Bose Corporation v. GN Netcom, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-10539
District Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 11, 2017 at 11:36 PM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Bose Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Hieken +1 617 521 7014 +1 617 542 8906 hieken@fr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam J. Kessel +1 617 542 5070 kessel@fr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory A. Madera +1 617 542 5070 +1 617 542 8906 madera@fr.com
No Logo Gn Netcom, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Day Pitney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David B. Broughel +1 617 345 4600 +1 617 345 4745 dbbroughel@daypitney.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Erica Tennyson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Erica Tennyson +1 617 684 1487 erica@tennysonlawoffice.com
No Logo Phitek Systems Ltd, Counter-Claimant
Officially listed as "Phitek Systems Limited"

Toggle Switch Represented by Day Pitney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David B. Broughel +1 617 345 4600 +1 617 345 4745 dbbroughel@daypitney.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Erica Tennyson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Erica Tennyson +1 617 684 1487 erica@tennysonlawoffice.com
v.
No Logo Gn Netcom, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Day Pitney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David B. Broughel +1 617 345 4600 +1 617 345 4745 dbbroughel@daypitney.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jackson & Walker, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Drew Chapman +1 210 978 7700

Toggle Switch Represented by Jackson Walker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William B Nash +1 210 978 7764 bnash@jw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Erica Tennyson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Erica Tennyson +1 617 684 1487 erica@tennysonlawoffice.com
No Logo Phitek Systems Ltd, Defendant
Officially listed as "Phitek Systems Limited"

Toggle Switch Represented by Day Pitney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David B. Broughel +1 617 345 4600 +1 617 345 4745 dbbroughel@daypitney.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jackson & Walker, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Drew Chapman +1 210 978 7700

Toggle Switch Represented by Jackson Walker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William B Nash +1 210 978 7764 bnash@jw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Erica Tennyson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Erica Tennyson +1 617 684 1487 erica@tennysonlawoffice.com
No Logo Bose Corporation, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Hieken +1 617 521 7014 +1 617 542 8906 hieken@fr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam J. Kessel +1 617 542 5070 kessel@fr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory A. Madera +1 617 542 5070 +1 617 542 8906 madera@fr.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1126
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (35) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/19/2008, Entered: None
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Bose Corporation, GN Netcom, Inc., Phitek Systems Limited. (Kessel, Adam) (Entered: 11/19/2008)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/29/2008, Entered: None
    STATUS REPORT (Joint) by Bose Corporation, GN Netcom, Inc., Phitek Systems Limited. (Kessel, Adam) (Entered: 07/29/2008)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
      Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered (Please see order for details.)denying 26 Motion for Leave to File; ; denying 27 Motion for Protective Order; denying 30 Motion for Leave to File; ; granting 32 Motion to Stay; denying 9 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying 16 Motion for Leave to File; ; denying 17 Motion for Leave to File; ; denying 20 Motion for Leave to File; ; denying 21 Motion for Leave to File; ; denying 22 Motion to Compel (Sonnenberg, Elizabeth) (Entered: 02/04/2008)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/10/2008, Entered: None
        MOTION to Stay by GN Netcon, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit A1, # 3 Exhibit A2, # 4 Exhibit B)(Tennyson, Erica) (Entered: 01/10/2008)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: None
          RESPONSE to Motion re 27 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Bose Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Kessel, Adam) (Entered: 12/21/2007)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: None
            MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Further Opposition To Bose's Motion to Compel by Phitek Systems Limited. (Attachments: # 1 1)(Tennyson, Erica) (Entered: 12/14/2007)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/7/2007, Entered: None
              NOTICE by GN Netcon, Inc. (Attachments: # 1)(Tennyson, Erica) (Entered: 12/07/2007)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/7/2007, Entered: None
                EXHIBIT S by GN Netcon, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 # 2 # 3 # 4 # 5 # 6 # 7 # 8 # 9 # 10 # 11 # 12)(Tennyson, Erica) (Entered: 12/07/2007)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/7/2007, Entered: None
                  MOTION for Protective Order by GN Netcon, Inc. Limited.(Tennyson, Erica) Modified on 12/7/2007 (Sonnenberg, Elizabeth). (Entered: 12/07/2007)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/6/2007, Entered: None
                    MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Compel by Bose Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Reply Brief in Support of Bose's Motion to Compel)(Kessel, Adam) (Entered: 12/06/2007)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/6/2007, Entered: None
                      Opposition re 22 MOTION to Compel Phitek to Respond to Document Requests and for Sanctions filed by Phitek Systems Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I# 10 Exhibit J# 11 Exhibit K# 12 Exhibit L# 13 Exhibit M# 14 Exhibit N# 15 Exhibit O# 16 Exhibit P# 17 Exhibit Q)(Tennyson, Erica) (Entered: 12/06/2007)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/22/2007, Entered: None
                        DECLARATION re 23 Memorandum in Support of Motion by Bose Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5)(Kessel, Adam) (Entered: 11/22/2007)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/22/2007, Entered: None
                          MEMORANDUM in Support re 22 MOTION to Compel Phitek to Respond to Document Requests and for Sanctions filed by Bose Corporation. (Kessel, Adam) (Entered: 11/22/2007)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/22/2007, Entered: None
                            MOTION to Compel Phitek to Respond to Document Requests and for Sanctions by Bose Corporation.(Kessel, Adam) (Entered: 11/22/2007)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/14/2007, Entered: None
                              MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply by GN Netcon, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Sur-reply)(Tennyson, Erica) (Entered: 11/14/2007)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/7/2007, Entered: None
                                Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply to GN Netcom's Opposition to Bose Motions for Leave to File an Amended Complaint by Bose Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Reply to GN NetCom's Opp to Bose Motions for Leave to File an Amended Complaint)(Kessel, Adam) (Entered: 11/07/2007)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/23/2007, Entered: None
                                  RESPONSE to Motion re 17 Supplemental MOTION for Leave to File An Amended Complaint Adding Creative Labs as Defendant, 16 MOTION for Leave to File An Amended Complaint Adding Logitech, Audio-Technica and Panasonic filed by GN Netcon, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 # 2 # 3 # 4 # 5 # 6 # 7 # 8)(Tennyson, Erica) (Entered: 10/23/2007)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/12/2007, Entered: None
                                    Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 11/20/2007 to Jurisdictional Discovery by GN Netcon, Inc., Phitek Systems Limited.(Tennyson, Erica) (Entered: 10/12/2007)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/11/2007, Entered: None
                                      Supplemental MOTION for Leave to File An Amended Complaint Adding Creative Labs as Defendant by Bose Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed First Amended Complaint)(Kessel, Adam) (Entered: 10/11/2007)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/9/2007, Entered: None
                                        MOTION for Leave to File An Amended Complaint Adding Logitech, Audio-Technica and Panasonic by Bose Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Kessel, Adam) (Entered: 10/09/2007)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: None
                                          ANSWER to Counterclaim by Bose Corporation.(Kessel, Adam) (Entered: 09/17/2007)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: None
                                            Assented to MOTION for Discovery and Postpone Response to Phitek's Motion to Dismiss by Bose Corporation.(Kessel, Adam) (Entered: 08/30/2007)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/28/2007, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory A. Madera on behalf of Bose Corporation (Madera, Gregory) (Entered: 08/28/2007)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of WILLIAM B. NASH by GN Netcon, Inc., Phitek Systems Limited. (Attachments: # 1)(Tennyson, Erica) (Entered: 08/27/2007)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                  MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of DANIEL D. CHAPMAN by GN Netcon, Inc., Phitek Systems Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Tennyson, Erica) (Entered: 08/27/2007)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support re 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(2) filed by Phitek Systems Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Tennyson, Erica) (Entered: 08/27/2007)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                      MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(2) by Phitek Systems Limited.(Tennyson, Erica) (Entered: 08/27/2007)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                        AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Bose Corporation by GN Netcon, Inc., .(Tennyson, Erica) Modified on 8/30/2007 (Sonnenberg, Elizabeth). (Entered: 08/27/2007)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Erica Tennyson on behalf of GN Netcon, Inc., Phitek Systems Limited (Tennyson, Erica) (Entered: 08/27/2007)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by David B. Broughel on behalf of GN Netcon, Inc., Phitek Systems Limited (Broughel, David) (Entered: 08/27/2007)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Erica Tennyson on behalf of GN Netcon, Inc., Phitek Systems Limited (Tennyson, Erica) (Entered: 08/27/2007)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Adam J. Kessel on behalf of Bose Corporation (Kessel, Adam) (Entered: 08/27/2007)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Bose Corporation. Phitek Systems Limited served on 7/4/2007, answer due 7/24/2007. Acknowledgement filed by Bose Corporation. (Madera, Gregory) (Entered: 07/12/2007)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Bose Corporation. GN Netcon, Inc. served on 6/21/2007, answer due 7/11/2007. Acknowledgement filed by Bose Corporation. (Madera, Gregory) (Entered: 07/12/2007)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 3/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                      COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against all defendants Filing fee: $ 350, receipt number 1453553, filed by Bose Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 # 2 Civil Cover Sheet # 3)(Hieken, Charles) (Entered: 03/21/2007)
                                                                      LREF

                                                                      Statistics

                                                                      This case has been viewed 29 times.

                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                      Space
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                       
                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                      Need Password Help?