Mackarvich, et al v. Minute Man Anchors, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Georgia Northern District Court, Case No. 1:00-cv-02610
District Judge Julie E. Carnes, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 26, 2017 at 7:13 PM EST (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Charles J. Mackarvich, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Porter & Orrison LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J Alexander Porter +1 404 233 2334 aporter@porterorrison.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Porter Orrison & Doster

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Simuel F. Doster, Jr. +1 404 233 2334
No Logo Tie Down, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Porter & Orrison LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J Alexander Porter +1 404 233 2334 aporter@porterorrison.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Porter Orrison & Doster

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Simuel F. Doster, Jr. +1 404 233 2334
v.
No Logo E-z Anchors, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Fred Robert Slotkin, Jr. +1 404 370 1041 bobby@slotkincaiola.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Flint & Kim

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cort R. Flint, Jr. +1 864 232 4261
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Daniel Lee, Jr. +1 864 232 4261

Toggle Switch Represented by Strickland Brockington Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frank B. Strickland +1 678 347 2200 +1 678 347 2210 fbs@sbllaw.net
No Logo Minute Man Anchors, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Fred Robert Slotkin, Jr. +1 404 370 1041 bobby@slotkincaiola.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Flint & Kim

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cort R. Flint, Jr. +1 864 232 4261
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Daniel Lee, Jr. +1 864 232 4261

Toggle Switch Represented by Strickland Brockington Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frank B. Strickland +1 678 347 2200 +1 678 347 2210 fbs@sbllaw.net
No Logo Minute Man Products, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Fred Robert Slotkin, Jr. +1 404 370 1041 bobby@slotkincaiola.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Flint & Kim

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cort R. Flint, Jr. +1 864 232 4261
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Daniel Lee, Jr. +1 864 232 4261

Toggle Switch Represented by Strickland Brockington Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frank B. Strickland +1 678 347 2200 +1 678 347 2210 fbs@sbllaw.net
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 281
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (40) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/10/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
CONSENT ORDER by Judge Julie E. Carnes, dismissing complaint and counterclaims w/prejudice (cc) (jph) (Entered: 01/11/2002)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/3/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
    SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Julie E. Carnes, Discovery ends 5/1/02 , Motions for sum jgm are due 5/21/02, if no motions for sum jgm then pre-trial order due on 5/31/02 , [39-1] order to be submitted on 6/3/02 if no m for sum jgm or pto is filed Parties are reminded to comply w/LR 5.1B regarding font (cc) (jph) (Entered: 10/04/2001)
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/28/2001, Entered: None
      Attorney appearance for defendants by Frank B. Strickland and F. Robert Slotkin, Jr. (jph) (Entered: 10/01/2001)
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/7/2001, Entered: None
        Application for admission of Cort R. Flint Jr. pro hac vice for defendants (jph) (Entered: 09/18/2001)
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/23/2001, Entered: None
          Preliminary Report and Discovery Schedule. (to judge) (jph) (Entered: 08/24/2001)
            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/23/2001, Entered: None
            Certificate of interested persons. (to judge) (jph) (Entered: 08/24/2001)
              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/26/2001, Entered: None
              Memorandum by plaintiffs in opposition to [33-1] motion for reconsideration of [29-1] order, [33-2] motion 28 USC 1292(b) Certification with detailed findings of fact for interlocutory appeal (jph) (Entered: 07/27/2001)
                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/12/2001, Entered: None
                MOTION by defendant E-Z Anchors, Inc. for reconsideration of [29-1] order , or in the alternative 28 USC 1292(b) Certification with detailed findings of fact for interlocutory appeal with brief in support. (jph) (Entered: 07/13/2001)
                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/12/2001, Entered: None
                  ANSWER by defendant to complaint [11-1] Discovery ends 12/9/01 (jph) (Entered: 07/13/2001)
                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/27/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER by Judge Julie E. Carnes consolidating case 1:01-cv-1278 w/1:00-cv-2610 and terminating 01-cv-1278 (cc) (jph) (Entered: 06/28/2001)
                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/27/2001, Entered: None
                      Supplement by plaintiffs to [23-1] response (jph) (Entered: 06/27/2001)
                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/27/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER by Judge Julie E. Carnes GRANTING [25-1] motion for leave to file supplement to plas' memorandum in opposition to dfts' motion to dismiss, DENYING [22-1] motion to dismiss by E-Z Anchors, Inc., Minute Man Products, Minute Man Anchors, DENYING [22-2] motion to transfer case to the District of South Carolina by E-Z Anchors, Inc., Minute Man Products, Minute Man Anchors, DENYING [22-3] motion to stay proceedings by E-Z Anchors, Inc., Minute Man Products, Minute Man Anchors, (cc) (jph) (Entered: 06/27/2001)
                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/22/2001, Entered: None
                          REPLY by defendants to response to [22-1] motion to dismiss, [22-2] motion to transfer case to the District of South Carolina, [22-3] motion to stay proceedings (jph) (Entered: 05/22/2001)
                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/15/2001, Entered: None
                            REPLY by defendants to response to [22-1] motion to dismiss (jph) (Entered: 05/16/2001)
                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/9/2001, Entered: None
                              Memo by CRD striking [24-1]response reply to, dfts are directed to refile this pldg w/i 5 days [26-1] notice to be submitted on 5/22/01 if dfts do not comply Parties are reminded to comply w/LR 5.1B regarding font (cc by CRD) (jph) (Entered: 05/10/2001)
                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/7/2001, Entered: None
                                MOTION by plaintiffs for leave to file supplement to plas' memorandum in opposition to dfts' motion to dismiss with supplement attached. (jph) Modified on 05/08/2001 (Entered: 05/08/2001)
                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/1/2001, Entered: None
                                  REPLY by defendants to response to [22-1] motion to dismiss ***Struck per ntc dated 5/9/01 for font violation*** (jph) Modified on 05/10/2001 (Entered: 05/02/2001)
                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/11/2001, Entered: None
                                    Memorandum by plaintiffs in opposition to [22-1] motion to dismiss, [22-2] motion to transfer case to the District of South Carolina, [22-3] motion to stay proceedings (jph) (Entered: 04/11/2001)
                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/6/2001, Entered: None
                                      MOTION by defendants to dismiss , or in the alternative to transfer case to the District of South Carolina , or to stay proceedings with brief in support. (jph) (Entered: 04/09/2001)
                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/30/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ORDER by Judge Julie E. Carnes GRANTING [17-1] motion to extend time for 10 days thru 4/3/01 subsequent to the determination of whether plas can amend their cmp for dfts' to reply [12-1] response, DENYING w/o prejudice [5-1] motion to dismiss by Minute Man Anchors Answer to complaint due 4/3/01 for E-Z Anchors, Inc., for Minute Man Products, for Minute Man Anchors, (cc) (jph) (Entered: 04/02/2001)
                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/20/2001, Entered: None
                                          WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Minute Man Products, E-Z Anchors, Inc. mailed 2/2/01 Answer due by 4/3/01 for E-Z Anchors, Inc., for Minute Man Products, for Minute Man Anchors (jph) (Entered: 03/21/2001)
                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/19/2001, Entered: None
                                            Letter by defendants stating that they are accepting service of amd cmp and agree to answer ddl of 4/3/01. (jph) (Entered: 03/20/2001)
                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/12/2001, Entered: None
                                              Memo by CRD stating that no motion to amend the cmp was required, therefore the amd cmp will be accepted for filing. The dft is directed to file an answer or motion to dismiss w/in 10 days. Parties are reminded to comply w/ LR 7.1D regarding font. (cc by CRD) (jph) (Entered: 03/13/2001)
                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/9/2001, Entered: None
                                                MOTION by defendant, Minute Man Anchors, Inc. to extend time for 10 days subsequent to the determination of whether plas can amend their cmp for dfts' to reply [12-1] response with brief in support. (jph) (Entered: 03/12/2001)
                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/8/2001, Entered: None
                                                  Memo by CRD reminding parties that all pldgs must comply w/ LR 7.1D regarding font size. (cc by CRD) (jph) (Entered: 03/09/2001)
                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/28/2001, Entered: None
                                                    Response regarding amended cmp by plaintiff in opposition to [14-1] notice (jph) (Entered: 03/01/2001)
                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/26/2001, Entered: None
                                                      Memo by CRD pla must file a motion, brief and propose order to amend cmp or submit a consent order w/in 20 days, dd [14-1] notice to be submitted on 3/19/01 The parties are reminded to comply with LR 7.1D. The parties are hereby put on notice that the court may not accept pldgs that violate the above local rule. (cc by CRD) (jph) (Entered: 02/27/2001)
                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/21/2001, Entered: None
                                                        Notice of filing depositions by plaintiff. Original depositions included in case #00-cv-2608-JEC. (jph) (Entered: 02/22/2001)
                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/21/2001, Entered: None
                                                          Memorandum by plaintiff in opposition to [5-1] motion to dismiss (jph) (Entered: 02/22/2001)
                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/2/2001, Entered: None
                                                            AMENDED COMPLAINT by plaintiff adding Minute Man Products, E-Z Anchors, Inc. (jph) (Entered: 02/05/2001)
                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/8/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              ORDER by Judge Julie E. Carnes GRANTING [6-1] motion to extend time thru 2/23/01 for pla to respond to defendant's [5-1] motion to dismiss, [5-1] motion to dismiss to be submitted on 2/26/01 (cc) (web) (Entered: 01/09/2001)
                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/3/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                ORDER by Judge Julie E. Carnes GRANTING [4-1] motion to extend time thru 12/8/00 for dft to answer [1-1] complaint, Answer due 12/8/00 for Minute Man Anchors (cc) (web) (Entered: 01/04/2001)
                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: None
                                                                  Notice to take deposition of Minute Man Products by plaintiffs (web) (Entered: 01/03/2001)
                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: None
                                                                    Notice to take deposition of Minute Man Anchors, Inc. by plaintiffs (web) (Entered: 01/03/2001)
                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/26/2000, Entered: None
                                                                      MOTION by plaintiffs to extend time to respond to defendant's [5-1] motion to dismiss with brief in support. (dfb) (Entered: 12/29/2000)
                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/11/2000, Entered: None
                                                                        MOTION by defendant to dismiss with brief in support. (adg) (Entered: 12/12/2000)
                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/4/2000, Entered: None
                                                                          Consented MOTION by defendant to extend time thru 12/8/00 for dft to answer [1-1] complaint with a proposed order attached. (To JEC For approval) (web) (Entered: 12/08/2000)
                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/3/2000, Entered: None
                                                                            WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Minute Man Anchors mailed 10/5/00. Answer due by 12/4/00 for Minute Man Anchors (web) (Entered: 11/06/2000)
                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/5/2000, Entered: None
                                                                              ANSWERS TO MANDATORY DISCLOSURES by plaintiffs. (web) (Entered: 10/13/2000)
                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/5/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                COMPLAINT filed. Consent form to proceed before U.S. magistrate and pretrial instructions given to attorney FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 460923 (web) (Entered: 10/13/2000)
                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                  This case has been viewed 80 times.

                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                  Space
                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                   
                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                  Need Password Help?