Sensitech, Inc. v. Kvenvold et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-12142
District Judge William Young, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 15, 2017 at 1:33 AM EST (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Sensitech, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hiscock & Barclay, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John T. Gutkoski +1 617 274 2906 +1 617 722 6003 jgutkoski@hblaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pepper Hamilton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexandra C. Fennell +1 617 204 5158 fennella@pepperlaw.com
v.
No Logo Anthony Mark Kvenvold, Defendant
No Logo Finch Systems of Winona, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Insight Design, Inc., Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1338
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (3) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/9/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
Judge William G. Young : ORDER entered. ORDER DISMISSING CASE Pursuant to Local Rule 41.1 for want of prosecution(Smith, Bonnie) (Entered: 03/09/2006)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/26/2005, Entered: None
    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sensitech, Inc.. (Patch, Christine) (Entered: 10/27/2005)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/26/2005, Entered: None
      COMPLAINT against Anthony Mark Kvenvold, Finch Systems of Winona, Inc., Insight Design, Inc. Filing fee: $ 250, receipt number 67790, filed by Sensitech, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Patch, Christine) (Entered: 10/27/2005)
        Request RequestSpace LREF

        Statistics

        This case has been viewed 74 times.

        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
        Space
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
         
        PlainSite
        Sign Up
        Need Password Help?