Mass Eye & Ear v. Novartis Pharma AG
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:03-cv-10023
District Judge Edward F. Harrington, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Massachusetts Eye And Ear Infirmary, Plaintiff
Officer/Director, Akouos, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Roach & Carpenter, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED M. Ellen Carpenter +1 617 720 1800 +1 617 720 0720
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christine M. Roach +1 617 720 1800 +1 617 720 0720

Toggle Switch Represented by Ropes & Gray LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth B. Herman +1 212 596 9000 +1 212 596 9090 kenneth.herman@ropesgray.com
v.
No Logo Novartis Ophthalmics, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Donnelly, Conroy & Gelhaar, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A. Bunis +1 617 720 2880 dbunis@dcglaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suffolk County District Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/11/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicholas Joseph Walsh +1 617 619 4000
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (31) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: None
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Massachusetts Eye & Ear Infirmary. (Mangasarian, Karen) (Entered: 03/02/2007)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/16/2007, Entered: None
    NOTICE of Change of Address by Karen Mangasarian (Mangasarian, Karen) (Entered: 02/16/2007)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/14/2007, Entered: None
      NOTICE of Change of Address by Christine M. Roach re: Ropes & Gray LLP (Roach, Christine) (Entered: 02/14/2007)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/23/2006, Entered: None
        STIPULATION and [proposed] Order Staying Action by Massachusetts Eye & Ear Infirmary, Novartis Ophthalmics, Inc.. (Roach, Christine) (Entered: 02/23/2006)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/11/2005, Entered: None
          NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance Attorney Nicholas Joseph Walsh terminated. (Walsh, Nicholas) (Entered: 08/11/2005)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/7/2005, Entered: None
            MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Massachusetts Eye & Ear Infirmary. (Attorney Bindu Donovan not on docket)(Holahan, Sandra) (Entered: 03/09/2005)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/7/2005, Entered: None
              NOTICE of firm name change by Massachusetts Eye & Ear Infirmary (Holahan, Sandra) (Entered: 01/12/2005)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/18/2003, Entered: None
                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Novartis Ophthalmics, Inc.. (Holahan, Sandra) (Entered: 08/20/2003)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/18/2003, Entered: None
                  ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Novartis Ophthalmics, Inc..(Holahan, Sandra) (Entered: 08/20/2003)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: None
                    ASSENTED MOTION for Extension of Time to 8/18/2003 to File Answer re 16 Amended Complaint by Novartis Ophthalmics, Inc..(Holahan, Sandra) (Entered: 08/19/2003)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/25/2003, Entered: None
                      RESPONSE in OPPOSITION to 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to August 15, 2003 to File Answer re 16 Amended Complaint, 18 Amended Complaint filed by Massachusetts Eye & Ear Infirmary; c/s. (Tebo, Susan) (Entered: 07/30/2003)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/24/2003, Entered: None
                        MOTION for Extension of Time to August 15, 2003 to File Answer re 16 Amended Complaint, 18 Amended Complaint filed by Novartis Ophthalmics, Inc.; c/s.(Tebo, Susan) (Entered: 07/30/2003)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: None
                          NOTICE OF NAME CHANGE to Novartis Pharma AG by Novartis Ophthalmics, Inc. (Holahan, Sandra) (Entered: 07/22/2003)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/11/2003, Entered: None
                            AMENDED COMPLAINT against Novartis Ophthalmics, Inc. , filed by Massachusetts Eye & Ear Infirmary.(Holahan, Sandra) (Entered: 07/16/2003)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/2/2003, Entered: None
                              RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to Motion re 8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Massachusetts Eye & Ear Infirmary. (Holahan, Sandra) (Entered: 07/09/2003)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/2/2003, Entered: None
                                AMENDED COMPLAINT against Novartis Ophthalmics, Inc. , filed by Massachusetts Eye & Ear Infirmary.(Holahan, Sandra) (Entered: 07/09/2003)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/2/2003, Entered: None
                                  MOTION for Leave to File amended complaint by Massachusetts Eye & Ear Infirmary.(Holahan, Sandra) (Entered: 07/09/2003)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/27/2003, Entered: None
                                    ASSENTED MOTION for Extension of Time to 7/2/2003 to file opposition by Massachusetts Eye & Ear Infirmary.(Holahan, Sandra) Modified on 7/2/2003 (Holahan, Sandra). (Entered: 07/02/2003)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/12/2003, Entered: None
                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to 6/27/2003 to to file a reply brief and opposition by Massachusetts Eye & Ear Infirmary, Novartis Ophthalmics, Inc..(Holahan, Sandra) (Entered: 06/18/2003)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/30/2003, Entered: None
                                        ANSWER to Complaint by Novartis Ophthalmics, Inc..(Holahan, Sandra) (Entered: 06/18/2003)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/30/2003, Entered: None
                                          DECLARATION of Christina Ackermann-Swistara re 8 MOTION to Dismiss by Novartis Ophthalmics, Inc.. (Holahan, Sandra) (Entered: 06/13/2003)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/30/2003, Entered: None
                                            AFFIDAVIT of David A. Bunis, Esq. re 8 MOTION to Dismiss by Novartis Ophthalmics, Inc.. (Holahan, Sandra) (Entered: 06/13/2003)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/30/2003, Entered: None
                                              MEMORANDUM in Support re 8 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Novartis Ophthalmics, Inc.. (Holahan, Sandra) (Entered: 06/13/2003)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/30/2003, Entered: None
                                                MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Novartis Ophthalmics, Inc..(Holahan, Sandra) (Entered: 06/13/2003)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/30/2003, Entered: None
                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Novartis Ophthalmics, Inc.. (Holahan, Sandra) (Entered: 06/13/2003)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/21/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    Case re-assigned to Judge Edward F. Harrington. Judge Joseph L. Tauro no longer assigned to the case. (Spencer, Sherry) (Entered: 05/22/2003)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/15/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      Judge Joseph L. Tauro . Notice: See notice for details. Request case be re-drawn to Judge Harrington 01-cv-10747. cc/cl (ssp) Modified on 5/22/2003 (Spencer, Sherry). (Entered: 05/15/2003)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/5/2003, Entered: None
                                                        Return receipt received for mail sent to: Novartis Ophthalmics AG with delivery on 04/03/03 accepted by: delivered at: Grenzstrasse 10, 8100 Bulach (ssp) (Entered: 05/12/2003)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/28/2003, Entered: None
                                                          STIPULATION by Mass Eye & Ear in 1:03-cv-10023, Novartis Ophthalmics in 1:03-cv-10023, reset answer due for 5/30/03 for Novartis Ophthalmics , filed. c/s (ssp) (Entered: 05/08/2003)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                            STIPULATION by Mass Eye & Ear in 1:03-cv-10023, Novartis Ophthalmics in 1:03-cv-10023, to extend time to April 30, 2003 to respond to complaint , filed. (eye) (Entered: 04/02/2003)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/3/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              Complaint filed. Case assigned to Judge: Tuaro. Receipt #: 44163 Amount:$ 150.. paid (eaf) (Entered: 01/06/2003)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                Statistics

                                                                This case has been viewed 33 times.

                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                Space
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                 
                                                                PlainSite
                                                                Sign Up
                                                                Need Password Help?