Serono, Inc. v. Berlex Laboratories
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:02-cv-10401
District Judge Mark L. Wolf, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 14, 2017 at 6:50 AM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Serono, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Duane Morris LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED D. Dennis Allegretti +1 617 289 9200
v.
No Logo Berlex Laboratories, Inc., Defendant
Biogen Idec, Inc. Biogen Idec, Inc., Interested Party
Officially listed as "Biogen Inc."
Unknown Role, Bioverativ Inc.
Unknown Role, Biogen Ma Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David B. Bass +1 617 526 6259 +1 617 526 5000 david.bassett@wilmerhale.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David B. Bass +1 617 526 6259 +1 617 526 5000 david.bassett@wilmerhale.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1338
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/21/2010, Entered: None
Joint MOTION for Return of Property Documents Filed Under Seal by Berlex Laboratories, Inc., Biogen Inc..(Bassett, David) (Entered: 10/21/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/17/2010, Entered: None
    MOTION for Extension of Time to September 27, 2010 to Respond to Order Regarding Future Custody of Material Filed Under Seal by Biogen Inc..(Bassett, David) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/26/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
      Chief Judge Mark L. Wolf: ORDER entered. Please take notice that the records of the Court contain material that was filed in the above case pursuant to a protective, confidentiality or impoundment order.The material having been filed without a cut-off date or the cut-off date for maintaining the records pursuant to Local Rule 7.2 having expired, it is hereby ORDERED that the documents numbered below will be placed in the public file of this case without further notice unless, within 21 days of the date of this order, an appropriate motion regarding future custody of this material is filed.Associated Cases: 1:96-cv-10916-MLW, 1:96-cv-12487-MLW, 1:97-cv-11191-MLW, 1:98-cv-11728-MLW, 1:02-cv-10401-MLW(O'Leary, Dennis) (Entered: 08/26/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/23/2002, Entered: None
        Proposed Stipulation and Order of Dismissal by Serono, Inc. in 1:02-cv-10401, Berlex Laboratories, in 1:02-cv-10401 received for filing. (ktb) (Entered: 07/25/2002)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/13/2002, Entered: None
          Return of service executed as to Berlex Laboratories, in 1:02-cv-10401 with service on 7/3/02 filed. Answer due on 7/23/02 for Berlex Laboratories, (ktb) (Entered: 07/15/2002)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/8/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
            Complaint filed. Case assigned to Judge: 0123. Receipt #: 37520 Amount:$ 150.00. Fee Status: pd (ktb) (Entered: 03/11/2002)
              Request RequestSpace LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 110 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?