-N, # 7 Exhibit O, # 8 Exhibit P-Q, # 9 Exhibit R-T)(Samuels, Andrew) (Entered: 01/17/2013)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
            STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between counsel for the respective parties that (i) the time for Plaintiff to serve any opposing affidavits and answering memoranda in opposition to Defendants' Notice of Motion to Dismiss the Complaint dated November 16, 2012 ("Defendants' Motion") is extended until Thursday, January 17, 2013 and (ii) the time for Defendants to serve any reply affidavits and memoranda of law in further support of Defendants' Motion is extended until Thursday, February 7, 2013. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 1/9/2013) (lmb) (Entered: 01/09/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
              STIPULATION: that (i) the time forPlaintiff to serve any opposing affidavits and answering memoranda in opposition to Defendants' Notice of Motion to Dismiss the Complaint dated November 16, 2012 is extended until Tuesday, January 8, 2013 and the time for Defendants to serve any reply affidavits and memoranda of faw in further support of Defendants' to serve any reply affidavits and memoranda of law in further support of Defendants' Motion is extended until Tuesday, January 22,2013. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 12/4/2012) (cd) (Entered: 12/04/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/20/2012, Entered: None
                RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Cap Cana S.A..(Russell, William) (Entered: 11/20/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: None
                  AFFIDAVIT of Dr. Manuel Berges Chupani in Support re: 13 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint.. Document filed by Cap Cana S.A., Abraham Hazoury, Catherine Kury Hazoury, Fernando Hazoury, Ricardo Hazoury, Michel Rodriguez, George Spencer, Michell Vargas. (Russell, William) (Entered: 11/16/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: None
                    DECLARATION of Abraham Hazoury in Support re: 13 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint.. Document filed by Cap Cana S.A., Abraham Hazoury, Catherine Kury Hazoury, Fernando Hazoury, Ricardo Hazoury, Michel Rodriguez, George Spencer, Michell Vargas. (Russell, William) (Entered: 11/16/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: None
                      DECLARATION of Catherine Kury Hazoury in Support re: 13 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint.. Document filed by Cap Cana S.A., Abraham Hazoury, Catherine Kury Hazoury, Fernando Hazoury, Ricardo Hazoury, Michel Rodriguez, George Spencer, Michell Vargas. (Russell, William) (Entered: 11/16/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: None
                        DECLARATION of Fernando Hazoury in Support re: 13 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint.. Document filed by Cap Cana S.A., Abraham Hazoury, Catherine Kury Hazoury, Fernando Hazoury, Ricardo Hazoury, Michel Rodriguez, George Spencer, Michell Vargas. (Russell, William) (Entered: 11/16/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: None
                          DECLARATION of George Spence in Support re: 13 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint.. Document filed by Cap Cana S.A., Abraham Hazoury, Catherine Kury Hazoury, Fernando Hazoury, Ricardo Hazoury, Michel Rodriguez, George Spencer, Michell Vargas. (Russell, William) (Entered: 11/16/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: None
                            DECLARATION of Michel Rodriguez in Support re: 13 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint.. Document filed by Cap Cana S.A., Abraham Hazoury, Catherine Kury Hazoury, Fernando Hazoury, Ricardo Hazoury, Michel Rodriguez, George Spencer, Michell Vargas. (Russell, William) (Entered: 11/16/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: None
                              DECLARATION of Michell Vargas in Support re: 13 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint.. Document filed by Cap Cana S.A., Abraham Hazoury, Catherine Kury Hazoury, Fernando Hazoury, Ricardo Hazoury, Michel Rodriguez, George Spencer, Michell Vargas. (Russell, William) (Entered: 11/16/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: None
                                DECLARATION of Ricardo Hazoury in Support re: 13 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint.. Document filed by Cap Cana S.A., Abraham Hazoury, Catherine Kury Hazoury, Fernando Hazoury, Ricardo Hazoury, Michel Rodriguez, George Spencer, Michell Vargas. (Russell, William) (Entered: 11/16/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: None
                                  DECLARATION of Juan A. Arteaga (with Exhibit A) in Support re: 13 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint.. Document filed by Cap Cana S.A., Abraham Hazoury, Catherine Kury Hazoury, Fernando Hazoury, Ricardo Hazoury, Michel Rodriguez, George Spencer, Michell Vargas. (Arteaga, Juan) (Entered: 11/16/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Blank 14 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: None
                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 13 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint.. Document filed by Cap Cana S.A., Abraham Hazoury, Catherine Kury Hazoury, Fernando Hazoury, Ricardo Hazoury, Michel Rodriguez, George Spencer, Michell Vargas. (Russell, William) (Entered: 11/16/2012)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: None
                                      MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint. Document filed by Cap Cana S.A., Abraham Hazoury, Catherine Kury Hazoury, Fernando Hazoury, Ricardo Hazoury, Michel Rodriguez, George Spencer, Michell Vargas.(Russell, William) (Entered: 11/16/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: None
                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Cap Cana S.A. served on 9/7/2012, answer due 9/28/2012. Document filed by Trump Marks Real Estate LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Goldman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/01/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: None
                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Fernando Hazoury served on 9/10/2012, answer due 10/1/2012. Document filed by Trump Marks Real Estate LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Goldman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/01/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: None
                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Catherine Kury Hazoury served on 9/7/2012, answer due 9/28/2012. Document filed by Trump Marks Real Estate LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Goldman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/01/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: None
                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Abraham Hazoury served on 9/8/2012, answer due 10/1/2012. Document filed by Trump Marks Real Estate LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Goldman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/01/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Ricardo Hazoury served on 9/8/2012, answer due 10/1/2012. Document filed by Trump Marks Real Estate LLC.. (Goldman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/01/2012)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Michell Vargas served on 9/8/2012, answer due 10/1/2012. Document filed by Trump Marks Real Estate LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Goldman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/01/2012)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Michel Rodriguez served on 9/10/2012, answer due 10/1/2012. Document filed by Trump Marks Real Estate LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Goldman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/01/2012)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Jeffrey L. Goldman on behalf of Trump Marks Real Estate LLC.. New Address: Belkin Burden Wenig & Goldman, LLP, 270 Madison Avenue, New York, NY, USA 10016, 212-867-4466. (Goldman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/01/2012)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. George Spencer served on 9/11/2012, answer due 10/2/2012. Document filed by Trump Marks Real Estate LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Goldman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/01/2012)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William Thomas Russell, Jr on behalf of Cap Cana S.A., Abraham Hazoury, Catherine Kury Hazoury, Fernando Hazoury, Ricardo Hazoury, Michel Rodriguez, George Spencer, Michell Vargas (Russell, William) (Entered: 09/24/2012)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Juan Alberto Arteaga on behalf of Cap Cana S.A., Abraham Hazoury, Catherine Kury Hazoury, Fernando Hazoury, Ricardo Hazoury, Michel Rodriguez, George Spencer, Michell Vargas (Arteaga, Juan) (Entered: 09/24/2012)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 8/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                              COMPLAINT against Cap Cana S.A., Abraham Hazoury, Catherine Kury Hazoury, Fernando Hazoury, Ricardo Hazoury, Michel Rodriguez, George Spencer, Michell Vargas. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 047046)Document filed by Trump Marks Real Estate LLC.(js) (Entered: 08/29/2012)
                                                                LREF

                                                                Statistics

                                                                This case has been viewed 835 times.

                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                Space
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                 
                                                                PlainSite
                                                                Sign Up
                                                                Need Password Help?