Altova GmbH v. Progress Software Corporation
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-11595
District Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 11, 2017 at 5:43 PM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Altova, GmbH, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Brown Rudnick LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward J. Naughton +1 617 856 8200 +1 617 856 8201 enaughton@brownrudnick.com
v.
No Logo Progress Software Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fenwick & West LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Darren E. Donnelly +1 650 988 8500 +1 650 938 5200 ddonnelly@fenwick.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nutter, McClennen & Fish, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nelson G. Apjohn +1 617 439 2246 +1 617 310 9246 napjohn@nutter.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Heather B. Repicky +1 617 439 2192 +1 614 310 9192 hrepicky@nutter.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: None
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Altova GmbH. (Naughton, Edward) (Entered: 05/29/2008)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/21/2008, Entered: None
    STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER by Altova GmbH. (Naughton, Edward) (Entered: 05/21/2008)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/15/2008, Entered: None
      STIPULATION to Extend Time To Answer by Altova GmbH. (Naughton, Edward) (Entered: 05/15/2008)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/15/2008, Entered: None
        STIPULATION re 1 Complaint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Progress Software Corporation. (Donnelly, Darren) (Entered: 04/15/2008)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/14/2008, Entered: None
          STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Progress Software Corporation. (Donnelly, Darren) (Entered: 03/14/2008)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/3/2008, Entered: None
            STIPULATION re 1 Complaint to Extend Time to Answer (Assented to) by Altova GmbH. (Naughton, Edward) (Entered: 03/03/2008)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: None
              STIPULATION re 1 Complaint to Extend Time to Answer (Assented to) by Altova GmbH. (Naughton, Edward) (Entered: 02/15/2008)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/31/2008, Entered: None
                STIPULATION re 1 Complaint TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER OR RESPOND (ASSENTED TO) by Progress Software Corporation. (Donnelly, Darren) (Entered: 01/31/2008)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/15/2008, Entered: None
                  STIPULATION re 1 Complaint to extend time to answer or respond (assented to) by Progress Software Corporation. (Donnelly, Darren) (Entered: 01/15/2008)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/12/2007, Entered: None
                    STIPULATION re 1 Complaint to Extend Time to Answer (Assented To) by Altova GmbH, Progress Software Corporation. (Naughton, Edward) (Entered: 12/12/2007)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: None
                      STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Progress Software Corporation. (Donnelly, Darren) (Entered: 11/28/2007)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/14/2007, Entered: None
                        STIPULATION re 1 Complaint To Extend Time to Answer by Altova GmbH, Progress Software Corporation. (Naughton, Edward) (Entered: 11/14/2007)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: None
                          MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Darren E. Donnelly Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1740845. by Progress Software Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Repicky, Heather) (Entered: 11/13/2007)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/9/2007, Entered: None
                            NOTICE of Appearance by Heather B. Repicky on behalf of Progress Software Corporation (Repicky, Heather) (Entered: 11/09/2007)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/12/2007, Entered: None
                              NOTICE of Appearance by Nelson G. Apjohn on behalf of Progress Software Corporation (Apjohn, Nelson) (Entered: 10/12/2007)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/12/2007, Entered: None
                                STIPULATION re 1 Complaint to Extend Time to Answer (Assented to) by Altova GmbH. (Naughton, Edward) (Entered: 10/12/2007)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/27/2007, Entered: None
                                  REPORT on the filing of a Patent Case. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 08/27/2007)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/27/2007, Entered: None
                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Altova GmbH. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 08/27/2007)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/27/2007, Entered: None
                                      COMPLAINT against Progress Software Corporation, filed by Altova GmbH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 08/27/2007)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 105 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?