Melea Limited et al v. Alliance Gas Systems Incorporated et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit Michigan Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:04-cv-70530
District Judge Gerald E. Rosen, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Gerald E. Rosen
Last Updated January 10, 2017 at 3:05 AM EST (8.3 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Melea Ltd., Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Melea Limited"

Represented by Brooks Kushman PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C. Brandenburg +1 248 358 4400 +1 248 358 3351 rbrandenburg@brookskushman.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ernie L. Brooks +1 248 358 4400 +1 248 358 3351 ebrooks@brookskushman.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robyn S. Lederman +1 248 358 4400 +1 248 358 3351 mcantor@brookskushman.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Seth E. Rodack +1 313 358 4400 +3583 358 358 3351 srodack@brookskushman.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C.J. Tuttle +1 248 358 4400 +1 248 358 3351 rtuttle@brookskushman.com
No Logo Plastic Molded Technologies, Inc., Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated"

Represented by Brooks Kushman PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C. Brandenburg +1 248 358 4400 +1 248 358 3351 rbrandenburg@brookskushman.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ernie L. Brooks +1 248 358 4400 +1 248 358 3351 ebrooks@brookskushman.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robyn S. Lederman +1 248 358 4400 +1 248 358 3351 mcantor@brookskushman.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Seth E. Rodack +1 313 358 4400 +3583 358 358 3351 srodack@brookskushman.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C.J. Tuttle +1 248 358 4400 +1 248 358 3351 rtuttle@brookskushman.com
No Logo Adac Plastics, Inc., Counter-Claimant
Officially listed as "ADAC Plastics Incorporated"
No Logo Algonquin Automotive, Counter-Claimant
No Logo Alliance Gas Systems Incorporated, Counter-Claimant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert A. Dunn +1 248 894 1791 dunninndeux@aol.com

Represented by Dinnin & Dunn, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan F. Yates

Represented by Raggio & Dinnin, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael T Raggio +1 248 364 2100 raggiodinnin@aol.com
No Logo Collins & Aikman Products Company, Counter-Claimant

Represented by Honigman Miller Schwartz & Cohn LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TTAB Attorney Placeholder +1 248 566 8490 +1 248 566 8491 bdw@honigman.com

Represented by McDonald, Hopkins, Burke & Haber Company, LPA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David B. Cupar +1 216 348 5400 dcupar@mcdonaldhopkins.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David T. Movius +1 216 430 2029 +1 216 348 5474 dmovius@mcdonaldhopkins.com
DaimlerChrysler Corporation DaimlerChrysler Corporation, Counter-Claimant

Represented by Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul A. Gennari +1 202 887 4586 pgennari@akingump.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael A. O'Shea +1 202 887 4570 +1 202 887 4288 moshea@akingump.com

Represented by Bush, Seyferth & Paige, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cheryl A. Bush +1 248 822 7800 +1 248 822 7801 bush@bsplaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard W. Paige +1 248 822 7804 paige@bsplaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard W. Paige +1 248 822 7804 paige@bsplaw.com

Represented by Bush, Seyferth,

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Raymond M. Kethledge - INACTIVE +1 248 822 7803

Represented by Venable LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frank C. Cimino, Jr. +1 202 344 4569 +1 202 344 8300 fccimino@venable.com
No Logo Doveport Systems, L. L. C., Counter-Claimant

Represented by Honigman Miller Schwartz & Cohn LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/07/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J. Michael Huget +1 734 418 4254 mhuget@honigman.com
No Logo Guardian Automotive, Counter-Claimant
No Logo Guardian Industries Corporation, Counter-Claimant

Represented by Dickinson Wright PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John S. Artz +1 248 433 7502 +1 248 433 7274 jsartz@dickinsonwright.com
No Logo Intier Automotive Seating Of America, Inc., Counter-Claimant
Officially listed as "Intier Automotive Seating of America, Incorporated"
No Logo Intier Automotive Inc., Counter-Claimant
Officially listed as "Intier Automotive, Incorporated"
No Logo Johnson Controls Interiors L. L. C., Counter-Claimant
No Logo Magna Donnelly Corporation, Counter-Claimant
No Logo Magna Donnelly Mirrors North America LLC, Counter-Claimant
No Logo Siegel-robert, Inc., Counter-Claimant
Officially listed as "Siegel-Robert, Incorporated"
v.
No Logo Adac Plastics, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "ADAC Plastics Incorporated"

Represented by The Darrow Law Firm PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/07/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher G. Darrow +1 248 864 5959 +1 248 864 5960 darrow@darrowiplaw.com
No Logo Algonquin Automotive, Defendant

Represented by Bush, Seyferth & Paige, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/07/2005, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cheryl A. Bush +1 248 822 7800 +1 248 822 7801 bush@bsplaw.com

Represented by Bush, Seyferth,

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/07/2005, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Raymond M. Kethledge - INACTIVE +1 248 822 7803
No Logo Alliance Gas Systems Incorporated, Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert A. Dunn +1 248 894 1791 dunninndeux@aol.com
DaimlerChrysler Corporation DaimlerChrysler Corporation, Defendant

Represented by Bush, Seyferth & Paige, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard W. Paige +1 248 822 7804 paige@bsplaw.com

Represented by Bush, Seyferth,

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Raymond M. Kethledge - INACTIVE +1 248 822 7803
No Logo Doveport Systems, L. L. C., Defendant

Represented by Boyle Burdett

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2004 H. William Burdett, Jr. +1 313 318 9203 burdett@boyleburdett.com

Represented by Honigman Miller Schwartz & Cohn LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/07/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Deborah J. Swedlow bswedlow@honigman.com
No Logo Intier Automotive Seating Of America, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Intier Automotive Seating of America, Incorporated"

Represented by Howard & Howard Attorneys, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/07/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TTAB Attorney Placeholder +1 248 645 1483 +1 248 645 1568 jsadowski@howardandhoward.com
No Logo Intier Automotive Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Intier Automotive, Incorporated"

Represented by Howard & Howard Attorneys, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/07/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TTAB Attorney Placeholder +1 248 645 1483 +1 248 645 1568 jsadowski@howardandhoward.com
No Logo Johnson Controls Interiors L. L. C., Defendant

Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/14/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY Ryan S. Bewersdorf +1 313 234 7100 +1 313 234 2800 rbewersdorf@foley.com
TERMINATED: 01/14/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY Jason D. Menges +1 313 234 7100 jmenges@foley.com
No Logo Siegel-robert, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Siegel-Robert, Incorporated"

Represented by Bush, Seyferth & Paige, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/07/2005, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cheryl A. Bush +1 248 822 7800 +1 248 822 7801 bush@bsplaw.com

Represented by Bush, Seyferth,

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/07/2005, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Raymond M. Kethledge - INACTIVE +1 248 822 7803
No Logo Melea Ltd., Counter-Defendant
Officially listed as "Melea Limited"

Represented by Brooks Kushman PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C. Brandenburg +1 248 358 4400 +1 248 358 3351 rbrandenburg@brookskushman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C. Brandenburg +1 248 358 4400 +1 248 358 3351 rbrandenburg@brookskushman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C. Brandenburg +1 248 358 4400 +1 248 358 3351 rbrandenburg@brookskushman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C. Brandenburg +1 248 358 4400 +1 248 358 3351 rbrandenburg@brookskushman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C. Brandenburg +1 248 358 4400 +1 248 358 3351 rbrandenburg@brookskushman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C. Brandenburg +1 248 358 4400 +1 248 358 3351 rbrandenburg@brookskushman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C. Brandenburg +1 248 358 4400 +1 248 358 3351 rbrandenburg@brookskushman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C. Brandenburg +1 248 358 4400 +1 248 358 3351 rbrandenburg@brookskushman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C. Brandenburg +1 248 358 4400 +1 248 358 3351 rbrandenburg@brookskushman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C. Brandenburg +1 248 358 4400 +1 248 358 3351 rbrandenburg@brookskushman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C. Brandenburg +1 248 358 4400 +1 248 358 3351 rbrandenburg@brookskushman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C. Brandenburg +1 248 358 4400 +1 248 358 3351 rbrandenburg@brookskushman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C. Brandenburg +1 248 358 4400 +1 248 358 3351 rbrandenburg@brookskushman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C. Brandenburg +1 248 358 4400 +1 248 358 3351 rbrandenburg@brookskushman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C. Brandenburg +1 248 358 4400 +1 248 358 3351 rbrandenburg@brookskushman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ernie L. Brooks +1 248 358 4400 +1 248 358 3351 ebrooks@brookskushman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robyn S. Lederman +1 248 358 4400 +1 248 358 3351 mcantor@brookskushman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Seth E. Rodack +1 313 358 4400 +3583 358 358 3351 srodack@brookskushman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Seth E. Rodack +1 313 358 4400 +3583 358 358 3351 srodack@brookskushman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Seth E. Rodack +1 313 358 4400 +3583 358 358 3351 srodack@brookskushman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Seth E. Rodack +1 313 358 4400 +3583 358 358 3351 srodack@brookskushman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Seth E. Rodack +1 313 358 4400 +3583 358 358 3351 srodack@brookskushman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Seth E. Rodack +1 313 358 4400 +3583 358 358 3351 srodack@brookskushman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Seth E. Rodack +1 313 358 4400 +3583 358 358 3351 srodack@brookskushman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Seth E. Rodack +1 313 358 4400 +3583 358 358 3351 srodack@brookskushman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Seth E. Rodack +1 313 358 4400 +3583 358 358 3351 srodack@brookskushman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Seth E. Rodack +1 313 358 4400 +3583 358 358 3351 srodack@brookskushman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Seth E. Rodack +1 313 358 4400 +3583 358 358 3351 srodack@brookskushman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Seth E. Rodack +1 313 358 4400 +3583 358 358 3351 srodack@brookskushman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Seth E. Rodack +1 313 358 4400 +3583 358 358 3351 srodack@brookskushman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Seth E. Rodack +1 313 358 4400 +3583 358 358 3351 srodack@brookskushman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Seth E. Rodack +1 313 358 4400 +3583 358 358 3351 srodack@brookskushman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C.J. Tuttle +1 248 358 4400 +1 248 358 3351 rtuttle@brookskushman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C.J. Tuttle +1 248 358 4400 +1 248 358 3351 rtuttle@brookskushman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C.J. Tuttle +1 248 358 4400 +1 248 358 3351 rtuttle@brookskushman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C.J. Tuttle +1 248 358 4400 +1 248 358 3351 rtuttle@brookskushman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C.J. Tuttle +1 248 358 4400 +1 248 358 3351 rtuttle@brookskushman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C.J. Tuttle +1 248 358 4400 +1 248 358 3351 rtuttle@brookskushman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C.J. Tuttle +1 248 358 4400 +1 248 358 3351 rtuttle@brookskushman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C.J. Tuttle +1 248 358 4400 +1 248 358 3351 rtuttle@brookskushman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C.J. Tuttle +1 248 358 4400 +1 248 358 3351 rtuttle@brookskushman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C.J. Tuttle +1 248 358 4400 +1 248 358 3351 rtuttle@brookskushman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C.J. Tuttle +1 248 358 4400 +1 248 358 3351 rtuttle@brookskushman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C.J. Tuttle +1 248 358 4400 +1 248 358 3351 rtuttle@brookskushman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C.J. Tuttle +1 248 358 4400 +1 248 358 3351 rtuttle@brookskushman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C.J. Tuttle +1 248 358 4400 +1 248 358 3351 rtuttle@brookskushman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C.J. Tuttle +1 248 358 4400 +1 248 358 3351 rtuttle@brookskushman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C.J. Tuttle +1 248 358 4400 +1 248 358 3351 rtuttle@brookskushman.com
No Logo Plastic Molded Technologies, Inc., Counter-Defendant
Officially listed as "Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated"

Represented by Brooks Kushman PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C. Brandenburg +1 248 358 4400 +1 248 358 3351 rbrandenburg@brookskushman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C. Brandenburg +1 248 358 4400 +1 248 358 3351 rbrandenburg@brookskushman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C. Brandenburg +1 248 358 4400 +1 248 358 3351 rbrandenburg@brookskushman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C. Brandenburg +1 248 358 4400 +1 248 358 3351 rbrandenburg@brookskushman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C. Brandenburg +1 248 358 4400 +1 248 358 3351 rbrandenburg@brookskushman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C. Brandenburg +1 248 358 4400 +1 248 358 3351 rbrandenburg@brookskushman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C. Brandenburg +1 248 358 4400 +1 248 358 3351 rbrandenburg@brookskushman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C. Brandenburg +1 248 358 4400 +1 248 358 3351 rbrandenburg@brookskushman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C. Brandenburg +1 248 358 4400 +1 248 358 3351 rbrandenburg@brookskushman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C. Brandenburg +1 248 358 4400 +1 248 358 3351 rbrandenburg@brookskushman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C. Brandenburg +1 248 358 4400 +1 248 358 3351 rbrandenburg@brookskushman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C. Brandenburg +1 248 358 4400 +1 248 358 3351 rbrandenburg@brookskushman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C. Brandenburg +1 248 358 4400 +1 248 358 3351 rbrandenburg@brookskushman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C. Brandenburg +1 248 358 4400 +1 248 358 3351 rbrandenburg@brookskushman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C. Brandenburg +1 248 358 4400 +1 248 358 3351 rbrandenburg@brookskushman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Seth E. Rodack +1 313 358 4400 +3583 358 358 3351 srodack@brookskushman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Seth E. Rodack +1 313 358 4400 +3583 358 358 3351 srodack@brookskushman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Seth E. Rodack +1 313 358 4400 +3583 358 358 3351 srodack@brookskushman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Seth E. Rodack +1 313 358 4400 +3583 358 358 3351 srodack@brookskushman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Seth E. Rodack +1 313 358 4400 +3583 358 358 3351 srodack@brookskushman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Seth E. Rodack +1 313 358 4400 +3583 358 358 3351 srodack@brookskushman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Seth E. Rodack +1 313 358 4400 +3583 358 358 3351 srodack@brookskushman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Seth E. Rodack +1 313 358 4400 +3583 358 358 3351 srodack@brookskushman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Seth E. Rodack +1 313 358 4400 +3583 358 358 3351 srodack@brookskushman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Seth E. Rodack +1 313 358 4400 +3583 358 358 3351 srodack@brookskushman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Seth E. Rodack +1 313 358 4400 +3583 358 358 3351 srodack@brookskushman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Seth E. Rodack +1 313 358 4400 +3583 358 358 3351 srodack@brookskushman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Seth E. Rodack +1 313 358 4400 +3583 358 358 3351 srodack@brookskushman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Seth E. Rodack +1 313 358 4400 +3583 358 358 3351 srodack@brookskushman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Seth E. Rodack +1 313 358 4400 +3583 358 358 3351 srodack@brookskushman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C.J. Tuttle +1 248 358 4400 +1 248 358 3351 rtuttle@brookskushman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C.J. Tuttle +1 248 358 4400 +1 248 358 3351 rtuttle@brookskushman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C.J. Tuttle +1 248 358 4400 +1 248 358 3351 rtuttle@brookskushman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C.J. Tuttle +1 248 358 4400 +1 248 358 3351 rtuttle@brookskushman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C.J. Tuttle +1 248 358 4400 +1 248 358 3351 rtuttle@brookskushman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C.J. Tuttle +1 248 358 4400 +1 248 358 3351 rtuttle@brookskushman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C.J. Tuttle +1 248 358 4400 +1 248 358 3351 rtuttle@brookskushman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C.J. Tuttle +1 248 358 4400 +1 248 358 3351 rtuttle@brookskushman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C.J. Tuttle +1 248 358 4400 +1 248 358 3351 rtuttle@brookskushman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C.J. Tuttle +1 248 358 4400 +1 248 358 3351 rtuttle@brookskushman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C.J. Tuttle +1 248 358 4400 +1 248 358 3351 rtuttle@brookskushman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C.J. Tuttle +1 248 358 4400 +1 248 358 3351 rtuttle@brookskushman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C.J. Tuttle +1 248 358 4400 +1 248 358 3351 rtuttle@brookskushman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C.J. Tuttle +1 248 358 4400 +1 248 358 3351 rtuttle@brookskushman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C.J. Tuttle +1 248 358 4400 +1 248 358 3351 rtuttle@brookskushman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C.J. Tuttle +1 248 358 4400 +1 248 358 3351 rtuttle@brookskushman.com
Other Parties
No Logo Cinpres Gas Injection Ltd., Movant
No Logo Collins & Aikman Products Company, Movant

Represented by Honigman Miller Schwartz & Cohn LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TTAB Attorney Placeholder +1 248 566 8490 +1 248 566 8491 bdw@honigman.com

Represented by McDonald, Hopkins, Burke & Haber Company, LPA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David B. Cupar +1 216 348 5400 dcupar@mcdonaldhopkins.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David T. Movius +1 216 430 2029 +1 216 348 5474 dmovius@mcdonaldhopkins.com
No Logo James Hendry, Movant

Represented by Coker, Myers,

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ronald M. Owen +1 904 356 6071
No Logo Magna Donnelly Corporation, Movant

Represented by Howard & Howard Attorneys, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TTAB Attorney Placeholder +1 248 645 1483 +1 248 645 1568 jsadowski@howardandhoward.com
No Logo Magna Donnelly Mirrors North America LLC, Movant

Represented by Howard & Howard Attorneys, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TTAB Attorney Placeholder +1 248 645 1483 +1 248 645 1568 jsadowski@howardandhoward.com
DaimlerChrysler Corporation DaimlerChrysler Corporation, ThirdParty Plaintiff
No Logo Guardian Automotive, ThirdParty Defendant

Represented by Dickinson Wright PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John S. Artz +1 248 433 7502 +1 248 433 7274 jsartz@dickinsonwright.com
No Logo Guardian Industries Corporation, Intervenor Defendant

Represented by Dickinson Wright PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John S. Artz +1 248 433 7502 +1 248 433 7274 jsartz@dickinsonwright.com
Attributes
Citation No cause code entered
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
Timeline
  Entries (391) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 393 Filed: 10/5/2005, Entered: None
ORDER for administrative closing due to bankruptcy stay. Signed by Honorable Gerald E Rosen. (DHame, ) (Entered: 10/06/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 392 Filed: 9/30/2005, Entered: None
ORDER DISMISSING CASE Signed by Honorable Gerald E Rosen. (DHame, ) (Entered: 10/03/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 391 Filed: 9/21/2005, Entered: None
NOTICE TO APPEAR: Settlement Conference set for 9/29/2005 04:00 PM before Honorable Gerald E Rosen. (LSau, ) (Entered: 09/21/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 390 Filed: 8/15/2005, Entered: None
MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney Robert A Dunn by Alliance Gas Systems Incorporated. (Dunn, Robert) (Entered: 08/15/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 389 Filed: 8/12/2005, Entered: None
NOTICE OF TELEPHONE CONFERENCE: Regarding Settlement set for 8/23/2005 10:00 AM before Honorable Gerald E Rosen. (LSau, ) (Entered: 08/12/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 388 Filed: 7/19/2005, Entered: None
ORDER for Dismissal as to Defendant DaimlerChrysler Corporation Signed by Honorable Gerald E Rosen. (LHack, ) (Entered: 07/20/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 387 Filed: 7/8/2005, Entered: None
STIPULATION of Dismissal by DaimlerChrysler Corporation, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated.(Kethledge, Raymond) (Entered: 07/08/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 386 Filed: 7/5/2005, Entered: None
RESPONSE to 367 Objection to the order of May 10, 2005 denying plaintiffs' motion for a protective order and granting James Hendry's motion for a protective order by James Hendry. (DHame, ) (Entered: 07/06/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 385 Filed: 6/24/2005, Entered: None
RESPONSE to 381 MOTION to Stay The Case During Period of Collins & Aikman Products Co.'s Automatic Stay Under Bankruptcy (Brief in Opposition) filed by Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits # 2 Exhibit A - Facsimile letter enclosing Stipulation and Order for Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Defendant DaimlerChrysler Corp.)(Tuttle, Robert) (Entered: 06/24/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 6/22/2005, Entered: None
STIPULATION AND ORDER resolving issues on the rule 30(b)(6) deposition of defendant Alliance Gas Systems, Inc. Signed by Honorable Gerald E Rosen. (DHame, ) (Entered: 06/23/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 383 Filed: 6/17/2005, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by DaimlerChrysler Corporation re 381 MOTION to Stay The Case During Period of Collins & Aikman Products Co.'s Automatic Stay Under Bankruptcy (Corrected Certificate of Service). (Kethledge, Raymond) (Entered: 06/17/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 382 Filed: 6/14/2005, Entered: None
CONFIDENTIAL EXHIBIT re 381 MOTION to Stay The Case During Period of Collins & Aikman Products Co.'s Automatic Stay Under Bankruptcy by DaimlerChrysler Corporation. (sealed in vault)(DHame, ) (Entered: 06/14/2005)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 381 Filed: 6/13/2005, Entered: None
MOTION to Stay The Case During Period of Collins & Aikman Products Co.'s Automatic Stay Under Bankruptcy by DaimlerChrysler Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits)(Kethledge, Raymond) (Entered: 06/13/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 380 Filed: 6/6/2005, Entered: None
Joint MOTION TO EXTEND All Due Dates In Case by DaimlerChrysler Corporation. (Kethledge, Raymond) (Entered: 06/06/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 379 Filed: 6/2/2005, Entered: None
STIPULATED ORDER re 343 MOTION Joint Motion to Preclude Plaintiffs' Experts from Providing Expert Testimony at Trial by defendants 354 Joint MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs To Comply With Court Order Regarding Discovery filed by defendants. Motion Hearing adjourned to 7/14/2005 02:00 PM before Honorable Donald A Scheer. Signed by Honorable Donald A Scheer. (MLan, ) (Entered: 06/02/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 378 Filed: 6/1/2005, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated re 377 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice As To Defendant Guardian Industries Corp. (Tuttle, Robert) (Entered: 06/01/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 6/1/2005, Entered: None
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice As To Defendant Guardian Industries Corp. by Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated.(Tuttle, Robert) (Entered: 06/01/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 5/31/2005, Entered: None
STIPULATION TO EXTEND ALL DUE DATES IN THE CASE by DaimlerChrysler Corporation.(Kethledge, Raymond) (Entered: 05/31/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 375 Filed: 5/31/2005, Entered: None
STIPULATION re 368 Notice of Hearing on Motion TO ADJOURN THE JUNE 7, 2005 HEARING by DaimlerChrysler Corporation.(Kethledge, Raymond) (Entered: 05/31/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 374 Filed: 5/26/2005, Entered: None
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 251 Motion to Compel- Signed by Honorable Donald A Scheer. (MLan, ) (Entered: 05/26/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 5/26/2005, Entered: None
ORDER granting by Stipulation 362 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 362 Reply due by 5/27/2005.- Signed by Honorable Donald A Scheer. (MLan, ) (Entered: 05/26/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 5/26/2005, Entered: None
AMENDED ORDER re 195 denying MOTION to Compel Deposition and Document Production From Non-Party Cinpres Gas Injection, Ltd. filed by Plaintiffs. This Order Corrects and Supercedes Docket Entry No. 349. Signed by Honorable Donald A Scheer. (MLan, ) (Entered: 05/26/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 5/25/2005, Entered: None
REPLY to Response re 354 Joint MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs To Comply With Court Order Regarding Discovery filed by DaimlerChrysler Corporation, Collins and Aikman Products Company, Guardian Industries Corporation. (Artz, John) (Entered: 05/25/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 5/25/2005, Entered: None
REPLY to Response re 353 Request, To Correct Errors In May 6, 2005 Order Which Denied Motion to Compel Discovery From Non-Party Cinpres Gas Injection, Ltd filed by Guardian Industries Corporation, Cinpres Gas Injection, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits # 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B)(Artz, John) (Entered: 05/25/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 5/24/2005, Entered: None
STIPULATION Enlarging The Time (1) For Plaintiffs To File Their Response To Defendants' Joint Motion To Preclude Plaintiffs' Experts From Providing Expert Testimony At Trial (Docket No. 343) And (2) For Defendants To Reply Thereto by Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated.(Brandenburg, Robert) (Entered: 05/24/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 5/20/2005, Entered: None
NOTICE of hearing on 354 Joint MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs To Comply With Court Order Regarding Discovery. Resolved/Unresolved Issues due by 6/3/2005. Motion Hearing set for 6/7/2005 02:00 PM before Honorable Donald A Scheer. (MLan, ) (Entered: 05/20/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 5/20/2005, Entered: None
OBJECTION to 351 Order on Motion for Protective Order, by all plaintiffs. (Tuttle, Robert) (Entered: 05/20/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 5/19/2005, Entered: None
RESPONSE to 354 Joint MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs To Comply With Court Order Regarding Discovery (Brief in Opposition) filed by Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated. (Tuttle, Robert) (Entered: 05/19/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 5/19/2005, Entered: None
RESPONSE to 353 Request, To Correct Errors in May 6, 2005, Order Which Denied Motion To Compel Discovery From Non-Party Cinpres Gas Injection, Ltd. by Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits # 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B)(Tuttle, Robert) (Entered: 05/19/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 5/19/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER REFERRING MOTION to Magistrate Judge Scheer: 354 Joint MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs To Comply With Court Order Regarding Discovery filed by DaimlerChrysler Corporation,, Collins and Aikman Products Company,, Guardian Automotive,. Signed by Honorable Gerald E Rosen. (LSau, ) (Entered: 05/19/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 5/18/2005, Entered: None
NOTICE of hearing on 343 MOTION Joint Motion to Preclude Plaintiffs' Experts from Providing Expert Testimony at Trial by Guardian Industries, Collins & Aikman Products Company and. Resolved/Unresolved Issues due by 6/3/2005. Motion Hearing set for 6/7/2005 02:00 PM before Honorable Donald A Scheer. (MLan, ) (Entered: 05/18/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 5/17/2005, Entered: None
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 355 Response (Free), Response (Free) by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits # 2 Exhibit # 3 Exhibit # 4 Exhibit # 5 Exhibit)(Brandenburg, Robert) (Entered: 05/17/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 5/17/2005, Entered: None
PETITION (Rule 16.1(b) Petition for a Pretrial Conference by Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits # 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C)(Tuttle, Robert) (Entered: 05/17/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 5/16/2005, Entered: None
RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF PRESENTING ORDER UNDER LOCAL RULE 58.1(c) by Guardian Industries Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits # 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C# 5 Exhibit D)(Artz, John) (Entered: 05/16/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 5/13/2005, Entered: None
NOTICE of hearing on 343 MOTION Joint Motion to Preclude Plaintiffs' Experts from Providing Expert Testimony at Trial by Guardian Industries, Collins & Aikman Products Company and. Resolved/Unresolved Issues due by 6/3/2005. Motion Hearing set for 6/7/2005 02:00 PM before Honorable Donald A Scheer. (MLan, ) (Entered: 05/13/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 5/12/2005, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated re 355 Response. (DHame, ) (Entered: 05/13/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 357 Filed: 5/12/2005, Entered: None
EXHIBITS C-G re 355 Response by Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated. (sealed in vault)(DHame, ) (Entered: 05/13/2005)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 5/13/2005, Entered: None
NOTICE by Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated re Motion Hearing, OF PRESENTING ORDER UNDER LOCAL RULE 58.1(c) (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits # 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C# 5 Exhibit D)(Tuttle, Robert) (Entered: 05/13/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 5/12/2005, Entered: None
RESPONSE of Plaintiffs to Defendants' Joint Motion To Preclude Plaintiffs' Experts From Providing Expert Testimony At Trial by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits # 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C-G)(Brandenburg, Robert) (Entered: 05/12/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 5/12/2005, Entered: None
Joint MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs To Comply With Court Order Regarding Discovery by Guardian Automotive, DaimlerChrysler Corporation, Collins and Aikman Products Company. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits # 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C# 5 Exhibit D# 6 Exhibit E)(Artz, John) (Entered: 05/12/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 5/12/2005, Entered: None
REQUEST TO CORRECT ERRORS IN MAY 6, 2005 ORDER WHICH DENIED MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY FROM NON-PARTY CINPRES GAS INJECTION, LTD. by DaimlerChrysler Corporation, Guardian Industries Corporation, Cinpres Gas Injection, Ltd, Collins and Aikman Products Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Artz, John) (Entered: 05/12/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 5/12/2005, Entered: None
REPLY to Response re 343 MOTION Joint Motion to Preclude Plaintiffs' Experts from Providing Expert Testimony at Trial by Guardian Industries, Collins & Aikman Products Company and DaimlerChrysler Corporation filed by DaimlerChrysler Corporation, Guardian Automotive, Guardian Automotive, DaimlerChrysler Corporation, DaimlerChrysler Corporation, Collins and Aikman Products Company, Guardian Industries Corporation, Guardian Automotive, Guardian Industries Corporation, Guardian Industries Corporation, DaimlerChrysler Corporation, Collins and Aikman Products Company. (Movius, David) (Entered: 05/12/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 5/10/2005, Entered: None
ORDER denying 198 Motion for Protective Order, granting 273 Motion for Protective Order- Signed by Honorable Donald A Scheer. (MLan, ) (Entered: 05/10/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 5/10/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER REFERRING MOTION to Magistrate Judge Scheer: 343 MOTION Joint Motion to Preclude Plaintiffs' Experts from Providing Expert Testimony at Trial by Guardian Industries, Collins & Aikman Products Company and filed by DaimlerChrysler Corporation,. Signed by Honorable Gerald E Rosen. (LSau, ) (Entered: 05/10/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 5/6/2005, Entered: None
ORDER denying 195 Motion to Compel- Signed by Honorable Donald A Scheer. (DHame, ) (Entered: 05/09/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 5/6/2005, Entered: None
ORDER denying 215 Motion for Sanctions- Signed by Honorable Donald A Scheer. (DHame, ) (Entered: 05/09/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 4/29/2005, Entered: None
ORDER withdrawing 281 Motion for Sanctions, granting 317 Motion for Leave to File amended answer- Signed by Honorable Gerald E Rosen. (DHame, ) (Entered: 05/03/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 346 Filed: 4/26/2005, Entered: None
BRIEF in Support re 343 MOTION Joint Motion to Preclude Plaintiffs' Experts from Providing Expert Testimony at Trial by Guardian Industries, Collins & Aikman Products Company and (SEALED IN VAULT) filed by DaimlerChrysler Corporation. (DHame, ) (Entered: 04/27/2005)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 345 Filed: 4/26/2005, Entered: None
BRIEF in Support re 343 MOTION Joint Motion to Preclude Plaintiffs' Experts from Providing Expert Testimony at Trial by Guardian Industries, Collins & Aikman Products Company and (SEALED IN VAULT) filed by DaimlerChrysler Corporation. (DHame, ) (Entered: 04/27/2005)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 344 Filed: 4/26/2005, Entered: None
BRIEF in Support re 343 MOTION Joint Motion to Preclude Plaintiffs' Experts from Providing Expert Testimony at Trial by Guardian Industries, Collins & Aikman Products Company and (SEALED IN VAULT) filed by DaimlerChrysler Corporation. (DHame, ) (Entered: 04/27/2005)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 4/26/2005, Entered: None
MOTION Joint Motion to Preclude Plaintiffs' Experts from Providing Expert Testimony at Trial by Guardian Industries, Collins & Aikman Products Company and by DaimlerChrysler Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1# 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2# 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3# 5 Exhibit Exhibit 4# 6 Exhibit Exhibit 5# 7 Exhibit Exhibit 6# 8 Exhibit Exhibit 7# 9 Exhibit Exhibit 8 - Sealed# 10 Exhibit Exhibit 9 - Sealed# 11 Exhibit Exhibit 10-Sealed# 12 Exhibit Exhibit 11 - Sealed# 13 Exhibit Exhibit 12)(Kethledge, Raymond) (Entered: 04/26/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 4/19/2005, Entered: None
STIPULATION re 205 Emergency MOTION for Protective Order, 222 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 37(b)(2) Arising Out of Collins & Aikman's Disobedience to the Court's December 16, 2004 Order re 30(b)(6) Deposition Witnesses, 249 MOTION for Sanctions and Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(b)(2) Arising Out of Collins & Aikman's Disobedience to the Court's December 16, 2004 Order Requiring it to Produce, 194 MOTION to Compel and for Award Under Rule 37 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, 212 MOTION for Sanctions, 253 MOTION for Rule 37 Award by Collins and Aikman Products Company, Melea Limited, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Collins and Aikman Products Company.(Movius, David) (Entered: 04/19/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 4/12/2005, Entered: None
CONFIDENTIAL EXHIBITS re 340 Supplemental Brief, by all plaintiffs. (NHoll, ) (Entered: 04/13/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 4/12/2005, Entered: None
SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re 215 MOTION for Sanctions (Joint) Against DaimlerChrysler Corp. for Disobedience to Para. 3 of the Discovery Order of 01-10-2005, et al. filed by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits Exhibits to Joint Supplemental Submission on Plaintiffs' Motion for Discovery Sanctions, et al.# 2 Exhibit 7# 3 Exhibit 8# 4 Exhibit 9# 5 Document Continuation Notice Re: Exhibits 1-6)(Brandenburg, Robert) (Entered: 04/12/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 4/7/2005, Entered: None
REPLY to Response re 304 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Plastic Molded Technologies, Inc.'s Claim for Patent Infringement and Memorandum in Support filed by DaimlerChrysler Corporation, Guardian Automotive, Guardian Automotive, DaimlerChrysler Corporation, DaimlerChrysler Corporation, Collins and Aikman Products Company, Guardian Industries Corporation, Guardian Automotive, Guardian Industries Corporation, Guardian Industries Corporation, DaimlerChrysler Corporation, Collins and Aikman Products Company. (Movius, David) (Entered: 04/07/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 4/7/2005, Entered: None
REPLY to Response re 303 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Declaratory Judgment Claim for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Memorandum in Support filed by Collins and Aikman Products Company, Collins and Aikman Products Company. (Movius, David) (Entered: 04/07/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 4/4/2005, Entered: None
REPLY to 328 Response (Free) to Objections to the Order of March 2, 2005 (Dkt. #296) by all plaintiffs. (Tuttle, Robert) (Entered: 04/04/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 4/1/2005, Entered: None
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 03/22/05 of discovery motions (DHame, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/18/2009: # 1 Document Continuation) (Goltz, D). (Entered: 04/04/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 3/28/2005, Entered: None
RESPONSE to 303 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Declaratory Judgment Claim for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Memorandum in Support (Brief in Opposition) filed by Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits # 2 Exhibit A - Abstract of Title for '637 patent# 3 Exhibit B - Abstract of Title for '660 patent# 4 Exhibit C - Abstract of Title for '087 patent)(Tuttle, Robert) (Entered: 03/28/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 3/28/2005, Entered: None
REPLY To Second Amended Counterclaims of Defendant Guardian Industries, Inc. by all plaintiffs. (Brandenburg, Robert) (Entered: 03/28/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 3/28/2005, Entered: None
RESPONSE to 304 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Plastic Molded Technologies, Inc.'s Claim for Patent Infringement and Memorandum in Support (Brief in Opposition) filed by Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits # 2 Exhibit A - Representation Agreement between Melea and PMT, 11-15-92# 3 Exhibit B - Authorized Representative Agreement between Melea and PMT, 12-17-02# 4 Exhibit C - Page 1034 from Ortho Pharmaceutical v. Genetics Institute, 52 F.3d 1026 (Fed. Cir. 1995))(Tuttle, Robert) (Entered: 03/28/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 3/28/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATION Regarding Motions Between Plaintiffs And DCC Pending Before Judge Rosen (Motions Not Referred to Magistrate Judge Scheer) by DaimlerChrysler Corporation.(Kethledge, Raymond) (Entered: 03/28/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 3/28/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATION Regarding Motions Between Plaintiffs And DCC Pending Before Magistrate Judge Scheer by DaimlerChrysler Corporation.(Kethledge, Raymond) (Entered: 03/28/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 3/28/2005, Entered: None
REPLY to Amended Counterclaims of Collins & Aikman Products Co. by all plaintiffs. (Brandenburg, Robert) (Entered: 03/28/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 3/24/2005, Entered: None
ORDER withdrawing 242 Motion to Extend - Signed by Honorable Donald A Scheer. (LBeh, ) (Entered: 03/25/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 3/24/2005, Entered: None
RESPONSE to 316 Objection, Opposition To Plaintiffs' Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and Local Rule 72.1(d)(1) Objections to the Order of March 2, 2005 (DKT #296) by DaimlerChrysler Corporation. (Kethledge, Raymond) (Entered: 03/24/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 3/23/2005, Entered: None
ORDER granting 318 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages- Signed by Honorable Gerald E Rosen. (DTyle, ) (Entered: 03/24/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 3/14/2005, Entered: None
ORDER granting 308 Motion to Seal- Signed by Honorable Donald A Scheer. (DHame, ) (Entered: 03/16/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 3/15/2005, Entered: None
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 02/25/05 of motion hearing (DHame, ) Modified on 11/16/2009 (FMos).{DATE OF HEARING ON TRANSCRIPT IS 2/22/05}. (Goltz, D). (Entered: 03/16/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 3/15/2005, Entered: None
REPLY to 251 MOTION to Compel Under Rule 37 for Discovery of Defendant Guardian Industries Corp. and For Sanctions, 298 Response to Motion, Brief in Opposition to Guardian's Cross-Motion for Sanctions by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits # 2 Exhibit E - 1/11/05 letter from John Artz to Robert Brandenburg# 3 Exhibit F - 5/20/03 letter from Craig Baldwin to Edward Smith# 4 Exhibit G - 7/16/03 letter from Joseph Rhoa to Craig Baldwin# 5 Exhibit H - Supplemental Response by Guardian to Plaintiffs' Interrog. No. 12# 6 Exhibit I - 12/22/04 letter from Robert Tuttle to John Artz)(Brandenburg, Robert) (Entered: 03/15/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 3/15/2005, Entered: None
AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM filed by Guardian Automotive against Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated by Guardian Automotive. (Artz, John) (Entered: 03/15/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 3/14/2005, Entered: None
RESPONSE to 281 MOTION for Sanctions (Rule 37(b)(2) Against Defendant DaimlerChrysler Corp. for its Disobedience to the Court's Discovery Order of December 10, 2004 OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' RULE 37(b)(2) MOTION FOR SANCTIONS filed by DaimlerChrysler Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits # 2 Exhibit A - DaimlerChrysler Corporation's Supplemental Response To Plaintiffs' Interrogatory No. 5# 3 Exhibit B - DaimlerChrysler Corporation's Motion For Leave To Amend Its Answer, Affirmative Defenses And Counterclaims)(Kethledge, Raymond) (Entered: 03/14/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 3/14/2005, Entered: None
RESPONSE to 284 MOTION to Compel DaimlerChrysler To Supplement Its Response To Interrogatory No. 13 DAIMLERCHRYSLER COPRORATION'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION filed by DaimlerChrysler Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits # 2 Exhibit A-Correspondence dated 2/25/05 from Paul A. Gennari to Seth E. Rodack# 3 Exhibit B - Order on: DaimlerChrysler's Emergency Motion; Plfs' Motion to Quash Subpoena and Joint Mot of DaimlerChrysler, Collins Aikman & Guardian Compel re: Syrowik# 4 Exhibit C - DaimlerChrysler Corporation's Supplemental Response To Plaintiffs' Third Set of Interrogatories (No. 13))(Kethledge, Raymond) (Entered: 03/14/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 3/14/2005, Entered: None
BRIEF in Support re 281 MOTION for Sanctions (Rule 37(b)(2) Against Defendant DaimlerChrysler Corp. for its Disobedience to the Court's Discovery Order of December 10, 2004 DAIMLERCHRYSLER CORPORATION'S OPPOSITION filed by DaimlerChrysler Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits # 2 Exhibit A -Correspondence dated February 25, 2005 from Paul A. Gennari to Seth Rodack# 3 Exhibit B - Order on Three (3) Separate Motions# 4 Exhibit C - DaimlerChrysler Corporation's Supplemental Response To Plaintiffs' Third Set Of Interrogatories (No. 13))(Kethledge, Raymond) (Entered: 03/14/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 3/14/2005, Entered: None
REPLY to Response re 242 MOTION TO EXTEND The Time For The Deposition of Edward Smith Under Rule 30(d)(2) and To Seek Sanctions Under Rules 30(d)(3), 37(a)(4)(A), and 37(d) filed by Guardian Automotive. (Artz, John) (Entered: 03/14/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 3/14/2005, Entered: None
Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Guardian Automotive. (Artz, John) (Entered: 03/14/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 3/14/2005, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to File MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ITS ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND COUNTERCLAIMS by DaimlerChrysler Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits # 2 Exhibit A - DaimlerChrysler Corporation's [Proposed] Amended Answer And Counterclaims To The Second Amended And Supplemental Complaint For Patent Infringement And Declaratory Relief)(Kethledge, Raymond) (Entered: 03/14/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 3/11/2005, Entered: None
OBJECTION to 296 Order on Motion to Quash, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, Order on Motion to Compel Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and Local Rule 72.1(d)(1) by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits # 2 Exhibit Appendix A - DDC's original Interrog. #2 and plaintiffs' verified response and DDC's restated & supplemented Interrog. #2 and plaintiffs' verified response)(Tuttle, Robert) (Entered: 03/11/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 3/10/2005, Entered: None
SUR-REPLY re 260 MOTION for Sanctions (Rule 11(c)(1)(A) Motion for Sanctions Against Defendant Collins & Aikman on its Eighth Affirmative Defense (Inequittable Conduct) and Declaratory Judgment Counterclaim Count V (Inequitable Conduct) filed by Collins and Aikman Products Company, Collins and Aikman Products Company. (Movius, David) (Entered: 03/10/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 3/10/2005, Entered: None
NOTICE by Collins and Aikman Products Company, Collins and Aikman Products Company of Withdrawal of Claim re 313 Amended Counterclaim,,,, Relative to U.S. Patent No. 5,433,087. (Movius, David) (Entered: 03/10/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 3/10/2005, Entered: None
AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM filed by Collins and Aikman Products Company, Collins and Aikman Products Company against Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated (Movius, David) (Entered: 03/10/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 3/8/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER REFERRING MOTION to Magistrate Judge Scheer: 205 Emergency MOTION for Protective Order filed by Collins and Aikman Products Company,, 212 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated,, Melea Limited,, 171 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Withheld from Discovery by Defendant Guardian Industries on Improper Assertion of Privilege or Immunity and Brief in Support thereof filed by Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated,, Melea Limited,, 260 MOTION for Sanctions (Rule 11(c)(1)(A) Motion for Sanctions Against Defendant Collins & Aikman on its Eighth Affirmative Defense (Inequittable Conduct) and Declaratory Judgment Counterclaim Count V (Inequitable Conduct) filed by Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated,, Melea Limited,, 228 MOTION for Sanctions (Rule 11(c)(1)(A) Against Defendant DaimlerChrysler Corporation On Its Third Affirmative Defense (Non-Infringement) And Declaratory Judgment Counterclaim Count II (Non-Infringement) filed by Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated,, Melea Limited,, 222 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 37(b)(2) Arising Out of Collins & Aikman's Disobedience to the Court's December 16, 2004 Order re 30(b)(6) Deposition Witnesses filed by Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated,, Melea Limited,, 249 MOTION for Sanctions and Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(b)(2) Arising Out of Collins & Aikman's Disobedience to the Court's December 16, 2004 Order Requiring it to Produce filed by Collins and Aikman Products Company,, 194 MOTION to Compel and for Award Under Rule 37 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure filed by Collins and Aikman Products Company, and 298 counter motion for sanctions against plaintiffs for violation of local rule 7.1 and for bringing frivilous motion. Signed by Honorable Gerald E Rosen. (DHame, ) (Entered: 03/09/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 3/8/2005, Entered: None
ORDER granting 199 Motion for Leave to File- Signed by Honorable Gerald E Rosen. (DHame, ) (Entered: 03/09/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 3/8/2005, Entered: None
ORDER granting 133 Motion for Leave to File- Signed by Honorable Gerald E Rosen. (DHame, ) (Entered: 03/09/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 3/9/2005, Entered: None
REPLY to Response re 260 MOTION for Sanctions (Rule 11(c)(1)(A) Motion for Sanctions Against Defendant Collins & Aikman on its Eighth Affirmative Defense (Inequittable Conduct) and Declaratory Judgment Counterclaim Count V (Inequitable Conduct) filed by Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated. (Tuttle, Robert) (Entered: 03/09/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 3/7/2005, Entered: None
MOTION to Seal 298 Response to Motion, Docket # 298 by Guardian Automotive. (Artz, John) (Entered: 03/07/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 3/7/2005, Entered: None
REPLY to 253 MOTION Cross-Motion for Rule 37 Award by Collins and Aikman Products Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Cupar, David) (Entered: 03/07/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 3/7/2005, Entered: None
RESPONSE to 273 MOTION for Protective Order (Brief in Opposition to Non-Party, James Hendry's Motion for Protective Order) filed by Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits # 2 Exhibit A - Privilege Log of Cinpres Gas Injection Ltd.)(Tuttle, Robert) (Entered: 03/07/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 3/7/2005, Entered: None
OBJECTION to 156 Order on Motion to Compel (Objections to the Order Presented By Defendant DaimlerChrysler on the Several Motions Heard February 22, 2005 by Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits # 2 Exhibit A - Letter from R. Kethledge to V. Sims, 12-17-04# 3 Exhibit B - Letter from S. Rodack to F. Cimino, 2-28-05)(Tuttle, Robert) (Entered: 03/07/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 3/4/2005, Entered: None
Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Plastic Molded Technologies, Inc.'s Claim for Patent Infringement and Memorandum in Support by DaimlerChrysler Corporation, Guardian Automotive, DaimlerChrysler Corporation, DaimlerChrysler Corporation, Collins and Aikman Products Company, Guardian Industries Corporation, Guardian Automotive, Guardian Industries Corporation, Guardian Industries Corporation, DaimlerChrysler Corporation, Collins and Aikman Products Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - PMT's Responses to C&A's Request to Admit Nos. 33 and 34)(Movius, David) (Entered: 03/04/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 3/4/2005, Entered: None
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Declaratory Judgment Claim for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Memorandum in Support by Collins and Aikman Products Company, Collins and Aikman Products Company. (Movius, David) (Entered: 03/04/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 3/4/2005, Entered: None
RESPONSE to 260 MOTION for Sanctions (Rule 11(c)(1)(A) Motion for Sanctions Against Defendant Collins & Aikman on its Eighth Affirmative Defense (Inequittable Conduct) and Declaratory Judgment Counterclaim Count V (Inequitable Conduct) filed by Collins and Aikman Products Company, Collins and Aikman Products Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Fontana v. Economic Development Corporation# 2 Exhibit B - C&A's Second Supplemental Response to Plaintiffs' Discovery Requests)(Movius, David) (Entered: 03/04/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 3/3/2005, Entered: None
ORDER Deeming 221 Motion to Quash Withdrawn- Signed by Honorable Donald A Scheer. (SSchoe, ) (Entered: 03/04/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 3/3/2005, Entered: None
ORDER re 271 Stipulation filed by Siegel-Robert, Incorporated,, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated,, Melea Limited,. Signed by Honorable Gerald E Rosen. (SSchoe, ) (Entered: 03/04/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 3/3/2005, Entered: None
ORDER Regarding U.S. Patent No. 5,443,087. Signed by Honorable Gerald E Rosen. (SSchoe, ) (Entered: 03/04/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 3/3/2005, Entered: None
[SEALED AS OF 03/14/05]RESPONSE to 251 MOTION to Compel Under Rule 37 for Discovery of Defendant Guardian Industries Corp. and For Sanctions And Guardian's Countermotion For Sanctions Against Plaintiffs For Violation of Local Rule 7.1 And For Bringing Frivilous Motion filed by Guardian Industries Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Artz, John) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/16/2005 (DHame, ). Modified on 3/16/2005 (DHame, ). (Entered: 03/03/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 3/3/2005, Entered: None
NOTICE of hearing on 284 MOTION to Compel DaimlerChrysler To Supplement Its Response To Interrogatory No. 13. Resolved/Unresolved Issues due by 3/25/2005. Motion Hearing set for 3/29/2005 02:00 PM before Honorable Donald A Scheer. (MLan, ) (Entered: 03/03/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 3/2/2005, Entered: None
ORDER denying 174 Motion to Quash, granting 193 Motion to Amend/Correct, granting 197 Motion to Compel- Signed by Honorable Donald A Scheer. (SSchoe, ) (Entered: 03/03/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 3/2/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER REFERRING MOTION to Magistrate Judge Scheer: 284 MOTION to Compel DaimlerChrysler To Supplement Its Response To Interrogatory No. 13 filed by Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated,, Melea Limited,. Signed by Honorable Gerald E Rosen. (SSchoe, ) (Entered: 03/03/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 3/1/2005, Entered: None
ORDER granting 275 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages- Signed by Honorable Gerald E Rosen. (SSchoe, ) (Entered: 03/02/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Sealed Legal Document 293 Filed: 2/28/2005, Entered: None
RESPONSE to 242 MOTION TO EXTEND The Time For The Deposition of Edward Smith Under Rule 30(d)(2) and To Seek Sanctions Under Rules 30(d)(3), 37(a)(4)(A), and 37(d) filed by Melea Limited.(filed under seal) (ATee, ) (Entered: 03/02/2005)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 292 Filed: 2/28/2005, Entered: None
REPLY to Response re 209 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Guardian Industries Corporation. (filed under seal)(ATee, ) (Entered: 03/02/2005)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 2/28/2005, Entered: None
RESPONSE to 249 MOTION for Sanctions and Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(b)(2) Arising Out of Collins & Aikman's Disobedience to the Court's December 16, 2004 Order Requiring it to Produce Witnesses for 30(b)(6) Depositions filed by all plaintiffs. (Rodack, Seth) (Entered: 02/28/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 2/28/2005, Entered: None
RESPONSE to 253 MOTION for Rule 37 Award and Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions ARising Out of Collins & Aikman's Disobedience to the Court's December 16, 2004 Order Compelling Collins & Aikman to Permit an Inspection filed by all plaintiffs. (Rodack, Seth) (Entered: 02/28/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 2/28/2005, Entered: None
STIPULATION Regarding U.S. Pat. No. 5,443,087 by DaimlerChrysler Corporation, Melea Limited, Guardian Industries Corporation, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Collins and Aikman Products Company.(Brandenburg, Robert) (Entered: 02/28/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 2/28/2005, Entered: None
NOTICE of hearing on 260 MOTION for Sanctions(Rule 11(c)(1)(A) Motion for Sanctions Against Defendant Collins & Aikman on its Eighth Affirmative Defense (Inequittable Conduct) and Declaratory Judgment Counterclaim Count V (Inequitable Conduct). Resolved/Unresolved Issues due by 3/25/2005. Motion Hearing set for 3/29/2005 02:00 PM before Honorable Donald A Scheer. (MLan, ) (Entered: 02/28/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 2/28/2005, Entered: None
NOTICE of hearing on 273 MOTION for Protective Order, 198 MOTION for Protective Order (Rule 26(c)) on the Deposition of Non-Party James W. Hendry. Resolved/Unresolved Issues due by 3/18/2005. Motion Hearing set for 3/22/2005 02:00 PM before Honorable Donald A Scheer. (MLan, ) (Entered: 02/28/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 2/23/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER REFERRING MOTION to Magistrate Judge Scheer: 260 MOTION for Sanctions (Rule 11(c)(1)(A) Motion for Sanctions Against Defendant Collins & Aikman on its Eighth Affirmative Defense (Inequittable Conduct) and Declaratory Judgment Counterclaim Count V (Inequitable Conduct) filed by Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated,, Melea Limited,. Signed by Honorable Gerald E Rosen. (ATee, ) (Entered: 02/27/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 2/23/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER REFERRING MOTION to Magistrate Judge Scheer: 273 MOTION for Protective Order filed by James Hendry,. Signed by Honorable Gerald E Rosen. (ATee, ) (Entered: 02/27/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 2/25/2005, Entered: None
MOTION to Compel DaimlerChrysler To Supplement Its Response To Interrogatory No. 13 by Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits # 2 Exhibit A - DaimlerChrysler 1st Set of Ints to ptfs# 3 Exhibit B - DaimlerChrysler Restated Int. No. 2# 4 Exhibit C - Ptfs 3rd set of ints to DaimlerChrysler# 5 Exhibit D - DaimlerChrysler's Rsp to ptfs Int. No. 13# 6 Exhibit E - Ptfs Rsp to DaimlerChrysler's Int. No. 2)(Rodack, Seth) (Entered: 02/25/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 2/25/2005, Entered: None
REPLY to Response re 212 MOTION for Sanctions arising out of Collins & Aikman's order compelling them to permit inspection of actual process used to process its accused parts filed by all plaintiffs. (Rodack, Seth) (Entered: 02/25/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 2/25/2005, Entered: None
REPLY to Response re 249 MOTION for Sanctions and Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(b)(2) Arising Out of Collins & Aikman's Disobedience to the Court's December 16, 2004 Order Requiring it to Produce Witnesses for 30(b)(6) Deposition filed by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits # 2 Exhibit 21 - 1/24/05 email from Movius to Rodack# 3 Exhibit 22 - 2/23/05 letter from Rodack to Movius & Cupar# 4 Exhibit 23 - 2/24/05 letter from Movius to Rodack# 5 Exhibit 24 - 2/24/05 letter from Rodack to Movius)(Rodack, Seth) (Entered: 02/25/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 2/25/2005, Entered: None
MOTION for Sanctions (Rule 37(b)(2) Against Defendant DaimlerChrysler Corp. for its Disobedience to the Court's Discovery Order of December 10, 2004 by Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits # 2 Exhibit A - Renotice of Deposition of DaimlerChrysler Corp.# 3 Exhibit B - Letter from F. Cimino to R. Brandenburg, 1-11-05# 4 Exhibit C - Facsimile letter from R. Tuttle to M. O'Shea, 2-1-05# 5 Exhibit D - Motions hearing transcript, 12-2-04# 6 Exhibit E - Letter from M. Cantor to M. Calcaterra, 4-20-98# 7 Exhibit F - Letter from R. Tuttle to M. Calcaterra, 9-7-01# 8 Exhibit G - State Bar of MI Member Directory page for M. Calcaterra# 9 Exhibit H - Translation of letter from Mr. Bruckner, 1-31-01)(Tuttle, Robert) (Entered: 02/25/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 2/23/2005, Entered: None
REPLY by plaintiffs to Response re 228 MOTION for Sanctions (Rule 11(c)(1)(A) Against Defendant DaimlerChrysler Corporation On Its Third Affirmative Defense (Non-Infringement) And Declaratory Judgment Counterclaim Count II (Non-Infringement) [SEALED MATTER PLACED IN VAULT]. (KWil, ) Modified on 2/25/2005 (KWil, ). (Entered: 02/25/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 2/22/2005, Entered: None
STIPULATION AND ORDER Signed by Honorable Donald A Scheer regarding Plaintiffs' motion to compel with regard to Collins & Aikman's responses to first set of interrogatories and first set of document requests.(KWil, ) (Entered: 02/24/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 2/22/2005, Entered: None
STIPULATION AND ORDER Signed by Honorable Donald A Scheer regarding plaintiffs' motion to compel defendant Guardian responses to first set of interrogatories.(KWil, ) (Entered: 02/24/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 277 Filed: 2/24/2005, Entered: None
REPLY to Response re 209 MOTION to Compel Discovery Filed Under Seal filed by Guardian Automotive. (Artz, John) (Entered: 02/24/2005)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 2/18/2005, Entered: None
BRIEF in Support filed by James Hendry re 273 MOTION for Protective Order . (Attachments: # 1 Document Continuation # 2 Document Continuation # 3 Document Continuation # 4 Document Continuation)(KWil, ) (Entered: 02/24/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 2/24/2005, Entered: None
Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages of Reply Brief by Guardian Industries Corporation. (Artz, John) (Entered: 02/24/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 2/18/2005, Entered: None
RESPONSE by James Hendry to 198 MOTION for Protective Order (Rule 26(c)) on the Deposition of Non-Party James W. Hendry . (Attachments: # 1 Document Continuation)(KWil, ) (Entered: 02/24/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 2/18/2005, Entered: None
MOTION for Protective Order by James Hendry. (KWil, ) (Entered: 02/24/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 2/18/2005, Entered: None
ORDER by Honorable Gerald E Rosen Directing the Clerk to Unseal 243 Brief in Support of Motion, filed by Guardian Automotive,. (KWil, ) (Entered: 02/24/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 2/18/2005, Entered: None
STIPULATION for dismissal as to defendant Siegel-Robert, Inc. by Siegel-Robert, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated.(DHame, ) (Entered: 02/24/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 1/26/2005, Entered: None
ORDER for dismissal as to Doveport Systems, L. L. C.,only. Signed by Honorable Gerald E Rosen. (DHame, ) (Entered: 02/24/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 2/23/2005, Entered: None
REPLY to Response re 228 MOTION for Sanctions (Rule 11(c)(1)(A) Against Defendant DaimlerChrysler Corporation On Its Third Affirmative Defense (Non-Infringement) And Declaratory Judgment Counterclaim Count II (Non-Infringement) filed by Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits # 2 Exhibit E - Facsimile letter from B. Tuttle to F. Cimino, Jr. and Stipulation and Order for Withdrawal)(Tuttle, Robert) (Entered: 02/23/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 2/22/2005, Entered: None
RESPONSE (Reply) as Part of Its Motion To Compel Deposition and Document Production from Cinpres by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits # 2 Exhibit L# 3 Exhibit M# 4 Exhibit N# 5 Exhibit O)(Brandenburg, Robert) (Entered: 02/22/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 2/22/2005, Entered: None
NOTICE of hearing on 221 MOTION to Quash (Joint) of Plaintiffs and Non-Party Colin K. Myles to Quash Subpoena and for Prot. Order Curbing Discovery of Colin K. Myles, 224 MOTION for Sanctions. Resolved/Unresolved Issues due by 3/8/2005. Motion Hearing set for 3/10/2005 02:00 PM before Honorable Donald A Scheer. (MLan, ) (Entered: 02/22/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 2/22/2005, Entered: None
NOTICE of hearing on 195 MOTION to Compel Deposition and Document Production From Non-Party Cinpres Gas Injection, Ltd. and 215 MOTION for Sanctions. Resolved/Unresolved Issues due by 3/8/2005. Motion Hearing set for 3/10/2005 02:00 PM before Honorable Donald A Scheer. (MLan, ) (Entered: 02/22/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 2/22/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE of hearing on 197 Joint MOTION to Compel Defendants DaimlerChrysler Corporation, Collins & Aikman Products Co., and Guardian Automotive to Compel the Deposition of and/or Acceptance of Subpoena on David R. Syrowick, 198 MOTION for Protective Order(Rule 26(c)) on the Deposition of Non-Party James W. Hendry, 174 Joint MOTION to Quash (by plaintiffs and non-party Robert Tuttle) Subpoena and for Protective Order Curbing Discovery of Plaintiffs' Counsel. (MLan, ) Modified on 2/22/2005 (MLan, ). Motion Hearing set for 3/3/05 2:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Donald A. Scheer, Statement of Resolved/Unresolved Issues due 3/1/05. (Entered: 02/22/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 2/17/2005, Entered: None
STIPULATION AND ORDER Signed by Honorable Gerald E Rosen regarding fact and expert discovery. (KWil, ) (Entered: 02/22/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 2/17/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Honorable Gerald E Rosen REFERRING MOTIONS to Magistrate Judge Scheer: 253 MOTION filed by Collins and Aikman Products Company,, 242 MOTION TO EXTEND The Time For The Deposition of Edward Smith Under Rule 30(d)(2) and To Seek Sanctions Under Rules 30(d)(3), 37(a)(4)(A), and 37(d) filed by Guardian Automotive,, 251 MOTION to Compel Under Rule 37 for Discovery of Defendant Guardian Industries Corp. and For Sanctions filed by Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated,, Melea Limited,. (KWil, ) (Entered: 02/22/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 2/21/2005, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by DaimlerChrysler Corporation Joint List Of Unresolved Issues Regarding DaimlerChrysler Corporation's Emergency Motion To Compel Plaintiffs To Fully And Adequately Answer Interrogatory No. 2, Or, In The Alternative, Deem Plaintiffs To Have Accepted DaimlerChrysler Corporation's Claim Interpretation. (Kethledge, Raymond) (Entered: 02/21/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 2/18/2005, Entered: None
RESPONSE to 228 MOTION for Sanctions (Rule 11(c)(1)(A) Against Defendant DaimlerChrysler Corporation On Its Third Affirmative Defense (Non-Infringement) And Declaratory Judgment Counterclaim Count II (Non-Infringement) filed by DaimlerChrysler Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits # 2 Exhibit EXHIBIT A Plaintiffs' Rule 11(c)(1)(A) Motion for Sanctions Against Defendant DaimlerChrysler Corporation On Its Third Affirmative Defense (Non-Infrinement) and Declaratory Judgment CounterClaim Count II (Non-Infrinement)# 3 Exhibit EXHBIIT B - 1/28/05 Letter from F. Cimino to R. Tuttle# 4 Exhibit EXHIBIT C 2/1/05 Letter from R. Tuttle to F. Cimino# 5 Exhibit EXHIBIT D - 12/2/04 Hearing Transcript at 23# 6 Exhibit EXHIBIT E - DaimlerChrysler Corporation's Emergency Motion to Compel Plaintiffs to Fully and Adequately Answer Interrogatory No. 2 Or, In The Altternative, Deem Plaintiffs To Have Accepted DaimlerChrysler Corporation's Claim Interpretation# 7 Exhibit EXHIBIT F Succession Picasso v. Spedding, 1997 WL 65911, *2 (S.D.N.Y.)# 8 Exhibit EXHIBIT G Plaintiffs' Reply Brief In Support of Their Motion to Compel Regarding DaimlerChrysler Corporation's Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories and First Set of Document Requests# 9 Exhibit EXHIBIT H - Joe Coelman Deposition Transcript, 1/25/05# 10 Exhibit EXHIBIT I Daimlerchrysler Corporation's Supplemental Responses to Plaintiffs' Interrogatories Nos. 4, 7, 9, and 10# 11 Exhibit DaimlerChrysler Corporation's Answer and CounterClaims to the Second Amended and Supplemental Complaint for Patent Infringement and Declaratory Relief)(Kethledge, Raymond) (Entered: 02/18/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 2/18/2005, Entered: None
MOTION for Sanctions (Rule 11(c)(1)(A) Motion for Sanctions Against Defendant Collins & Aikman on its Eighth Affirmative Defense (Inequittable Conduct) and Declaratory Judgment Counterclaim Count V (Inequitable Conduct) by Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits # 2 Exhibit 1 - Collins & Aikman "Withheld List"# 3 Exhibit 2 - Collins & Aikman's Subpoena to R. Tuttle, dated 12-20-04# 4 Exhibit 3 - Notice of Intent to Issue A Reexamination Certificate# 5 Exhibit 4 - Letter to R. Tuttle from S. Johnson, 12-6-90# 6 Exhibit 5 - Letter to S. Johnson from R. Tuttle, 12-6-90# 7 Exhibit 6 - Letter to R. Tuttle from S. Johnson, 12-12-90# 8 Exhibit 7 - Disclosure Statement filed by Applicant# 9 Exhibit 8 - Counter-Statement And Affidavit of James W. Hendry, 3-22-91# 10 Exhibit 9 - Collins & Aikman's Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures# 11 Exhibit 10 - Collins & Aikman's Answers and Objections to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories and Plaintiffs' First Set of Document Requests)(Tuttle, Robert) (Entered: 02/18/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 2/15/2005, Entered: None
MOTION by James Hendry (NON-PARTY) for Extension of Time to Response to plaintiffs' motion for Rule 26(c) protective order . (KWil, ) (Entered: 02/16/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 2/15/2005, Entered: None
APPLICATION FOR RELIEF FROM LOCAL RULE 83.20(f) filed by Ronald M. Owens on behalf of James Hendry a non-party in the case.(KWil, ) (Entered: 02/16/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 2/16/2005, Entered: None
REPLY to Response re 198 MOTION for Protective Order (Rule 26(c)) on the Deposition of Non-Party James W. Hendry filed by Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated. (Tuttle, Robert) (Entered: 02/16/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 256 Filed: 2/14/2005, Entered: None
EXHIBIT B re 253 MOTION by Guardian Automotive. (filed under seal)(ATee, ) (Entered: 02/15/2005)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 255 Filed: 2/14/2005, Entered: None
EXHIBITS 1 - 3 re 254 Brief in Support of Motion by Guardian Industries Corporation (Filed under seal). (ATee, ) (Entered: 02/15/2005)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 254 Filed: 2/14/2005, Entered: None
BRIEF in Support re 242 MOTION TO EXTEND The Time For The Deposition of Edward Smith Under Rule 30(d)(2) and To Seek Sanctions Under Rules 30(d)(3), 37(a)(4)(A), and 37(d) filed by Guardian Industries Corporation (Filed under seal) (ATee, ) (Entered: 02/15/2005)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 2/11/2005, Entered: None
CROSS MOTION for Rule 37 Award and Memorandum by Collins and Aikman Products Company. (Attachments: # 1 Document Continuation)(ATee, ) (Entered: 02/15/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 2/11/2005, Entered: None
EXHIBIT D re 249 MOTION for Sanctions and Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(b)(2) Arising Out of Collins & Aikman's Disobedience to the Court's December 16, 2004 Order Requiring it to Produce by Collins and Aikman Products Company. (ATee, ) (Entered: 02/15/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 2/14/2005, Entered: None
MOTION to Compel Under Rule 37 for Discovery of Defendant Guardian Industries Corp. and For Sanctions by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Index of Exhibits # 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C# 5 Exhibit D# 6 Exhibit E)(Brandenburg, Robert) (Entered: 02/14/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 2/11/2005, Entered: None
NOTICE by Melea Limited of Witnesses who May be Used at Trial Under FRE 702,703 or 705 (Brandenburg, Robert) (Entered: 02/11/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 2/11/2005, Entered: None
MOTION for Sanctions and Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(b)(2) Arising Out of Collins & Aikman's Disobedience to the Court's December 16, 2004 Order Requiring it to Produce Witnesses for a 30(b)(6) Deposition by Collins and Aikman Products Company, Collins and Aikman Products Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit 8# 9 Exhibit 9# 10 Exhibit 10# 11 Exhibit 11# 12 Exhibit 12# 13 Exhibit 13# 14 Exhibit 14# 15 Exhibit 15)(Cupar, David) (Entered: 02/11/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 2/11/2005, Entered: None
RESPONSE to 221 MOTION to Quash (Joint) of Plaintiffs and Non-Party Colin K. Myles to Quash Subpoena and for Prot. Order Curbing Discovery of Colin K. Myles JOINT RESPONSE AND BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO JOINT MOTION OF PLAINTIFFS AND NON-PARTY COLIN K. MYLES TO QUASH SUBPOENA AND FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER CURBING DISCOVERY OF COLIN K. MYLES filed by DaimlerChrysler Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits # 2 Exhibit A--1/21/05 letter from Tuttle to Defendants# 3 Exhibit B-1/24/05 letter from Gennari to Tuttle)(Kethledge, Raymond) (Entered: 02/11/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 2/11/2005, Entered: None
RESPONSE to 221 MOTION to Quash (Joint) of Plaintiffs and Non-Party Colin K. Myles to Quash Subpoena and for Prot. Order Curbing Discovery of Colin K. Myles JOINT RESPONSE AND BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO JOINT MOTION OF PLAINTIFFS AND NON-PARTY COLIN K. MYLES TO QUASH SUBPOENA AND FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER CURBING DISCOVERY OF COLIN K. MYLES filed by DaimlerChrysler Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits # 2 Exhibit A-1/21/05 letter from Tuttle to Defendants# 3 Exhibit B-1/24/05 letter from Gennari to Tuttle)(Kethledge, Raymond) (Entered: 02/11/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 2/11/2005, Entered: None
RESPONSE to 224 MOTION for Sanctions DAIMLERCHRYSLER CORPORATION'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' RULE 37(b)(2) MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT DAIMLERCHRYSLER CORPORATION FOR DISOBEDIENCE OF THE COURT'S DECEMBER 10, 2004 ORDER COMPELLING IT TO RESPOND TO INTERROGATORY NO. 4 filed by DaimlerChrysler Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits # 2 Exhibit A-12/2/04 hearing Transcript# 3 Exhibit B-DaimlerChrysler Corporation's Emergency Motion to Compel Plaintiffs to Fully and Adequately Answer Interrogatory No. 2 or, In the Alternative, Deem Plaintiffs to Have Accepted DaimlerChrysler Corporation's Claim Interpretation# 4 Exhibit C-Plaintiffs' Reply Brief In Support of Their Motion to Compel Regarding DaimlerChrysler Corporation's Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories and First Set of Document Requests# 5 Exhibit D-Joel Coleman, 1/25/05 Deposition Transcript# 6 Exhibit E-1/28/05 Correspondence from Frank Cimino to Robert Tuttle# 7 Exhibit F-2/1/05 Faxed Correspondence from Robert Tuttle to Frank Cimino)(Kethledge, Raymond) (Entered: 02/11/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 2/11/2005, Entered: None
SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re 205 Emergency MOTION for Protective Order, 237 Response to Motion filed by Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated. (Tuttle, Robert) (Entered: 02/11/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 2/9/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER REFERRING MOTION to Magistrate Judge Scheer: 209 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Guardian Automotive, Signed by Honorable Gerald E Rosen. (KWil, ) (Entered: 02/11/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 243 Filed: 2/10/2005, Entered: None
BRIEF in Support re 242 MOTION TO EXTEND The Time For The Deposition of Edward Smith Under Rule 30(d)(2) and To Seek Sanctions Under Rules 30(d)(3), 37(a)(4)(A), and 37(d) Filed Under Seal filed by Guardian Automotive. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Artz, John) (Entered: 02/10/2005)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 2/10/2005, Entered: None
MOTION TO EXTEND The Time For The Deposition of Edward Smith Under Rule 30(d)(2) and To Seek Sanctions Under Rules 30(d)(3), 37(a)(4)(A), and 37(d) by Guardian Automotive. (Artz, John) (Entered: 02/10/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 2/10/2005, Entered: None
RESPONSE to 209 MOTION to Compel Discovery (Plaintiffs' Brief In Opposition) filed by Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits # 2 Exhibit A - Privilege Log of Guardian Industries - Revised# 3 Exhibit B - Privilege Log of DaimlerChrysler Corporation# 4 Exhibit C - Plaintiff's 2nd Supplemental Responses to DaimlerChrysler Corp.'s Interrogatories No. 5 & 7# 5 Exhibit D - Transcript of 12-2-04 Hearing# 6 Exhibit E - Letter from R. Tuttle to F.J. Hone, 12-8-98# 7 Exhibit F - Documents regarding French Patent No. 4,145,441, served 1-18-05# 8 Exhibit G - Pages 89-104 of Transcript of 12-2-04 Hearing# 9 Exhibit H - Pages 72-77 of Transcript of 12-2-04 Hearing# 10 Exhibit I - Abstract of Title for the '637 patent# 11 Exhibit J - Abstract of Title for the '660 patent# 12 Exhibit K - Abstract of Title for '087 patent)(Tuttle, Robert) (Entered: 02/10/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 2/10/2005, Entered: None
RESPONSE to 204 MOTION to Strike 202 Response (Free), Response (Free) Plaintiffs' Brief in Opposition to C&A's Motion for Rule 37 Award filed by all plaintiffs. (Brandenburg, Robert) (Entered: 02/10/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 2/3/2005, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (ATee, ) (Entered: 02/10/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 2/9/2005, Entered: None
RESPONSE to 215 MOTION for Sanctions JOINT OPPOSITION OF DAIMLERCHRYSLER CORPORATION AND HARNESS DICKEY & PIERCE TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR DISCOVERY SANCTIONS AGAINST DAIMLERCHRYSLER CORPORATION FOR DISOBEDIENCE TO PARAGRAPH 3 OF THE DISCOVERY ORDER OF JANUARY 10, 2005 AND FOR ENFORCEMENT OF THE DOCUMENT SUBPOENA SERVED UPON NON-PARTY HARNESS, DICKEY & PIERCE filed by DaimlerChrysler Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits # 2 Exhibit A-1/16/05 and 1/17/05 EMail from Cimino to Tuttle# 3 Exhibit B-1/19/05 Corres from Gennari to Tuttle# 4 Exhibit C-1/24/05 Corres from Gennari to Tuttle encl. DaimlerChrysler's Second Supp. Rsps to Plaintiffs' Request for Documents and Tangible Things #6# 5 Exhibit D-Haworth, Inc. v Herman Miller, Inc.# 6 Exhibit E-Applied Telematics, Inc. v Spring Corporation# 7 Exhibit F-Faxed corres dated 1/17/05 from Tuttle to Gennari# 8 Exhibit G-Patent HOlding Co., v TG (USA) Corp.)(Kethledge, Raymond) (Entered: 02/09/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 2/9/2005, Entered: None
RESPONSE to 205 Emergency MOTION for Protective Order of Collins & Aikman Products Company filed by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1)(Tuttle, Robert) (Entered: 02/09/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 2/7/2005, Entered: None
RESPONSE to 195 MOTION to Compel Deposition and Document Production From Non-Party Cinpres Gas Injection, Ltd. filed by Cinpres Gas Injection, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits # 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C# 5 Exhibit D)(Artz, John) (Entered: 02/07/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 2/7/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
BRIEF in Support re 198 MOTION for Protective Order (Rule 26(c)) on the Deposition of Non-Party James W. Hendry JOINT RESPONSE AND BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR A RULE 26(C) PROTECTIVE ORDER ON THE DEPOSITION OF NON-PARTY JAMES W. HENDRY filed by all defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits# 2 Exhibit 1-Plaintiffs' Response Filed in the Middle District of Florida to Mr. Hendry's Motion for Protective Order# 3 Exhibit 2-Order of Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson, Middle District of Florida, regarding Mr. Hendry's Motion for Protective Order# 4 Exhibit 3-February 2, 2005 Letter from Mr. Hendry's attorney, Ron Owen)(Kethledge, Raymond) (Entered: 02/07/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 2/7/2005, Entered: None
RESPONSE by Plaintiffs in Opposition To Collins & Aikman Products Co.'s Motion To Compel And For Award Under Rule 37 by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits Exhibit Index# 2 Exhibit 1# 3 Exhibit 2# 4 Exhibit 3# 5 Exhibit 4)(Brandenburg, Robert) (Entered: 02/07/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 2/3/2005, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by DaimlerChrysler Corporation purchase order documents, CD Rom Disk #8. (Kethledge, Raymond) (Entered: 02/03/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 2/1/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER REFERRING MOTIONS to Magistrate Judge Scheer: 221 Motion to quash subpeona and for protective order curbing discovery and 224 Motion for sanctions. Signed by Honorable Gerald E Rosen. (DPer, ) (Entered: 02/03/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 2/2/2005, Entered: None
NOTICE by Collins and Aikman Products Company of withdrawal of 210 MOTION to Deposit Funds With Court Clerk. (Wassom, Brian) (Entered: 02/02/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 2/2/2005, Entered: None
RESPONSE Brief In Opposition To C&A's Motion For Leave To File Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits # 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C# 5 Exhibit D# 6 Exhibit E)(Brandenburg, Robert) (Entered: 02/02/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 1/31/2005, Entered: None
STIPULATED ORDER on plaintiffs 89 MOTION to Compel defendant Guardian Industries, Inc. to permit inspection of the actual molding process and the operation of the gas-assist molding equipment used by Guardian. Signed by Honorable Donald A Scheer. (SSchoe, ) (Entered: 02/02/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 2/1/2005, Entered: None
MOTION for Sanctions (Rule 11(c)(1)(A) Against Defendant DaimlerChrysler Corporation On Its Third Affirmative Defense (Non-Infringement) And Declaratory Judgment Counterclaim Count II (Non-Infringement) by Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits # 2 Exhibit A - Letter from C. Dale Hubbard to Robert Tuttle, 3-3-03# 3 Exhibit B - DaimlerChrysler Policy on Intellectual Property Rights# 4 Exhibit C - July 2002 letter from Gary C. Valade# 5 Exhibit D - DaimlerChrysler (Chrysler Group) Customer-Specific Requirements)(Tuttle, Robert) (Entered: 02/01/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 2/1/2005, Entered: None
RESPONSE to 197 Joint MOTION to Compel Defendants DaimlerChrysler Corporation, Collins & Aikman Products Co., and Guardian Automotive to Compel the Deposition of and/or Acceptance of Subpoena on David R. Syrowick filed by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits # 2 Exhibit 1# 3 Exhibit 2# 4 Exhibit 3# 5 Exhibit 4# 6 Exhibit 5# 7 Exhibit 6# 8 Exhibit 7)(Brandenburg, Robert) (Entered: 02/01/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 2/1/2005, Entered: None
RESPONSE to 210 MOTION to Deposit Funds With Court Clerk filed by Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits # 2 Exhibit 1 - Listing of The DPM Group facilities)(Tuttle, Robert) (Entered: 02/01/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 225 Filed: 1/28/2005, Entered: None
EXHIBITS 1-11 (sealed in vault) re 224 MOTION for Sanctions by all plaintiffs. (DHame, ) (Entered: 01/31/2005)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 1/28/2005, Entered: None
RULE 37(b)(2) MOTION for Sanctions against defendant DaimlerChrysler Corporation for disobedience to the court's December 10, 2004 order compelling it to respond to interrogatory number 4 by all plaintiffs. (DHame, ) (Entered: 01/31/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 1/31/2005, Entered: None
NOTICE TO APPEAR: Discovery Status Conference set for 2/16/2005 10:00 AM before Honorable Donald A Scheer. (MLan, ) (Entered: 01/31/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 1/28/2005, Entered: None
MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 37(b)(2) Arising Out of Collins & Aikman's Disobedience to the Court's December 16, 2004 Order re 30(b)(6) Deposition Witnesses by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 # 2 # 3 # 4 # 5 # 6 # 7 # 8 # 9 # 10 # 11 # 12 # 13 # 14 # 15 # 16 # 17 # 18 # 19 # 20)(Rodack, Seth) (Entered: 01/28/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 1/28/2005, Entered: None
MOTION to Quash (Joint) of Plaintiffs and Non-Party Colin K. Myles to Quash Subpoena and for Prot. Order Curbing Discovery of Colin K. Myles by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits to Mot to Quash Myles Subpoena# 2 Exhibit 1 (Part 1) to mot and BIS to quash subpoena of Myles# 3 Exhibit Exh 1-part 2# 4 Exhibit Exh 2 to Mot and BIS to quash subpoena of Myles)(Brandenburg, Robert) (Entered: 01/28/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 1/26/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER REFERRING MOTION to Magistrate Judge Scheer: 195 MOTION to Compel Deposition and Document Production From Non-Party Cinpres Gas Injection, Ltd.filed by Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated,, Melea Limited,. Signed by Honorable Gerald E Rosen. (LHack, ) (Entered: 01/28/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 1/26/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER REFERRING MOTION to Magistrate Judge Scheer: 198 MOTION for Protective Order (Rule 26(c)) on the Deposition of Non-Party James W. Hendry filed by Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited,, 197 Joint MOTION to Compel Defendants DaimlerChrysler Corporation, Collins & Aikman Products Co., and Guardian Automotive to Compel the Deposition of and/or Acceptance of Subpoena on David R. Syrowickfiled by DaimlerChrysler Corporation, 174 Joint MOTION to Quash (by plaintiffs and non-party Robert Tuttle) Subpoena and for Protective Order Curbing Discovery of Plaintiffs' Counsel filed by Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited,. Signed by Honorable Gerald E Rosen. (LHack, ) (Entered: 01/28/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 1/27/2005, Entered: None
RESPONSE of Plaintiffs & Robert Tuttle's Reply In Support of Its Motion To Quash Subpoena & for Protective Order Curbing Discovery of Plaintiffs' Counsel by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit D to Plaintiffs' Reply In Support of Its Motion to Quash Subpoena, et al.)(Brandenburg, Robert) (Entered: 01/27/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 1/27/2005, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by DaimlerChrysler Corporation (Amended/Corrected Certificate of Service reflecting service of Joint Motion of Defendants DaimlerChrysler Corporation, Collins & Aikman Products Co., and Guardian Automotive to Compel The Deposition of And/Or Acceptance of Subpoena on David R. Syrowik. (Kethledge, Raymond) (Entered: 01/27/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 1/26/2005, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated re 212 MOTION for Sanctions, 213 Brief in Support of Motion, 214 Exhibit Supplemental. (Tuttle, Robert) (Entered: 01/26/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 1/26/2005, Entered: None
MOTION for Sanctions by Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits # 2 Exhibit A-Discovery Order, 1-10-05# 3 Exhibit B-DCC's Supplemental Responses to Plaintiffs' Interrogatories No. 2, 8 and 9# 4 Exhibit C-Privilege Log of DCC# 5 Exhibit D-Letter of 4-20-98 from Brooks & Kushman to Mark P. Calcaterra, Esq.# 6 Exhibit E-Letter of 6-26-98 from Michael Ladney to Larry Oswald# 7 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Document Subpoena to Harness, Dickey & Pierce# 8 Exhibit G-Privilege Log for Documents Produced Pursuant to Subpoena of Harness, Dickey & Pierce# 9 Exhibit H-Michlin v. Canon, Inc., 208 F.R.D. 172 (E.D. Mich. 2002))(Tuttle, Robert) (Entered: 01/26/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 1/25/2005, Entered: None
EXHIBITS re 213 Brief in Support of Motion by plaintiffs. (PPaul, ) (Entered: 01/26/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 1/25/2005, Entered: None
BRIEF in Support re 212 MOTION for Sanctions filed by plaintiffs. (PPaul, ) (Entered: 01/26/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 1/25/2005, Entered: None
MOTION for Sanctions by plaintiffs. (PPaul, ) (Entered: 01/26/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 1/26/2005, Entered: None
RESPONSE to 191 Emergency MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs To Fully And Adequately Answer Interrogatory No. 2 Or, In The Alternative, Deem Plaintiffs To Have Accepted DaimlerChrysler Corporation's Claim Interpretation filed by all plaintiffs. (Brandenburg, Robert) (Entered: 01/26/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 1/25/2005, Entered: None
MOTION to Deposit Funds With Court Clerk by Collins and Aikman Products Company. (Wassom, Brian) (Entered: 01/25/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 1/25/2005, Entered: None
MOTION to Compel Discovery by Guardian Automotive. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits # 2 Exhibit 1# 3 Exhibit 2# 4 Exhibit 3# 5 Exhibit 4# 6 Exhibit 5# 7 Exhibit 6# 8 Exhibit 7# 9 Exhibit 8# 10 Exhibit 9)(Artz, John) (Entered: 01/25/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 1/24/2005, Entered: None
CONFIDENTIAL APPENDIX to 202 brief in opposition to Collins and Aikman's cross-motion for rule 37 award and confidential exhibits 2-4 by all plaintiffs. (DHame, ) (Entered: 01/25/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 1/24/2005, Entered: None
NOTICE of hearing on 193 Emergency Motion to Compel Plaintiffs To Fully And Adequately Answer Interrogatory No. 2 Or, In The Alternative, Deem Plaintiffs To Have Accepted DaimlerChrysler Corporation's Claim Interpretation. Motion Hearing set for 2/22/2005 02:00 PM before Honorable Donald A Scheer. (PPaul, ) (Entered: 01/25/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 1/21/2005, Entered: None
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 12/16/04 of Discovery Motions (PPaul, ) (Goltz, D). (Entered: 01/25/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 1/25/2005, Entered: None
Emergency MOTION for Protective Order by Collins and Aikman Products Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Cupar, David) (Entered: 01/25/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 1/24/2005, Entered: None
MOTION to Strike 202 Response (Free), Response (Free) Plaintiffs' Brief in Opposition to C&A's Motion for Rule 37 Award by Collins and Aikman Products Company. (Cupar, David) (Entered: 01/24/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 1/21/2005, Entered: None
Letter from Ryan S. Bewersdorf regarding electronic notification (DHame, ) (Entered: 01/24/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 1/24/2005, Entered: None
RESPONSE to 173 Response to Motion, and Opposition To Collins & Aikman's Cross-Motion For Rule 37 Award by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits # 2 Exhibit 1-Motion of Collins&Aikman To Quash Sub/Motion for Prot. Order and Exhibits)(Brandenburg, Robert) (Entered: 01/24/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 1/24/2005, Entered: None
REPLY to Response re 160 MOTION to Compel Collins & Aikman's Responses to Discovery Requests and Reply in Support of Collins & Aikman Products Company's Unopposed Cross-Moton for Relief for Rule 37 Award filed by Collins and Aikman Products Company. (Cupar, David) (Entered: 01/24/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 1/21/2005, Entered: None
RESPONSE to 174 Joint MOTION to Quash (by plaintiffs and non-party Robert Tuttle) Subpoena and for Protective Order Curbing Discovery of Plaintiffs' Counsel (Joint Memorandum of Opposition of Defendants DaimlerChrysler Corporation, Collins & Aikman Products Co., and Guardian Automotive filed by DaimlerChrysler Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits# 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Face of each of the three patents-in-suit# 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Three Patentee's Declarations for Patent Application of the three patents-in-suit# 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Documents submitted to Patent Office in each of the patents-in-suit by Mr. Syrowik# 5 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Documents submitted to Patent Office during prosecution of the '637 patent by Mr. Tuttle# 6 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - Documents submitted to Patent Office during 2003 reexamination of the '637 patent# 7 Exhibit Exhibit 6 - Melea, et al., v Alliance, et al. Case Docket# 8 Exhibit Exhibit 7 - Guardian's Motion to Amend its Answer, and Second Amended Complaint# 9 Exhibit Exhibit 8 - 12/20/04 Letter to Tuttle requesting acceptance of service by fax# 10 Exhibit Exhibit 9 - Process Server Declaration# 11 Exhibit Exhibit 10 - Non-Party James Hendry's Motion for Protective Order (to exclude Brooks Kushman law firm from attending Hendry Deposition)# 12 Exhibit Exhibit 11 - Letter from Kethledge to Tuttle forwarding deposition fees and changing location of production of documents)(Kethledge, Raymond) (Entered: 01/21/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 1/21/2005, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to File a First Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims by Collins and Aikman Products Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Cupar, David) (Entered: 01/21/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 1/21/2005, Entered: None
MOTION for Protective Order (Rule 26(c)) on the Deposition of Non-Party James W. Hendry by Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits # 2 Exhibit A-Letter of 1-7-05 from R. Owen to R. Tuttle# 3 Exhibit B-Non-Party, James Hendry's Motion for Protective Order, 1-18-05# 4 Exhibit C-Consulting Agreement between CGIL and J. Hendry, 9-27-01# 5 Exhibit D-Agreement For Consulting Services between M. Ladney and J. Hendry, 4-18-87# 6 Exhibit E-Letter Agreement between J. Hendry and M. Ladney, 4-18-87# 7 Exhibit F-DPM Plastic Group Company Information Sheet# 8 Exhibit G-Declaration for Patent Application# 9 Exhibit H-Assignment, assigning patent from J. Hendry to M. Ladney, 6-28-88# 10 Exhibit I-Letter of 12-6-90 from S. Johnson to R. Tuttle# 11 Exhibit J-Letter of 12-6-90 from R. Tuttle to S. Johnson# 12 Exhibit K-Letter of 12-12-90 from S. Johnson to R. Tuttle# 13 Exhibit L-Disclosure Statement# 14 Exhibit M-Counter-Statement And Affidavit of James W. Hendry# 15 Exhibit N-James Hendry Videotaped Deposition Excerpts# 16 Exhibit O-Consulting Agreement between Global Plastics Technologies and J. Hendry, 6-11-93# 17 Exhibit P-James Hendry Deposition Excerpts# 18 Exhibit Q-Decision of Dr. P. Ferdinando of United Kingdom Patent Office# 19 Exhibit R-Docket Sheets, Cinpres Ltd. v. Hendry, et al, Case No. 96-CV-752# 20 Exhibit S-Letter of 7-29-96 from M. Ladney to J. Hendry# 21 Exhibit T-Amended Complaint, Cinpres Ltd v. James Hendry, et al, Case No. 96-752-CV-T-24B# 22 Exhibit U-Declaration of James W. Hendry# 23 Exhibit V-Addendum to Consulting Agreement Dated June 11, 1993# 24 Exhibit W-Letter of 5-18-01 from J. Artz to Dipl. Ing. J. Rehders# 25 Exhibit X-Letter of 4-22-03 from J. Gioconda to R. Tuttle# 26 Exhibit Y-Letter of 4-24-03 from R. Tuttle to J. Hendry# 27 Exhibit Z-Letter of 4-27-03 fromJ. Hendry to R. Tuttle# 28 Exhibit AA-Facsimile letter of 5-23-03 from R. Tuttle to J. Hendry# 29 Exhibit BB-Transcription of voice mail message from J. Hendry to R. Tuttle, 5-23-03# 30 Exhibit CC-Opinion and Order Denying Defendant's Motion to Quash Subpoena, Denying Non-Party Cinpres' Motion to Quash Subpoena, and Modifying Subpoena, Melea Ltd, et al v. Steelcase, Inc., Case No. 03-CV-70565-DT# 31 Exhibit DD-Schedule A of CGIL Subpoena)(Tuttle, Robert) (Entered: 01/21/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 1/21/2005, Entered: None
Joint MOTION to Compel Defendants DaimlerChrysler Corporation, Collins & Aikman Products Co., and Guardian Automotive to Compel the Deposition of and/or Acceptance of Subpoena on David R. Syrowick by DaimlerChrysler Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits List of Exhibits# 2 Exhibit Exhibit A - The '637 Patent Cover Page# 3 Exhibit Exhibit B - Declaration from the '637 File History# 4 Exhibit Exhibit C - The '660 Patent Cover Page# 5 Exhibit Exhibit D - Declaration from the '660 File History# 6 Exhibit Exhibit F - Declaration from the '087 File History# 7 Exhibit Exhibit G - Subpoena to Mr. Tuttle# 8 Exhibit Exhibit H - Subpoena to Brooks & Kushman, P.C.# 9 Exhibit Exhibit I - Subpoena to Mr. Syrowik# 10 Exhibit Exhibit J - Proof of Service of Subpoena to Mr. Tuttle# 11 Exhibit Proof of Service of Subpoena to Brooks & Kushman, P.C.# 12 Exhibit Exhibit L - Declaration of Process Server, Mr. Newberg# 13 Exhibit Exhibit M - January 5, 2005 correspondence# 14 Exhibit Exhibit N - Case: Amway Corp. v Nartron Corp.# 15 Exhibit Exhibit O - Notice of Deposition for Mr. Syrowik# 16 Exhibit Exhit P - December 20, 2004 correspondence)(Kethledge, Raymond) (Entered: 01/21/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 1/20/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER REFERRING MOTION to Magistrate Judge Scheer: 193 MOTION to Amend/Correct Emergency Motion to Compel Plaintiffs To Fully And Adequately Answer Interrogatory No. 2 Or, In The Alternative, Deem Plaintiffs To Have Accepted DaimlerChrysler Corporation's Claim Interpretation filed by DaimlerChrysler Corporation,. Signed by Honorable Gerald E Rosen. (DHame, ) (Entered: 01/21/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 1/20/2005, Entered: None
MOTION to Compel Deposition and Document Production From Non-Party Cinpres Gas Injection, Ltd. by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits # 2 Exhibit A - Subpoena of Cinpres# 3 Exhibit B - Obj to Cinpres Gas Injection to Subpoena# 4 Exhibit C - Melea v. Steelcase, opinion and order of 9-30-03# 5 Exhibit D - Guardian's suppl resp to Int. No. 18 (selected pgs)# 6 Exhibit E - Pearson observations of 7-1-02# 7 Exhibit F - Guardian's opposition to ptfs' mot to compel withheld docs (selected pgs)# 8 Exhibit G - Portion of www.gasassist.com# 9 Exhibit H - 1-6-05 letter of R.Dunn to R.Tuttle# 10 Exhibit I - Hendry Consulting Agreement of 9-1-01# 11 Exhibit J - Subpoena of Hendry# 12 Exhibit K - Decl of Terry Pearson dated 10-14-03)(Brandenburg, Robert) (Entered: 01/20/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 1/20/2005, Entered: None
MOTION to Compel and for Award Under Rule 37 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by Collins and Aikman Products Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E)(Cupar, David) (Entered: 01/20/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 1/20/2005, Entered: None
MOTION to Amend/Correct Emergency Motion to Compel Plaintiffs To Fully And Adequately Answer Interrogatory No. 2 Or, In The Alternative, Deem Plaintiffs To Have Accepted DaimlerChrysler Corporation's Claim Interpretation by DaimlerChrysler Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits# 2 Exhibit Exhibit #1 - Interrogatory No. 2# 3 Exhibit Exhibit #2 - Chart served with plaintiffs' discovery responses# 4 Exhibit Exhibit #3-Excerpt from December 2, 2004 hearings transcript# 5 Exhibit Exhibit #4-DaimlerChrysler Corporation's December 30, 2004 correspondence with enclosure# 6 Exhibit Exhibit #5-Response to DaimlerChrysler's Restated and Supplemental Interrogatory No. 2)(Kethledge, Raymond) (Entered: 01/20/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 1/19/2005, Entered: None
Emergency MOTION to Amend/Correct Emergency Motion to Compel Plaintiffs To Fully And Adequately Answer Interrogatory No. 2 Or, In The Alternative, Deem Plaintiffs To Have Accepted DaimlerChrysler Corporation's Claim Interpretation by DaimlerChrysler Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits Index to Exhibits# 2 Exhibit Exhibit #1# 3 Exhibit Exhibit #2# 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3# 5 Exhibit Exhibit #4# 6 Exhibit Exhibit #5)(Kethledge, Raymond) (Entered: 01/19/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 1/19/2005, Entered: None
Emergency MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs To Fully And Adequately Answer Interrogatory No. 2 Or, In The Alternative, Deem Plaintiffs To Have Accepted DaimlerChrysler Corporation's Claim Interpretation by DaimlerChrysler Corporation. (Kethledge, Raymond) (Entered: 01/19/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: None
ORDER for dismissal as to defendants Johnson Controls Interiors, LLC. Signed by Honorable Gerald E Rosen. (SSchoe, ) (Entered: 01/19/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: None
ORDER for dismissal as to defendant Adac Plastics Incorporated. Signed by Honorable Gerald E Rosen. (SSchoe, ) (Entered: 01/19/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: None
ORDER for dismissal with prejudice as to defendants Intier Automotive Seating of America, Inc and Intier Automotive, Inc. Signed by Honorable Gerald E Rosen. (SSchoe, ) (Entered: 01/19/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 1/19/2005, Entered: None
REPLY to Response re 171 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Withheld from Discovery by Defendant Guardian Industries on Improper Assertion of Privilege or Immunity and Brief in Support thereof filed by Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits # 2 Exhibit K - Ludwig v. Pilkington North America, Inc., 2004 WL 1898238 (N.D. Ill.)# 3 Exhibit L - For Your Ease Only, Inc. v. Calgon Carbon Corp., 2003 WL 21920244 (N.D. Ill.))(Tuttle, Robert) (Entered: 01/19/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: None
RESPONSE to 171 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Withheld from Discovery by Defendant Guardian Industries on Improper Assertion of Privilege or Immunity and Brief in Support thereof filed by Guardian Industries Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits # 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C)(Artz, John) (Entered: 01/14/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: None
DECLARATION by Craig Baldwin filed by Guardian Industries Corporation.(Artz, John) (Entered: 01/14/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 1/12/2005, Entered: None
NOTICE of hearing on 174 Joint MOTION to Quash (by plaintiffs and non-party Robert Tuttle) Subpoena and for Protective Order Curbing Discovery of Plaintiffs' Counsel. Motion Hearing set for 2/22/2005 02:00 PM before Honorable Donald A Scheer. (PPaul, ) (Entered: 01/14/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 1/10/2005, Entered: None
ORDER modifying 150 Order on Motion to Compel. Signed by Honorable Donald A Scheer. (ATee, ) (Entered: 01/13/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 1/10/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Honorable Gerald E Rosen REFERRING MOTIONS to compel 132 and 160 to Magistrate Judge Scheer.(KWil, ) (Entered: 01/13/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 1/11/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER REFERRING MOTION to Magistrate Judge Scheer: 174 Joint MOTION to Quash (by plaintiffs and non-party Robert Tuttle) Subpoena and for Protective Order Curbing Discovery of Plaintiffs' Counsel filed by Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited for hearing and determination. Signed by Honorable Gerald E Rosen. (DOpa, ) (Entered: 01/13/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 1/12/2005, Entered: None
RESPONSE to 160 MOTION to Compel Collins & Aikman's Responses to Discovery Requests Reply in Support by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits # 2 Exhibit P-Collins & Aikman Products Co.'s Motion For Extension of Time to Respond To Plaintiffs' Discovery Requests# 3 Exhibit Q-Letter from David B. Cupar to Robert C. Brandenburg dated 11/24/2004# 4 Exhibit R-Letter from David B. Cupar to Seth E. Rodack dated 01/07/2005)(Brandenburg, Robert) (Entered: 01/12/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 1/12/2005, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated Regarding Order Modifying The December 12, 2004 Order On Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Regarding DaimlerChrysler Corp's Discovery. (Tuttle, Robert) (Entered: 01/12/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 1/11/2005, Entered: None
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Johnson Controls Interiors L. L. C..(Bewersdorf, Ryan) (Entered: 01/11/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 1/5/2005, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by DaimlerChrysler Corporation. (KWil, ) (Entered: 01/08/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 1/7/2005, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by DaimlerChrysler Corporation re 175 Stipulation For Order Modifying The December 12, 12004 Order on Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Regarding DaimlerChrysler Corporation's Discovery. (Kethledge, Raymond) (Entered: 01/07/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 1/7/2005, Entered: None
STIPULATION for Order Modifying The December 12, 2004 Order On Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Regarding DaimlerChrysler Coproration's Discovery by DaimlerChrysler Corporation.(Kethledge, Raymond) (Entered: 01/07/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 1/4/2005, Entered: None
Joint MOTION to Quash (by plaintiffs and non-party Robert Tuttle) Subpoena and for Protective Order Curbing Discovery of Plaintiffs' Counsel by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits # 2 Exhibit A - Subpoenas served on plts' counsel, Robert Tuttle# 3 Exhibit B - Subpoenas served on Brooks Kushman PC# 4 Exhibit C - Notices of Dep directed to another member of Brooks Kushman PC law firm)(Brandenburg, Robert) (Entered: 01/04/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 1/4/2005, Entered: None
RESPONSE to 160 MOTION to Compel Collins & Aikman's Responses to Discovery Requests and Cross Motion for Rule 37 Award filed by Collins and Aikman Products Company, Collins and Aikman Products Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Cupar, David) (Entered: 01/04/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 12/29/2004, Entered: None
STIPULATION for Dimissal with Prejudice as to Defendants Intier Automotive Seating and Intier Automotive, Inc.(ATee, ) (Entered: 12/30/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 12/28/2004, Entered: None
MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Withheld from Discovery by Defendant Guardian Industries on Improper Assertion of Privilege or Immunity and Brief in Support thereof by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits # 2 Exhibit A - Privilege Log of Guardian Industries, Inc.# 3 Exhibit B - Letter dated 12/21/04 to John S. Artz from Seth E. Rodack# 4 Exhibit C - Third Party Summons for Guardian Automotive dated 7/16/04# 5 Exhibit D - Letter dated 5/20/03 to Edward Smith from Craig Baldwin# 6 Exhibit E - CGI Management Team# 7 Exhibit F - Observations on a Summary of Melea listed US patents# 8 Exhibit G - Guardian Ind Inc.'s Rspn to Ptfs Melea Ltd and Plastic Molded Tech Inc.'s 1st Set of Ints Nos. 1-21# 9 Exhibit H - Guardian Industries Inc.'s Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ. P. 26(a)(1)# 10 Exhibit I - SBM Member Directory# 11 Exhibit J - Collins & Aikman Products Co. Withheld List)(Tuttle, Robert) (Entered: 12/28/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 12/27/2004, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated re 167 Order Certificate of Service. (Rodack, Seth) (Entered: 12/27/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 12/22/2004, Entered: None
STIPULATION for Dismissal with prejudice as to defendant ADAC Plastics Incorporated.(ATee, ) (Entered: 12/23/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 12/22/2004, Entered: None
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 12/2/04 of Motions to Compel, Motion for Extension of Time (ATee, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/19/2009: # 1 Document Continuation, # 2 Document Continuation, # 3 Document Continuation) (Goltz, D). (Entered: 12/23/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 12/21/2004, Entered: None
AMENDED ORDER by Honorable Donald A Scheer re 150 Order on Motion to Compel 92 .(KWil, ) (Entered: 12/23/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 12/22/2004, Entered: None
REPLY to Response re 133 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims filed by Guardian Industries Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits # 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C# 5 Exhibit D# 6 Exhibit E# 7 Exhibit F# 8 Exhibit G# 9 Exhibit H# 10 Exhibit I# 11 Exhibit J# 12 Exhibit K# 13 Exhibit L# 14 Exhibit M# 15 Exhibit N# 16 Exhibit O)(Artz, John) (Entered: 12/22/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 12/22/2004, Entered: None
Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages of Reply Brief by Guardian Industries Corporation. (Artz, John) (Entered: 12/22/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 12/22/2004, Entered: None
REPLY to Response re 132 MOTION to Compel Defendant Guardian Industries, Inc.'s Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories and Brief in Support filed by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 # 2 # 3 # 4 # 5 # 6 # 7 # 8)(Rodack, Seth) (Entered: 12/22/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 12/20/2004, Entered: None
EMERGENCY MOTION for relief from 12/10/04 re 148 Order on Motion to Compel, 150 Order on Motion to Compel by defendant Alliance Gas Systems Incorporated. (SSchoe, ) (Entered: 12/22/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: None
STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice as to defendant Doveport Systems, L.L.C..(SSchoe, ) (Entered: 12/22/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 12/21/2004, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by DaimlerChrysler Corporation Notices of Taking Deposition of David Syrowik and Robert Tuttle by DaimlerChrysler Corporation, Collins & Aikman and Guardian. (Kethledge, Raymond) (Entered: 12/21/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 12/21/2004, Entered: None
MOTION to Compel Collins & Aikman's Responses to Discovery Requests by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 # 2 # 3 # 4 # 5 # 6 # 7 # 8 # 9 # 10 # 11 # 12 # 13 # 14 # 15 # 16)(Rodack, Seth) (Entered: 12/21/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 12/20/2004, Entered: None
RESPONSE to 132 MOTION to Compel Defendant Guardian Industries, Inc.'s Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories and Brief in Support filed by Guardian Industries Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits # 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C# 5 Exhibit D)(Artz, John) (Entered: 12/20/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 12/16/2004, Entered: None
ORDER by Honorable Donald A Scheer re 113 Motion to Compel Defendant Collins & Aikman Products Co. to Produce a 30(b)(6) Witness.(ATee, ) (Entered: 12/20/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 12/16/2004, Entered: None
ORDER by Honorable Donald A Scheer re 114 Motion to Compel to Permit Inspection of the Actual Molding Process and the Operation of the Gas-Assist Molding Equipment.(ATee, ) (Entered: 12/20/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 12/16/2004, Entered: None
ORDER by Honorable Donald A Scheer re 94 Motion to Compel Regarding Plaintiffs' Responses to DaimlerChrysler Corporation's First Set of Requests for Admission, Interrogatories and Document Requests. (ATee, ) (Entered: 12/20/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 12/16/2004, Entered: None
ORDER finding as moot 101 Motion to Compel and 102 Motion to Compel- Signed by Honorable Donald A Scheer. (ATee, ) (Entered: 12/20/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 12/16/2004, Entered: None
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Brian D. Wassom appearing on behalf of Collins and Aikman Products Company.(ATee, ) (Entered: 12/20/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 12/16/2004, Entered: None
OBJECTION to 94 MOTION to Compel Discovery Order presented by Defendant DaimlerChrysler on its Motion to Compel by Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits # 2 Exhibit A - Excerpt from 12/2/04 motion hearing, pp. 52-56# 3 Exhibit B - Excerpt from 12/2/04 motion hearing, p. 71# 4 Exhibit C - Excerpt from 12/2/04 motion hearing, pp. 85-88# 5 Exhibit D - Excerpt from 12/2/04 motion hearing, p. 104# 6 Exhibit E - Excerpt from 12/2/04 motion hearing, pp. 110-112# 7 Exhibit F - Excerpt from 12/2/04 motion hearing, p. 77)(Rodack, Seth) (Entered: 12/16/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 12/14/2004, Entered: None
ORDER by Honorable Gerald E Rosen dismissing Algonquin Automotive re 142 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited. (KWil, ) (Entered: 12/15/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 12/10/2004, Entered: None
ORDER by Honorable Donald A Scheer denying as moot 81 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply . (KWil, ) (Entered: 12/14/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 12/10/2004, Entered: None
ORDER by Honorable Donald A Scheer granting 92 Motion to Compel. (KWil, ) (Entered: 12/14/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 12/10/2004, Entered: None
ORDER by Honorable Donald A Scheer granting in part and denying in part 91 Motion to Compel. (KWil, ) (Entered: 12/14/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 12/10/2004, Entered: None
ORDER by Honorable Donald A Scheer granting 89 Motion to Compel. (KWil, ) (Entered: 12/14/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 12/10/2004, Entered: None
ORDER by Honorable Donald A Scheer granting in part and denying in part 93 Motion to Compel and Motion for Sanctions. (KWil, ) (Entered: 12/14/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 12/14/2004, Entered: None
RESPONSE to 133 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims filed by Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits # 2 Exhibit 4 - U.S. Patent No. 5,443,087# 3 Exhibit 1 - Facsimile letter seeking concurrence to Guardian's motion, dated 12/1/04, sent at 4:02 PM# 4 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Terry Pearson# 5 Exhibit 3 - Minutes of the proceedings in the European Patent Office involving European counterpart of '637 patent# 6 Exhibit 5 - U.S. Patent No. 4,961,441# 7 Exhibit 6 - Notice of Taking Deposition of Robert Tuttle, Case No. 03-70565)(Tuttle, Robert) (Entered: 12/14/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 12/8/2004, Entered: None
NOTICE of New Firm Affiliation and Change of Address for co-counsel Frank C. Cimino Jr., Paul A. Gennari, Michael A. O'Shea. (KWil, ) (Entered: 12/13/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 12/7/2004, Entered: None
ORDER denying 105 Motion for Protective Order- Signed by Honorable Donald A Scheer. (ATee, ) (Entered: 12/13/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 12/10/2004, Entered: None
OBJECTION to ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT GUARDIAN TO PERMIT INSPECTION OF THE ACTUAL MOLDING PROCESS AND THE OPERATION OF THE GAS-ASSIST MOLDING EQUIPMENT MANUFACTURED, SOLD AND USED by Guardian Industries Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits # 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B)(Artz, John) (Entered: 12/10/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 12/10/2004, Entered: None
STIPULATION of Dismissal of Algonquin Automotive by Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated.(Brandenburg, Robert) (Entered: 12/10/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 12/9/2004, Entered: None
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Robert C. Brandenburg appearing on behalf of Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated.(Brandenburg, Robert) (Entered: 12/09/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 12/9/2004, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by DaimlerChrysler Corporation re 139 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Notice of Presentment of Order. (Kethledge, Raymond) (Entered: 12/09/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 12/9/2004, Entered: None
NOTICE by DaimlerChrysler Corporation (Notice of Presentment by DaimlerChrysler Corporation) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Order On Defendant DaimlerChrysler Corporation's Motion to Compel Regarding Plaintiffs' Responses to DaimlerChrysler Corporation's First Set of Requests For Admission, Interrogatories and Document Requests)(Kethledge, Raymond) (Entered: 12/09/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 12/7/2004, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by DaimlerChrysler Corporation re 137 Notice of Change of Address, and Firm Affiliation of Co-Counsel for DaimlerChrysler Corporation, Algonquin Automotive and Siegel-Robert, Inc.,. (Kethledge, Raymond) (Entered: 12/07/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 12/7/2004, Entered: None
NOTICE of Change of Address by Raymond M. Kethledge on behalf of Algonquin Automotive. Siegel-Robert, Inc., and DaimlerChrysler Corporation (Co-Counsel, Michael O'Shea, Frank C. Cimino, Jr., and Paul A. Gennari of Akin, Gump, Strauss, Hauer & Feld (Kethledge, Raymond) (Entered: 12/07/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 12/6/2004, Entered: None
NOTICE by Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated re 89 MOTION to Compel, 91 MOTION to Compel, 92 MOTION to Compel, 93 MOTION to Compel MOTION for Sanctions Under Local Rule 58.1 (Tuttle, Robert) (Entered: 12/06/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 12/2/2004, Entered: None
RESPONSE and Designations Pursuant to the Rule 30(b)(6) Notice of Deposition Served By Defendant DaimlerChrysler Corporation by all plaintiffs. (Tuttle, Robert) (Entered: 12/02/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 11/29/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER REFERRING MOTION to Magistrate Judge SCHEER: 105 MOTION for Protective Order To Limit Inspection of Guardian's Processes and Equipment filed by Guardian Industries Corporation. Signed by Honorable Gerald E Rosen. (SSchoe, ) (Entered: 12/02/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 12/1/2004, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims by Guardian Industries Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 [Proposed] Second Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims)(Artz, John) (Entered: 12/01/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 12/1/2004, Entered: None
MOTION to Compel Defendant Guardian Industries, Inc.'s Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories and Brief in Support by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits # 2 Exhibit A Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories# 3 Exhibit B Guardian's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Discovery Requests# 4 Exhibit C Guardian's Responses to Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories# 5 Exhibit D 11-16-04 Letter from plaintiffs' counsel to Guardian's counsel# 6 Exhibit E 11-24-04 Letter from Guardian to plaintiffs# 7 Exhibit F 11-29-04 Letter from plaintiffs to Guardian# 8 Exhibit G 11-29-04 Letter from Guardian to plaintiffs# 9 Exhibit H 11-30-04 Letter from plaintiffs to Guardian# 10 Exhibit I Copy of Form 16)(Rodack, Seth) (Entered: 12/01/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 11/30/2004, Entered: None
NOTICE of hearing on 105 MOTION for Protective Order To Limit Inspection of Guardian's Processes and Equipment. Motion Hearing set for 12/2/2004 02:00 PM before Honorable Donald A Scheer. (VSim, ) (Entered: 11/30/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 11/29/2004, Entered: None
RESPONSE to 114 MOTION to Compel Inspection filed by Collins and Aikman Products Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Cupar, David) (Entered: 11/29/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 11/29/2004, Entered: None
RESPONSE to 113 MOTION to Compel Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition filed by Collins and Aikman Products Company. (Cupar, David) (Entered: 11/29/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 11/22/2004, Entered: None
REPLY brief with exhibit A to Response re 105 MOTION for Protective Order To Limit Inspection of Guardian's Processes and Equipment filed by Guardian Industries Corporation. (DHame, ) (Entered: 11/23/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 11/19/2004, Entered: None
NOTICE of hearing on 94 MOTION to Compel Discovery. Motion Hearing set for 12/2/2004 02:00 PM before Honorable Donald A Scheer. (VSim, ) (Entered: 11/19/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 11/19/2004, Entered: None
NOTICE of hearing on 113 MOTION to Compel, 114 MOTION to Compel. Motion Hearing set for 12/16/2004 02:00 PM before Honorable Donald A Scheer. (VSim, ) (Entered: 11/19/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 11/18/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER REFERRING MOTION to Magistrate Judge Scheer: 94 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by DaimlerChrysler Corporation. Signed by Honorable Gerald E Rosen. (LSau, ) (Entered: 11/18/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 11/15/2004, Entered: None
NOTICE of hearing on 101 MOTION to Compel, 81 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs' Discovery Requests. Motion Hearing set for 12/16/2004 02:00 PM before Honorable Donald A Scheer. (VSim, ) (Entered: 11/18/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 11/17/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER REFERRING MOTION to Magistrate Judge Scheer: 113 MOTION to Compel filed by Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, 114 MOTION to Compel filed by Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited. Signed by Honorable Gerald E Rosen. (LSau, ) (Entered: 11/17/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 11/17/2004, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by DaimlerChrysler Corporation Cd rom containing documents produced Nos. 000438-003969. (Kethledge, Raymond) (Entered: 11/17/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 11/16/2004, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Algonquin Automotive re 117 Brief in Support of Response, and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel to Permit Inspection of the Actual Molding Process and the Operation of the Gas-Assist Molding Equipment Used by Algonquin Automotive. (Kethledge, Raymond) (Entered: 11/16/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 11/15/2004, Entered: None
REPLY to Response re 92 MOTION to Compel defendant Alliance Gas Systems, Inc. to permit inspection of the actual molding process in the operation of the gas-assist molding equipment manufactured sold and used by Alliance filed by plaintiffs Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated. (SSchoe, ) (Entered: 11/16/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 11/15/2004, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by DaimlerChrysler Corporation re 118 Brief in Support of Response, Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion To Compel Discovery Responses. (Kethledge, Raymond) (Entered: 11/15/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 11/15/2004, Entered: None
BRIEF in Support re 102 MOTION to Compel Algonquin's Response and Brief In Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion To Compel Discovery Responses filed by DaimlerChrysler Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits # 2 Exhibit 1 (one)# 3 Exhibit 2 (two)# 4 Exhibit 3 (three))(Kethledge, Raymond) (Entered: 11/15/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 11/15/2004, Entered: None
BRIEF in Support re 101 MOTION to Compel Algonquin's Response and Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion To Compel Inspection filed by DaimlerChrysler Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits # 2 Exhibit One (1)# 3 Exhibit Two (2)# 4 Exhibit 3 (three)# 5 Exhibit 4 (four))(Kethledge, Raymond) (Entered: 11/15/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 11/10/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER REFERRING MOTION to Magistrate Judge Scheer: 101 MOTION to Compel filed by Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, 102 MOTION to Compel filed by Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, 81 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs' Discovery Requests filed by Guardian Industries Corporation. Signed by Honorable Gerald E Rosen. (ATee, ) (Entered: 11/12/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 11/9/2004, Entered: None
BRIEF BY PLAINTIFFS IN OPPOSITION TO 94 Defendant Daimler Chrysler's MOTION to Compel Discovery . (Attachments: # 1 Document Continuation # 2 Document Continuation # 3 Document Continuation # 4 Document Continuation # 5 Document Continuation)(ATee, ) (Entered: 11/10/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 11/8/2004, Entered: None
MOTION to Compel defendants Collins and Aikman Products Co. to permit inspection of the actual molding process and the operation of the gas-assist molding equipment used by Collins and Aikman Products Co. by plaitiffs Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Document Continuation)(SSchoe, ) (Entered: 11/09/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 11/8/2004, Entered: None
MOTION to Compel Rule 30(b)(6)Deposition of Collins and Aikman Products Co. by plaintiffs Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Document Continuation)(SSchoe, ) (Entered: 11/09/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 11/8/2004, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by DaimlerChrysler Corporation re 111 Response to Motion,,, to Compel Under Rule 37 (plaintiffs' motion). (Kethledge, Raymond) (Entered: 11/08/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 11/8/2004, Entered: None
RESPONSE to 93 MOTION to Compel MOTION for Sanctions In Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion Under Rule 37 to Compel and For Sanctions filed by DaimlerChrysler Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits # 2 Exhibit In re Air Crash At Taipei, Taiwan on October 31, 2000, 2002 WL 32155477, *6 (C.D. Cal. Oct. 23, 2002)# 3 Exhibit SmithKline Beecham Corp. and Beecham Group, P.L.C., v Apotex Corp., et al,. 2000 WL 116082 *9 (N.D. Ill. Jan. 24, 2000)# 4 Exhibit SmithKline Beecham Corp., Smithline Beecham, P.L.C., et al., v Apotex, Inc., et al., 2004 WL 739959, *3-4 (E.D. Pa. March 23, 2004)# 5 Exhibit Alan Cantor v The Equitable Life Assurance Society of the United States, 1998 WL 544962, *2 (E.D. Pa. Aug. 27, 1998))(Kethledge, Raymond) (Entered: 11/08/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 11/8/2004, Entered: None
RESPONSE to defendants 105 MOTION for Protective Order To Limit Inspection of Guardian's Processes and Equipment filed by plaintiffs Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated. (SSchoe, ) (Entered: 11/08/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 11/5/2004, Entered: None
REPLY to Response re plaintiff's 102 MOTION to Compel filed by plaintiff's Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated. (SSchoe, ) (Entered: 11/08/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 11/5/2004, Entered: None
RESPONSE to 101 MOTION to Compel filed by Alliance Gas Systems Incorporated. (ATee, ) (Entered: 11/05/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 11/1/2004, Entered: None
REPLY BRIEF by Plaintiffs to Response re 89 MOTION to Compel Defendant Guardian Industries Corporation to Permit Inspection of the Actual Molding Process and the Operation of the Gas-Assist Molding Equipment used by Guardian.(ATee, ) (Entered: 11/03/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 11/2/2004, Entered: None
NOTICE of hearing on 92 MOTION to Compel, 93 MOTION to Compel MOTION for Sanctions. Motion Hearing set for 12/2/2004 02:00 PM before Honorable Donald A Scheer. (VSim, ) (Entered: 11/02/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 11/1/2004, Entered: None
MOTION for Protective Order To Limit Inspection of Guardian's Processes and Equipment by Guardian Industries Corporation. (Artz, John) (Entered: 11/01/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 11/1/2004, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by DaimlerChrysler Corporation re 103 Response to Motion, to Compel Discovery. (Kethledge, Raymond) (Entered: 11/01/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 11/1/2004, Entered: None
RESPONSE to 91 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by DaimlerChrysler Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits # 2 Exhibit October 14, 2004 letter from Paul Gennari to Robert Tuttle# 3 Exhibit Unpublished Opinion - Richard N. Frank, et al. v. Clyde Wm. Engle, et al 1998 WL 155553# 4 Exhibit October 29, 2004 letter from Paul Gennari to Seth E. Rodack)(Kethledge, Raymond) (Entered: 11/01/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 10/29/2004, Entered: None
MOTION to Compel regarding Algonquin's responses to plintiffs first set of interrogatories and first set of document requests by plaintiffs Melea Limited, and Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Document Continuation # 2 Document Continuation)(SSchoe, ) (Entered: 11/01/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 10/29/2004, Entered: None
MOTION to Compel defendant Algonquin Automotive to permit inspection of the actual molding process and the operation of the gas-assist molding equipment by plaintiffs Melea Limited, and Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Document Continuation)(SSchoe, ) (Entered: 11/01/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 100 Filed: 10/29/2004, Entered: None
BRIEF by plaintiffs in Support re 91 MOTION to Compel Algonquin Automotive to Answer Plaintiff's first set of interrogatories and first set of document requests (FILED UNDER SEAL AND PLACED IN VAULT) (ATee, ) (Entered: 11/01/2004)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 10/29/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER REFERRING MOTION to Magistrate Judge Scheer: 92 MOTION to Compel filed by Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, 93 MOTION to Compel MOTION for Sanctions filed by Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited. Signed by Honorable Gerald E Rosen. (ATee, ) (Entered: 11/01/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 11/1/2004, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by DaimlerChrysler Corporation Cd rom of docs prod (000001-000437), signed verification page. (Kethledge, Raymond) (Entered: 11/01/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 10/28/2004, Entered: None
RESPONSE to 89 MOTION to Compel Inspection of Actual Molding Process and Molding Equipment filed by Guardian Industries Corporation. (Artz, John) (Entered: 10/28/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 10/26/2004, Entered: None
NOTICE of hearing on 89 MOTION to Compel, 91 MOTION to Compel, 81 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs' Discovery Requests. Motion Hearing set for 12/2/2004 02:00 PM before Honorable Donald A Scheer. (VSim, ) (Entered: 10/27/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 10/25/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER REFERRING MOTION to Magistrate Judge Scheer: 89 MOTION to Compel filed by Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, 91 MOTION to Compel filed by Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated, Melea Limited, 81 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs' Discovery Requests filed by Guardian Industries Corporation. Signed by Honorable Gerald E Rosen. (SSchoe, ) (Entered: 10/27/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 10/26/2004, Entered: None
MOTION to Compel Discovery by DaimlerChrysler Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Requests to Admit# 3 Exhibit Exh. 2 - Interrogatories to Plaintiffs# 4 Exhibit Exh 3 - Requests to Produce to Plaintiffs# 5 Exhibit Exh 4 - Plaintiffs' responses to Requests for Admissions# 6 Exhibit Exh. 5 - Plaintiffs' Responses to Interrogatories# 7 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Responses to Requests to Produce# 8 Exhibit 10/08/04 Correspondence# 9 Exhibit Ex. 8 - 10/15/04 Correspondence# 10 Exhibit Ex. 9 - 10/19/04 Correspondence# 11 Exhibit Ex. 10 - 10/20/04 Correspondence# 12 Exhibit Ex. 11a - 10/20 through 10/22 Correspondence# 13 Document Continuation Ex. 11b - Continuation of Exhibit 11a (combined Ex. 11)# 14 Exhibit Ex. 12 - Plaintiffs' Complaint# 15 Exhibit Ex. 13 Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint# 16 Exhibit Ex. 14 - Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint# 17 Exhibit Ex. 15 - Byrd v. Reno, 1998 WL 429676# 18 Exhibit Ex. 16. - U.S. v. Denlinger, 1989 WL 516267# 19 Exhibit Ex. 17 - Collins & Aikman License Agreement)(Paige, Richard) (Entered: 10/26/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 10/21/2004, Entered: None
MOTION to Compel and MOTION for Sanctions by plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Document Continuation)(ATee, ) (Entered: 10/25/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 10/20/2004, Entered: None
MOTION to Compel Defendant Alliance Gas System, Inc. to permit inspection of the actual molding process in the operation of the gas-assist molding equipment manufactured, sold and used by Alliance by plaintiff Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Document Continuation)(SSchoe, ) (Entered: 10/22/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 10/14/2004, Entered: None
MOTION by plaintiffs to Compel regarding Daimler Chrysler responses . (KWil, ) (Entered: 10/15/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 10/13/2004, Entered: None
REPLY by plaintiffs to 82 Amended Counterclaims . (KWil, ) (Entered: 10/14/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 10/12/2004, Entered: None
MOTION by plaintiffs' to Compel defendant Guardian to permit inspection. (Attachments: # 1 Document Continuation)(KWil, ) (Entered: 10/14/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 10/12/2004, Entered: None
RESPONSE by plaintiffs' to 80 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs' Discovery Requests . (KWil, ) (Entered: 10/14/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 10/8/2004, Entered: None
PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Honorable Gerald E Rosen. (ATee, ) (Entered: 10/13/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 10/7/2004, Entered: None
ORDER by Honorable Gerald E Rosen for Substitution of Counsel. (KWil, ) (Entered: 10/13/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 10/12/2004, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by DaimlerChrysler Corporation re 78 Notice (Other) of Dismissal without prejudice against Guardian Automotive. (Kethledge, Raymond) (Entered: 10/12/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 10/11/2004, Entered: None
REPLY to Response re 81 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs' Discovery Requests filed by Guardian Industries Corporation. (Artz, John) (Entered: 10/11/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 10/5/2004, Entered: None
RESPONSE by plaintiff to defendant Guardian Industy Inc's 81 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Respond (SSchoe, ) (Entered: 10/06/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 10/5/2004, Entered: None
AMENDED ANSWER to SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT AND JURY DEMAND, COUNTERCLAIM filed by Guardian Industries Corporation against Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated by Guardian Industries Corporation. (Artz, John) (Entered: 10/05/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 10/4/2004, Entered: None
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs' Discovery Requests by Guardian Industries Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits # 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B)(Artz, John) (Entered: 10/04/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 10/1/2004, Entered: None
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs' Discovery Requests by Collins and Aikman Products Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Cupar, David) (Entered: 10/01/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 10/1/2004, Entered: None
ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand and, COUNTERCLAIM of Intervening Defendant filed by Guardian Automotive, Guardian Industries Corporation against Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated by Guardian Automotive, Guardian Industries Corporation.(Artz, John) (Entered: 10/01/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 9/29/2004, Entered: None
NOTICE by DaimlerChrysler Corporation of Dismissal of Third Party Complaint against Guardian Automotive (Kethledge, Raymond) (Entered: 09/29/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 9/21/2004, Entered: None
ORDER Granting Motion to Intervene by Guardian Industries Corporation. Signed by Honorable Gerald E Rosen. (NHoll, ) (Entered: 09/27/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 9/21/2004, Entered: None
NOTICE of withdrawal of plaintiff's 66 Response to Motion. (SSchoe, ) (Entered: 09/22/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 9/20/2004, Entered: None
REPLY to Response re 72 MOTION to Strike 53 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim filed by Melea Limited. (CGre, ) (Entered: 09/21/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 9/16/2004, Entered: None
REPLY to Response re 64 MOTION to Intervene As Defendants filed by Guardian Automotive. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits # 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B)(Artz, John) (Entered: 09/16/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 9/13/2004, Entered: None
RESPONSE to 72 MOTION to Strike 53 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim filed by Collins and Aikman Products Company. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support of its Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Strike# 2 Exhibit # 3 Exhibit)(Cupar, David) (Entered: 09/13/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 8/26/2004, Entered: None
MOTION by plaintiffs' to Strike 53 Eighth Affirmative Defense and Counterclaim Count V . (Attachments: # 1 Document Continuation # 2 Document Continuation)(KWil, ) (Entered: 08/31/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/27/2004, Entered: None
ANSWER to Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM filed by Johnson Controls Interiors L. L. C. against Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated by Johnson Controls Interiors L. L. C..(Bewersdorf, Ryan) (Entered: 08/27/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 8/24/2004, Entered: None
STIPULATION AND ORDER by Honorable Gerald E Rosen granting 29 Motion to Intervene by Johnson Controls Interiors L. L. C. (KWil, ) Modified on 8/27/2004 (KWil, ). (Entered: 08/27/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 8/24/2004, Entered: None
ORDER by Honorable Gerald E Rosen Extending Time for Third Party Defendant Guardian Automotive to Answer Third Party Complaint.. (KWil, ) (Entered: 08/27/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 8/24/2004, Entered: None
STIPULATION AND ORDER by Honorable Gerald E Rosen Allowing Intier Automotive Seating of America, Incorporated Intier Automotive, Incorporated to 30 Intervene. (KWil, ) (Entered: 08/27/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 8/24/2004, Entered: None
ANSWER by plaintiffs to Counterclaims re 53 .(KWil, ) (Entered: 08/27/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 8/24/2004, Entered: None
RESPONSE by plaintiffs to 64 Motion to Intervene as defendant. (KWil, ) (Entered: 08/27/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 8/23/2004, Entered: None
NOTICE by Guardian Automotive Of Hearing (Artz, John) (Entered: 08/23/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 8/23/2004, Entered: None
MOTION to Intervene As Defendants by Guardian Automotive. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Responsive Pleading to Second Amended and Supplemental Complaint)(Artz, John) (Entered: 08/23/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 8/23/2004, Entered: None
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT GUARDIAN AUTOMOTIVE TO ANSWER DAIMLER CHRYSLER CORPORATION'S THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT by Guardian Automotive. (Artz, John) (Entered: 08/23/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 8/17/2004, Entered: None
ANSWER (Reply) by plaintiffs to 55 Counterclaim by Intier Automotive Seating of America, Incorporated, Intier Automotive, Incorporated . (KWil, ) (Entered: 08/19/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 8/17/2004, Entered: None
ANSWER (Reply) by plaintiffs to 45 Counterclaim by Alliance Gas Systems Incorporated . (KWil, ) (Entered: 08/19/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/17/2004, Entered: None
ANSWER (Reply) by plaintiffs to 33 Counterclaim by DaimlerChrysler Corporation . (KWil, ) (Entered: 08/19/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/17/2004, Entered: None
ANSWER (Reply) by plaintiffs to 46 Counterclaim by ADAC Plastics Incorporated . (KWil, ) Modified on 8/19/2004 (KWil, ). (Entered: 08/19/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/17/2004, Entered: None
ANSWER (Reply) by plaintiffs to 34 Counterclaim by Siegel-Robert, Incorporated . (KWil, ) (Entered: 08/19/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/17/2004, Entered: None
ANSWER (Reply) by plaintiffs to 37 Counterclaim by Doveport Systems, LLC . (KWil, ) Modified on 8/19/2004 (KWil, ). (Entered: 08/19/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/17/2004, Entered: None
ANSWER (Reply) by plaintiffs to counterclaims by Johnson Controls Interiors, LLC. (KWil, ) (Entered: 08/19/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/16/2004, Entered: None
ANSWER and AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Intier Automotive Seating of America, Incorporated, Intier Automotive, Incorporated to Amended Complaint and COUNTERCLAIM by Intier Automotive Seating of America, Incorporated, Intier Automotive, Incorporated against Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated. (KWil, ) (Entered: 08/18/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/18/2004, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by John A. Artz on behalf of Guardian Automotive (Artz, John) (Entered: 08/18/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/16/2004, Entered: None
ANSWER to Amended Complaint Second Amended and Supplemental Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM filed by Collins and Aikman Products Company against all plaintiffs by Collins and Aikman Products Company.(Cupar, David) (Entered: 08/16/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/12/2004, Entered: None
STIPULATION AND ORDER granting 28 Motion to Intervene- Signed by Honorable Gerald E Rosen. (ATee, ) (Entered: 08/13/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/12/2004, Entered: None
ORDER by Honorable Donald A Scheer finding as moot 20 Motion for Protective Order and finding as moot 20 Motion to Quash as they both have been withdrawn (ATee, ) (Entered: 08/13/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/12/2004, Entered: None
STIPULATION To Extend Time To Answer Daimler Chrysler Corporation's Third Party Complaint by Guardian Automotive (Artz, John) (Entered: 08/12/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/6/2004, Entered: None
RESPONSE to 32 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Melea Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Document Continuation)(SSchoe, ) (Entered: 08/12/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/5/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 32 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer Due: 8/16/2004- Signed by Honorable Paul D Borman on behalf of Judge Rosen. (ATee, ) (Entered: 08/11/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/5/2004, Entered: None
ORDER granting 26 Motion to Intervene- Signed by Honorable Gerald E Rosen. (ATee, ) (Entered: 08/11/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/30/2004, Entered: None
PROPOSED ANSWER to Second Amended Complaint by ADAC Plastics Incorporated and COUNTERCLAIM against Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated .(KWil, ) (Entered: 08/10/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/30/2004, Entered: None
ANSWER by Alliance Gas Systems Incorporated to Second Amended Complaint 23 and COUNTERCLAIM against Melea Limited and Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated .(KWil, ) (Entered: 08/10/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/29/2004, Entered: None
SUMMONS Returned Executed. Guardian Automotive served on 7/20/2004, answer due 8/9/2004 (KWil, ) (Entered: 08/10/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/28/2004, Entered: None
AMENDED ANSWER by Algonquin Automotive to Second Amended Complaint 23 .(KWil, ) (Entered: 08/09/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/26/2004, Entered: None
ANSWER to Second Amended Complaint 23 Affirmative Defenses and COUNTERCLAIM filed by Intier Automotive Seating of America, Incorporated, Intier Automotive, Incorporated, Magna Donnelly Corporation, Magna Donnelly Mirrors North America, L. L. C. against Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated .(KWil, ) (Entered: 08/09/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/28/2004, Entered: None
RESPONSE BRIEF to 26 Motion to Intervene filed by Melea Limited and Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated. (LBeh, ) (Entered: 08/09/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/28/2004, Entered: None
RESPONSE BRIEF to 28 Motion to Intervene filed by Melea Limited and Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated. (LBeh, ) (Entered: 08/09/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/28/2004, Entered: None
RESPONSE BRIEF to 29 Motion to Intervene filed by Melea Limited and Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated. (LBeh, ) (Entered: 08/09/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/28/2004, Entered: None
RESPONSE BRIEF to 30 Motion to Intervene filed by Melea Limited and Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated. (LBeh, ) (Entered: 08/09/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/27/2004, Entered: None
ANSWER to Amended Complaint 23 with Affirmative Defenses and COUNTERCLAIM filed by Doveport Systems, L. L. C. against Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated.(KWil, ) Modified on 8/9/2004 (KWil, ). (Entered: 08/09/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/26/2004, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Algonquin Automotive, DaimlerChrysler Corporation, Siegel-Robert, Incorporated re: Answer to Second Amended Complaint. (KWil, ) (Entered: 08/09/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/26/2004, Entered: None
ANSWER to Amended Complaint 23 and COUNTERCLAIM filed by Algonquin Automotive against Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated.(KWil, ) (Entered: 08/09/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/26/2004, Entered: None
ANSWER to Amended Complaint 23 , and COUNTERCLAIM filed by Siegel-Robert, Incorporated against Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated.(KWil, ) (Entered: 08/09/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/26/2004, Entered: None
ANSWER to Amended Complaint 23 and COUNTERCLAIM filed by DaimlerChrysler Corporation against Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated .(KWil, ) Modified on 8/9/2004 (KWil, ). (Entered: 08/09/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/2/2004, Entered: None
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to the Second Amended Complaint by Collins and Aikman Products Company. (Cupar, David) (Entered: 08/02/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/22/2004, Entered: None
NOTICE by Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated of withdrawal of 24 MOTION for Protective Order. (ATee, ) (Entered: 07/27/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/16/2004, Entered: None
MOTION to Intervene as Defendants and Counterplaintiffs and brief in support by Intier Automotive Seating of America, Incorporated, Intier Automotive, Incorporated, Magna Donnelly Mirrors North America, L. L. C., Magna Donnelly Corporation. (ATee, ) (Entered: 07/27/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/16/2004, Entered: None
MOTION to Intervene by Johnson Controls Interiors L. L. C.; with exhibits A-C. (Attachments: # 1 Document Continuation)(JGilb, ) (Entered: 07/27/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/16/2004, Entered: None
MOTION to Intervene by Algonquin Automotive and Siegel-Robert, Incorporated. (JGilb, ) (Entered: 07/27/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/16/2004, Entered: None
THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT, with Jury Demand, filed by DaimlerChrysler Corporation against Guardian Automotive (JGilb, ) (Entered: 07/27/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/16/2004, Entered: None
MOTION to Intervene by ADAC Plastics Incorporated. (ATee, ) (Entered: 07/26/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/12/2004, Entered: None
RESPONSE to 20 Motion for Protective Order and Motion to Quash filed by Melea Limited. (CGre, ) (Entered: 07/22/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/9/2004, Entered: None
MOTION for Protective Order by all plaintiffs. (CGre, ) (Entered: 07/22/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/7/2004, Entered: None
SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated against Alliance Gas Systems Incorporated, DaimlerChrysler Corporation, Doveport Systems, L. L. C.. (Attachments:Exhibits A-G # 1 Document Continuation # 2 Document Continuation)(RHutc, ) Modified on 8/9/2004 (KWil, ). (Entered: 07/15/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/8/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER REFERRING MOTION to Magistrate Judge Scheer: 20 MOTION for Protective Order MOTION to Quash filed by Collins and Aikman Products Company Signed by Honorable Gerald E Rosen. (LHack, ) (Entered: 07/15/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/13/2004, Entered: None
NOTICE of hearing on 20 MOTION for Protective Order MOTION to Quash. Motion Hearing set for 8/12/2004 02:00 PM before Honorable Donald A Scheer. (VSim, ) (Entered: 07/14/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/29/2004, Entered: None
MOTION to quash subpoena, Motion for Protective Order by Collins and Aikman Products Company. (PPaul, ) (Entered: 07/08/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/24/2004, Entered: None
SCHEDULING ORDER: Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 6/2/2005 Signed by Honorable Gerald E Rosen. (Refer to image for additional dates)(BSoc, ) (Entered: 06/29/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/5/2004, Entered: None
ANSWER to Counterclaim of Doveport Systems, LLC by Melea Limited.(JLam, ) (Entered: 05/06/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/5/2004, Entered: None
ANSWER to Counterclaim of Alliance Gas Systems, Inc by Melea Limited.(JLam, ) (Entered: 05/06/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/5/2004, Entered: None
ANSWER to Counterclaim of DaimlerChrysler Corporation by Melea Limited.(JLam, ) (Entered: 05/06/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/26/2004, Entered: None
ANSWER to Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM filed by Alliance Gas Systems Incorporated against Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated by Alliance Gas Systems Incorporated.(JLam, ) (Entered: 04/29/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/29/2004, Entered: None
NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference set for 5/19/2004 10:30 AM before Honorable Gerald E Rosen. (LSau, ) (Entered: 04/29/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/26/2004, Entered: None
ANSWER to Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM filed by Doveport Systems, L. L. C. against Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated by Doveport Systems, L. L. C..(JLam, ) (Entered: 04/27/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/26/2004, Entered: None
ANSWER to Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM filed by DaimlerChrysler Corporation against Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated by DaimlerChrysler Corporation.(JLam, ) (Entered: 04/27/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/20/2004, Entered: None
SUMMONS Returned Executed. DaimlerChrysler Corporation served on 2/17/2004, answer due 3/8/2004 (SMar, ) (Entered: 04/23/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/8/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER, Attorney Howard W. Burdett for Doveport Systems, L. L. C. added. Signed by Judge Gerald E Rosen. (JLam, ) (Entered: 04/20/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/8/2004, Entered: None
AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated against Alliance Gas Systems Incorporated, DaimlerChrysler Corporation, Doveport Systems, L. L. C. (Attachments: # 1 Document Continuation Exhibits A-E)(JLam, ) (Entered: 04/20/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/9/2004, Entered: None
SUMMONS Returned Executed. Alliance Gas Systems Incorporated served on 2/24/2004, answer due 3/15/2004 (LHack, ) (Entered: 03/19/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/9/2004, Entered: None
SUMMONS Returned Executed. Doveport Systems, L. L. C. served on 2/18/2004, answer due 3/9/2004 (LHack, ) (Entered: 03/19/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/5/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER for Extension of Time Response due by 4/9/2004. Signed by Judge Gerald E Rosen. (LHack, ) (Entered: 03/17/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/13/2004, Entered: None
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Melea Limited (LHack, ) (Entered: 02/23/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/13/2004, Entered: None
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated (LHack, ) (Entered: 02/23/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/13/2004, Entered: None
COMPLAINT filed by Melea Limited, Plastic Molded Technologies, Incorporated against Alliance Gas Systems Incorporated, DaimlerChrysler Corporation, Doveport Systems, L. L. C. with Jury Demand, Receipt No. 502844. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-D# Document Continuaiton (2)(LHack, ) (Entered: 02/23/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 146 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?