Smith Sport Optics v. Cool Shades, Inc

Federal Civil Lawsuit Idaho District Court, Case No. 1:02-cv-00266
District Judge Larry M. Boyle, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Larry M. Boyle
Last Updated January 17, 2017 at 2:06 AM EST (8.3 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Smith Sport Optics, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Dorsey & Whitney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward W Bulchis +1 206 903 8785 bulchis.ed@dorsey.com

Represented by Hawley Troxell Ennis & Hawley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth C. Howell +1 208 344 6000 +1 208 342 3829 kch@hteh.com
v.
No Logo Cool Shades, Inc, Defendant

Represented by Cool Shades, Inc

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cool Shades, Inc +1 888 481 8037 +1 888 481 8037

Represented by Dykas & Shaver, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TTAB Attorney Placeholder +1 208 327 8900 frank@dykaslaw.com
Attributes
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1051
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
Timeline
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/4/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER by Judge Larry M. Boyle : dismissing case (cc: all counsel) (dkh)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/4/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge Larry M. Boyle granting motion to extend time to respond to motion to dismiss and scheduling conference order [13-1], motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction [10-1] ; Response to motion ddl extended to 9/13/02, motion to change venue [10-2] ; Response to motion ddl extended to 9/13/02 ; Teleconf vacated 9/3/02 (cc: all counsel) (dkh)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/27/2002, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by pla and def in support of joint motion to extend time to respond to motion to dismiss and scheduling conference order [13-1] (dkh) (Entered: 08/28/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/27/2002, Entered: None
JOINT MOTION by pla and def to extend time to respond to motion to dismiss and scheduling conference order (dkh) (Entered: 08/28/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/5/2002, Entered: None
DECLARATION by Kate Wallace re motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction [10-1], re motion to change venue [10-2] (dkh) (Entered: 08/06/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/5/2002, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by def in support of motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction [10-1], of motion to change venue [10-2] (dkh) (Entered: 08/06/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/5/2002, Entered: None
MOTION by def Cool Shades, Inc to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction , and alternatively to change venue (dkh) (Entered: 08/06/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/30/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge Larry M. Boyle granting motion for an enlargement of time to answer or otherwise defend against pla's complaint [6-1], granting motion to extend time to answer [8-1] ; Case Mgmt ddl set for 8/19/02 (cc: all counsel) (dkh)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/23/2002, Entered: None
MOTION by def Cool Shades, Inc to extend time to answer (dkh)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/8/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
AMENDED ORDER by Judge Larry M. Boyle ; Teleconf reset for 9/3/02 10:30 (cc: all counsel) (dkh)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/3/2002, Entered: None
MOTION by def Cool Shades, Inc. for an enlargement of time to answer or otherwise defend against pla's complaint (ja) (Entered: 07/05/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/21/2002, Entered: None
RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS executed upon def Cool Shades, Inc on 6/13/02 (dkh) (Entered: 06/24/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/18/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge Larry M. Boyle ; Teleconf set for 8/21/02 11:00 (cc: all counsel) (dkh)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/17/2002, Entered: None
APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE - pla Smith Sport Optics represented by Edward W Bulchis dkh (dkh)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/13/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for plaintiff (msb)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/11/2002, Entered: None
COMPLAINT (Summons(es) issued) Filing Fee $ 150 ; Receipt # 11793 (msb) (Entered: 06/13/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 11 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?