Potomac Aviation v. Belfort Instrument
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:02-cv-10276
District Judge Robert E. Keeton, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 27, 2017 at 2:00 AM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Potomac Aviation Technology Corp., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hamilton Brook Smith & Reynolds, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David J. Brody +1 978 341 0036 +1 978 341 0136 David.Brody@hbsr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Leacy Dupre +1 978 341 0036 john.dupre@hbsr.com
v.
No Logo Belfort Instrument Company, Defendant
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 145
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (2) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/27/2002, Entered: None
Notice of voluntary dismissal by Potomac Aviation as to Belfort Instrument , filed. (kf) (Entered: 05/29/2002)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/19/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
    Complaint filed. Case assigned to Judge: Keeton. Receipt #: 37145 Amount:$ 150.00. Fee Status: paid (kf) (Entered: 02/26/2002)
      Request RequestSpace LREF

      Statistics

      This case has been viewed 13 times.

      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
      Space
      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
       
      PlainSite
      Sign Up
      Need Password Help?