Micron Technology v. Mosel Vitelic Corp, et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit Idaho District Court, Case No. 1:98-cv-00293
District Judge Larry M. Boyle, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Larry M. Boyle
Last Updated January 16, 2017 at 1:52 AM EST (8.3 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Micron Technology, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Greener Burke Shoemaker PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Loras Glynn +1 208 319 2600 +1 208 319 2601 dglynn@greenerlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard H Greener +1 208 319 2600 +1 208 319 2601 rgreener@greenerlaw.com

Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Kenneth Callahan +1 312 862 2000 +1 312 862 2200 david.callahan@kirkland.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth J Dyer
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry F. Irwin +1 312 861 2423 +1 312 861 2423 birwin@kirkland.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Russell Evan Levine +1 312 861 2466 +1 312 861 2200 rlevine@kirkland.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey D. Mills +1 312 861 2000
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rita Mirman +1 312 861 2000
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Frederick Paschke +1 312 861 2000 +1 312 861 2200
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marcus Edward Sernel +1 312 861 2000 +1 312 861 2200 msernel@kirkland.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William A. Streff, Jr. +1 312 861 2000 +1 312 861 2200 wstreff@kirkland.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer Anderson Van Kirk +1 312 861 2000 +8612 861 861 2200

Represented by Moffatt Thomas Barrett Rock & Fields, Chartered

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kirk R Helvie +1 208 345 2000
No Logo Mosel Vitelic Corporation, Counter-Claimant

Represented by Christian Dean Collins

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul L Westberg +1 208 336 5200 +1 208 336 2121 lwestberg@wmclegal.com

Represented by Skjerven Morrill MacPherson Franklin & Friel LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bryan K Anderson +1 408 453 9200 +1 408 453 7979
No Logo Mosel Vitelic, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Represented by Christian Dean Collins

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul L Westberg +1 208 336 5200 +1 208 336 2121 lwestberg@wmclegal.com

Represented by Skjerven Morrill MacPherson Franklin & Friel LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bryan K Anderson +1 408 453 9200 +1 408 453 7979
v.
No Logo Mosel Vitelic Corporation, Defendant

Represented by Christian Dean Collins

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul L Westberg +1 208 336 5200 +1 208 336 2121 lwestberg@wmclegal.com

Represented by McDermott, Will & Emery, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George L Hampton, IV +1 949 851 0633
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Robert O'Neill +1 949 851 0633 +1 949 851 9348 moneill@mwe.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David M. Stein +1 949 851 0633 dstein@mwe.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James M Whitelaw +1 949 851 0633

Represented by Skjerven Morrill MacPherson Franklin & Friel LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bryan K Anderson +1 408 453 9200 +1 408 453 7979
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward V Anderson +1 408 453 9200
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven M Levitan +1 408 453 9200 +1 408 453 9200
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alan H. Mac Pherson +1 408 283 1222
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert B Morrill +1 408 453 9200
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Edward Parsons +1 408 453 9200
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Maria S Spustek +1 408 453 9200
No Logo Mosel Vitelic, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Christian Dean Collins

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul L Westberg +1 208 336 5200 +1 208 336 2121 lwestberg@wmclegal.com

Represented by McDermott, Will & Emery, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George L Hampton, IV +1 949 851 0633
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Fay Edwin Morisseau +1 949 851 0633 +1 949 851 9348 fmorisseau@mwe.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Robert O'Neill +1 949 851 0633 +1 949 851 9348 moneill@mwe.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David M. Stein +1 949 851 0633 dstein@mwe.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James M Whitelaw +1 949 851 0633

Represented by Skjerven Morrill MacPherson Franklin & Friel LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bryan K Anderson +1 408 453 9200 +1 408 453 7979
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward V Anderson +1 408 453 9200
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven M Levitan +1 408 453 9200 +1 408 453 9200
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alan H. Mac Pherson +1 408 283 1222
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert B Morrill +1 408 453 9200
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Edward Parsons +1 408 453 9200
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Maria S Spustek +1 408 453 9200
No Logo Micron Technology, Inc., Counter-Defendant

Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry F. Irwin +1 312 861 2423 +1 312 861 2423 birwin@kirkland.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Russell Evan Levine +1 312 861 2466 +1 312 861 2200 rlevine@kirkland.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Frederick Paschke +1 312 861 2000 +1 312 861 2200
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William A. Streff, Jr. +1 312 861 2000 +1 312 861 2200 wstreff@kirkland.com

Represented by Moffatt Thomas Barrett Rock & Fields, Chartered

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kirk R Helvie +1 208 345 2000
Attributes
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 145
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
Timeline
  Entries (151) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 4/20/2000, Entered: None
ORDER by Magistrate Larry M. Boyle granting stipulation for dismissal with prejudice [150-1] dismissing case with prejudice , each party to bear their own costs and fees (cc: all counsel) (wm)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 4/13/2000, Entered: None
STIPULATION for dismissal with prejudice (wm) (Entered: 04/14/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 3/30/2000, Entered: None
NOTICE OF VACATING HEARING ; Teleconf set for 4/6/00 is vacated (cc: all counsel) (wm)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 2/14/2000, Entered: None
SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by pla (wm) (Entered: 02/15/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Sealed Legal Document 147 Filed: 2/14/2000, Entered: None
EXHIBITS by def to revised scheduling conference notice [146-1], filed under seal (wm)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 2/14/2000, Entered: None
REVISED SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT by def (wm)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 2/4/2000, Entered: None
MINUTES OF STATUS CONFERENCE - ; Teleconf deferred until 4/6/00 at 9:30 ; Case Mgmt ddl set for 2/14/00 for parties to submit revised scheduling conference forms LMB (wm)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 2/3/2000, Entered: None
SUPPLEMENTAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by defs (wm)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 1/27/2000, Entered: None
MINUTES OF STATUS CONFERENCE - ; Teleconf deferred until 2/4/00 at 9:30 , paries shall advise court of status of case at conference, finding moot the motion for scheduling and status conference [128-1] LMB (wm) (Entered: 02/02/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 1/21/2000, Entered: None
SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by pla (wm)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 1/20/2000, Entered: None
SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATMENT - PROPOSED TRIAL SCHEDULE by defendant in 1:98-cv-00293 (wm) Modified on 02/02/2000 (Entered: 01/21/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 12/27/1999, Entered: None
NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE ; Telephonic Status Conference set for 9:30 1/27/00 before LMB in Boise (wm) (Entered: 12/29/1999)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 12/13/1999, Entered: None
NOTICE by def of change of address 1:98-cv-00294 of change of address (wm) (Entered: 12/14/1999)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 11/9/1999, Entered: None
REPLY by pla to response to motion for scheduling and status conference [128-1] (wm) (Entered: 11/10/1999)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 11/5/1999, Entered: None
ORDER granting motion for attorney Kenneth J Dyer to appear pro hac vice [136-1] (cc: all counsel) (wm)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 11/3/1999, Entered: None
MOTION by pla for attorney Kenneth J Dyer to appear pro hac vice (wm) (Entered: 11/05/1999)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 11/5/1999, Entered: None
ORDER granting motion for attorney Marcus E Sernel to appear pro hac vice [134-1] (cc: all counsel) (wm)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 11/3/1999, Entered: None
MOTION by pla for attorney Marcus E Sernel to appear pro hac vice (wm) (Entered: 11/05/1999)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 10/26/1999, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of George L. Hampton, IV in support of motion response [132-1] (wm) (Entered: 10/27/1999)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 10/26/1999, Entered: None
RESPONSE by defendant to memorandum in support of motion for scheduling and status conference [128-1] (wm) (Entered: 10/27/1999)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 10/12/1999, Entered: None
ORDER by Magistrate Larry M. Boyle denying motion for expedited hearing on motion to compel and for sanctions [110-1], granting motion to compel responses to discovery [106-1], denying motion request for sanctions [106-2] (cc: all counsel) (wm) (Entered: 10/13/1999)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 10/12/1999, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Richard H. Greener regarding motion for scheduling and status conference [128-1] (wm) (Entered: 10/13/1999)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 10/12/1999, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by pla in support of motion for scheduling and status conference [128-1] (wm) (Entered: 10/13/1999)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 10/12/1999, Entered: None
MOTION by pla for scheduling and status conference (wm) (Entered: 10/13/1999)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 8/23/1999, Entered: None
REPLY by pla re: [123-1] (wm) (Entered: 08/24/1999)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 8/9/1999, Entered: None
RESPONSE by dft to supplemental memorandum in support of request for status conference and setting of a trial date [123-1] (wm) (Entered: 08/10/1999)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Sealed Legal Document 125 Filed: 7/22/1999, Entered: None
SECOND AFFIDAVIT of counsel regarding supplemental memorandum in support [123-1], filed under seal (wm) (Entered: 07/23/1999)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 7/22/1999, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Richard H. Greener in support of plas supplemental memorandum in support of request for status conference [123-1] (wm) (Entered: 07/23/1999)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 7/22/1999, Entered: None
SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by pla re request [102-1] (wm) (Entered: 07/23/1999)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 7/8/1999, Entered: None
NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY, by pla with attorney Richard H Greener, Daniel L Glynn (wm) (Entered: 07/09/1999)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 7/6/1999, Entered: None
APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE - dft represented by James M Whitelaw ww (wm)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 6/2/1999, Entered: None
REPLY by pla to response to motion to compel responses to discovery [106-1], motion request for sanctions [106-2], exhibit A to this reply is sealed and not scanned in (wm) (Entered: 06/03/1999)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 5/20/1999, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Michael R. O'Neill in support of motion response [118-1] (wm) (Entered: 05/21/1999)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 5/20/1999, Entered: None
OPPOSITION by dft to motion to compel responses to discovery [106-1] (wm) (Entered: 05/21/1999)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 5/14/1999, Entered: None
REPLY by pla to response to motion for expedited hearing on motion to compel and for sanctions [110-1] (wm) (Entered: 05/17/1999)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 5/14/1999, Entered: None
APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE - dft represented by Fay Edwin Morisseau ww (wm)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 5/14/1999, Entered: None
APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE - dft represented by David M Stein ww (wm)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 5/14/1999, Entered: None
APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE - dft represented by George L Hampton IV ww (wm)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 5/14/1999, Entered: None
APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE - dft represented by Michael R O'Neill ww (wm)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 5/11/1999, Entered: None
DECLARATION by dft in support of motion response [111-1] (wm) (Entered: 05/12/1999)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 5/11/1999, Entered: None
OPPOSITION by dft to motion for expedited hearing on motion to compel and for sanctions [110-1] (wm) (Entered: 05/12/1999)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 5/6/1999, Entered: None
MOTION by pla for expedited hearing on motion to compel and for sanctions (wm)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 5/6/1999, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of John F. Paschke regarding motion to compel responses to discovery [106-1], regarding motion request for sanctions [106-2] (wm)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 5/6/1999, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Russell E. Levine regarding motion to compel responses to discovery [106-1], regarding motion request for sanctions [106-2] (wm)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 5/6/1999, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by pla in support of motion to compel responses to discovery [106-1], of motion request for sanctions [106-2] (wm)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 5/6/1999, Entered: None
MOTION by pla to compel responses to discovery , and request for sanctions (wm)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 4/27/1999, Entered: None
REPLY by pla to response to plas request for status conference (wm) (Entered: 04/29/1999)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 4/22/1999, Entered: None
RESPONSE by dft to request for status conference [102-1] (wm) (Entered: 04/23/1999)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 4/12/1999, Entered: None
PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Larry M. Boyle : (cc: all counsel) (wm) (Entered: 04/13/1999)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 4/8/1999, Entered: None
REQUEST by pla for status conference and the setting of a trial date (wm)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 3/31/1999, Entered: None
ORDER by Magistrate Larry M. Boyle granting in part and denying in part motion to stay this action [17-1] denying motion for more definite statement [26-2], granting motion for protective order re: confidential information [49-1], granting motion to compel responses to interrogs [54-1], granting in part and denying in part motion for protective order re: depositions [70-1] denying motion for protective order re: counsels access to confidential materials [92-1] (cc: all counsel) (wm)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 3/4/1999, Entered: None
NOTICE by pla to court concerning plas motion for protective order re: confidential information [49-1] (wm) (Entered: 03/05/1999)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 2/12/1999, Entered: None
REPLY by dft to response to motion for protective order re: counsels access to confidential materials [92-1] (wm)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 2/2/1999, Entered: None
REPLY by pla to response to motion for protective order re: confidential information [49-1] (wm) (Entered: 02/03/1999)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 1/25/1999, Entered: None
REPLY by dft to response to motion for protective order re: depositions [70-1] (wm) (Entered: 01/26/1999)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 1/25/1999, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Robert B. Morrill in support of motion for protective order re: depositions [70-1] (wm) (Entered: 01/26/1999)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 1/19/1999, Entered: None
OPPOSITION by dft to motion for protective order re: confidential information [49-1] (wm) (Entered: 01/20/1999)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 1/19/1999, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Robert B. Morill in support of motion for protective order re: counsels access to confidential materials [92-1] (wm) (Entered: 01/20/1999)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 1/19/1999, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by dft in support of motion for protective order re: counsels access to confidential materials [92-1] (wm) (Entered: 01/20/1999)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 1/19/1999, Entered: None
MOTION by dfts for protective order re: counsels access to confidential materials (wm) (Entered: 01/20/1999)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 1/14/1999, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Russell E. Levine in support of opposition to dfts motion for protective order [89-1] (wm)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 1/11/1999, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Russell E. Levine in support of plas motion response [89-1] (wm) (Entered: 01/12/1999)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 1/11/1999, Entered: None
OPPOSITION by pla to motion for protective order re: depositions [70-1] (wm) (Entered: 01/12/1999)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 1/11/1999, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Robert B. Morrill in support of response [86-1], in accordian file (wm)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 1/11/1999, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Rajit Shah re response [86-1] (wm)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 1/11/1999, Entered: None
OPPOSITION by dft to plas motion to allow discovery to proceed [67-1] (wm)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 1/7/1999, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Russell E. Levine (wm) (Entered: 01/08/1999)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 1/5/1999, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of W. David Westergard in support of plas motion for protective order re: confidential information [49-1] (wm) (Entered: 01/08/1999)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 1/5/1999, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Russell E. Levine in support of revised memorandum [82-1] (wm) (Entered: 01/08/1999)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 1/5/1999, Entered: None
REVISED MEMORANDUM by pla in support of motion for protective order re: confidential information [49-1], in accordian file (wm) (Entered: 01/08/1999)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 12/31/1998, Entered: None
ORDER by Magistrate Larry M. Boyle granting motion to expedite hearing on motion to allow discovery to proceed [76-1], denying in part the motion to allow discovery to proceed [67-1] (cc: all counsel) (wm) (Entered: 01/08/1999)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 12/30/1998, Entered: None
ORDER by Magistrate Mikel H. Williams, consolidating lead case 98-293 with member case 98-294, Case reassigned to Magistrate Larry M. Boyle finding moot the motion to stay this action [21-1] (cc: all counsel) (wm) (Entered: 01/08/1999)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 12/30/1998, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Russell E. Levine (wm) (Entered: 12/31/1998)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 12/30/1998, Entered: None
EMERGENCY MINUTES OF STATUS CONFERENCE MOTION - granting in part and deffering in part motion to allow discovery to proceed [67-1] granting motion to expedite hearing on motion to allow discovery to proceed [76-1] LMB (wm) (Entered: 12/31/1998)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 12/29/1998, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Kirk R. Helvie in support of motion to expedite hearing on motion to allow discovery to proceed [76-1] (wm)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 12/29/1998, Entered: None
MOTION by pla to expedite hearing on motion to allow discovery to proceed (wm)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 12/29/1998, Entered: None
NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE ; Status Conference set for 10:00 12/30/98 before LMB in Boise (wm)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 12/29/1998, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Maria S. Spustek in support of motion for protective order re: depositions [70-1] (wm)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 12/28/1998, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Bryan K. Anderson in support of motion for protective order re: depositions [70-1], in accordian file (wm) (Entered: 12/29/1998)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 12/28/1998, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of William D. Collins regarding motion for protective order re: depositions [70-1] (wm) (Entered: 12/29/1998)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 12/28/1998, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by dfts in support of motion for protective order re: depositions [70-1] (wm) (Entered: 12/29/1998)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 12/28/1998, Entered: None
MOTION by dfts for protective order re: depositions (wm) (Entered: 12/29/1998)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 12/28/1998, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Russell E. Levine regarding motion to allow discovery to proceed [67-1] (wm) (Entered: 12/29/1998)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 12/28/1998, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by pla in support of motion to allow discovery to proceed [67-1] (wm) (Entered: 12/29/1998)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 12/28/1998, Entered: None
MOTION by pla to allow discovery to proceed (wm) (Entered: 12/29/1998)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 12/22/1998, Entered: None
ORDER by Magistrate Larry M. Boyle granting stipulation for extension of briefing schedule [64-1] (cc: all (wm) (Entered: 12/23/1998)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 12/21/1998, Entered: None
REPLY by pla to response to motion to compel responses to interrogs [54-1] (dkh) (Entered: 12/22/1998)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 12/17/1998, Entered: None
STIPULATION for extension of briefing schedule (wm) (Entered: 12/18/1998)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 12/10/1998, Entered: None
ORDER by Magistrate Larry M. Boyle granting stipulation that the unopposed motion for extension of time may be granted [60-1], granting motion to extend time to respond to motion for protective order [59-1] motion for protective order re: confidential information [49-1] ; Response to motion ddl extended to 12/17/98 (cc: all counsel) (wm) (Entered: 12/11/1998)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 12/7/1998, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Bryan K. Anderson in support of motion response [61-1] (wm) (Entered: 12/08/1998)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 12/7/1998, Entered: None
RESPONSE by dft to motion to compel responses to interrogs [54-1] (wm) (Entered: 12/08/1998)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 12/2/1998, Entered: None
STIPULATION that the unopposed motion for extension of time may be granted (wm) (Entered: 12/03/1998)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 12/2/1998, Entered: None
UNOPPOSED MOTION by dfts to extend time to respond to motion for protective order (wm) (Entered: 12/03/1998)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 11/25/1998, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by dft regarding supplemental declaration of Bryan K. Anderson (wm) (Entered: 11/30/1998)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 11/25/1998, Entered: None
SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION of Bryan K. Anderson re; motion to stay this action [17-1] (wm) (Entered: 11/30/1998)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 11/20/1998, Entered: None
ORDER by Magistrate Larry M. Boyle granting motion to extend time to respond to motion for protective order [53-1], motion for protective order re: confidential information [49-1] ; Response to motion ddl extended to 12/3/98 (cc: all counsel) (wm) (Entered: 11/23/1998)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 11/20/1998, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by pla in support of motion to compel responses to interrogs [54-1] (wm) (Entered: 11/23/1998)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 11/20/1998, Entered: None
MOTION by pla to compel responses to interrogs (wm) (Entered: 11/23/1998)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 11/19/1998, Entered: None
UNOPPOSED MOTION by dfts to extend time to respond to motion for protective order (wm)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 11/19/1998, Entered: None
STIPULATION that the dfts unopposed motion for extension of time filed 11/18/98 be granted (wm)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 11/5/1998, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of W. David Westergard in support of plas motion for protective order re: confidential information [49-1] (wm) (Entered: 11/06/1998)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 11/5/1998, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by pla in support of motion for protective order re: confidential information [49-1] (wm) (Entered: 11/06/1998)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 11/5/1998, Entered: None
MOTION by pla for protective order re: confidential information (wm) (Entered: 11/06/1998)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/28/1998, Entered: None
REPLY by pla to response to motion to strike from dfts Mosel's answer and counterclaim affirmative defenses alleging unenforceability [26-1], motion for more definite statement [26-2] (wm) (Entered: 10/30/1998)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/28/1998, Entered: None
ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM [38-1] by counter-dft Micron Technology (wm) (Entered: 10/30/1998)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/29/1998, Entered: None
APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE - Mosel Vitelic Corp, Mosel Vitelic, Inc. represented by Alan H MacPerson ww (wm)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/29/1998, Entered: None
APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE - Mosel Vitelic Corp, Mosel Vitelic, Inc. represented by Robert B Morrill ww (wm)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/23/1998, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by dft regarding reply brief in support of motion for stay and declarations in support (wm) (Entered: 10/26/1998)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/23/1998, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Maria S. Spustek in support of motion to stay this action [17-1] (wm) (Entered: 10/26/1998)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/23/1998, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Bryan K. Anderson in support of motion to stay this action [17-1] (wm) (Entered: 10/26/1998)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/23/1998, Entered: None
REPLY by dft to response to motion to stay this action [17-1] (wm) (Entered: 10/26/1998)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/5/1998, Entered: None
MINUTES OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - taking under advisement on 10/5/98 the motion to stay this action [17-1] ; Teleconf held 10/5/98 LMB (wm) (Entered: 10/23/1998)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/16/1998, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by dft regarding opposition to plas motion to strike and first amended answer (wm) (Entered: 10/19/1998)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/14/1998, Entered: None
AMENDED ANSWER [11-1] by dft; jury demand (wm) (Entered: 10/15/1998)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/14/1998, Entered: None
OPPOSITION by dft to motion to strike from dfts Mosel's answer and counterclaim affirmative defenses alleging unenforceability [26-1], motion for more definite statement [26-2] (wm) (Entered: 10/15/1998)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/9/1998, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by pla in opposition re: motion to stay this action [17-1], in accordian file (wm) Modified on 10/13/1998 (Entered: 10/13/1998)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/1/1998, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by dft regarding proposed scheduling and litigation plan (wm) (Entered: 10/02/1998)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/1/1998, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Bryan K. Anderson in support of dfts notice [33-1] (wm) (Entered: 10/02/1998)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/1/1998, Entered: None
PROPOSED SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by dft (wm) (Entered: 10/02/1998)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/1/1998, Entered: None
CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE U.S. MAGISTRATE by dfts (wm) (Entered: 10/02/1998)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/2/1998, Entered: None
ORDER granting motion for attorney Jeffrey A. Streff, Jr. to appear pro hac vice [30-1], granting motion for Jeffrey D Mills to appear pro hac vice [29-1], granting motion for attorney Jennifer Anderson Van Kirk to appear pro hac vice [28-1] (cc: all counsel) (wm)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/30/1998, Entered: None
MOTION by pla for attorney Jeffrey A. Streff, Jr. to appear pro hac vice (wm) (Entered: 10/02/1998)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/30/1998, Entered: None
MOTION by pla for attorney Jeffrey D Mills to appear pro hac vice (wm) (Entered: 10/02/1998)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/30/1998, Entered: None
MOTION by pla for attorney Jennifer Anderson Van Kirk to appear pro hac vice (wm) (Entered: 10/02/1998)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/30/1998, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by pla in support of motion to strike from dfts Mosel's answer and counterclaim affirmative defenses alleging unenforceability [26-1], of motion for more definite statement [26-2], in accordian file (wm) (Entered: 10/01/1998)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/30/1998, Entered: None
MOTION by pla to strike from dfts Mosel's answer and counterclaim affirmative defenses alleging unenforceability , or for more definite statement (wm) (Entered: 10/01/1998)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/30/1998, Entered: None
ORDER granting motions for attorneys Russell E. Levine [24-1] David K Callahan [23-1] Rita Mirman [22-1] and John F. Paschke to appear pro hac vice [21-1] (cc: all counsel) (wm)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/29/1998, Entered: None
MOTION by pla for attorney Russell E. Levine to appear pro hac vice (wm) (Entered: 09/30/1998)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/29/1998, Entered: None
MOTION by pla for attorney David K Callahan to appear pro hac vice (wm) (Entered: 09/30/1998)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/29/1998, Entered: None
MOTION by pla for attorney Rita Mirman to appear pro hac vice (wm) (Entered: 09/30/1998)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/29/1998, Entered: None
MOTION by pla for attorney John F. Paschke to appear pro hac vice (wm) (Entered: 09/30/1998)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/28/1998, Entered: None
SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by pla Micron Technology (dkh) (Entered: 09/29/1998)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/28/1998, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Alan H. MacPherson in support of dfts motion to stay this action [17-1], in accordian file (wm)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/28/1998, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by dft in support of motion to stay this action [17-1] (wm)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/28/1998, Entered: None
MOTION by dfts to stay this action (wm)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/25/1998, Entered: None
APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE - dft represented by Steven M Levitan WW (wm)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/25/1998, Entered: None
APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE - dft represented by Edward V Anderson ww (wm)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/25/1998, Entered: None
APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE - dft represented by James E Parsons ww (wm)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/25/1998, Entered: None
APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE - dft represented by Maria S Spustek ww (wm)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/21/1998, Entered: None
NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE ; Telephonic Status Conference set for 11:00 10/5/98 before LMB in Boise (wm)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/11/1998, Entered: None
ANSWER to complaint [2-1] and COUNTERCLAIM; jury demand by dfts against pla Micron Technology (wm) (Entered: 09/14/1998)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/3/1998, Entered: None
APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE - dft represented by Bryan K Anderson ww (wm) (Entered: 09/11/1998)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/26/1998, Entered: None
CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE U.S. MAGISTRATE by dft (wm) (Entered: 08/27/1998)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/26/1998, Entered: None
CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE U.S. MAGISTRATE by pla (wm) (Entered: 08/27/1998)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/14/1998, Entered: None
ORDER by Magistrate Larry M. Boyle granting stipulation for extension of time to answer [6-1] ; Case Mgmt ddl set for 9/10/98 (cc: all counsel) (dkh)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/12/1998, Entered: None
STIPULATION for extension of time to answer (wm) Modified on 08/13/1998
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/31/1998, Entered: None
RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS executed upon dft Mosel Vitelic, Inc. on 7/22/98 (wm) (Entered: 08/03/1998)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/31/1998, Entered: None
RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS executed upon dft Mosel Vitelic Corp on 7/22/98 (wm) (Entered: 08/03/1998)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/31/1998, Entered: None
RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS executed upon dft Mosel Vitelic Corp on 7/22/98 (wm) (Entered: 08/03/1998)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/20/1998, Entered: None
AMENDED COMPLAINT [1-1] by plaintiff; jury demand; adding Mosel Vitelic, Inc. as defendant (jml) (Entered: 07/21/1998)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/17/1998, Entered: None
COMPLAINT (Summons(es) issued) (jml) (Entered: 07/21/1998)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 55 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?