Boston Scientific Co, et al v. Johnson & Johnson, I, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:02-cv-10249
District Judge Reginald C. Lindsay, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 27, 2017 at 4:03 PM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Boston Scientific Corporation Boston Scientific Corporation, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Boston Scientific Corp."

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William F Lee +1 617 526 6000 +1 617 526 5000 william.lee@wilmerhale.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dominic E Massa +1 617 526 6000 +1 617 526 5000 dominic.massa@wilmerhale.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William G. McElawin +1 202 663 6000 +1 202 663 6363 william.mcelwain@wilmerhale.com
No Logo Boston Scientific Scimed, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William F Lee +1 617 526 6000 +1 617 526 5000 william.lee@wilmerhale.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dominic E Massa +1 617 526 6000 +1 617 526 5000 dominic.massa@wilmerhale.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William G. McElawin +1 202 663 6000 +1 202 663 6363 william.mcelwain@wilmerhale.com
No Logo Schneider (europe) GmbH, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William F Lee +1 617 526 6000 +1 617 526 5000 william.lee@wilmerhale.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dominic E Massa +1 617 526 6000 +1 617 526 5000 dominic.massa@wilmerhale.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William G. McElawin +1 202 663 6000 +1 202 663 6363 william.mcelwain@wilmerhale.com
No Logo Scimed Life Systems, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William F Lee +1 617 526 6000 +1 617 526 5000 william.lee@wilmerhale.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dominic E Massa +1 617 526 6000 +1 617 526 5000 dominic.massa@wilmerhale.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William G. McElawin +1 202 663 6000 +1 202 663 6363 william.mcelwain@wilmerhale.com
v.
No Logo Cordis Corporation, Defendant
Johnson & Johnson, Inc. Johnson & Johnson, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Immunicon Corp
Unknown Role, Nevro Corp
Unknown Role, Inno-tech, Inc.
Unknown Role, Biopsys Medical, Inc.
Unknown Role, De Puy, Inc.
Unknown Role, Femrx, Inc.
Unknown Role, Heartport, Inc.
Unknown Role, Orapharma, Inc.
Unknown Role, Animas Corp
Unknown Role, Provention Bio, Inc.
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1338
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (3) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/25/2002, Entered: None
Notice of voluntary dismissal by Boston Scientific Co, Boston Scientific Sc, Scimed Life Systems, filed. (kf) (Entered: 06/26/2002)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/18/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
    Judge Reginald C. Lindsay. Order entered pursuant to Rule 4(m), Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 4.1(b): this action will be dismissed in twenty days unless proof of service is filed; case eligible for dismissal on 7/8/02. Copy sent to counsel on 6/19/02. (sat) (Entered: 06/19/2002)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/14/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
      Complaint filed. Case assigned to Judge: Lindsay. Receipt #: 37034 Amount:$ 150.00. Fee Status: paid (sat) (Entered: 02/15/2002)
        Request RequestSpace LREF

        Statistics

        This case has been viewed 89 times.

        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
        Space
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
         
        PlainSite
        Sign Up
        Need Password Help?