Sapa Extrusions, Inc. v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Pennsylvania Middle District Court, Case No. 3:13-cv-02827
Magistrate Judge Malachy E. Mannion, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 17, 2016 at 5:46 AM DT (5.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cozen O'Connor, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Deborah M Minkoff +1 215 665 2170 dminkoff@cozen.com
No Logo American Guarantee and Liability Insurance Company, Defendant
No Logo ARCH SPECIALTY INSURANCE CO., Defendant
Officially listed as "Arch Specialty Insurance Company"

Toggle Switch Represented by Bron, Paul

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED THOMAS VECCHIO +1 856 317 7100 +1 856 317 7117 tvecchio@connellfoley.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Connell Foley LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William D Deveau +1 201 521 1000 wdeveau@connellfoley.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan P. McHenry +1 973 535 0500 +1 973 535 9217 jmchenry@connellfoley.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas M Wester +1 973 535 0500
No Logo Gerling Konzern Allegemeine Versicherungs-AG, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by White & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED DAVID J. CREAGAN +1 215 864 7032 creagand@whiteandwilliams.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shane R. Heskin +1 215 864 6329 +1 215 399 9603 heskins@whiteandwilliams.com
TERMINATED: 06/04/2015, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brendan D. McQuiggan +1 215 864 7173 +1 215 789 7530 mcquigganb@whiteandwilliams.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patricia B. Santelle +1 215 864 6205
No Logo GREAT AMERICAN ASSURANCE CO., Defendant
Officially listed as "Great American Assurance Company"

Toggle Switch Represented by Srinivasa Rao, Kotaru

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MICHAEL E. BUCKLEY +1 516 357 3000 +1 516 357 3333 michael.buckley@rivkin.com
No Logo Insurance Company Of The State Of Pennsylvania, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Trenk, DiPasquale, Della Fera & Sodono, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joel M. Eads +1 610 645 5600 +1 610 645 5605 jeads@trenklawfirm.com
No Logo National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Trenk, DiPasquale, Della Fera & Sodono, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joel M. Eads +1 610 645 5600 +1 610 645 5605 jeads@trenklawfirm.com
No Logo Pacific Employers Insurance Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cozen O'Connor, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Deborah M Minkoff +1 215 665 2170 dminkoff@cozen.com
Liberty Mutual Insurance Group, Inc. Liberty Mutual Insurance Group, Inc., Counterclaim Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Liberty Mutual Insurance Company"
No Logo Sapa Extrusions, Inc., Counterclaim Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 110 - Contract - Insurance
  Entries (144) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 2/24/2016, Entered: None
Letter from National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pa. and The Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania re Status Update of Marvin Subpoenas. (Eads, Joel) (Entered: 02/24/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 1/19/2016, Entered: None
    SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 6/24/2016. Motions due by 8/1/2016. (See document for details).Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 1/19/16. (bs) (Entered: 01/19/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 1/19/2016, Entered: None
      NOTICE of Change of Address by Deborah M Minkoff (Minkoff, Deborah) (Entered: 01/19/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 1/15/2016, Entered: None
        Letter from Michael Conley, Esq., counsel for Plaintiff RE: Discovery Update. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Conley, Michael) (Entered: 01/15/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 1/11/2016, Entered: None
          ORDER granting 114 Motion for a Confidentiality Order. (See order for details). Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 1/11/16 (bs) (Entered: 01/11/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 11/18/2015, Entered: None
            SCHEDULING ORDER: - Discovery ddls. (See order for details). Status Report of Discovery due by 1/15/2016.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 11/18/15. (bs) (Entered: 11/18/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 11/13/2015, Entered: None
              STIPULATION Proposed Form of Order following Discovery Conference Call on November 10, 2015 by Sapa Extrusions, Inc., filed by Sapa Extrusions, Inc..(Pillsbury, William) (Entered: 11/13/2015)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None
                Letter from Shane Heskin to The Honorable Malachy Mannion. (Heskin, Shane) (Entered: 11/09/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None
                  Letter from Michael Conley on behalf of SAPA Extrusions in Response to letter of 11/3/15 . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s))(Conley, Michael) (Entered: 11/09/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 11/4/2015, Entered: None
                    DOCUMENT SEALED - Unredacted letter and exibits re: doc 135. (bs) (Entered: 11/04/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 11/4/2015, Entered: None
                      Letter from Shane Heskin to the Honorable Malachy Mannion. (Heskin, Shane) (Entered: 11/04/2015)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: None
                        ORDER granting 133 joint Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Fact Discovery due 1/29/16, Expert Discovery due by 5/27/16.Expert rpts. due from pltf. 2/15/16, from defts. 3/15/16 & suppls. 4/15/16. Disp. mots. due 4/28/16.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 10/13/15 (bs) (Entered: 10/14/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: None
                          Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Sapa Extrusions, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Pillsbury, William) (Entered: 10/13/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None
                            NOTICE of Change of Address by Joel Max Eads (Eads, Joel) (Entered: 09/21/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 8/25/2015, Entered: None
                              ORDER granting 130 Motion to Withdraw mot. for sumjgm - withdrawing 111 Motion for Summary Judgment;Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 8/25/15 (bs) (Entered: 08/25/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 8/24/2015, Entered: None
                                MOTION to Withdraw 111 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 113 Statement of Facts, 112 Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, by Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Eads, Joel) (Entered: 08/24/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 8/24/2015, Entered: None
                                  ORDER granting 128 pltf's Motion to Extend Time to respond to National Unition Fire Ins. Co. of Pittsburgh and The Ins. Co. of State of PA's mot. for sumjgm. Br. in oppos. due 9/11/15.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 8/24/15 (bs) (Entered: 08/24/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: None
                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to RESPOND TO MOTION SUMMARY JUDGEMENT OF DEFENDANTS NATIONAL UNION FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY OF PITTSBURGH, PA AND THE INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA by Sapa Extrusions, Inc..(Pillsbury, William) (Entered: 08/20/2015)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None
                                      Praecipe Notice of Withdrawal of PEIC and ACE American Motion for Summary Judgment Against Sapa Extrusions, Inc. . (Minkoff, Deborah) (Entered: 08/17/2015)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE by Gerling Konzern Allegemeine Versicherungs-AG to Withdraw Motion for Summary Judgment Against Sapa and Sapa's Crossclaim for Partial Summary Judgment Without Prejudice (Heskin, Shane) (Entered: 08/14/2015)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: None
                                          MOTION to Withdraw Motion for Summary Judgment Against Sapa and Sapa's Crossclaim for Partial Summary Judgment Without Prejudice by Gerling Konzern Allegemeine Versicherungs-AG.(Heskin, Shane) (Entered: 08/14/2015)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: None
                                            ORDER granting in part and denying in part 120 Motion to Stay. The case management deadlines will be extended as follows:1.Fact Discovery. All fact discovery shall be completed by October 28, 2015.2.Expert Discovery. All expert discovery shall be completed by March 3, 2016.3.Expert Reports. Expert reports will be due from the plaintiff on or before November 13, 2015; from the defendant on or before December 14, 2015; Supplementations, if any, by either party will be due on or before January 14, 2016.4.Dispositive Motions. Dispositive motions, if any, shall be filed by April 28, 2016. Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 8/10/15 (bs) (Entered: 08/11/2015)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: None
                                              SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Michael Conley.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 8/7/15. (bs) (Entered: 08/10/2015)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                Letter from William H. Pillsbury Concerning Discovery Issues. (Pillsbury, William) (Entered: 08/07/2015)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                  MOTION to Stay and/or Extend Discovery Deadlines by Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Certificate of Nonconcurrence, # 3 Proposed Order)(Eads, Joel) (Entered: 08/07/2015)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                    Letter from Shane R. Heksin to The Honorable Malachy Mannion. (Heskin, Shane) (Entered: 08/03/2015)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: None
                                                      ANSWER TO STATEMENT OF FACTS re 94 Statement of Facts with Additional Statement of Undisputed Material Facts filed by Sapa Extrusions, Inc..(Pillsbury, William) (Entered: 07/31/2015)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: None
                                                        AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re 92 MOTION for Summary Judgment of William H. Pillsbury filed by Sapa Extrusions, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B, # 3 Exhibit(s) C, # 4 Exhibit(s) D, # 5 Exhibit(s) E, # 6 Exhibit(s) F, # 7 Exhibit(s) G, # 8 Exhibit(s) H, # 9 Exhibit(s) I, # 10 Exhibit(s) J, # 11 Exhibit(s) K, # 12 Exhibit(s) L, # 13 Exhibit(s) N, # 14 Exhibit(s) O, # 15 Exhibit(s) P, # 16 Exhibit(s) Q, # 17 Exhibit(s) R, # 18 Exhibit(s) S, # 19 Exhibit(s) T, # 20 Exhibit(s) U)(Pillsbury, William) (Entered: 07/31/2015)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: None
                                                          BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re 92 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Sapa Extrusions, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Unpublished Opinion(s), # 3 Certificate of Service)(Pillsbury, William) (Entered: 07/31/2015)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: None
                                                            BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 114 MOTION for Order of Confidentiality filed by Sapa Extrusions, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 1)(Pillsbury, William) (Entered: 07/31/2015)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: None
                                                              MOTION for Order of Confidentiality by Sapa Extrusions, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Nonconcurrence, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Pillsbury, William) (Entered: 07/31/2015)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: None
                                                                STATEMENT OF FACTS re 111 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 112 Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA.(Eads, Joel) (Entered: 07/31/2015)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: None
                                                                  BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 111 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit(s) A, # 3 Exhibit(s) B, # 4 Exhibit(s) C, # 5 Exhibit(s) D, # 6 Exhibit(s) E, # 7 Exhibit(s) F, # 8 Exhibit(s) G, # 9 Exhibit(s) H, # 10 Exhibit(s) I, # 11 Exhibit(s) J, # 12 Unpublished Opinion(s))(Eads, Joel) (Entered: 07/31/2015)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: None
                                                                    MOTION for Summary Judgment by Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Nonconcurrence, # 2 Proposed Order)(Eads, Joel) (Entered: 07/31/2015)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: None
                                                                      PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by William H. Pillsbury on behalf of Sapa Extrusions, Inc. Attorney Michael Conley is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-3503857.. (Pillsbury, William) (Entered: 07/31/2015)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: None
                                                                        MOTION for Joinder by Great American Assurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Michael Buckley, # 3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit(s) Exhibit C, # 6 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Buckley, Michael) (Entered: 07/31/2015)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                          STATEMENT OF FACTS re 105 MOTION for Summary Judgment Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 56 filed by Ace American Insurance Company, Pacific Employers Insurance Company.(Minkoff, Deborah) (Entered: 07/29/2015)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                            AFFIDAVIT in Support re 105 MOTION for Summary Judgment Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 56 Declaration of Deborah Minkoff filed by Ace American Insurance Company, Pacific Employers Insurance Company.(Minkoff, Deborah) (Entered: 07/29/2015)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                              BRIEF IN SUPPORT attaching exhibits A-R to Deborah Minkoff Declaration re 105 MOTION for Summary Judgment Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 56 filed by Ace American Insurance Company, Pacific Employers Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B, # 3 Exhibit(s) C, # 4 Exhibit(s) D, # 5 Exhibit(s) E, # 6 Exhibit(s) F, # 7 Exhibit(s) G, # 8 Exhibit(s) H, # 9 Exhibit(s) I, # 10 Exhibit(s) J, # 11 Exhibit(s) K, # 12 Exhibit(s) L, # 13 Exhibit(s) M, # 14 Exhibit(s) N, # 15 Exhibit(s) O, # 16 Exhibit(s) P, # 17 Exhibit(s) Q, # 18 Exhibit(s) R)(Minkoff, Deborah) (Entered: 07/29/2015)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                MOTION for Summary Judgment Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 56 by Ace American Insurance Company, Pacific Employers Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Nonconcurrence, # 2 Proposed Order)(Minkoff, Deborah) (Entered: 07/29/2015)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                  ORDER denying 97 Motion to Seal. If sealing is truly necessary, counsel must submit a request precisely specifying the language needed to be placed under seal, together with specific reasons ands supporting case law.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 7/2/15 (bs) (Entered: 07/02/2015)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                    ORDER granting 101 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 92 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Brief in Opposition due by 7/31/2015. Reply Brief due by 8/14/2015.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 7/2/15 (bs) (Entered: 07/02/2015)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                      BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re 101 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Brief to 92 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 93 Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment and Proposed Briefing Schedule filed filed by Gerling Konzern Allegemeine Versicherungs-AG. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Heskin, Shane) (Entered: 06/16/2015)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Brief to 92 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 93 Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment and Proposed Briefing Schedule filed by Sapa Extrusions, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Concurrence, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Pillsbury, William) (Entered: 06/15/2015)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                          EXHIBIT4 OF GERLING-KONZERN GENERAL INSURANCE CO. MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Attachments: # 1 Part1, # 2 Part2, # 3 Part3) (kc) (Entered: 06/04/2015)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                            STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MARTERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF GERLING-KONZERN GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP56. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 2, # 2 Exhibit(s) 3, # 3 Part2, # 4 Part3) (kc) (Entered: 06/04/2015)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                              DOCUMENT(S) PENDING SEALING DECISION Gerkubg-Konzern Allgemeine Versicherungs-AG Statement of Legal and Factual Justification for It's Motion to Seal Statement of Undisputed Material Facts Supporting It's Motion for Summary Judgment and Exhibits 2,3 and 4 thereto. (kc) (Entered: 06/04/2015)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                MOTION to Seal selected documents in connection with It's Motion for Summary Judgment by Gerling Konzern Allegemeine Versicherungs-AG. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(kc) (Entered: 06/04/2015)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                  WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE - Attorney Brendan D McQuiggan terminated on behalf of Gerling Konzern Allegemeine Versicherungs-AG. (Heskin, Shane) (Entered: 06/04/2015)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT in Support re 92 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Gerling Konzern Allegemeine Versicherungs-AG. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s), # 2 Exhibit(s), # 3 Exhibit(s), # 4 Exhibit(s), # 5 Exhibit(s), # 6 Exhibit(s), # 7 Exhibit(s), # 8 Exhibit(s), # 9 Exhibit(s), # 10 Exhibit(s), # 11 Exhibit(s), # 12 Exhibit(s), # 13 Exhibit(s), # 14 Exhibit(s))(Heskin, Shane) (Entered: 06/02/2015)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                      STATEMENT OF FACTS re 92 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 93 Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Gerling Konzern Allegemeine Versicherungs-AG.(Heskin, Shane) (Entered: 06/02/2015)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                        BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 92 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Gerling Konzern Allegemeine Versicherungs-AG.(Heskin, Shane) (Entered: 06/02/2015)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                          MOTION for Summary Judgment by Gerling Konzern Allegemeine Versicherungs-AG.(Heskin, Shane) (Entered: 06/02/2015)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 5/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                            SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Shane Heskin.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 5/18/15. (bs) (Entered: 05/18/2015)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 5/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                              SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Sarah Mitchell.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 5/18/15. (bs) (Entered: 05/18/2015)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Shane R Heskin on behalf of Gerling Konzern Allegemeine Versicherungs-AG Attorney Shane Heskin is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-3437471.. (Heskin, Shane) (Entered: 05/15/2015)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Thomas Vecchio on behalf of Arch Specialty Insurance Company Attorney Sarah C. Mitchell is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-3437397.. (Vecchio, Thomas) (Entered: 05/15/2015)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 86 Motion to Extend case management ddls. Fact Discovery due 8/28/15, Expert Discovery due by 12/31/2015. Expert rpts. due from pltf. 9/14/15, from defts. 10/14/15 & suppls. 11/14/15. Dispositive Motions due by 2/28/2016.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 1/29/15 (bs) (Entered: 01/29/2015)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to Motion to Extend Case Management Deadlines by Ace American Insurance Company, Pacific Employers Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service, # 2 Certificate of Concurrence, # 3 Proposed Order, # 4 Exhibit(s) A - Marvin Complaint, # 5 Exhibit(s) B - 2014-07-28 Judge Mannion Memorandum, # 6 Exhibit(s) C - 2014-12-02 Minkoff email to Pillsbury, # 7 Exhibit(s) D - 2014-12-11 Minkoff email to Piillsbury, # 8 Exhibit(s) E - 2014-12-11 Pillsbury email to Minkoff, # 9 Exhibit(s) F - 2014-12-30 Minkoff email to Pillsubury)(Minkoff, Deborah) (Entered: 01/29/2015)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        ORDER dismissing 83 Motion & Brief for Protective Order. (See order for details).Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 11/4/14 (bs) (Entered: 11/04/2014)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 83 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Unpublished Opinion(s))(Eads, Joel) (Entered: 10/31/2014)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            MOTION for Protective Order by Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA.(Eads, Joel) (Entered: 10/31/2014)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              ANSWER to 72 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Liberty Mutual Insurance Company by Sapa Extrusions, Inc.(f/k/a ALCOA Extrustions, Inc.).(Pillsbury, William) (Entered: 09/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania's ANSWER to 60 Amended Complaint, by Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania.(Eads, Joel) (Entered: 09/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  National Union's ANSWER to 60 Amended Complaint, by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA.(Eads, Joel) (Entered: 09/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 60 Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, Answer to Crossclaims and Jury Demand by Arch Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Vecchio, Thomas) (Entered: 09/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to 60 Amended Complaint, by Gerling Konzern Allegemeine Versicherungs-AG. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(McQuiggan, Brendan) (Entered: 09/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to 60 Amended Complaint, and Separate Defenses of Great American Assurance Company, Answer to Cross-Claims and Jury Demand by Great American Assurance Company.(Buckley, Michael) (Entered: 09/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 9/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          ORDER APPROVING 75 Stipulation filed by Pacific Employers Insurance Company, Ace American Insurance Company.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 9/18/14. (bs) (Entered: 09/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 9/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION Joint Stipulation as to Identification of Issuing Insurer for Policy HDO G20586023 by Ace American Insurance Company, Pacific Employers Insurance Company. (Minkoff, Deborah) (Entered: 09/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 9/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to 60 Amended Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses by Pacific Employers Insurance Company.(Minkoff, Deborah) (Entered: 09/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 9/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to 60 Amended Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses by Ace American Insurance Company.(Minkoff, Deborah) (Entered: 09/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 9/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to 60 Amended Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM and Affirmative Defenses against Sapa Extrusions, Inc. by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company.(Foster, William) (Entered: 09/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 9/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 68 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for Great American Assurance Company to answer amd. cmp. Answer due 9/19/2014. Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 9/4/14 (bs) (Entered: 09/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 9/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 69 Ace American Insurance Company & Pacific Employers Insurance Company's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Ace American Insurance Company & Pacific Employers Insurance Company answer due 9/19/2014. Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 9/4/14 (bs) (Entered: 09/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 9/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 60 Amended Complaint, Certificate of Service and Certificate of Concurrence by Ace American Insurance Company, Pacific Employers Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Minkoff, Deborah) (Entered: 09/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 60 Amended Complaint, by Great American Assurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Concurrence, # 3 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Buckley, Michael) (Entered: 09/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 66 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Arch Specialty Insurance Company answer due 9/19/2014. Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 8/29/14 (bs) (Entered: 08/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 60 Amended Complaint, by Arch Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Concurrence Certificate of Service, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Concurrence)(Vecchio, Thomas) (Entered: 08/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 62 deft. National Union Fire Ins. Co. of Pittsburgh's Motion to Extend Time to respond to amd. cmpl. Response due 9/19/14.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 8/29/14 (bs) (Entered: 08/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 63 deft. Gerling's Motion to Extend Time to respond to amd. cmp. Response due 9/19/14.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 8/29/14 (bs) (Entered: 08/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 8/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to to September 19, 2014to respond to Amended Complaint by Gerling Konzern Allegemeine Versicherungs-AG. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Concurrence)(McQuiggan, Brendan) (Entered: 08/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Concurrence, # 2 Proposed Order)(Eads, Joel) (Entered: 08/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 8/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Thomas Wester.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 8/15/14. (bs) (Entered: 08/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Specialty Insurance Company, Gerling Konzern Allegemeine Versicherungs-AG, Great American Assurance Company, Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Pacific Employers Insurance Company, filed by Sapa Extrusions, Inc..(Pillsbury, William) (Entered: 08/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Thomas Vecchio on behalf of Arch Specialty Insurance Company Attorney Thomas M. Wester is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-3191100.. (Vecchio, Thomas) (Entered: 08/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry)(1)The Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvanias motion, (Doc. 19), is DENIED;(2)National Unions motion is GRANTED IN PART insofar as the plaintiff has failed to plead sufficient damages to trigger the umbrella policies. In all other respects, National Unions motion is DENIED. Counts 3, 4, 5, 6, and 30 are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE;(3)Gerlings motion, (Doc. 42), is GRANTED. Counts 7, 8, 25, and 26 are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE;(4)The plaintiff is granted leave to amend its complaint by August 15, 2014.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 8/7/14. (bs) (Entered: 08/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) re 53 Memorandum (Order to follow as separate docket entry) Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 8/7/14. (bs) Modified on 8/7/2014 (bs). (Entered: 08/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 55 Motion to Amend/Correct.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 8/7/14 (bs) (Entered: 08/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 54 Order (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry), Terminate Motions,,,, 53 Memorandum (Order to follow as separate docket entry) by Gerling Konzern Allegemeine Versicherungs-AG. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Law, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Concurrence, # 4 Certificate of Service)(McQuiggan, Brendan) (Entered: 08/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 54 Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry),IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT:(1)The Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvanias motion, (Doc. 19), is DENIED;(2)National Unions motion is GRANTED IN PART insofar as the plaintiff has failed to plead sufficient damages to trigger the umbrella policies. In all other respects, National Unions motion is DENIED. Counts 3, 4, 5, 6, and 30 are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE;(3)Gerlings motion, (Doc. 42), is GRANTED. Counts 27, 28, and 29 are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE;(4)The plaintiff is granted leave to amend its complaint by August 15, 2014. 42 19 Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 7/28/14. (bs) (Entered: 07/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 53 Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry).Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 7/28/14. (bs) (Entered: 07/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER APPROVING 51 Stipulation filed by Ace American Insurance Company that Count Seventeen is dismissed.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 5/20/14. (bs) (Entered: 05/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION Joint Stipulation of Partial Voluntary Dismisal as to Count Seventeen by Ace American Insurance Company. (Minkoff, Deborah) (Entered: 05/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Gerling Konzern Allegemeine Versicherungs-AG identifying Corporate Parent Talanx AG, Other Affiliate HDI-Gerling Industrie Versicherung AG for Gerling Konzern Allegemeine Versicherungs-AG. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(McQuiggan, Brendan) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Brendan D. McQuiggan.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 5/13/14. (bs) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Brendan D McQuiggan on behalf of Gerling Konzern Allegemeine Versicherungs-AG Attorney Brendan McQuiggan is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-3098379.. (McQuiggan, Brendan) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY BRIEF re 42 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Gerling Konzern Allegemeine Versicherungs-AG.(Santelle, Patricia) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 6/30/2014. Fact Discovery due 2/28/15, Expert Discovery due by 7/31/2015. Joinder of Parties due by 6/30/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 9/30/2015.Expert reports will be due from the plaintiff on or before March 15, 2015; from the defendant on or before April 15, 2015; Supplementations, if any, by either party will be due on or before May 15, 2015.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 4/28/14. (bs) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re 42 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Sapa Extrusions, Inc..(Pillsbury, William) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Sapa Extrusions, Inc.. (Pillsbury, William) (Entered: 04/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 42 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Gerling Konzern Allegemeine Versicherungs-AG. (Attachments: # 1 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE)(Santelle, Patricia) (Entered: 04/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Gerling Konzern Allegemeine Versicherungs-AG. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Nonconcurrence)(Santelle, Patricia) (Entered: 04/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to William D. Deveau.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 4/7/14. (bs) (Entered: 04/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Jonathan P. McHenry.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 4/7/14. (bs) (Entered: 04/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Thomas Vecchio on behalf of Arch Specialty Insurance Company Attorney Jonathan P. McHenry is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-3061466., filed by on behalf of Arch Specialty Insurance Company.(Vecchio, Thomas) (Entered: 04/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Thomas Vecchio on behalf of Arch Specialty Insurance Company Attorney William D. Deveau is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-3061434., filed by on behalf of Arch Specialty Insurance Company.(Vecchio, Thomas) (Entered: 04/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Patricia Santelle.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 3/28/14. (bs) (Entered: 03/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Patricia B Santelle on behalf of Gerling Konzern Allegemeine Versicherungs-AG Attorney Patricia Santelle is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-3056761., filed by on behalf of Gerling Konzern Allegemeine Versicherungs-AG.(Santelle, Patricia) (Entered: 03/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Pacific Employers Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent ACE American Insurance Company, a Pennsylvania Corporation for Pacific Employers Insurance Company. (Minkoff, Deborah) (Entered: 03/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,,,, with Affirmative Defenses by Pacific Employers Insurance Company.(Minkoff, Deborah) (Entered: 03/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Ace American Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent INA Holdings Corporation, a Delaware Corporation for Ace American Insurance Company. (Minkoff, Deborah) (Entered: 03/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,,,, with Affirmative Defenses by Ace American Insurance Company.(Minkoff, Deborah) (Entered: 03/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 28 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Sapa Extrusions, Inc..(Pillsbury, William) (Entered: 03/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,,,, Separate Defenses of Great American Assurance Co., Answer to Cross-Claims, and Jury Demand by Great American Assurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affirmation of Service)(Buckley, Michael) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 4/28/2014 11:00 AM before Honorable Malachy E Mannion.This conference will be held by telephone but may be held in-person if counsel requests and has the concurrence of all other counsel. Where the case management plan requests dates, counsel should agree upon a specific month, day and year. (Please do not make entries such as 28 days after the close of discovery.) The completed Joint Case Management Plan must be e-filed with the court at least seven (7) business days prior to the case management conference. Parties must use the most recent Joint Case Management form from the Middle District web-site.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 3/12/14. (bs) (Entered: 03/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Liberty Mutual's ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM and Affirmative Defenses against Sapa Extrusions, Inc. by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Foster, William) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY BRIEF re 19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA.(Eads, Joel) (Entered: 03/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER gramtomg 25 Stipulation, filed by Great American Assurance Company. that deft. Great American Assurance Co. shall have until 3/14/14 to file an ans. to the complaint.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 3/3/14. (bs) (Entered: 03/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION re 1 Complaint,,,,,, by Great American Assurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Letter to The Honorable Malachy E. Mannion from Michael E. Buckley respectfully requesting that the enclosed Stipulation for an Extension of Time to March 14, 2014 to respond to plaintiff's complaint be approved. The Stipualtion has been signed by both parties.)(Buckley, Michael) (Entered: 02/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 13 Stipulation filed by Sapa Extrusions, Inc. that deft's Pacific Employers Ins. Co. and ACE American Ins. Co. may move, answer or otherwise respond to pltf's complaint on or before 3/20/14.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 1/31/14. (bs) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Buckley on behalf of Great American Assurance Company (Attachments: # 1 Letter to Clerk enclosing Notice of Appearance, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Buckley, Michael) (Entered: 02/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re 19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Sapa Extrusions, Inc..(Pillsbury, William) (Entered: 02/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Deborah Melamut Minkoff on behalf of Ace American Insurance Company, Pacific Employers Insurance Company. (ga) (Entered: 02/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA.(Eads, Joel) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Eads, Joel) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Joel Max Eads on behalf of Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA (Eads, Joel) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Corporate Disclosure Statement by Arch Specialty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Arch Capital Group Ltd., Other Affiliate Arch Insurance Company for Arch Specialty Insurance Company.. (Vecchio, Thomas) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,,,, Affirmative Defenses and Answer to Cross-Claims by Arch Specialty Insurance Company.(Vecchio, Thomas) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Approving 14 Letter stipulation that deft. shll have until 3/5/14 to answer.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 1/31/14. (bs) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter from William C. Foster, Esquire enclosing Joint Stipulation for Extension. (Foster, William) (Entered: 01/31/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION re 6 Waiver of Service Executed, 12 Waiver of Service Executed for Extension of Time to Move, Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Sapa Extrusions, Inc.. (Pillsbury, William) (Entered: 01/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Sapa Extrusions, Inc.. Pacific Employers Insurance Company waiver sent on 12/4/2013, answer due 2/3/2014. (Pillsbury, William) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Sapa Extrusions, Inc.. National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA waiver sent on 12/4/2013, answer due 2/3/2014. (Pillsbury, William) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Sapa Extrusions, Inc.. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company waiver sent on 12/4/2013, answer due 2/3/2014. (Pillsbury, William) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Sapa Extrusions, Inc.. Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania waiver sent on 12/4/2013, answer due 2/3/2014. (Pillsbury, William) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Sapa Extrusions, Inc.. Great American Assurance Company waiver sent on 12/4/2013, answer due 2/3/2014. (Pillsbury, William) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Sapa Extrusions, Inc.. Arch Specialty Insurance Company waiver sent on 12/4/2013, answer due 2/3/2014. (Pillsbury, William) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Sapa Extrusions, Inc.. Ace American Insurance Company waiver sent on 12/4/2013, answer due 2/3/2014. (Pillsbury, William) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 5 Filed: 12/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Sapa Extrusions, Inc. of Defendant American Guarantee & Liability Insurance Company Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) (Pillsbury, William) (Entered: 12/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sapa Extrusions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Sapa A.B., Corporate Parent Orkla Group for Sapa Extrusions, Inc... (Pillsbury, William) (Entered: 12/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 11/21/13. (bs) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: # 1 Summons Packet) (bg) (Entered: 11/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 2941580), filed by Sapa Extrusions, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit(s) A, # 3 Exhibit(s) B1, # 4 Exhibit(s) B2, # 5 Exhibit(s) B3, # 6 Exhibit(s) B4, # 7 Exhibit(s) B5, # 8 Exhibit(s) B6, # 9 Exhibit(s) B7, # 10 Exhibit(s) B8, # 11 Exhibit(s) C1, # 12 Exhibit(s) C2, # 13 Exhibit(s) C3, # 14 Exhibit(s) C4, # 15 Exhibit(s) C5, # 16 Exhibit(s) C6, # 17 Exhibit(s) C7, # 18 Exhibit(s) C8, # 19 Exhibit(s) C9, # 20 Exhibit(s) D, # 21 Exhibit(s) E1, # 22 Exhibit(s) E2, # 23 Exhibit(s) F1, # 24 Exhibit(s) F2, # 25 Exhibit(s) G1, # 26 Exhibit(s) G2, # 27 Exhibit(s) H, # 28 Exhibit(s) I, # 29 Exhibit(s) J1, # 30 Exhibit(s) J2, # 31 Exhibit(s) J3, # 32 Exhibit(s) J4, # 33 Exhibit(s) J5, # 34 Exhibit(s) J6, # 35 Exhibit(s) J7, # 36 Exhibit(s) J8, # 37 Exhibit(s) K1, # 38 Exhibit(s) K2, # 39 Exhibit(s) K3, # 40 Exhibit(s) L1, # 41 Exhibit(s) L2, # 42 Exhibit(s) L3, # 43 Exhibit(s) M1, # 44 Exhibit(s) M2, # 45 Exhibit(s) N, # 46 Exhibit(s) O, # 47 Exhibit(s) P, # 48 Exhibit(s) Q1, # 49 Exhibit(s) Q2, # 50 Exhibit(s) R, # 51 Exhibit(s) S, # 52 Exhibit(s) T, # 53 Exhibit(s) U, # 54 Exhibit(s) V, # 55 Exhibit(s) W, # 56 Exhibit(s) X1, # 57 Exhibit(s) X2, # 58 Exhibit(s) X3, # 59 Exhibit(s) Y1, # 60 Exhibit(s) Y2, # 61 Exhibit(s) Y3, # 62 Exhibit(s) Z1, # 63 Exhibit(s) Z2, # 64 Exhibit(s) Z3, # 65 Exhibit(s) AA1, # 66 Exhibit(s) AA2)(bg) (Entered: 11/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space Space

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 62 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?