Jackson v. Alaska AL Inc, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:01-cv-09966
District Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 9, 2017 at 2:03 PM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Phillip S Jackson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Factor & Lake Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/18/2002 MICHEAL D. LAKE

Toggle Switch Represented by Flachsbart & Greenspoon, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William W. Flachsbart +1 312 551 9500 +1 312 551 9501 wwf@fg-law.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert P. Greenspoon +1 312 431 3800 +1 312 551 9501 rpg@fg-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/18/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bradford P. Lyerla +1 312 923 2613 +1 312 923 2713 blyerla@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Neal Gerber & Eisenberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/18/2002 James P. Muraff +1 312 269 8000 +1 312 246 1747 jmuraff@ngelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Niro, Scavone, Haller & Niro, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dean D. Niro +1 312 236 0733 +1 312 236 3137 dniro@nshn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Raymond P Niro, Sr. +1 312 236 0733 +1 312 236 3137 rniro@nshn.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wallenstein Wagner & Rockey, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/18/2002 Gerry R Fischer +1 312 554 3300
v.
No Logo Alaska Airlines, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Aloha Airlines, Inc., Defendant
No Logo America West Holdings Corporation, Defendant
American Airlines, Inc. American Airlines, Inc., Defendant
AMR Corporation Unknown Role, AMR Corporation
Unknown Role, Orbitz Inc
Continental Airlines, Inc. Continental Airlines, Inc., Defendant
Delta Air Lines, Inc. Delta Air Lines, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Orbitz Inc
Unknown Role, Clear Secure, Inc.
No Logo Frontier Airlines, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Hawaiian Airlines, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Midwest Express Holdings, Inc., Defendant
No Logo National Airlines, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Northwest Airlines Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Spirit Airlines, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Trans World Airlines, Inc., Defendant
US Airways Group, Inc. US Airways Group, Inc., Defendant
United Airlines, Inc. United Airlines, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Vanguard Airlines, Inc., Defendant
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/17/2002, Entered: None
MINUTE ORDER of 6/17/02 by Hon. Rebecca R. Pallmeyer : The above cause is dismissed without prejudice. Status hearing set for 6/26/02 stricken terminating case . Mailed notice (yp) (Entered: 06/18/2002)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/14/2002, Entered: None
    NOTICE OF DISMISSAL OF CASE by plaintiff. (yp) (Entered: 06/18/2002)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/9/2002, Entered: None
      ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for plaintiff by Raymond P. Niro, Dean D. Niro, Robert P. Greenspoon, William W. Flachsbart. (yp) (Entered: 05/10/2002)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/18/2002, Entered: None
        MINUTE ORDER of 4/18/02 by Hon. Rebecca R. Pallmeyer : Plaintiff's motion for leave to withdraw as attorney's of record Bradford P. Lyerla, Michael D. Lake, James P. Muraff and Gerry R. Fischer [4-1] and substitute attorney is granted [4-2]. Plaintiff to retain substitute counsel within 21 days. Date for service extended to 6/14/02 to permit ongoing settlement negotiations. Status hearing held and continued to 5/23/02 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (yp) (Entered: 04/19/2002)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/2/2002, Entered: None
          AMENDED NOTICE by plaintiff of motion regarding motion for leave to withdraw as attorney's of record Bradford P. Lyerla, D. Lake, James P. Muraff and Gerry R. Fischer [4-1], and substitute attorney [4-2]. (yp) (Entered: 04/19/2002)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/25/2002, Entered: None
            MOTION by plaintiff Phillip S Jackson for leave to withdraw as attorney's of record Bradford P. Lyerla, Michael D. Lake, James P. Muraff and Gerry R. Fischer , and to substitute attorney ; Notice. (yp) (Entered: 04/19/2002)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/20/2002, Entered: None
              REPORT by plaintiff of parties planning meeting. (yp) (Entered: 02/25/2002)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/28/2001, Entered: None
                NOTICE by plaintiff of claim involving a patent. (hp) (Entered: 01/02/2002)
                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/28/2001, Entered: None
                  COMPLAINT (Attachment); jury demand - Civil cover sheet - Appearance(s) of Bradford P. Lyerla, Micheal D. Lake, James Perry Muraff, Gerry R Fischer as attorney(s) for plaintiff (Sixteen original and sixteen copies summons(es) issued.) ( Documents: 1-1 through 1-3) (hp) (Entered: 01/02/2002)
                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 49 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?