Balivi Chemical Corp v. Chemical Supply Co, et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit Idaho District Court, Case No. 1:90-cv-00188
District Judge Marion J. Callister, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Marion J. Callister
Last Updated January 16, 2017 at 3:01 AM EST (8.3 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Balivi Chemical Corporation, Plaintiff

Represented by Dykas & Shaver, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TTAB Attorney Placeholder +1 208 327 8900 frank@dykaslaw.com
No Logo Chemical Supply Company, Inc., Counter-Claimant
v.
No Logo Chemical Supply Company, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Balivi Chemical Corporation, Counter-Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space TTAB Attorney Placeholder +1 208 327 8900 frank@dykaslaw.com
an Idaho Corporation TTAB Attorney Placeholder +1 208 327 8900 frank@dykaslaw.com

Represented by Dykas & Shaver, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TTAB Attorney Placeholder +1 208 327 8900 frank@dykaslaw.com
Attributes
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
Timeline
  Entries (33) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/11/1991, Entered: None
ORDER by Honorable Marion J. Callister terminating case administratively without prejudice (cc: all counsel) (al)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/14/1991, Entered: None
MINUTES OF TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE; see order for details - this case is stayed until ruling in Colorado re: jurisdictional isssue. Further stay may be considered after ruling (al) (Entered: 03/21/1991)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/14/1991, Entered: None
ORDER by Honorable Marion J. Callister , CASE STAYED - as to all parties pending resolution of jurisdiction issue in Colodado District Court (cc: all counsel) (al) (Entered: 03/18/1991)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/10/1991, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE ; Status Conference set for 10:30 3/14/91 before Judge Callister (al) (Entered: 02/21/1991)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/10/1990, Entered: None
RESPONSIVE BRIEF by defendant Chemical Supply Co in support of motion to stay proceedings [14-1] (gl) (Entered: 08/14/1990)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/6/1990, Entered: None
RESPONSE by plaintiff Balivi Chemical Corp re: objection [29-1] (al) (Entered: 08/07/1990)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/2/1990, Entered: None
OBJECTIONS by defendant Chemical Supply Co to memorandum [28-1] (al) (Entered: 08/03/1990)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/12/1990, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by plaintiff Balivi Chemical Corp in opposition re: motion to stay or bifurcate proceedings [14-1] (al)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/28/1990, Entered: None
ORDER by Honorable Marion J. Callister denying motion for protective order [19-1] to stop the depos scheduled for 6/28/90 (cc: all counsel) (al) (Entered: 06/29/1990)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/28/1990, Entered: None
AMENDED NOTICE of taking deposition of Mac Evans (al) (Entered: 06/29/1990)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/28/1990, Entered: None
AMENDED NOTICE of taking deposition of Warren Shillington (al) (Entered: 06/29/1990)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/28/1990, Entered: None
AMENDED NOTICE of taking deposition of Chemical Supply Co. (al) (Entered: 06/29/1990)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/27/1990, Entered: None
OBJECTION by plaintiff Balivi Chemical Corp to motion for protective order [19-1] (al) (Entered: 06/29/1990)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/27/1990, Entered: None
SUBPOENA as to: William A. Keim served on 6/26/90 (al) (Entered: 06/29/1990)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/27/1990, Entered: None
BRIEF by plaintiff Balivi Chemical Corp in support re: motion for protective order [19-1] (al) (Entered: 06/29/1990)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/27/1990, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE by defendant Chemical Supply Co (al) (Entered: 06/29/1990)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/27/1990, Entered: None
SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION by defendant Chemical Supply Co for protective order (al) (Entered: 06/29/1990)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/26/1990, Entered: None
ORDER by Honorable Marion J. Callister denying motion to quash [10-1] denying motion for protective order [10-2] (cc: all counsel) (al) (Entered: 06/29/1990)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/20/1990, Entered: None
SUBPOENA as to: William Keim served on 6/12/90 (al) (Entered: 06/26/1990)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/25/1990, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by plaintiff Balivi Chemical Corp in opposition re: motion to stay proceedings [14-1], re: motion for protective order [14-2] (al) (Entered: 06/26/1990)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/25/1990, Entered: None
BRIEF by defendant Chemical Supply Co in support re: motion to stay proceedings [14-1], re: motion for protective order [14-2] (al) (Entered: 06/26/1990)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/25/1990, Entered: None
MOTION by defendant Chemical Supply Co to stay proceedings ,and for protective order (al) (Entered: 06/26/1990)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/20/1990, Entered: None
RESPONSE by plaintiff Balivi Chemical Corp to motion to quash [10-1] (al) (Entered: 06/22/1990)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/18/1990, Entered: None
SUBPOENA as to: Warren Shillington served on 6/12/90 (al) (Entered: 06/19/1990)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/18/1990, Entered: None
SUBPOENA as to: Mac Evans served on 6/12/90 (al) (Entered: 06/19/1990)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/18/1990, Entered: None
MOTION by defendant Chemical Supply Co to quash , and for protective order (al)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/6/1990, Entered: None
NOTICE of taking deposition of William A. Keim (al) (Entered: 06/07/1990)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/4/1990, Entered: None
NOTICE of taking deposition of Chemical Supply Co. (al) (Entered: 06/06/1990)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/4/1990, Entered: None
NOTICE of taking deposition of Warren Shillington (al) (Entered: 06/06/1990)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/4/1990, Entered: None
NOTICE of taking deposition of Mac Evans (al) (Entered: 06/06/1990)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/17/1990, Entered: None
REPLY by counter-defendant Balivi Chemical Corp re: counterclaim [4-2] (al) (Entered: 06/06/1990)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/3/1990, Entered: None
ANSWER to complaint [1-1] and COUNTERCLAIM by defendant Chemical Supply Co against plaintiff Balivi Chemical Corp (al) (Entered: 06/06/1990)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/28/1990, Entered: None
COMPLAINT (Summons(es) issued) (consent notice issued/furnished) (al) (Entered: 06/06/1990)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 27 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?