Omegaflex, Inc. v. Parker Hannifin
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 3:02-cv-30022
District Judge Michael A Ponsor, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 22, 2016 at 1:16 AM ST (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Omega Flex, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cantor Colburn LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William J. Cass +1 860 286 2929 +1 860 286 0115 wcass@cantorcolburn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven M. Coyle +1 860 286 2929 +1 860 286 0115 scoyle@cantorcolburn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles F O'Brien +1 860 286 2929 +1 860 286 0115 cobrien@cantorcolburn.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew C. Ryan +1 860 286 2929 +1 860 286 0115 ryan@cantorcolburn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael J. Rye +1 860 286 2929 +1 860 286 0115 mrye@cantorcolburn.com
No Logo Parker-Hannifin Corporation, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Connolly Bove Lodge & Hutz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rudolf E. Hutz +1 302 658 9141 +1 302 658 5614 rhutz@cblh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Crevier & Ryan LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David B. Crevier +1 413 787 2400 +1 413 781 8235 dcrevier@crevierandryan.com

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce E. Falby +1 617 406 6020 +1 617 406 6100 bruce.falby@dlapiper.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kaley, Scott

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Harold Pezzner, PHV +1 302 658 9141 +1 302 658 5614 hpezzner@cblh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/05/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Luke L. Dauchot +1 213 680 8348 +1 312 862 2200 luke.dauchot@kirkland.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Thompson Hine, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/10/2003, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED KENNETH G. COLE
TERMINATED: 07/10/2003, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey C. Metzcar +1 937 443 6841 +1 937 443 6805 jeff.metzcar@thompsonhine.com
v.
No Logo Parker-Hannifin Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Connolly Bove Lodge & Hutz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/12/2007, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED BRIAN J. HAIRSTON
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rudolf E. Hutz +1 302 658 9141 +1 302 658 5614 rhutz@cblh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Crevier & Ryan LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David B. Crevier +1 413 787 2400 +1 413 781 8235 dcrevier@crevierandryan.com

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce E. Falby +1 617 406 6020 +1 617 406 6100 bruce.falby@dlapiper.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kaley, Scott

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Harold Pezzner, PHV +1 302 658 9141 +1 302 658 5614 hpezzner@cblh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/05/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Luke L. Dauchot +1 213 680 8348 +1 312 862 2200 luke.dauchot@kirkland.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Thompson Hine, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/10/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED KENNETH G. COLE
TERMINATED: 07/10/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey C. Metzcar +1 937 443 6841 +1 937 443 6805 jeff.metzcar@thompsonhine.com
No Logo Omega Flex, Inc., Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cantor Colburn LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William J. Cass +1 860 286 2929 +1 860 286 0115 wcass@cantorcolburn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven M. Coyle +1 860 286 2929 +1 860 286 0115 scoyle@cantorcolburn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles F O'Brien +1 860 286 2929 +1 860 286 0115 cobrien@cantorcolburn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael J. Rye +1 860 286 2929 +1 860 286 0115 mrye@cantorcolburn.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 145
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (304) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 8/8/2014, Entered: None
CLERK'S NOTICE: Sealed documents (Exhibits 1, 3, 9, and 10 to #162) returned to Plaintiff's counsel (representative for Steven Coyle) via mail on 8/8/14 per counsel's request. (Cherepon, Hailey) (Entered: 08/08/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: None
    Letter/request (non-motion) from Rudolf E. Hutz, Esq. - Counsel for Parker Hannifin Corporation authorizing Steven M. Coyle, Esq., counsel for OmegaFlex, Inc., to receive any and all documents filed under seal which are referenced in an Order from the Court - Docket No. 302. (Coyle, Steven) (Entered: 07/12/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
      Judge Michael A. Ponsor: ORDER pursuant to Local Rule 7.2, re impounded documents in the Court's custody.(Lizotte, James) (Entered: 07/08/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 2/3/2009, Entered: None
        STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Omegaflex, Inc., Parker Hannifin Corporation. (Coyle, Steven) (Entered: 02/03/2009)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: None
          DECLARATION re 299 Sur-Reply to Motion For Judgment As A Matter Of Law (Supplemental) by Omegaflex, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Coyle, Steven) (Entered: 08/18/2008)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: None
            SUR-REPLY to Motion re 288 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law of Invalidity for Obviousness of OmegaFlex, Inc.'s Patents in Suit (Renewed) filed by Omegaflex, Inc.. (Coyle, Steven) (Entered: 08/18/2008)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: None
              DECLARATION re 297 Reply to Response to Motion by Parker Hannifin Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit N, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit O, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit P, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit Q)(Pezzner, Harold) (Entered: 08/11/2008)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: None
                REPLY to Response to 288 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law of Invalidity for Obviousness of OmegaFlex, Inc.'s Patents in Suit (Renewed) filed by Parker Hannifin Corporation. (Pezzner, Harold) (Entered: 08/11/2008)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 8/7/2008, Entered: None
                  Consent MOTION for Bill of Costs (Stipulated) by Omegaflex, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Ryan, Andrew) (Entered: 08/07/2008)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 8/6/2008, Entered: None
                    Joint MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief by Defendant, Parker-Hannifin Corporation and Sur-Reply Brief by Plaintiff, OmegaFlex, Inc. by Omegaflex, Inc., Parker Hannifin Corporation.(Pezzner, Harold) (Entered: 08/06/2008)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 8/1/2008, Entered: None
                      DECLARATION re 293 Opposition to Motion For Judgment As A Matter Of Law by Omegaflex, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X)(Coyle, Steven) (Entered: 08/01/2008)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 8/1/2008, Entered: None
                        Opposition re 288 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law of Invalidity for Obviousness of OmegaFlex, Inc.'s Patents in Suit (Renewed) filed by Omegaflex, Inc.. (Coyle, Steven) (Entered: 08/01/2008)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: None
                          Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Opposition to Parker Hannifin's Motion for JMOL by Omegaflex, Inc..(Ryan, Andrew) (Entered: 07/31/2008)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: None
                            Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 8/1/08 to Extend Opposition Brief Deadline by Omegaflex, Inc..(Coyle, Steven) (Entered: 07/21/2008)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: None
                              DECLARATION re 289 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 288 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law of Invalidity for Obviousness of OmegaFlex, Inc.'s Patents in Suit (Renewed) of Hal Pezzner by Parker Hannifin Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M)(Pezzner, Harold) (Entered: 07/10/2008)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: None
                                MEMORANDUM in Support re 288 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law of Invalidity for Obviousness of OmegaFlex, Inc.'s Patents in Suit (Renewed) filed by Parker Hannifin Corporation. (Pezzner, Harold) (Entered: 07/10/2008)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: None
                                  MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law of Invalidity for Obviousness of OmegaFlex, Inc.'s Patents in Suit (Renewed) by Parker Hannifin Corporation.(Pezzner, Harold) (Entered: 07/10/2008)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 6/26/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    Judge Michael A Ponsor: ORDER entered. JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff OmegaFlex, Inc. against Defendant Parker Hannifin Corp.(Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 06/26/2008)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 6/26/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      Judge Michael A Ponsor: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER REGARDING JUDGMENT. See the attached memo & order for details. cc/cl(Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 06/26/2008)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 6/24/2008, Entered: None
                                        Letter/request (non-motion) from PARKER-HANNIFIN'S REPLY TO OMEGAFLEX'S MEMORANDUM IN RESPONSE TO PARKER-HANNIFIN'S PROPOSED JUDGMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Amended Proposed Judgment)(Pezzner, Harold) (Entered: 06/24/2008)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 6/23/2008, Entered: None
                                          Letter/request (non-motion) from OmegaFlex MEMORANDUM IN RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT PARKER HANNIFIN CORPORATIONS PROPOSED FINAL JUDGMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Ryan, Andrew) (Entered: 06/23/2008)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 6/23/2008, Entered: None
                                            Letter/request (non-motion) from OmegaFlex Amended Proposed Judgment in a Civil Case. (Ryan, Andrew) (Entered: 06/23/2008)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 6/20/2008, Entered: None
                                              Letter/request (non-motion) from Defendant Parker-Hannifin Corporation regarding Submission of Proposed Judgment. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Judgment)(Pezzner, Harold) (Entered: 06/20/2008)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 6/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                Letter/request (non-motion) from Hal Pezzner regarding the Proposed Judgment in a Civil Case. (Pezzner, Harold) (Entered: 06/09/2008)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 6/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                  Letter/request (non-motion) from Plaintiff OmegaFlex, Inc. Proposed Judgment. (Ryan, Andrew) (Entered: 06/06/2008)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 5/23/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    Judge Michael A Ponsor: ORDER PROHIBITING POST-VERDICT CONTACT WITH JURORS entered; cc/cl. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 05/23/2008)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 5/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, a copy of which is attached to this entry.. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 05/23/2008)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 5/23/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        Transcript of Jury Trial Day Ten (and verdict) held on May 23, 2008, before Judge Ponsor. Court Reporter: Alice Moran at 413/731-0086. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Redaction Request due 6/10/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/20/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/18/2008. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 05/23/2008)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 5/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                          JURY VERDICT in favor of plaintiff - Omegaflex against defendant - ParkerHannifin (French, Elizabeth) (Entered: 05/23/2008)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 5/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, a copy of which is attached to this entry.. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 05/21/2008)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 5/21/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              Transcript of Jury Trial Day Six held on May 19, 2008, before Judge Ponsor. Court Reporter: Alice Moran at 413/731-0086. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Redaction Request due 6/9/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/18/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/18/2008. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 05/21/2008)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, a copy of which is attached to this entry.. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 05/19/2008)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  Transcript of Motion Hearing held on May 12, 2008, before Judge Ponsor. Court Reporter: Alice Moran at 413/731-0086. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Redaction Request due 6/6/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/16/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/14/2008. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 05/19/2008)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                    NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, a copy of which is attached to this entry.. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 05/19/2008)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      Transcript of Jury Trial Day Five held on May 16, 2008, before Judge Ponsor. Court Reporter: Alice Moran at 413/731-0086. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Redaction Request due 6/6/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/16/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/14/2008. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 05/19/2008)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        Transcript of Jury Trial Day Four (11:10-1:00) held on May 15, 2008, before Judge Ponsor. Court Reporter: Sarah L. Mubarek at sarahmubarek@comcast.net. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Redaction Request due 6/6/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/16/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/14/2008. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 05/19/2008)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          Transcript of Jury Trial Day Three (11:15-1:00) held on May 14, 2008, before Judge Ponsor. Court Reporter: Sarah L. Mubarek at sarahmubarek@comcast.net. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Redaction Request due 6/6/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/16/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/14/2008. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 05/19/2008)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            Transcript of Jury Trial Day Two (PM Session) held on May 13, 2008, before Judge Ponsor. Court Reporter: Rebekah J. Johnson at sarahmubarek@comcast.net. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Redaction Request due 6/6/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/16/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/14/2008. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 05/19/2008)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              Transcript of Jury Trial Day Two (11:25-1:00) held on May 13, 2008, before Judge Ponsor. Court Reporter: Sarah L. Mubarek at sarahmubarek@comcast.net. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Redaction Request due 6/6/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/16/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/14/2008. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 05/19/2008)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 5/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                STIPULATION PARTIES JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING PATENT CLAIMS AT ISSUE by Omegaflex, Inc.. (Ryan, Andrew) (Entered: 05/17/2008)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                  Plft's Proposed Special Jury Verdict Form by Omegaflex, Inc. filed. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 05/16/2008)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                    NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, a copy of which is attached to this entry.. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 05/16/2008)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      Transcript of Jury Trial Day Four (PM Session) held on May 15, 2008, before Judge Ponsor. Court Reporter: Alice Moran at 413/731-0086. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Redaction Request due 6/3/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/13/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/11/2008. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 05/16/2008)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        Transcript of Jury Trial Day Four (AM Session) held on May 15, 2008, before Judge Ponsor. Court Reporter: Alice Moran at 413/731-0086. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Redaction Request due 6/3/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/13/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/11/2008. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 05/16/2008)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 5/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                          Supplemental Proposed Jury Instructions by Omegaflex, Inc.. (Ryan, Andrew) (Entered: 05/15/2008)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 5/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                            NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, a copy of which is attached to this entry.. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 05/15/2008)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 5/15/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              Transcript of Jury Trial Day (Afternoon Session) held on May 14, 2008, before Judge Ponsor. Court Reporter: Alice Moran at 413/731-0086. The transcript may be viewed at: the court public terminal, purchased through the Court Reporter, or through PACER after it is released. Redaction Request due 6/2/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/12/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/11/2008. (Scalfani, Deborah) Modified on 5/16/2008 (Scalfani, Deborah). (Entered: 05/15/2008)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 5/15/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                Transcript of Jury Trial Day Three (Morning Session) held on May 14, 2008, before Judge Ponsor. Court Reporter: Alice Moran at 413/731-0086. The transcript may be viewed at: the court public terminal, purchased through the Court Reporter, or through PACER after it is released. Redaction Request due 6/2/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/12/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/11/2008. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 05/15/2008)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 5/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                  NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, a copy of which is attached to this entry.. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 05/14/2008)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 5/14/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    Transcript of Jury Trial Day Two held on May 13, 2008, before Judge Ponsor. Court Reporter: Alice Moran at 413/731-0086. The transcript may be viewed at: the court public terminal, purchased through the Court Reporter, or through PACER after it is released. Redaction Request due 6/2/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/11/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/11/2008. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 05/14/2008)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 5/14/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      Transcript of Jury Trial Day One held on May 12, 2008, before Judge Ponsor. Court Reporter: Alice Moran at 413/731-0086. The transcript may be viewed at: the court public terminal, purchased through the Court Reporter, or through PACER after it is released. Redaction Request due 6/2/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/11/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/11/2008. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 05/14/2008)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 5/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Proposed Jury Verdict by Parker Hannifin Corporation. (Pezzner, Harold) (Entered: 05/08/2008)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 5/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Proposed Jury Verdict by Omegaflex, Inc.. (Ryan, Andrew) (Entered: 05/08/2008)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 5/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 250 MOTION for Clarification re 246 Order on Motion in Limine,, Request for Clarification Regarding Permitted Trial Evidence on Development of Its Accused Fitting, FastMate 2 filed by Omegaflex, Inc.. (Ryan, Andrew) (Entered: 05/07/2008)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 5/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                              MOTION for Clarification re 246 Order on Motion in Limine,, Request for Clarification Regarding Permitted Trial Evidence on Development of Its Accused Fitting, FastMate 2 by Parker Hannifin Corporation.(Pezzner, Harold) (Entered: 05/06/2008)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                OmegaFlex's Letter/request (non-motion) designation of deposition testimony for use at trial. (Ryan, Andrew) (Entered: 05/05/2008)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Joint Proposed Voir Dire by all parties. (Ryan, Andrew) (Entered: 05/05/2008)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Joint Proposed Jury Instructions by all parties. (Ryan, Andrew) (Entered: 05/05/2008)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 5/2/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      Judge Michael A Ponsor: ORDER entered granting 230 Motion in Limine, granting 232 Motion in Limine and granting 234 Motion in Limine. See the attached memo & order for complete details. cc/cl (Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 05/02/2008)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 5/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Letter/request (non-motion) from Parker-Hannifin Corporation's Counter-Designation of Deposition Testimony. (Pezzner, Harold) (Entered: 05/02/2008)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          DECLARATION re 241 Reply to Response to Motion in Limine No. 1 by Omegaflex, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Coyle, Steven) (Entered: 04/25/2008)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to 234 MOTION in Limine No. 3: TO PREVENT THE DEFENDANT, PARKER HANNIFIN CORPORATION, FROM ARGUING TO THE JURY THAT THE LEGAL STANDARD FOR OBVIOUSNESS HAS CHANGED AS A RESULT OF THE KSR DECISION filed by Omegaflex, Inc.. (Coyle, Steven) (Entered: 04/25/2008)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to 232 MOTION in Limine No. 2: TO EXCLUDE ANY REFERENCE AT TRIAL TO THE APPELLATE filed by Omegaflex, Inc.. (Coyle, Steven) (Entered: 04/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to 230 MOTION in Limine No. 1: TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE AND TESTIMONY CONCERNING PARKERS DEVELOPMENT OF THE INFRINGING FASTMATE FITTING filed by Omegaflex, Inc.. (Coyle, Steven) (Entered: 04/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Andrew C. Ryan in Support of 230 Motion in Limine No. 1 by Omegaflex, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Coyle, Steven) Modified on 4/23/2008 (Finn, Mary). (Entered: 04/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Reply Briefs in Support of Motions in Limine by Omegaflex, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Coyle, Steven) (Entered: 04/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 4/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION re 236 Opposition to Motion, 237 Opposition to Motion, 235 Opposition to Motion of Harold Pezzner by Parker Hannifin Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11)(Pezzner, Harold) (Entered: 04/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 4/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Opposition re 234 MOTION in Limine No. 3: TO PREVENT THE DEFENDANT, PARKER HANNIFIN CORPORATION, FROM ARGUING TO THE JURY THAT THE LEGAL STANDARD FOR OBVIOUSNESS HAS CHANGED AS A RESULT OF THE KSR DECISION filed by Parker Hannifin Corporation. (Pezzner, Harold) (Entered: 04/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 4/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Opposition re 232 MOTION in Limine No. 2: TO EXCLUDE ANY REFERENCE AT TRIAL TO THE APPELLATE Decision of June 18, 2007, or to Any Statements Made in the Parties' Appellate Briefs filed by Parker Hannifin Corporation. (Pezzner, Harold) (Entered: 04/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 4/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Opposition re 230 MOTION in Limine No. 1: TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE AND TESTIMONY CONCERNING PARKERS DEVELOPMENT OF THE INFRINGING FASTMATE FITTING filed by Parker Hannifin Corporation. (Pezzner, Harold) (Entered: 04/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              MOTION in Limine No. 3: TO PREVENT THE DEFENDANT, PARKER HANNIFIN CORPORATION, FROM ARGUING TO THE JURY THAT THE LEGAL STANDARD FOR OBVIOUSNESS HAS CHANGED AS A RESULT OF THE KSR DECISION by Omegaflex, Inc..(Ryan, Andrew) (Entered: 04/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT in Support of OmegaFlex's Motion in Limine No. 2: TO EXCLUDE ANY REFERENCE AT TRIAL TO THE APPELLATE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Ryan, Andrew) (Entered: 04/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  MOTION in Limine No. 2: TO EXCLUDE ANY REFERENCE AT TRIAL TO THE APPELLATE by Omegaflex, Inc..(Ryan, Andrew) (Entered: 04/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT in Support of OmegaFlex's Motion in Limine No. 1: TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE AND TESTIMONY CONCERNING PARKERS DEVELOPMENT OF THE INFRINGING FASTMATE FITTING. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit)(Ryan, Andrew) (Entered: 04/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION in Limine No. 1: TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE AND TESTIMONY CONCERNING PARKERS DEVELOPMENT OF THE INFRINGING FASTMATE FITTING by Omegaflex, Inc..(Ryan, Andrew) (Entered: 04/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 3/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Bruce E. Falby (Falby, Bruce) (Entered: 03/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 3/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Luke L. Dauchot (Dauchot, Luke) (Entered: 03/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 3/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Parker Hannifin Corporation (Pezzner, Harold) (Entered: 03/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 2/28/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              Judge Michael A Ponsor: ORDER entered. FURTHER SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 5/12/2008 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Michael A Ponsor. Cl. to appear at 9:00 A.M. for conf. prior to commencement of jury selection. Any Motions in limine due by 4/4/2008 and opposed by 4/18/2008. Proposed voir dire questions and proposed jury instructions due by 5/05/2008. Due to the Court's congested trial docket, Cl. should stay in touch with the courtroom deputy clerk to confirm the actual trial date; cc/cl.(Finn, Mary) (Entered: 02/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to Motion re 223 MOTION to Modify Trial Date filed by Omegaflex, Inc.. (Coyle, Steven) (Entered: 02/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by Omegaflex, Inc., Parker Hannifin Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Part 2 of Pretrial Memorandum, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Coyle, Steven) (Entered: 02/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Modify Trial Date by Parker Hannifin Corporation.(Pezzner, Harold) (Entered: 02/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 1/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Change of Address or Firm Name by Andrew C Ryan (Ryan, Andrew) (Entered: 01/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 1/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Change of Address or Firm Name by William J. Cass (Cass, William) (Entered: 01/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 1/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Change of Address or Firm Name by Steven Michael Coyle (Coyle, Steven) (Entered: 01/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            Judge Michael A Ponsor : ORDER entered. PROCEDURAL ORDER re pretrial/trial. cc/cl(Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 10/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              Judge Michael A Ponsor : ORDER entered. SCHEDULING ORDER: As follows; Dft's Supplemental expert report due 11/9/07, Ptf's Supplemental expert report due 12/14/07, Supplemental expert depo by 1/25/08,A Final Pretrial Conference is set for 2/11/2008 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Michael A Ponsor.,Trial is set for 4/14/2008 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Michael A Ponsor. and Proposed voir dire questions,jury instructions and motions in limine due 3/31/07. See the attached scheduling order for complete details. cc/cl(Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 10/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Proposed JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference Parties Joint Proposed Supplemental Expert Discovery and Pretrial Schedule. (Coyle, Steven) (Entered: 09/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  Assented to MOTION to Continue Status Conference to 10/04/2007 by Omegaflex, Inc..(Coyle, Steven) (Entered: 09/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    EXCERPT TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial held on April 23, 2007 before Judge Ponsor. Court Reporter: Alice Moran. The original transcripts are maintained by the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter at 413/731-0086 or the Clerk's Office. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 07/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 7/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION for Order to set a status conference by Omegaflex, Inc..(Ryan, Andrew) (Entered: 07/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        Non-precedential OPINION of USCA for Federal Circuit. See attached Opinion for details. (Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 07/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 6/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          USCA for the Federal Circuit's Opinion and Judgment as to 143 Notice of Appeal, filed by Parker Hannifin Corporation. The District Court's grants of S/J are REVERSED, its grant of a permanent injunction is VACATED, and the case is REMANDED. (Document dated 6/18/2007) (Finn, Mary) Modified on 6/27/2007 (Finn, Mary). (Entered: 06/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 5/31/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Hearing Proceedings held on April 16, 2007 before Judge Michael A. Ponsor filed. Court Reporter: Monica L. Cameron, Philbins & Associates, )413) 733-4078. Digital Recording: No. The original transcripts are maintained in the case file in the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter or the Clerk's Office. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 05/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 5/30/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              Judge Michael A Ponsor : ORDER entered. JUDGMENT in favor of plaintiff against defendant in the amount of $1,127,447.70 which includes damages of $973,360.00 and pre-judgment interest of $154,087.70. Post judgment interest rate is 4.96%.(Stuckenbruck, John) (Entered: 05/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Hearing Proceedings held on March 6, 2007 before Judge Michael A. Ponsor. Court Reporter: Alice Moran. The original transcripts are maintained in the case file in the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter at (413) 731-0086 or the Clerk's Office. (Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 05/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter/request (non-motion) from Parties' Joint Proposed Final Judgment. (Ryan, Andrew) (Entered: 05/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION REGARDING PREJUDGMENT INTEREST by Omegaflex, Inc.. (Ryan, Andrew) (Entered: 05/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of TRIAL Proceedings held on May 3, 2007 before Judge Michael A. Ponsor. Court Reporter: Alice Moran. The original transcripts are maintained in the case file in the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter or at (413) 731-0086 the Clerk's Office. (Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 05/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 5/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        JURY VERDICT in favor of plaintiff against defendant in amount of $973,360.00. (Stuckenbruck, John) (Entered: 05/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 5/3/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Judge Michael A Ponsor : ORDER entered. ORDER PROHIBITING POST-VERDICT CONTACT WITH JURORS. See the attached order for complete details. cc/cl (Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 05/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 5/3/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Charging Conference Proceedings held on May 2, 2007 before Judge Michael A. Ponsor. Court Reporter: Alice Moran. The original transcripts are maintained in the case file in the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter at (413) 731-0086 or the Clerk's Office. (Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 05/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 5/2/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial Proceedings held on May 1, 2007 at 11:02 A.M. before Judge Michael A. Ponsor filed. Court Reporter: Sarah L. Mubarek, Philbins & Associates, (413) 733-4078. Digital Recording: No. The original transcripts are maintained in the case file in the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter or the Clerk's Office. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 05/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 5/2/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of TRIAL Proceedings held on April 30, 2007 before Judge Michael A. Ponsor. Court Reporter: Alice Moran. The original transcripts are maintained in the case file in the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter at (413) 731-0086 or the Clerk's Office. (Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 05/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 5/2/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of TRIAL Proceedings held on May 1, 2007 before Judge Michael A. Ponsor. Court Reporter: Alice Moran. The original transcripts are maintained in the case file in the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter at (413) 731-0086 or the Clerk's Office. (Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 05/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 5/1/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of TRIAL Proceedings held on April 30, 2007 before Judge Michael A. Ponsor. Court Reporter: Alice Moran. The original transcripts are maintained in the case file in the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter at (413) 731-0086 or the Clerk's Office. (Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 05/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 5/1/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial Proceedings held on April 30, 2007 at 11:12 A.M. before Judge Michael A. Ponsor filed. Court Reporter: Sarah L. Mubarek, Philbins & Associates, 733-4078. Digital Recording: No. The original transcripts are maintained in the case file in the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter or the Clerk's Office. (Finn, Mary) Modified on 5/1/2007 to add Court reporting firm and phone number. (Finn, Mary). (Entered: 05/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 4/30/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of trial held on 4/27/07 before Judge Ponsor. Court Reporter: Sarah Mubarek, 413-733-4078. The original transcripts are maintained in the case file in the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter or the Clerk's Office. (Stuckenbruck, John) (Entered: 04/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 4/30/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of TRIAL Proceedings held on April 27, 2007 before Judge Michael A. Ponsor. Court Reporter: Alice Moran. The original transcripts are maintained in the case file in the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter or the Clerk's Office. (Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 04/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 4/29/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter/request (non-motion) from PARTIES' FIRST REVISED JOINT PRETRIAL STIPULATIONS. (Ryan, Andrew) (Entered: 04/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial Proceedings held on April 26, 2007 at 11:00 A.M. before Judge Michael A. Ponsor filed. Court Reporter: Sarah L. Mubarek, Philbins & Associates, 733-4078. Digital Recording: No. The original transcripts are maintained in the case file in the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter or the Clerk's Office. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 04/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of TRIAL Proceedings held on April 26, 2007 before Judge Michael A. Ponsor. Court Reporter: Alice Moran. The original transcripts are maintained in the case file in the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter at (413) 731-0086 or the Clerk's Office. (Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 04/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 4/26/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of TRIAL Proceedings held on April 25, 2007 before Judge Michael A. Ponsor. Court Reporter: Sarah L. Mubarek. The original transcripts are maintained in the case file in the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter or the Clerk's Office. (Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 04/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 4/25/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of TRIAL Proceedings held on April 25, 2007 before Judge Michael A. Ponsor. Court Reporter: Alice Moran. The original transcripts are maintained in the case file in the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter at (413) 731-0086 or the Clerk's Office. (Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 04/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 4/25/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial Proceedings held on April 24, 2007 at 11:04 A.M. before Judge Michael A. Ponsor. Court Reporter: Sarah L. Mubarek, Philbins & Associates, 733-4078. Digital Recording: No. The original transcripts are maintained in the case file in the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter or the Clerk's Office. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 04/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 4/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter/request (non-motion) from Parties' Joint Pretrial Stipulations Regarding Willfulness Issues. (Ryan, Andrew) (Entered: 04/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 4/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter/request (non-motion) from Parties' Joint Pretrial Stipulations. (Ryan, Andrew) (Entered: 04/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 4/24/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial Proceedings held on April 24, 2007 before Judge Michael A. Ponsor filed. Court Reporter: Alice Moran, (413) 731-0086. Digital Recording: No. The original transcripts are maintained in the case file in the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter or the Clerk's Office. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 04/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 4/24/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of TRIAL Proceedings held on April 23, 2007 before Judge Michael A. Ponsor. Court Reporter: Alice Moran. The original transcripts are maintained in the case file in the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter at (413) 731-0086 or the Clerk's Office. (Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 04/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 4/23/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter/request (non-motion) from Defendant, Parker-Hannifin Corporation's Counter-Designation of Deposition Testimony. (Pezzner, Harold) (Entered: 04/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 4/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint Proposed Jury Instructions by Omegaflex, Inc.. (Ryan, Andrew) (Entered: 04/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter/request (non-motion) from OmegaFlex Inc.'s Supplemental Designation of Deposition Testimony of John Molnar, Esq.. (Ryan, Andrew) (Entered: 04/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Parker Hannifin Corporation, Parker Hannifin Corporation to 167 Trial Brief, 165 Pretrial Memorandum. (Pezzner, Harold) (Entered: 04/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Judge Michael A Ponsor : ORDER entered. SCHEDULING FOR TRIAL: Jury Trial begin 4/23/2007 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Michael A Ponsor. See the attached schedule for complete details. cc/cl(Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 04/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 4/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Mark Albino by Omegaflex, Inc.. (Ryan, Andrew) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/16/2007 (Finn, Mary). (Entered: 04/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 4/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION (Supplemental) of Andrew C. Ryan by Omegaflex, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Ryan, Andrew) (Entered: 04/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 4/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re 161 MOTION in Limine and supporting Memorandum of Reasons to Preclude Parker Hannifin from Presenting Evidence at Trial Concerning the Costs of a Non-infringing Substitute Product and to Strike Corresponding Portions of Supplemental Expert Report filed by Omegaflex, Inc.. (Ryan, Andrew) (Entered: 04/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 4/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief re Motion In Limine to Exclude Testimony and Strike Second Supplemental Expert Report by Omegaflex, Inc..(Ryan, Andrew) (Entered: 04/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 4/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter/request (non-motion) from OmegaFlex Inc.'s Counter-Designations of Deposition Testimony. (Ryan, Andrew) (Entered: 04/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 4/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter/request (non-motion) from Parker-Hannifin Corporation's Counter-Designation of Deposition Testimony. (Pezzner, Harold) (Entered: 04/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 4/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint Proposed Voir Dire by Omegaflex, Inc., Parker Hannifin Corporation, Parker Hannifin Corporation, Omegaflex, Inc.. (Coyle, Steven) (Entered: 04/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 4/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Opposition re 161 MOTION in Limine and supporting Memorandum of Reasons to Preclude Parker Hannifin from Presenting Evidence at Trial Concerning the Costs of a Non-infringing Substitute Product and to Strike Corresponding Portions of Supplemental Expert Report filed by Parker Hannifin Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5)(Pezzner, Harold) (Entered: 04/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 4/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proposed Jury Instructions by Parker Hannifin Corporation. (Pezzner, Harold) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/10/2007 (Finn, Mary). (Entered: 04/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 4/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter/request (non-motion) from Plaintiff OmegaFlex's designation of deposition excerpts. (Ryan, Andrew) (Entered: 04/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 4/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint Proposed Jury Verdict by Omegaflex, Inc.. (Ryan, Andrew) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/10/2007 (Finn, Mary). (Entered: 04/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 4/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proposed Voir Dire by Omegaflex, Inc.. (Ryan, Andrew) (Entered: 04/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 4/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proposed Jury Instructions by Omegaflex, Inc.. (Ryan, Andrew) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/10/2007 (Finn, Mary). (Entered: 04/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 4/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRIAL BRIEF RE Issues of Willfull Infringement and Enhanced Damages by Omegaflex, Inc.. (Ryan, Andrew) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/10/2007 (Finn, Mary). (Entered: 04/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 4/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter/request (non-motion) from Defendant Parker-Hannifin Corporation's Designation of Deposition Excerpts. (Pezzner, Harold) (Entered: 04/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 4/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by Parker Hannifin Corporation. (Pezzner, Harold) (Entered: 04/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 3/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Omegaflex, Inc. of Confidential Exhibits to Declaration of Andrew C. Ryan. (Ryan, Andrew) (Entered: 03/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 3/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Seal Document Exhibit Nos. 1, 3, 9 and 10 to the Declaration of Andrew C. Ryan by Omegaflex, Inc..(Ryan, Andrew) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/2/2007 (Finn, Mary). (Entered: 03/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 3/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Andrew C. Ryan by Omegaflex, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Exhibit # 3 Exhibit # 4 Exhibit (Exh. 4 - part 1)# 5 Exhibit (Exh. 4 - part 2)# 6 Exhibit (Exh. 5 - part 1)# 7 Exhibit (Exh. 5 - part 2)# 8 Exhibit # 9 Exhibit # 10 Exhibit (Exh. 8 - part 1)# 11 Exhibit (Exh. 8 - part 2)# 12 Exhibit # 13 Exhibit)(Ryan, Andrew) (Entered: 03/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 3/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION in Limine and supporting Memorandum of Reasons to Preclude Parker Hannifin from Presenting Evidence at Trial Concerning the Costs of a Non-infringing Substitute Product and to Strike Corresponding Portions of Supplemental Expert Report by Omegaflex, Inc..(Ryan, Andrew) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/2/2007 (Finn, Mary). (Entered: 03/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 3/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by Omegaflex, Inc., Parker Hannifin Corporation, Parker Hannifin Corporation, Omegaflex, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Coyle, Steven) (Entered: 03/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 3/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Brian J. Hairston filed. Attorney Brian J. Hairston terminated as counsel for the Deft. (Finn, Mary) Modified on 3/12/2007 (Finn, Mary). (Entered: 03/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 3/8/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Judge Michael A Ponsor : ORDER entered. FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER: As follows; All additional Document will be exchanged by 3/20/07, Proposed voir dire questions, jury instructions and trial memoranda due 4/9/07, and Jury Trial set for 4/16/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Michael A Ponsor. See the attached pretrial order for complete details. cc/cl(Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 03/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 3/5/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Judge Michael A Ponsor : ORDER entered. approving the parties' 155 Joint Stipulation regarding the determination of wilfull infringement at trial., (Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 03/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 3/1/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Parker Hannifin Corporation. (Pezzner, Harold) (Entered: 03/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 2/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION (Joint) Regarding the Determination of Wilfull Infringement at Trial by Omegaflex, Inc., Parker Hannifin Corporation, Parker Hannifin Corporation, Omegaflex, Inc.. (Coyle, Steven) (Entered: 02/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 2/22/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Judge Michael A Ponsor : ORDER entered. ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE issued to Attorney Brian J. Hairston. Resp. due 3/05/2007; cc/cl.(Finn, Mary) (Entered: 02/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 2/22/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Deft's REPLY to Response to Motion re 150 MOTION in Limine to Limit the Use of this Court's Decision Granting Summary Judgment of Infringement During the Damages Trial by Parker Hannifin Corporation filed. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 02/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Unopposed Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion in Limine by Parker Hannifin Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Pezzner, Harold) (Entered: 02/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 2/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Opposition re 150 MOTION in Limine to Limit the Use of this Court's Decision Granting Summary Judgment of Infringement During the Damages Trial filed by Omegaflex, Inc., Omegaflex, Inc.. (Coyle, Steven) (Entered: 02/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 2/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION in Limine to Limit the Use of this Court's Decision Granting Summary Judgment of Infringement During the Damages Trial by Parker Hannifin Corporation.(Pezzner, Harold) (Entered: 02/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 12/20/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Opposition re 148 MOTION to Stay Trial of Damages Pending Its Appeal of the Liability Decision filed by Omegaflex, Inc., Omegaflex, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Coyle, Steven) (Entered: 12/20/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 11/20/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Stay Trial of Damages Pending Its Appeal of the Liability Decision by Parker Hannifin Corporation.(Pezzner, Harold) (Entered: 11/20/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 11/13/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re 143 Notice of Appeal, filed by Parker Hannifin Corporation,. USCA Case Number 2007-1044 (Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 11/13/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 10/30/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Copy of docket sheet, Notices of Appeal - 143 & 144 , 142 - Provisional Permament Injunction Order and U.S. Court of Appeals Federal Circuit Information Sheet forwarded to U.S. Court of Appeal for the Federal Circuit, 717 Madison Place, N.W., Washington DC 20439. (Attachments: # 1 Provisional Permament Injunction Order) (Finn, Mary) Additional attachment(s) added on 10/30/2006 (Finn, Mary). (Entered: 10/30/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 10/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re 143 Notice of Appeal, 144 Amended notice of Appeal. #'s 1 - 138, 140 - 144. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 10/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 10/24/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED DOCUMENT by Parker Hannifin Corporation. Amendment to 143 Notice of Appeal,. (Pezzner, Harold) (Entered: 10/24/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 10/23/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 142 Permanent Injunction by Parker Hannifin Corporation. $ 455 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/clerks/transcript.htm MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Appeal Record due by 11/13/2006. (Pezzner, Harold) (Entered: 10/23/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 10/19/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Judge Michael A Ponsor : ORDER entered. PROVISIONAL PERMANENT INJUNCTION. See the attached provisional permanent injunction for complete details. cc/cl(Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 10/19/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 10/11/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Response by Omegaflex, Inc., Omegaflex, Inc. to 140 Objection to Plaintiff's Proposed Form Of Permanent Injunction. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Coyle, Steven) (Entered: 10/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 10/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Objection to 138 Notice (Other) by Parker Hannifin Corporation of Proposed Form of Permanent Injunction. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Pezzner, Harold) (Entered: 10/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 9/25/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on September 8, 2006 before Judge Ponsor. Court Reporter: James P. Gibbons. The original transcripts are maintained in the case file in the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter at 617/428-0402 or the Clerk's Office. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 09/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 9/21/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Omegaflex, Inc., Omegaflex, Inc. of Filing Provisional Permanent Injunction Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Coyle, Steven) (Entered: 09/21/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 9/13/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Judge Michael A Ponsor : ORDER entered. FURTHER SCHEDULING ORDER: As follows; Ptf. will submit draft Permanent Injuction by 9/22/06, Dft. respose by 10/6/06, the court will review and issue it by 10/20/06, Dft's may file its motion to stay by 11/20/2006, and Ptf. opposition by 12/20/06. See the attached order for complete details. cc/cl(Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 09/13/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 9/8/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew C Ryan on behalf of Omegaflex, Inc. (Ryan, Andrew) (Entered: 09/08/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 9/1/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by Omegaflex, Inc., Parker Hannifin Corporation, Parker Hannifin Corporation, Omegaflex, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 # 2)(Coyle, Steven) (Entered: 09/01/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 7/14/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Deft's LETTER MOTION for Hearing on the Pltf's 108 MOTION for Permanent Injunction by Parker Hannifin Corporation filed.(Finn, Mary) (Entered: 07/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 7/14/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Deft's AFFIDAVIT of Harold Pezzner in Support of their 132 Surreply to the Pltf's 130 SEALED SUPPL. REPLY to the Deft's Suppl. Response to their 108 MOTION for Permanent Injunction and in support of their motion for Permanent Injunction by Parker-Hannifin Corporation FILED UNDER SEAL. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 07/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 7/14/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Deft's Surreply to the Pltf's 130 SEALED SUPPL. REPLY to the Deft's Suppl. Response to their 108 MOTION for Permanent Injunction and in support of their motion for Permanent Injunction by Parker-Hannifin Corporation filed. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 07/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 7/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Plft's SEALED AFFIDAVIT of Steven M. Coyle in Support of their 130 SEALED Suppl. opposition to the Deft's Reply to their Motion for permanent injunction FILED UNDER SEAL. (Finn, Mary) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/10/2006 (Finn, Mary). (Entered: 07/10/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 7/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Pltf's SEALED REPLY to the Deft's Suppl. Response to their 108 MOTION for Permanent Injunction by Omegaflex, Inc. FILED UNDER SEAL. (Finn, Mary) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/10/2006 to show the document was filed under seal. (Finn, Mary). Modified on 7/10/2006 (Finn, Mary). (Entered: 07/10/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 7/7/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Pltf's MOTION for Leave to File under seal its suppl. opposition to the Deft's motion for permanent injunction and suppl. affidavit of Steven M. Coyle by Omegaflex, Inc. filed.(Finn, Mary) (Entered: 07/10/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Deft's SEALED AFFIDAVIT of Harold Pezzner, Esquire in support of its 127 Memorandum in Opposition to the Pltf's motion for permanent injunction by Parker Hannifin Corporation FILED UNDER SEAL. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 06/30/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Deft's SEALED SUPPL. MEMORANDUM in Opposition to the Pltf's 108 MOTION for Permanent Injunction by Parker Hannifin Corporation FILED UNDER SEAL. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 06/30/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 6/22/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 5/17/06 before Judge Michael A. Ponsor. Court Reporter: Alice Moran. The original transcripts are maintained in the case file in the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter or the Clerk's Office. (Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 06/22/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 6/12/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Pltf's SUPPL. AFFIDAVIT of Mark Albino in Support in support of its 108 MOTION for Permanent Injunction by Omegaflex, Inc. FILED UNDER SEAL. (Attachments: # 1)(Finn, Mary) (Entered: 06/12/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 6/12/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUPPL. AFFIDAVIT of Steven M. Coyle in Support of its 108 MOTION for Permanent Injunction by Omegaflex, Inc. FILED UNDER SEAL. (Attachments: # 1)(Finn, Mary) (Entered: 06/12/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 6/12/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Pltf's SUPPL. MEMORANDUM in Support of its 108 MOTION for Permanent Injunction by Omegaflex, Inc. FILED UNDER SEAL. (Attachments: # 1)(Finn, Mary) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/12/2006 (Finn, Mary) and Modified on 6/12/2006 add the correct document - incorrect document linked to this entry and corrected. (Finn, Mary). (Entered: 06/12/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 6/9/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Pltf's MOTION for Leave to File under seal its suppl. memorandum, supl. affidavits of Steven M. Coyle and Mark Albino in support of its motion for permanent injunction by Omegaflex, Inc. filed..(Finn, Mary) Modified on 6/13/2006 to add "suppl. affidavits of Steven M. Coyle and Mark Albino. (Finn, Mary). (Entered: 06/12/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 5/19/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Judge Michael A Ponsor : ORDER entered. FURTHER SCHEDULING ORDER: SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/8/2006 03:00 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Michael A Ponsor.(French, Elizabeth) (Entered: 05/19/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 5/15/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Parker Hannifin Corporation of Supreme Court Decision on Grant of Injunctions in Patent Cases (Hutz, Rudolf) (Entered: 05/15/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 5/15/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re 109 MOTION for Reconsideration of the Court's Summary Judgment Decision filed by Parker Hannifin Corporation. (Hutz, Rudolf) (Entered: 05/15/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 5/12/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Plft's AFFIDAVIT of Mark Albino re 117 Reply to Response to Motion by Omegaflex, Inc. filed. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 05/15/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 5/12/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Pltf's REPLY to the Deft's Response to their 108 MOTION for Permanent Injunction by Omegaflex, Inc. FILED UNDER SEAL. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 05/15/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 5/12/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Pltf's Motion for leave to file under seal its reply in resp. to the Deft's opposition to their motion for pernanent injunction by Omegaflex, Inc. filed.(Finn, Mary) (Entered: 05/12/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 5/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION for Leave to File Replies to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Permanent Injunction and Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's Summary Judgment Decision by Omegaflex, Inc., Parker Hannifin Corporation.(Coyle, Steven) (Entered: 05/10/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 5/4/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 109 MOTION for Reconsideration of the Court's Summary Judgment Decision filed by Omegaflex, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Coyle, Steven) (Entered: 05/04/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 5/3/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Deft's SEALED MEMORANDUM in Opposition to the Pltf's 108 MOTION for Permanent Injunction by Parker Hannifin Corporation FILED UNDER SEAL. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 05/03/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 5/3/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by David B. Crevier on behalf of Parker Hannifin Corporation (Crevier, David) (Entered: 05/03/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 4/26/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 108 MOTION for Permanent Injunction, 109 MOTION for Reconsideration of the Court's Summary Judgment Decision by Omegaflex, Inc., Parker Hannifin Corporation.(Coyle, Steven) (Entered: 04/26/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 4/13/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support re 109 MOTION for Reconsideration of the Court's Summary Judgment Decision filed by Parker Hannifin Corporation. (Hutz, Rudolf) (Entered: 04/13/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 4/13/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Reconsideration of the Court's Summary Judgment Decision by Parker Hannifin Corporation.(Hutz, Rudolf) (Entered: 04/13/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 4/12/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Permanent Injunction by Omegaflex, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Coyle, Steven) (Entered: 04/12/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 3/31/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Judge Michael A Ponsor : MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered granting Ptf's 55 and 57 Motions for Summary Judgment, and denying Dft's 83 Motion for Summary Judgment. The clerk will set the case for a conference to establish a schedule for a trial on the issue of damages. See the attached memo & order for complete details. cc/cl (Attachments: # 1 Memo & Order Cont. (2 of 2) Parts) (Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 03/31/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 3/31/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 5/17/2006 02:30 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Michael A Ponsor. (French, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/31/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 2/16/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Change of Address by Bruce E. Falby (Falby, Bruce) (Entered: 02/16/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 9/27/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Pltf's SUPPL. MEMORANDUM in Opposition to the Deft's 83 substitute motion for S/J and in support of its 57 MOTION for S/J that its patents are not invalid by Omegaflex, Inc. filed. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 09/27/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 9/26/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Pltf's MOTION for Leave to File suppl. memorandum in opp. to the Deft's substitute motion for S/J and in support of its motion for S/J that its Patents are not invalid by Omegaflex, Inc. filed.(Finn, Mary) (Entered: 09/26/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 102 Filed: 9/16/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT (Exhibit 44) placed in secure file room.. (Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 09/16/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 9/16/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Second Further DECLARATION of Steven M. Coyle in support of Ptf's 57 MOTION for Summary Judgment and in Opposition to Parker's motion for Summary Judgment by Omegaflex, Inc. (Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 09/16/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 9/13/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          FURTHER DECLARATION of Harold Pezzner, Esq. by Parker Hannifin Corporation. (Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 09/13/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 9/13/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Dft's REPLY MEMORANDUM in Support of its 83 substitute MOTION for Summary Judgment of invalidity filed by Parker Hannifin Corporation. (Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 09/13/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 9/12/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Ptf's MOTION to file under Seal and to Impound Exhibit 44 to the further declaration of Steven M. Coyle. by Omegaflex, Inc.(Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 09/13/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 9/12/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Ptf's REPLY to Dft's Opposition to it's 57 MOTION for Summary Judgment that its Patents are not invalid filed by Omegaflex, Inc.. (Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 09/13/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 9/12/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Ptf's REPLY to Dft's Opposition to its 55 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Infringement filed by Omegaflex, Inc. (Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 09/13/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 8/30/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Deft's AFFIDAVIT of Harold D. Pezzner in Opposition to the Pltf's 57 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 55 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Parker Hannifin Corporation filed. (Exhibits 21 - 31 not scanned due to their volume) (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 08/30/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 8/30/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Deft's MEMORANDUM in Opposition to the Pltf's 57 MOTION for Summary Judgment that its Patents are not Invalid by Parker Hannifin Corporation filed. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 08/30/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 8/30/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Deft's MEMORANDUM in Opposition to the Pltf's 55 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Infringement by Parker Hannifin Corporation filed. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 08/30/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 8/29/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Pltf's SEALED AFFIDAVIT of Edwin Pile in support of their 57 MOTION for S/J and in opp. to the Deft's 83 Substitute MOTION for S/J by Omegaflex, Inc. FILED UNDER SEAL. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 08/30/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 8/29/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Pltf's MOTION to file under Seal and to Impound Declaration (Affidavit) of Edwin Pike by Omegaflex, Inc. filed.(Finn, Mary) (Entered: 08/30/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 8/29/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Pltf's AFFIDAVIT of Dr. Warren P. Seering in further support of their 57 MOTION for S/J that its patents are not invalid and in opposition to the Deft's 83 substitute MOTION for S/J by Omegaflex, Inc. filed. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 08/30/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 8/29/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Pltf's FURTHER AFFIDAVIT of Steven M. Coyle in Support of their 57 MOTION for S/J, 55 motion for S/J and in opposition to the Deft's 83 Substitute MOTION for Summary Judgment, by Omegaflex filed. Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 35 - 42 - not scanned due to their volume)(Finn, Mary) (Entered: 08/30/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 8/29/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Pltf's MEMORANDUM in Opposition to the Deft's 83 Substitute MOTION for partial Summary Judgment by Omegaflex, Inc. filed. (Attachments: # 1)(Finn, Mary) (Entered: 08/30/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 8/5/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION to Continue Summary Judgment Hearing to 9/29/05 by Omegaflex, Inc., and Parker Hannifin Corporation.(Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 08/05/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 7/5/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Deft's AFFIDAVIT of David F. Geary in Support of their 83 MOTION for Partial S/J by Parker Hannifin Corporation filed. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 07/05/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 7/1/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Deft's AFFIDAVIT of Harold Pezzner in Support of their 83 MOTION S/J filed. (Attachments: # 1). Document not scanned due to its volume. (Finn, Mary) ary). (Entered: 07/01/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 7/1/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Deft's MEMORANDUM in Support of their 83 Substitute MOTION for partial S/J by Parker Hannifin Corporation filed. (Attachments: # 1)(Finn, Mary) (Entered: 07/01/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 7/1/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Deft's Substitute MOTION for S/J of Invaldity of the claims of U.S. Patent Nos. 6,069,749 and 6,428,052 by Parker Hannifin Corporation filed.(Finn, Mary) (Entered: 07/01/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 6/22/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 5/25/05 before Judge Michael A. Ponsor. Court Reporter: Sarah L. Mubarek. The original transcripts are maintained in the case file in the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter or the Clerk's Office. (Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 06/22/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 6/1/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Judge Michael A Ponsor : MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered. Following argument on the Pltf's motion to strike and/or exclude expert testimony - 68 , the Court ALLOWED the motion as follows: By 6/30/2005, the Deft. will file a substitute motion for S/J, setting forth arguments in support of judgment as a matter of law anchored on the record (including expert discl.) as developed up to the date that discovery was closed. The court will not consider arguments in favor of the Deft's motion that rely upon expert discl. occuring after the discovery closing date. Both sides will be given until 8/15/2005 to file their opp. to any pending motion for S/J. Replies due by 8/29/2005. Counsel to appear for argument on all pending motions for S/J on 9/15/2005 at 2:00 P.M.; cc/cl. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 06/02/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 4/26/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Hearing on Motion to Strike (Dkt. No: 68) Only Motion Hearing set for 5/5/2005 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Michael A Ponsor. (French, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/26/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 3/24/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Deft. Parker Haniffin Corporation's surreply in opp. to the Pltf's 76 Reply to their Response to their (Pltf's) Motion to strike and/or exclude filed. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 03/24/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 3/16/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Dft's (Assented to) MOTION for Leave to File a surreply memorandum in opposition to Ptf's reply in support of its motion to strike by Parker Hannifin Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Surreply in Opposition)(Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 03/16/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 3/9/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Pltf's SUPPL. AFFIDAVIT of Steven M. Coyle in Supportof its 68 MOTION to strike and/or exclude the Deft's late expert testimony and newly aserted theories of invalidity by Omegaflex, Inc. filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 13A-C, 14) (Document not scanned due to its volume)(Finn, Mary) (Entered: 03/09/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 3/9/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Pltf's REPLY to the Deft's resp. to their 68 motion to strike and/or exclude Deft's late expert testimony and newly asserted theories of invalidity by Omegaflex, Inc. filed. (Finn, Mary) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/9/2005 (Finn, Mary). (Entered: 03/09/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 3/9/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Pltf's Assented to MOTION for Leave to File reply to Deft's opp. to their motion to strike by Omegaflex, Inc. filed.(Finn, Mary) (Entered: 03/09/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 2/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              THIRD DECLARATION of Harold Pezzner re 73 Opposition to Motion by Parker Hannifin Corporation. (Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 02/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 2/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Dft's Opposition to Ptf's 68 MOTION to strike filed by Parker Hannifin Corporation. cc/cl (Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 02/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 2/16/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Change of Firm Name by Bruce E. Falby (Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 02/16/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 2/11/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Pltf's MOTION to Continue the motions for S/J hearing set for 4/15/2005 and the resp. to motions for S/J deadline of 3/15/2005. by Omegaflex, Inc. filed.(Finn, Mary) (Entered: 02/11/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 2/11/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Pltf's AFFIDAVIT of Steven M. Coyle in Support of its 68 MOTION to strike and/or exclude the Deft's late expert testimony and newly asserted theories of invaladity by Omegaflex, Inc. filed. (Document not scanned due to its volume but on record in the Clerk's Office and placed in the file)(Finn, Mary) (Entered: 02/11/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 2/11/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Pltf's MEMORANDUM in Support of its 68 motion to strike and/or exclude the Deft's late expert testimony and newly asserted theories of invaladity filed by Omegaflex, Inc.. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 02/11/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 2/11/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Pltf's motion to strike and/or motion to exclude the Deft's late expert testimony and newly asserted theories of invaladity by Omegaflex, Inc. filed.(Finn, Mary) (Entered: 02/11/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 2/1/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Deft's AFFIDAVIT of Harold Pezzner, Esquire in Support of its 63 MOTION for S/J by Parker Hannifin Corporation filed. (Document not scanned due to its volume) (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 02/01/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 2/1/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Deft's AFFIDAVIT of David F. Geary in Support in support of its 63 MOTION for S/J by Parker Hannifin Corporation filed. (Document not scanned due to its volume) (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 02/01/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 2/1/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Deft's AFFIDAVIT of Ronald A. Moner in Support of its 63 MOTION for S/J by Parker Hannifin Corporation filed. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 02/01/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 2/1/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Deft's MEMORANDUM in Support of its 63 MOTION for partial S/J by Parker Hannifin Corporation filed. (Attachments: # 1)(Finn, Mary) (Entered: 02/01/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 2/1/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Deft's MOTION for S/J of Invalidity by Parker Hannifin Corporation filed.(Finn, Mary) (Entered: 02/01/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 1/31/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Pltf's AFFIDAVIT of Dr. Warren Seering in Support of its 57 MOTION for S/J that its patents are not invalid, 55 MOTION for S/J of Infringement by Omegaflex, Inc. filed. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 02/01/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 1/31/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Pltf's AFFIDAVIT of Steven M. Coyle in Support of its 57 MOTION for S/J that its patents are not invalid, 55 MOTION for S/J of Infringement by Omegaflex, Inc. filed. (Volume II) (Document not scanned due to its volume) (Exhibit #33 to this affidavit contained in a sealed envelope) (Finn, Mary) Modified on 2/1/2005 (Finn, Mary). (Entered: 02/01/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 1/31/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Pltf's AFFIDAVIT of Steven M. Coyle in Support in suport of its 57 MOTION for S/J that its patents are not invalid, 55 MOTION for S/J of Infringement by Omegaflex, Inc. filed. (Document not scanned due to its volume) (Finn, Mary) Modified on 2/1/2005 (Finn, Mary). Modified on 2/1/2005 (Finn, Mary). (Entered: 02/01/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 1/31/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Pltf's AFFIDAVIT of Arthur V. Weirauch in Support of its 57 MOTION for S/J that its Patents are not Invalid by Omegaflex, Inc. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 02/01/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 1/31/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Pltf's MEMORANDUM in Support of its 57 MOTION for S/J that its Patents are not Invalid by Omegaflex, Inc filed. (Attachments: # 1)(Finn, Mary) (Entered: 02/01/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/31/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Pltf's MOTION for S/J that its Patents are not Invalid by Omegaflex, Inc. filed.(Finn, Mary) (Entered: 02/01/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/31/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Pltf's MEMORANDUM in Support of its 55 MOTION for S/J of Infringementby Omegaflex, Inc.filed. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 02/01/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/31/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Pltf's motion for S/J of Infringement by Omegaflex, Inc. filed.(Finn, Mary) (Entered: 02/01/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 12/20/04 before Judge Michael A. Ponsor. Court Reporter: Alice Moran. The original transcripts are maintained in the case file in the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter or the Clerk's Office. (Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 01/14/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/21/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Judge Michael A Ponsor : ORDER entered SUPPLEMENTAL SCHEDULING ORDER:Counsel will appear again before this court for oral argument on any pending motions for summary judgment on 4/14/2005 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Michael A Ponsor. Any motions for summary judgment by either party due by 1/31/2005. opposition due 3/15/05. cc/cl(Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 12/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 12/21/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Judge Michael A Ponsor : MEMORANDUM RE: CLAIM CONSTRUCTION entered, see the attached memo for complete details. cc/cl (Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 12/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 12/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Francis O'Brien on behalf of Omegaflex, Inc. filed. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 12/20/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 12/2/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Deft's REPLY MEMORANDUM in support of its 47 Memorandum re: construction of disputed claim terms filed. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 12/02/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 12/1/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Pltf's AFFIDAVIT of Steven M. Coyle in Support of its 48 Response to the Deft's claim construction memorandum filed. (Attachments: # 1 # 2)(Finn, Mary) (Entered: 12/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/1/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Pltf, Omegaflex, Inc.'s Resp. to the Deft's 47 Claim Construction Memorandum filed.. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 12/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/16/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Dft's MEMORANDUM in support of its construction of disputed claim terms by Parker Hannifin Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits - 1 to 13 (not scanned))(Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 11/16/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/15/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Ptf's APPENDIX OF EXHIBITS to its 45 Declaration of Steven M. Coyle Volume II by Omegaflex, Inc. (Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 11/16/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/15/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Steven M. Coyle by Omegaflex, Inc. (Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 11/16/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/15/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Ptf's MEMORANDUM in support of proposed claim construction by Omegaflex, Inc. (Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 11/16/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/21/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Parties CORRECTED JOINT SUBMISSION of proposed claim terms for construction with proposed definitions by Omegaflex, Inc., Parker Hannifin Corporation filed. (Attachments: # 1 # 2)(Finn, Mary) (Entered: 10/21/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/15/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PRTIES' JOINT SUBMISSION of proposed claim terms for construction with proposed definitions. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit - B)(Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 10/18/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/2/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to Second Amended Complaint and Counterclaim by Parker Hannifin Corporation, filed, c/s.(Healy, Bethaney) (Entered: 08/03/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/13/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against Parker Hannifin Corporation , filed by Omegaflex, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, #(2) Exhibits B & C)(Stuckenbruck, John) (Entered: 08/03/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/8/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Ptf's (Assented to) MOTION to Amend 11 Complaint by Omegaflex, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed 2nd Amended Complaint# 2 Exhibit A to Amd Complaint# 3 Exhibit B to Amd Complaint# 4 Exhibit C to Amd Complaint)(Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 07/08/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/24/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Ptf's SUBSTITUTE EXHIBITS Replacing the exhibits to their 11 First Amended Complaint, filed September 2002 by Omegaflex, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Replacement exhibits# 2 Replacement exhibits# 3 Replacement exhibits)(Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 05/25/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/3/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on April 22, 2004 at 3:03 P.M. before Judge Michael A. Ponsor filed. Court Reporter: Alice Moran. Tape Number: None. The original transcripts are maintained in the case file in the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter or the Clerk's Office. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 05/03/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Judge Michael A Ponsor : FURTHER SCHEDULING ORDER entered as follows: Expert reports of proof will be served on opposing party by 6/14/04, Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/22/2004., all experts depositions due 8/31/04, joint submissions of disputed claims due 10/15/04, memoranda regarding claim construction due 11/15/04, replies by 12/1/04 and counsel will appear before this court for oral arguent on the issue of cliam construction on 12/20/2004 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 2 before Honorable Michael A. Ponsor.(Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 04/23/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/1/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice Resetting or Cancelling Hearing. Hearing rescheduled or cancelled: Status conf to: 4/22/04 at 3:00 (French, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/13/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Parties joint motion to ext. discovery deadline for ninety (90)days to 2/28/2004 filed.(Finn, Mary) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/18/2003 (Finn, Mary). (Entered: 11/13/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/16/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Change of Address by Brian J. Hairston, Rudolf E. Hutz, Harold Pezzner (Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 09/16/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/13/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate of Good Standing by Brian J. Hairston re 31 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brian J. Hairston Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 305312. by Parker Hannifin Corporation. (Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 08/13/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/13/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Assented to MOTION for admission to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brian J. Hairston Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 305312. by Parker Hannifin Corporation.(Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 08/13/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/9/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Assented to MOTION for leave to Withdraw as Attorney by Parker Hannifin Corporation.(Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 07/09/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/2/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Assented to MOTION for leave to Withdraw by Luke L. Dauchot, as Attorney for Parker Hannifin Corporation.(Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 07/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/26/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Harold Pezzner on behalf of Parker Hannifin Corporation (Stuckenbruck, John) (Entered: 06/27/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/26/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Rudolf E. Hutz on behalf of Parker Hannifin Corporation (Stuckenbruck, John) (Entered: 06/27/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATED MOTION for Protective Order re: confidential materials by Omegaflex, Inc., Parker Hannifin Corporation filed.(Finn, Mary) (Entered: 06/24/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/17/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Deft. Parker Hannifin Corporation's MOTION for Rudolf E. Hutz and Harold Pezzner to appear pro hace vice filed. Filing fee $ 100.00. Receipt number 305255. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 06/17/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/6/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Change of Address by Bruce E. Falby (Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 06/06/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/16/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Judge Michael A Ponsor : FURTHER SCHEDULING ORDER entered. All non-expert depos. to be completed by 11/30/2003. Status conf. set for 12/04/2003 at 2:00 P.M. At this time, the Court will take up the following issues: a Markman hearing, expert discovery, S/J and a trial date. Discussions for settlement and discovery, which will not be extended, to be pursued simultaneously; cc/cl. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 05/20/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/16/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Michael A Ponsor : Status Conference held on 5/16/2003 Further scheduling order given to counsel; Return for Status Conference on 12/4/03 at 2:00 p.m. re: Marksman hearing and Summary Judgment scheduling (Court Reporter S. Mubarek.) (French, Elizabeth) (Entered: 05/19/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint motion by Omegaflex, Inc., Parker Hannifin to stay of proceedings and to revise current case schedule , filed. c/s (mgl) (Entered: 01/24/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Answer by Omegaflex, Inc. to amended counterclaim by Parker Hannifin [5-2] filed. (mef) (Entered: 10/15/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/10/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Answer by Parker Hannifin to amended complaint and [5-2] counter claim, filed. c/s (mgl) (Entered: 10/10/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/26/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of appearance of attorney for Parker Hannifin, Parker Hannifin by Luke L. Dauchot, filed. (mgl) (Entered: 09/26/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/26/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of appearance of attorney for Parker Hannifin, Parker Hannifin by Kenneth G. Cole, filed. c/s (mgl) (Entered: 09/26/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/26/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of appearance of attorney for Parker Hannifin, Parker Hannifin by Jeffrey C Metzcar, filed. c/s (mgl) (Entered: 09/26/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/19/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Local Rule 7.3 Corporate Disclosure statement filed by Omegaflex, Inc. (mef) (Entered: 09/19/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/17/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Judge Michael A. Ponsor . Scheduling Order entered setting motions to amend the pleadings or to add parties filing deadline for 12/31/2002. Discovery cutoff 4/30/2003. Status Conf. set for 2:00 P.M. on 5/16/2003. Ans. to amended complaint to be filed by 10/07/2002; cc/cl. . [EOD Date 9/17/02] (mef) (Entered: 09/17/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/17/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Local Rule 7.3 Corporate Disclosure statement filed by Parker Hannifin (mef) (Entered: 09/17/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/13/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Judge Michael A. Ponsor . Clerk's Notes: re: sched. conf Court Reporter: A Moran (laf) (Entered: 09/13/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/9/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Amended complaint by Omegaflex, Inc. filed. (Answer due 9/19/02 for Parker Hannifin ) . Amended complaint amends [1-1] complaint ; adding . (mgl) (Entered: 09/09/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/6/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint statement by Omegaflex, Inc., Parker Hannifin, Parker Hannifin, Omegaflex, Inc. , re: rule 16.1(d), filed. c/s (mgl) (Entered: 09/06/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/5/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION (Motion) by Parker Hannifin, Parker Hannifin , for Luke L. Dauchot, Kennth G. Cole and Jeffrey C. Metzcr to appear pro hac vice. Fee Status: Paid. Fee Amt: $150.00 Receipt #: 304980. , filed. (mef) (Entered: 09/05/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/5/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION (Motion) by Omegaflex, Inc. , to amend [1-1] complaint to add a second cause of action for patent infringement filed. (mef) (Entered: 09/05/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/21/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Judge Michael A. Ponsor. Notice of Conference: Set Pretrial scheduling conf. for 3:00 P.M. on 9/13/2002; cc/cl. . (mef) (Entered: 08/21/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/30/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Answer by Omegaflex, Inc. to [5-2] counterclaim, filed. (bah) (Entered: 08/05/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/26/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Answer to complaint and Counterclaim by Parker Hannifin against Omegaflex, Inc. , filed. c/s (mgl) (Entered: 07/26/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/1/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Return of service executed as to Parker Hannifin with service on 6/4/02 filed. Answer due on 6/24/02 for Parker Hannifin (mgl) (Entered: 07/01/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/1/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Corrected Joint motion by Omegaflex, Inc., Parker Hannifin to extend time to 7/24/02 to answer or otherwise responed to the complaint , filed. c/s (mgl) (Entered: 07/01/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/24/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION (Motion) by Parker Hannifin to ext. time to 7/05/2002 to resp. to the complaint. , filed. (mef) (Entered: 06/24/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/11/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Complaint filed. Case assigned to Judge: Michael A. Ponsor. Receipt #: 304779. Amount:$ 150.00. Fee Status: Paid. CF, LR 4.1, notice of lawsuit and waiver of service of summons to Counsel. (mef) (Entered: 02/11/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 41 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?