Cabot Safety Intermediate Corporation et al v. Arena Industries, LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 4:07-cv-40164
District Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 12, 2017 at 1:28 AM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Aearo Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cantor Colburn LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew C. Ryan +1 860 286 2929 +1 860 286 0115 ryan@cantorcolburn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael J. Rye +1 860 286 2929 +1 860 286 0115 mrye@cantorcolburn.com
No Logo Cabot Safety Intermediate Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cantor Colburn LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew C. Ryan +1 860 286 2929 +1 860 286 0115 ryan@cantorcolburn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael J. Rye +1 860 286 2929 +1 860 286 0115 mrye@cantorcolburn.com
No Logo Arena Industries, LLC, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky & Popeo, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Timothy Renaud +1 617 348 1870 +1 617 542 2241 mtrenaud@mintz.com
v.
No Logo Arena Industries, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky & Popeo, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Timothy Renaud +1 617 348 1870 +1 617 542 2241 mtrenaud@mintz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pepper Hamilton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Aaron J Levangie +1 617 204 5100 +1 617 204 5150 levangiea@pepperlaw.com
No Logo Aearo Company, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cantor Colburn LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew C. Ryan +1 860 286 2929 +1 860 286 0115 ryan@cantorcolburn.com
No Logo Cabot Safety Intermediate Corporation, Counter-Defendant
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 145
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: None
STIPULATION of Dismissal Of All Claims And Counterclaims With Prejudice by Cabot Safety Intermediate Corporation, Arena Industries, LLC, Aearo Company. (Rye, Michael) (Entered: 04/07/2008)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/24/2008, Entered: None
    Joint MOTION to Amend Discovery Schedule by Cabot Safety Intermediate Corporation, Aearo Company, Arena Industries, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Third Amended Discovery Schedule)(Levangie, Aaron) (Entered: 03/24/2008)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/21/2008, Entered: None
      Joint MOTION to Amend Discovery Schedule by Arena Industries, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Levangie, Aaron) (Entered: 02/21/2008)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
        Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered. Stipulated PROTECTIVE ORDER.(Castles, Martin) (Entered: 02/07/2008)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: None
          Assented to MOTION for Protective Order by Cabot Safety Intermediate Corporation, Aearo Company, Arena Industries, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. A: Stipulated Protective Order)(Levangie, Aaron) (Entered: 02/07/2008)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/10/2008, Entered: None
            Proposed Document(s) submitted by Cabot Safety Intermediate Corporation, Arena Industries, LLC. Document received: Stipulated Protective Order. (Levangie, Aaron) (Entered: 01/10/2008)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/8/2008, Entered: None
              NOTICE of Change of Address or Firm Name by Michael J. Rye (Rye, Michael) (Entered: 01/08/2008)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/8/2008, Entered: None
                NOTICE of Change of Address or Firm Name by Andrew C Ryan (Ryan, Andrew) (Entered: 01/08/2008)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: None
                  MOTION to Amend Discovery Schedule by Arena Industries, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Discovery Schedule)(Levangie, Aaron) (Entered: 12/21/2007)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/9/2007, Entered: None
                    CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Arena Industries, LLC.(Renaud, Michael) (Entered: 11/09/2007)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/9/2007, Entered: None
                      CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Cabot Safety Intermediate Corporation, Aearo Company.(Rye, Michael) (Entered: 11/09/2007)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/4/2007, Entered: None
                        Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Aaron J. Levangie by Arena Industries, LLC.(Renaud, Michael) (Entered: 10/04/2007)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: None
                          JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference. (Ryan, Andrew) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/9/2007 (Hassett, Kathy). (Entered: 09/28/2007)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: None
                            Plaintiffs' ANSWER to Counterclaim by Aearo Company.(Ryan, Andrew) (Entered: 09/10/2007)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/23/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                              NOTICE of Scheduling Conference:Scheduling Conference set for 10/5/2007 at 10:30AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV. (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 08/23/2007)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/14/2007, Entered: None
                                ANSWER to Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against all plaintiffs by Arena Industries, LLC.(Renaud, Michael) (Entered: 08/14/2007)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/27/2007, Entered: None
                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Aearo Company. (Ryan, Andrew) (Entered: 07/27/2007)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/12/2007, Entered: None
                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Arena Industries, LLC. (Renaud, Michael) (Entered: 07/12/2007)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/12/2007, Entered: None
                                      Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 08/14/07 to File Answer To Complaint by Arena Industries, LLC.(Renaud, Michael) (Entered: 07/12/2007)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/12/2007, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Michael T. Renaud on behalf of Arena Industries, LLC (Renaud, Michael) (Entered: 07/12/2007)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: None
                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Cabot Safety Intermediate Corporation, Aearo Company. Arena Industries, LLC served on 7/3/2007, answer due 7/23/2007. Acknowledgement filed by Cabot Safety Intermediate Corporation; Aearo Company. (Ryan, Andrew) (Entered: 07/09/2007)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: None
                                            First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Arena Industries, LLC, filed by Aearo Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - PART 1# 2 Exhibit A - PART 2# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C - PART 1# 5 Exhibit C - PART 2# 6 Exhibit D# 7 Exhibit E - PART 1# 8 Exhibit E - PART 2# 9 Exhibit F - PART 1# 10 Exhibit F - PART 2# 11 Exhibit G# 12 Exhibit H# 13 Exhibit I# 14 Exhibit J)(Ryan, Andrew) (Entered: 06/29/2007)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/12/2007, Entered: None
                                              REPORT on the filing of patent case. (Hassett, Kathy) (Entered: 06/12/2007)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: None
                                                COMPLAINT against Arena Industries, LLC, filed by Cabot Safety Intermediate Corporation, Aearo Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Part 1# 2 Exhibit A Part 2# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C Part 1# 5 Exhbit C Part 2# 6 Exhbit D# 7 Civil Cover Sheet) 8 Category Sheet (Jones, Sherry) (Entered: 06/08/2007)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 93 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?