VLT, Inc. v. Lucent Technologies Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-10047
District Judge Patti B. Saris, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 13, 2017 at 4:54 AM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Vlt, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert E. Hillman +1 617 542 5070 +1 617 542 8906 hillman@fr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence Kenneth Kolodney +1 617 542 5070 +1 617 542 8906 lkk@fr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas C Doskocil +1 617 570 1215 +1 617 523 1231 ddoskocil@goodwinprocter.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul F. Ware, Jr. +1 617 570 1000 +1 617 523 1231 pware@goodwinprocter.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daryl L Wiesen +1 614 570 1396 +1 617 523 1231 dwiesen@goodwinprocter.com
v.
No Logo Lucent Technologies, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Comm/scope, Inc.
Unknown Role, Agere Systems, Inc.
Unknown Role, Lucent En Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Ropes & Gray LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dalila Argaez Wendlandt +1 617 951 7884 +1 617 951 7050 dalila.wendlandt@ropesgray.com
No Logo Tyco Electronics Power Systems, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ropes & Gray LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dalila Argaez Wendlandt +1 617 951 7884 +1 617 951 7050 dalila.wendlandt@ropesgray.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1338
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/24/2007, Entered: None
STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joint Stipulation For Dismissal With Prejudice And Order Thereon) by Lucent Technologies Inc., Tyco Electronics Power Systems, Inc., VLT, Inc.. (Doskocil, Douglas) (Entered: 05/24/2007)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/17/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
    Judge Patti B. Saris : ORDER entered. SETTLEMENT ORDER OF DISMISSAL (Patch, Christine) (Entered: 05/21/2007)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/16/2007, Entered: None
      JOINT STATEMENT of counsel (Local Rule 16.1 Joint Statement And Notice Of Settlement). (Doskocil, Douglas) (Entered: 05/16/2007)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/27/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
        NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 5/23/2007 at 3:30 PM in Courtroom 19 before Judge Patti B. Saris. (Alba, Robert) (Entered: 03/27/2007)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/26/2007, Entered: None
          ANSWER to Complaint by Lucent Technologies Inc., Tyco Electronics Power Systems, Inc..(Wendlandt, Dalila) (Entered: 03/26/2007)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/28/2007, Entered: None
            MOTION for Extension of Time to 3-26-2007 to Answer Or Otherwise Respond To Complaint by Lucent Technologies Inc., Tyco Electronics Power Systems, Inc..(Wendlandt, Dalila) (Entered: 02/28/2007)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: None
              Joint MOTION to Postpone Scheduling Conference by Lucent Technologies Inc., Tyco Electronics Power Systems, Inc., VLT, Inc..(Doskocil, Douglas) (Entered: 02/09/2007)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/5/2007, Entered: None
                SUMMONS Returned Executed Tyco Electronics Power Systems, Inc. served on 1/16/2007, answer due 2/5/2007. (Doskocil, Douglas) (Entered: 02/05/2007)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/5/2007, Entered: None
                  SUMMONS Returned Executed Lucent Technologies Inc. served on 1/16/2007, answer due 2/5/2007. (Doskocil, Douglas) (Entered: 02/05/2007)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/1/2007, Entered: None
                    MOTION for Extension of Time to 3/5/2007 to Answer Or Otherwise Respond To Complaint by Lucent Technologies Inc., Tyco Electronics Power Systems, Inc..(Wendlandt, Dalila) (Entered: 02/01/2007)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/1/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                      NOTICE of Scheduling ConferenceThe Scheduling Conference has been set for 2/13/2007 03:00 PM in Courtroom 14 before Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin. (Simeone, Maria) Additional attachment(s) added on 2/1/2007 (Simeone, Maria). (Entered: 02/01/2007)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/19/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                        Judge Robert B. Collings : ORDER OF RECUSAL.(Dolan, Kathleen) (Entered: 01/22/2007)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/9/2007, Entered: None
                          REPORT on the filing of copyright case. (Filo, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/11/2007)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/9/2007, Entered: None
                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by VLT, Inc.. (Hurley, Virginia) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/11/2007 (Filo, Jennifer). (Entered: 01/09/2007)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/9/2007, Entered: None
                              COMPLAINT against Lucent Technologies Inc., Tyco Electronics Power Systems, Inc. , filed by VLT, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet # 2 Category Sheet # 3 Exhibit A # 4 Exhibit B)(Hurley, Virginia) (Entered: 01/09/2007)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 55 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?