Unknown
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 4:07-cv-40256
District Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 11, 2017 at 2:44 AM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Printguard, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy D. Johnston +1 617 310 6025 +1 617 310 6001 johnstont@gtlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nutter, McClennen & Fish, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Heather B. Repicky +1 617 439 2192 +1 614 310 9192 hrepicky@nutter.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Lehrer Patent Law Firm LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph F. Shea +1 617 418 1704 joseph.shea@FisherBroyles.com
No Logo Anti-Marking Systems, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bracewell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED john.luman@bgllp.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED john.luman@bgllp.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew William Zeve +1 713 221 1116 +1 713 437 5383 andrew.zeve@bracewell.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew William Zeve +1 713 221 1116 +1 713 437 5383 andrew.zeve@bracewell.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Brown Rudnick LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin M. Welch +1 617 856 8200 +1 617 289 0507 bwelch@brownrudnick.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin M. Welch +1 617 856 8200 +1 617 289 0507 bwelch@brownrudnick.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Murphy & King

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cheryl B. Pinarchick +1 617 423 0400 +1 617 423 0498 cbp@murphyking.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cheryl B. Pinarchick +1 617 423 0400 +1 617 423 0498 cbp@murphyking.com
v.
No Logo Anti-Marking Systems, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bracewell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED john.luman@bgllp.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew William Zeve +1 713 221 1116 +1 713 437 5383 andrew.zeve@bracewell.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Brown Rudnick LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin M. Welch +1 617 856 8200 +1 617 289 0507 bwelch@brownrudnick.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Murphy & King

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cheryl B. Pinarchick +1 617 423 0400 +1 617 423 0498 cbp@murphyking.com
No Logo Shigeki Matsukawa, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bracewell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED john.luman@bgllp.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew William Zeve +1 713 221 1116 +1 713 437 5383 andrew.zeve@bracewell.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Brown Rudnick LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin M. Welch +1 617 856 8200 +1 617 289 0507 bwelch@brownrudnick.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Murphy & King

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cheryl B. Pinarchick +1 617 423 0400 +1 617 423 0498 cbp@murphyking.com
No Logo Sivex Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bracewell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED john.luman@bgllp.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew William Zeve +1 713 221 1116 +1 713 437 5383 andrew.zeve@bracewell.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Brown Rudnick LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin M. Welch +1 617 856 8200 +1 617 289 0507 bwelch@brownrudnick.com

Toggle Switch Represented by MURPHY & KING, PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cheryl B. Pinarchick +1 617 423 0400 +1 617 423 0498 cbp@murphyking.com
No Logo Printguard, Inc., Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by FisherBroyles, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph F. Shea +1 617 418 1704 joseph.shea@FisherBroyles.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph F. Shea +1 617 418 1704 joseph.shea@FisherBroyles.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy D. Johnston +1 617 310 6025 +1 617 310 6001 johnstont@gtlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy D. Johnston +1 617 310 6025 +1 617 310 6001 johnstont@gtlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nutter, McClennen & Fish, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Heather B. Repicky +1 617 439 2192 +1 614 310 9192 hrepicky@nutter.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Heather B. Repicky +1 617 439 2192 +1 614 310 9192 hrepicky@nutter.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1126
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (105) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 6/12/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered. ORDER pursuant to Local Rule 7.2, re impounded documents in the Court's custody.(Jones, Sherry) (Entered: 06/12/2009)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 10/30/2008, Entered: None
    Assented to MOTION for Order to Remove Documents Filed Under Seal From the Court Records by PrintGuard, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Repicky, Heather) (Entered: 10/30/2008)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 10/23/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
      Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered. ORDER pursuant to Local Rule 7.2, re impounded documents in the Court's custody.(Hassett, Kathy) (Entered: 10/23/2008)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 10/10/2008, Entered: None
        STIPULATION of Dismissal by PrintGuard, Inc.. (Repicky, Heather) (Entered: 10/10/2008)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 8/13/2008, Entered: None
          Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Proposed Schedule, MOTION to Continue Status Conference ( Responses due by 8/27/2008) by PrintGuard, Inc..(Repicky, Heather) (Entered: 08/13/2008)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 7/29/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
            Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered re 99 Joint MOTION to Vacate 72 Memorandum & ORDER, 52 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Order on Motion to Expedite and for Entry of Final JudgmentJoint MOTION to Vacate 72 Memorandum & ORDER, 52 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Order on Motion to Expedite and for Entry of Final Judgment filed by Anti-Marking Systems, Inc. (Hassett, Kathy) (Entered: 07/29/2008)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: None
              Joint MOTION to Vacate 72 Memorandum & ORDER, 52 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Order on Motion to Expedite and for Entry of Final Judgment by Anti-Marking Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order Vacating January 16, 2008, and March 17, 2008 Orders Denying Plaintiff's Application for Preliminary Injunction and for Entry of Final Judgment)(Luman, John) (Entered: 07/28/2008)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 7/15/2008, Entered: None
                Joint MOTION to Continue Status Conference by Anti-Marking Systems, Inc., PrintGuard, Inc..(Repicky, Heather) (Entered: 07/15/2008)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: None
                  NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, a copy of which is attached to this entry.. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 07/11/2008)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                    Transcript of Motion Hearing held on June 24, 2008, before Judge Saylor. Court Reporter: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at 508/929-3399. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Redaction Request due 7/29/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/8/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/6/2008. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 07/11/2008)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 7/9/2008, Entered: None
                      Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to August 15, 2008 to File Proposed Schedule by PrintGuard, Inc..(Repicky, Heather) (Entered: 07/09/2008)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 6/24/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                        Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: AMENDED ORDER AND INJUNCTION entered. re: 89 Judgment and Order and Injunction. (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 06/24/2008)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 6/20/2008, Entered: None
                          Opposition re 91 MOTION to Modify The Court's May 27, 2007 Proposed "Judgment and Order and Injunction" filed by Anti-Marking Systems, Inc.. (Luman, John) (Entered: 06/20/2008)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 6/6/2008, Entered: None
                            MEMORANDUM in Support re 91 MOTION to Modify The Court's May 27, 2007 Proposed "Judgment and Order and Injunction" filed by PrintGuard, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Repicky, Heather) (Entered: 06/06/2008)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 6/6/2008, Entered: None
                              MOTION to Modify The Court's May 27, 2007 Proposed "Judgment and Order and Injunction" by PrintGuard, Inc..(Repicky, Heather) (Entered: 06/06/2008)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: None
                                Opposition re 85 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Responsive to PrintGuard's Second Request for the Production of Documents and Things filed by Anti-Marking Systems, Inc.. (Luman, John) (Entered: 06/03/2008)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 5/27/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered. JUDGMENT AND ORDER AND INJUNCTION.(Castles, Martin) (Entered: 05/27/2008)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 5/27/2008, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, a copy of which is attached to this entry.. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 05/27/2008)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 5/27/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      Transcript of Motion Hearing held on May 23, 2008, before Judge Saylor. Court Reporter: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at 508/929-3399. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Redaction Request due 6/16/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/24/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/22/2008. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 05/27/2008)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 5/20/2008, Entered: None
                                        MEMORANDUM in Support re 85 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Responsive to PrintGuard's Second Request for the Production of Documents and Things filed by PrintGuard, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Repicky, Heather) (Entered: 05/20/2008)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 5/20/2008, Entered: None
                                          MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Responsive to PrintGuard's Second Request for the Production of Documents and Things by PrintGuard, Inc..(Repicky, Heather) (Entered: 05/20/2008)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: None
                                            REPLY to Response to 76 MOTION to Dismiss COUNTERCLAIMS, AMEND ITS ANSWER, AND ENTER JUDGMENT OF INFRINGEMENT filed by Anti-Marking Systems, Inc.. (Luman, John) (Entered: 05/12/2008)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: None
                                              MOTION for Leave to File A REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ITS ANSWER AND MOTION TO DISMISS ITS COUNTERCLAIMS WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Anti-Marking Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Luman, John) (Entered: 05/09/2008)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 5/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                DECLARATION re 80 Opposition to Motion of Daniel J. Rizika by PrintGuard, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Repicky, Heather) (Entered: 05/07/2008)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 5/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                  DECLARATION re 80 Opposition to Motion of Heather B. Repicky by PrintGuard, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Repicky, Heather) (Entered: 05/07/2008)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 5/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                    Opposition re 76 MOTION to Dismiss COUNTERCLAIMS, AMEND ITS ANSWER, AND ENTER JUDGMENT OF INFRINGEMENT filed by PrintGuard, Inc.. (Repicky, Heather) (Entered: 05/07/2008)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 4/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to 5/9/08 to Produce Documents by Anti-Marking Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Luman, John) (Entered: 04/30/2008)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                        PROPOSED SECOND AMENDED ANSWER RE 76 motion to amend to 4 Amended Complaint by Anti-Marking Systems, Inc.(Luman, John) Modified on 4/28/2008 (Hassett, Kathy). (Entered: 04/25/2008)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support re 76 MOTION to Dismiss COUNTERCLAIMS, AMEND ITS ANSWER, AND ENTER JUDGMENT OF INFRINGEMENT filed by Anti-Marking Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Luman, John) (Entered: 04/25/2008)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                            MOTION to Dismiss COUNTERCLAIMS, AMEND ITS ANSWER, AND ENTER JUDGMENT OF INFRINGEMENT by Anti-Marking Systems, Inc..(Luman, John) (Entered: 04/25/2008)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                              Opposition re 73 MOTION to Compel Responses to Written Discovery Requests filed by Anti-Marking Systems, Inc.. (Luman, John) (Entered: 04/04/2008)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 3/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals re 64 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit. Documents included: 72, 73. (Hassett, Kathy) (Entered: 03/26/2008)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                  MOTION to Compel Responses to Written Discovery Requests by PrintGuard, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Repicky, Heather) (Entered: 03/21/2008)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered. AMENDED MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 5 motion for preliminary injunction. (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 03/17/2008)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                      REPLY to Response to 60 MOTION to Dismiss and to Strike Allegations of Inequitable Conduct (Renewed) filed by PrintGuard, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Repicky, Heather) (Entered: 03/06/2008)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 3/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Plaintiffs Renewed Motion to Dismiss and to Strike Allegations of Inequitable Conduct by PrintGuard, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Proposed Reply), # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Repicky, Heather) (Entered: 03/05/2008)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 2/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                          USCA Case Number for the Federal Circuit 08-1211 for 64 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit, filed by PrintGuard, Inc. (Ramos, Jeanette) (Entered: 02/29/2008)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 2/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                            Opposition re 63 Second MOTION to Compel filed by Anti-Marking Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Luman, John) (Entered: 02/28/2008)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 2/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                              Opposition re 60 MOTION to Dismiss and to Strike Allegations of Inequitable Conduct (Renewed) filed by Anti-Marking Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(Luman, John) (Entered: 02/25/2008)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 2/20/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by PrintGuard, Inc. for proceedings held on 11/07/2007 and 01/16/2008 before Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV, (Repicky, Heather) (Entered: 02/20/2008)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 2/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                  Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals for Federal Circuit re 64 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit. (Hassett, Kathy) (Entered: 02/20/2008)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Federal Circuit as to 52 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Order on Motion to Expedite by PrintGuard, Inc.. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 01010000000001853167. Appeal Record due by 3/6/2008. (Repicky, Heather) (Entered: 02/15/2008)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 2/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                      Second MOTION to Compel by PrintGuard, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Repicky, Heather) (Entered: 02/14/2008)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 2/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                        ANSWER to 57 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by PrintGuard, Inc..(Repicky, Heather) (Entered: 02/11/2008)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 2/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support re 60 MOTION to Dismiss and to Strike Allegations of Inequitable Conduct (Renewed) filed by PrintGuard, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Repicky, Heather) (Entered: 02/11/2008)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 2/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss and to Strike Allegations of Inequitable Conduct (Renewed) by PrintGuard, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Proposed Order))(Repicky, Heather) (Entered: 02/11/2008)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                              REPLY to Response to 51 MOTION to Compel filed by PrintGuard, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Repicky, Heather) (Entered: 02/06/2008)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Compel by PrintGuard, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Repicky, Heather) (Entered: 02/05/2008)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                  DEFENDANT ANTI-MARKING SYSTEMS, INC.'S FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to 4 Amended Complaint AND FIRST AMENDED, COUNTERCLAIM against PrintGuard, Inc. by Anti-Marking Systems, Inc..(Luman, John) (Entered: 01/29/2008)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Opposition re 51 MOTION to Compel filed by Anti-Marking Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Luman, John) (Entered: 01/29/2008)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                      CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Anti-Marking Systems, Inc..(Welch, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/29/2008)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/23/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered. SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 4/30/2008. Discovery to be completed by 5/31/2008. Status Conference set for 6/4/2008 02:15 PM in Courtroom 2 before Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV. Motions due by 6/15/2008. (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 01/23/2008)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 1/19/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Status and Scheduling Conference held on January 16, 2008 before Judge Saylor. Court Reporter: Marianne Kusa-Ryll. The original transcripts are maintained by the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter at 508/929-3399 or the Clerk's Office. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 01/19/2008)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 1/16/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered denying 5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and denying as moot 10 Motion to Expedite discovery. (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 01/16/2008)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                              MOTION to Compel by PrintGuard, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Repicky, Heather) (Entered: 01/15/2008)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                CERTIFICATIONPursuant to L.R. 16.1(D)(3) for Plaintiff PrintGuard, Inc. (Repicky, Heather) Modified on 1/11/2008 (Jones, Sherry). (Entered: 01/10/2008)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference. (Repicky, Heather) (Entered: 01/10/2008)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    DECLARATION re 47 Reply to Response to Motion of Heather B. Repicky by PrintGuard, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Repicky, Heather) (Entered: 01/07/2008)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re 35 MOTION to Dismiss and to Strike Allegations of Inequitable Conduct filed by PrintGuard, Inc.. (Repicky, Heather) (Entered: 01/07/2008)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Dimiss and to Strike by PrintGuard, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Reply Brief), # 2 Affidavit of Heather B. Repicky, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5)(Repicky, Heather) (Entered: 01/04/2008)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 12/27/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Scheduling Conference: Scheduling Conference set for 1/16/2008 at 3:15PM in Courtroom 2 before Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV. (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 12/27/2007)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Opposition re 35 MOTION to Dismiss and to Strike Allegations of Inequitable Conduct filed by Anti-Marking Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Deposition Excerpts, # 2 Exhibit 2 Brochure)(Zeve, Andrew) (Entered: 12/21/2007)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 43 Filed: 12/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Sealed Document. (Plaintiff's supplemental memorandum) (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 12/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Sivex Corporation and Shigeki Matsukawa by PrintGuard, Inc.. (Repicky, Heather) (Entered: 12/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 41 Filed: 12/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Sealed Unredacted version of Defendant's Supplement to its opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Exhibits 1-5. (Jones, Sherry) (Entered: 12/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Seal Plaintiff's Supplemental Memorandum by PrintGuard, Inc..(Repicky, Heather) (Entered: 12/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 12/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Anti-Marking Systems, Inc. re 38 Opposition to Motion, OF FILING WITH CLERK'S OFFICE (unredacted version filed under seal) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Index to Exhibits for Defendant's Supplement to Its Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction))(Welch, Benjamin) (Entered: 12/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Supplemental Opposition re 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Anti-Marking Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Filed Under Seal)# 2 Exhibit 2 (Filed Under Seal)# 3 Exhibit 3 (Filed Under Seal)# 4 Exhibit 4 (Filed Under Seal)# 5 Exhibit 5 (Filed Under Seal))(Welch, Benjamin) (Entered: 12/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/10/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV: ORDER entered. PROTECTIVE ORDER.(Castles, Martin) (Entered: 12/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support re 35 MOTION to Dismiss and to Strike Allegations of Inequitable Conduct filed by PrintGuard, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Repicky, Heather) (Entered: 12/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss and to Strike Allegations of Inequitable Conduct by PrintGuard, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Repicky, Heather) (Entered: 12/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to Counterclaim by PrintGuard, Inc. to 30 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim. (Repicky, Heather) Modified on 12/11/2007 (Jones, Sherry). (Entered: 12/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION for Protective Order by PrintGuard, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Repicky, Heather) (Entered: 12/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/29/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to December 12, 2007 to File Response/Reply as to 29 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by PrintGuard, Inc..(Johnston, Timothy) (Entered: 11/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support re 29 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Shigeki Matsukawa, Sivex Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Shigeki Matsukawa)(Luman, John) (Entered: 11/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        DEFENDANT ANTI-MARKING SYSTEMS, INC.'S ORIGINAL ANSWER to Amended Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM against PrintGuard, Inc. by Anti-Marking Systems, Inc..(Luman, John) (Entered: 11/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Shigeki Matsukawa, Sivex Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Luman, John) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/20/2007 (Hassett, Kathy). Modified on 11/20/2007 (Hassett, Kathy). (Entered: 11/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/15/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Response by PrintGuard, Inc. to Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply (#25). (Repicky, Heather) (Entered: 11/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/15/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION re 26 Reply to Response to Motion of Daniel J. Rizika by PrintGuard, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Repicky, Heather) (Entered: 11/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/15/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by PrintGuard, Inc.. (Repicky, Heather) (Entered: 11/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/15/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  SUR-REPLY to Motion re 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Anti-Marking Systems, Inc., Sivex Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Sur Reply to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Welch, Benjamin) (Entered: 11/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Reply by PrintGuard, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Reply Brief# 2 Supplement Declaration of Daniel J. Rizika# 3 Exhibit A to Declaration# 4 Exhibit B to Declaration)(Repicky, Heather) (Entered: 11/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      Opposition re 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Anti-Marking Systems, Inc., Sivex Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Matsukawa Affidavit# 2 Exhibit 1 to Matsukawa Affidavit# 3 Exhibit 2 to Matsukawa Affidavit# 4 Exhibit 3 to Matsukawa Affidavit# 5 Exhibit 4 to Matsukawa Affidavit# 6 Exhibit B - Zeve Affidavit# 7 Exhibit 1 to Zeve Affidavit# 8 Exhibit 2 to Zeve Affidavit# 9 Exhibit 3 to Zeve Affidavit# 10 Exhibit 4 to Zeve Affidavit# 11 Exhibit 5 to Zeve Affidavit# 12 Exhibit 6 to Zeve Affidavit# 13 Exhibit 7 to Zeve Affidavit)(Luman, John) (Entered: 11/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on November 7, 2007 before Judge Saylor. Court Reporter: Marianne Kusa-Ryll. The original transcripts are maintained by the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter at 508/929-3399 or the Clerk's Office. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 11/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/8/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph F. Shea on behalf of PrintGuard, Inc. (Shea, Joseph) (Entered: 11/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed Anti-Marking Systems, Inc. served on 10/30/2007, answer due 11/19/2007. (Repicky, Heather) (Entered: 11/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed Sivex Corporation served on 10/29/2007, answer due 11/19/2007. (Repicky, Heather) (Entered: 11/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed Shigeki Matsukawa served on 10/29/2007, answer due 11/19/2007. (Repicky, Heather) (Entered: 11/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/6/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION re 16 Opposition to Motion of Timothy D. Johnston by PrintGuard, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D)(Repicky, Heather) (Entered: 11/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/6/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Opposition re 10 MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by PrintGuard, Inc.. (Repicky, Heather) (Entered: 11/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy D. Johnston on behalf of PrintGuard, Inc. (Johnston, Timothy) (Entered: 11/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Cheryl B. Pinarchick on behalf of Anti-Marking Systems, Inc., Sivex Corporation, PrintGuard, Inc. (Pinarchick, Cheryl) (Entered: 11/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Andrew W. Zeve Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1730495. by Anti-Marking Systems, Inc., Shigeki Matsukawa, Sivex Corporation.(Welch, Benjamin) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/5/2007 (Hassett, Kathy). (Entered: 11/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of John F. Luman III Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1730478. by Anti-Marking Systems, Inc., Shigeki Matsukawa, Sivex Corporation.(Welch, Benjamin) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/5/2007 (Hassett, Kathy). (Entered: 11/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support re 10 MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by Anti-Marking Systems, Inc., Sivex Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Order on Motion for Expedited Discovery)(Welch, Benjamin) (Entered: 11/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Expedite Discovery by Anti-Marking Systems, Inc., Sivex Corporation.(Welch, Benjamin) (Entered: 11/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin M. Welch on behalf of Anti-Marking Systems, Inc., Shigeki Matsukawa, Sivex Corporation (Welch, Benjamin) (Entered: 11/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION re 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction of Heather B. Repicky by PrintGuard, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G)(Repicky, Heather) (Entered: 10/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION re 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction of Daniel J. Rizika by PrintGuard, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G)(Repicky, Heather) (Entered: 10/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support re 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by PrintGuard, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Repicky, Heather) (Entered: 10/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by PrintGuard, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Repicky, Heather) (Entered: 10/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED COMPLAINT against Anti-Marking Systems, Inc., Shigeki Matsukawa, Sivex Corporation, filed by PrintGuard, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Repicky, Heather) (Entered: 10/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPORT on the filing/termination of patent/trademark case. (Repicky, Heather) (Entered: 09/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by PrintGuard, Inc.. (Repicky, Heather) (Entered: 09/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT against PrintGuard, Inc. Filing fee: $ 350, receipt number 1685591, filed by PrintGuard, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Civil Cover Sheet # 4 Category Form)(Repicky, Heather) (Entered: 09/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 78 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?