Leeper v. Alliance Resource Partners, L.P.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Southern District Court, Case No. 3:16-cv-00250

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 6, 2019 at 3:31 PM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Carl Leeper, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by GOLDENBERG HELLER ANTOGNOLI & ROWLAND PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas J. Lech +1 618 656 5150 tlech@ghalaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by P.O. Box 959

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin Paul Green +1 618 656 5150 +1 618 656 6230 kevin@ghalaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas P. Rosenfeld +1 618 656 5150 +1 618 656 6230 tom@ghalaw.com
v.
No Logo Alliance Resource Partners LP, Defendant
No Logo Doe Defendants 1-20, Defendant
No Logo Hamilton County Coal, LLC, Defendant
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 160(1)
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER GRANTING 71 136 Motions for Summary Judgment filed by Defendants, DENYING 138 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff, DENYING as moot 82 Motion to Certify Class, DENYING as moot 72 Motion To Oppose Plaintiff's Propo sed Class Certification or To Stay Class Certification Pending Resolution of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, DENYING as moot 157 Motion to Amend/Correct 82 MOTION to Certify Class, and DENYING as moot 129 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The case is CLOSED and judgment will be entered accordingly. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 12/17/2018. (bak)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 11/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 11/6/2017. (sgp)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 9/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER DENYING 39 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 9/29/2017. (bak)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/8/2016, Entered: None
        NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas J. Lech on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Lech, Thomas) (Entered: 03/08/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/8/2016, Entered: None
          NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin P. Green on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Green, Kevin) (Entered: 03/08/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/8/2016, Entered: None
            NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas P. Rosenfeld on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Rosenfeld, Thomas) (Entered: 03/08/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank 1 Filed: 3/8/2016, Entered: None
              COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-2881348.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rosenfeld, Thomas) (Entered: 03/08/2016)
              LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 360 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?