Hughes Aircraft Co. v. Inframetrics, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:91-cv-10991
District Judge A. David Mazzone, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 4, 2017 at 2:03 PM EST (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Victor George Savikas +1 213 489 3939 +1 213 243 2539 vgsavikas@jonesday.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 107

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark A. Rosen +1 781 251 9800 +1 781 329 3833 rosen@goshlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Maynard M. Kirpalani +1 617 422 5300 +1 617 423 6917 maynard.kirpalani@wilsonelser.com
No Logo Inframetrics, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cesari & McKenna, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas C. O'Konski +1 617 951 2500 +1 617 951 3927 TOK@c-m.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David J. Thibodeau, Jr. +1 617 951 2500 djt@c-m.com
v.
No Logo Inframetrics, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cesari & McKenna, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas C. O'Konski +1 617 951 2500 +1 617 951 3927 TOK@c-m.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David J. Thibodeau, Jr. +1 617 951 2500 djt@c-m.com
No Logo HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Victor George Savikas +1 213 489 3939 +1 213 243 2539 vgsavikas@jonesday.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Maynard M. Kirpalani +1 617 422 5300 +1 617 423 6917 maynard.kirpalani@wilsonelser.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1338
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/3/1992, Entered: None Court Filing
Judge A. D. Mazzone . Order of Dismissal entered...see file for more further details, cc/cl. (case settled see dkt #20) (mcm) (Entered: 08/07/1992)
    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/8/1992, Entered: None
    Stipulation of dismissal...parties hereby agree that case be dismissed e/prejudice and w/o costsi, filed cs. (mcm) (Entered: 07/15/1992)
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/14/1992, Entered: None
      STIPULATION by Hughes Aircraft Co., Inframetrics, Inc., the parties hereby agree that the 1st set of ints anf 1st set of request for prod of docs due by May 27, 1992, cc/cl. (mcm) (Entered: 05/18/1992)
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/29/1992, Entered: None
        STIPULATION by Hughes Aircraft Co., Inframetrics, Inc., extending time for filing response to discovery request to May 13,1992 filed c/s (sad) (Entered: 05/01/1992)
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/8/1992, Entered: None
          STIP/Motion by Hughes Aircraft Co., Inframetrics, Inc. to extend time to file rsp to disc request to 4/29/92 filed cs. (mcm) (Entered: 04/09/1992)
            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/24/1992, Entered: None
            STIP/Motion by Hughes Aircraft Co., Inframetrics, Inc. to extend time for filing rsp to discovery to 4/8/92 filed cs. (mcm) (Entered: 03/30/1992)
              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/24/1992, Entered: None Court Filing
              Judge A. D. Mazzone . Scheduling Order setting Joining of parties, amending of pleadings on 3/25/92 Deadline for filing of all motions 3/25/92 Discovery cutoff 8/24/92, cc/cl. (mcm) (Entered: 02/24/1992)
                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/14/1992, Entered: None
                Ltr from Atty Rosen re: status cnf held on 12/17/92. Ptys were requested to report to the court status of settlement. As of this date, ptys have not reached an agreement. Joint request for status cnf be set for sometime in June 1992. (mcm) (Entered: 02/16/1992)
                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/8/1991, Entered: None
                  STIPULATION (Motion) by Hughes Aircraft Co., Inframetrics, Inc. to extend time for filing response to discovery requests filed. (fmr) (Entered: 01/09/1992)
                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/12/1991, Entered: None
                    Motion by Hughes Aircraft Co. for Victor G. Savikas to appear pro hac vice , filed cs. (Cert Good Standing attch) (mcm) (Entered: 12/17/1991)
                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/10/1991, Entered: None
                      STIPULATION (Motion) by Hughes Aircraft Co., Inframetrics, Inc. to extend time for filing response to discovery request filed. c/s. (fmr) (Entered: 12/12/1991)
                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/29/1991, Entered: None
                        Answer by Hughes Aircraft Co. to [7-2] counter claim (mcm) (Entered: 12/04/1991)
                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/14/1991, Entered: None
                          STIPULATION by Hughes Aircraft Co., Inframetrics, Inc., extending time to file responsive pleadings to defendant's counterclaim filed. c/s (fmr) (Entered: 11/18/1991)
                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/30/1991, Entered: None Court Filing
                            Judge David S. Nelson . Order, for six month discovery issued, cc/cl (fmr) (Entered: 10/31/1991)
                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/28/1991, Entered: None
                              Answer to Complaint; jury demand and Counterclaim by Inframetrics, Inc. against Hughes Aircraft Co. filed, c/s. (fmr) (Entered: 10/29/1991)
                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/11/1991, Entered: None
                                STIPULATION (Motion) by Hughes Aircraft Co., Inframetrics, Inc. to extend time for filing responsive pleading filed. (fmr) (Entered: 10/15/1991)
                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/11/1991, Entered: None
                                  Joint motion by Hughes Aircraft Co., Inframetrics, Inc. to extend time for filing responsive pleading to October 12, 1991, filed.c/s (fmr) (Entered: 09/13/1991)
                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/15/1991, Entered: None
                                    STIPULATION (Motion) by Hughes Aircraft Co., Inframetrics, Inc. to extend time answer and otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint filed, c/s. (fmr) (Entered: 08/16/1991)
                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/29/1991, Entered: None
                                      Return of service executed as to Inframetrics, Inc. 7/24/91 Answer due on 8/13/91 for Inframetrics, Inc. filed (fmr) (Entered: 08/02/1991)
                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/23/1991, Entered: None
                                        Return of service executed as to Inframetrics, Inc. 7/15/91 Answer due on 8/4/91 for Inframetrics, Inc. filed. (fmr) (Entered: 07/29/1991)
                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/3/1991, Entered: None
                                          Complaint filed (fmr) (Entered: 04/04/1991)
                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                            Statistics

                                            This case has been viewed 40 times.

                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                            Space
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                             
                                            PlainSite
                                            Sign Up
                                            Need Password Help?