Unknown
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-11873
District Judge Reginald C. Lindsay, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 11, 2017 at 4:47 AM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo William Semons, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Steven N. Fox

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven N. Fox +1 781 713 4244 +1 781 821 8919 sfox@foxpatent.com
No Logo Surface Shields, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Armstrong Teasdale LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicholas B. Clifford, Jr. +1 314 621 5070 +1 314 612 2217 nclifford@armstrongteasdale.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooke, Clancy & Gruenthal LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin W. Clancy +1 617 428 6800 +1 617 428 6868 kclancy@ccg-law.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marjorie S. Cooke +1 617 428 6800 +1 617 428 6868 mcooke@ccg-law.com
v.
No Logo Surface Shields, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Armstrong Teasdale LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicholas B. Clifford, Jr. +1 314 621 5070 +1 314 612 2217 nclifford@armstrongteasdale.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooke, Clancy & Gruenthal LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin W. Clancy +1 617 428 6800 +1 617 428 6868 kclancy@ccg-law.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marjorie S. Cooke +1 617 428 6800 +1 617 428 6868 mcooke@ccg-law.com
No Logo William Semons, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Steven N. Fox

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven N. Fox +1 781 713 4244 +1 781 821 8919 sfox@foxpatent.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1126
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: None
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by William Semons. (Fox, Steven) (Entered: 05/12/2008)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/23/2008, Entered: None
    CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION by Plaintiff re 11 Joint Statement of Counsel. (Fox, Steven) (Entered: 01/23/2008)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/23/2008, Entered: None
      CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION re 11 Joint statement of counsel - Local Rule 16.1(D)(3) Certification. (Clancy, Kevin) (Entered: 01/23/2008)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/17/2008, Entered: None
        JOINT STATEMENT of counsel under Local Rule 16.1(D). (Fox, Steven) (Entered: 01/17/2008)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: None
          ANSWER to 7 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by William Semons.(Fox, Steven) (Entered: 12/21/2007)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/5/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
            NOTICE of Scheduling ConferenceScheduling Conference set for 1/24/2008 02:30 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Reginald C. Lindsay. (Hourihan, Lisa) (Entered: 12/05/2007)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/3/2007, Entered: None
              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Surface Shields, Inc.. (Clancy, Kevin) (Entered: 12/03/2007)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/3/2007, Entered: None
                ANSWER to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against William Semons by Surface Shields, Inc..(Clancy, Kevin) (Entered: 12/03/2007)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/8/2007, Entered: None
                  Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to December 3, 2007 to File Answer to Complaint by Surface Shields, Inc..(Clancy, Kevin) (Entered: 11/08/2007)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/8/2007, Entered: None
                    NOTICE of Appearance by Marjorie S. Cooke on behalf of Surface Shields, Inc. (Cooke, Marjorie) (Entered: 11/08/2007)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/8/2007, Entered: None
                      AFFIDAVIT of Nicholas B. Clifford re 3 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Nicholas B. Clifford by Surface Shields, Inc.. (Clancy, Kevin) (Entered: 11/08/2007)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/8/2007, Entered: None
                        Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Nicholas B. Clifford by Surface Shields, Inc..(Clancy, Kevin) (Entered: 11/08/2007)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/8/2007, Entered: None
                          NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin W. Clancy on behalf of Surface Shields, Inc. (Clancy, Kevin) (Entered: 11/08/2007)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: None
                            COMPLAINT William Semons against Surface Shields, Inc. Filing fee: $ 350, receipt number 1694126, filed by William Semons. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet# 2 Category Form)(Fox, Steven) (Entered: 10/05/2007)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 57 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?