Creek Co Ltd v. Ross, et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit Idaho District Court, Case No. 1:91-cv-00314
District Judge Marion J. Callister, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Marion J. Callister
Last Updated January 16, 2017 at 2:58 AM EST (8.3 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Creek Company Ltd, The, Plaintiff

Represented by Dykas & Shaver, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TTAB Attorney Placeholder +1 208 327 8900 frank@dykaslaw.com

Represented by Office Of The United States Attorney, Eastern District Of Virginia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amy S Howe +1 208 334 1211 +1 208 334 9375 amy.howe@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo John Does, Defendant
No Logo Peter L Ross, Defendant

Represented by EVANS KEANE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin David Grimes +1 208 384 1800

Represented by Gerber Ritchey & O'Banion

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Patrick O'Banion +1 916 971 1010

Represented by Jones & Swartz PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce C Jones +1 208 489 8989 +1 208 489 8988 bruce@jonesandswartzlaw.com

Represented by Law Offices of Patrick H Dwyer

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick H Dwyer
Attributes
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1125
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
Timeline
  Entries (48) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/31/1991, Entered: None
SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIDAVIT of Chris Terry (al)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/8/1991, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Donald Brown (al) (Entered: 10/31/1991)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/8/1991, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Peter Ross regarding motion to disqualify counsel for plaintiff [4-1] (al) (Entered: 10/31/1991)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/8/1991, Entered: None
SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIDAVIT of Julie Scott (al) (Entered: 10/31/1991)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/8/1991, Entered: None
SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIDAVIT of Dorothy Stoneman (al) (Entered: 10/31/1991)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/8/1991, Entered: None
SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIDAVIT of Linda Manning (al) (Entered: 10/31/1991)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/30/1991, Entered: None
ORDER by Honorable Marion J. Callister re [7-1] Case transferred to Dist of: Oregon all pending motions in abeyance to be resolved in Dist of Oregon (cc: all counsel) (al) (Entered: 10/31/1991)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/31/1991, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM DECISION by Honorable Marion J. Callister (al)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/23/1991, Entered: None
WITHDRAWAL of request for oral argument (al)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/22/1991, Entered: None
MOTION by defendant Peter L Ross to strike supplemental afdt of Frank Dykas (al) (Entered: 10/23/1991)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/21/1991, Entered: None
RESPONSE by defendant Peter L Ross to plaintiffs request for hearing on dfts mo to disqualify (al) (Entered: 10/23/1991)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/18/1991, Entered: None
SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIDAVIT of Wilson Creek (al) (Entered: 10/21/1991)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/18/1991, Entered: None
ORDER by Honorable Marion J. Callister granting motion to extend time to respond to interrogs [34-1] to 14 days from courts determination of dfts mo to dismiss and mo to disqualify counsel. (cc: all counsel) (al) (Entered: 10/21/1991)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/16/1991, Entered: None
REQUEST by plaintiff Creek Co Ltd for oral argument (al) (Entered: 10/21/1991)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/16/1991, Entered: None
MOTION by defendant Peter L Ross to extend time to respond to interrogs (al) (Entered: 10/21/1991)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/15/1991, Entered: None
REPLY by defendant Peter L Ross re: motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction [7-1] (al) (Entered: 10/16/1991)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/11/1991, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Kenneth Zuercher (al) (Entered: 10/16/1991)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/11/1991, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Vicki Mills (al) (Entered: 10/16/1991)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/11/1991, Entered: None
REPLY by defendant Peter L Ross to response to motion to disqualify counsel for plaintiff [4-1] (al) (Entered: 10/16/1991)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/1/1991, Entered: None
ORDER by Honorable Marion J. Callister granting motion to extend time to respond to dft's motion to dismiss, motion to strike, and motion to disqualify [14-1] granting motion to expedite disposition of dft's motion to disqualify counsel for pf, motion to dismiss and motion to strike [15-1] The court shall examine the reply to pla response as soon as filed and shall resolve the pending mo on an expedited basis. (cc: all counsel) (al) (Entered: 10/02/1991)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/1/1991, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Edward Bird (al) (Entered: 10/02/1991)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/1/1991, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Wilson Creek (al) (Entered: 10/02/1991)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/1/1991, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Mary E. Smith (al) (Entered: 10/02/1991)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/1/1991, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Jennifer Peters (al) (Entered: 10/02/1991)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/1/1991, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Frank J. Dykas (al) (Entered: 10/02/1991)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/1/1991, Entered: None
RESPONSE by plaintiff Creek Co Ltd to motion to disqualify counsel for plaintiff [4-1] (al) (Entered: 10/02/1991)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/1/1991, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by plaintiff Creek Co Ltd to motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction [7-1], motion to strike certain portions of the complaint as immaterial [7-2] (al) (Entered: 10/02/1991)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/30/1991, Entered: None
CORRECTION to Plaintiffs Objection to expedite procedure. John P. O'Banion not Patrick Dwyer, filed the exhibit attached to pla objection. (al)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/23/1991, Entered: None
OBJECTION by plaintiff Creek Co Ltd to motion to expedite disposition of dft's motion to disqualify counsel for pf, motion to dismiss and motion to strike [15-1] (al) (Entered: 09/30/1991)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/25/1991, Entered: None
RESPONSE by defendant Peter L Ross to plf's objection to dft's motion for an expedited disposition (mn) (Entered: 09/26/1991)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/24/1991, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by defendant Peter L Ross in support of motion for sanctions against plf's counsel, Frank J. Dykas for refusing to withdraw due to a conflict of interest [17-1] (mn) (Entered: 09/26/1991)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/24/1991, Entered: None
MOTION by defendant Peter L Ross for sanctions against plf's counsel, Frank J. Dykas for refusing to withdraw due to a conflict of interest (mn) (Entered: 09/26/1991)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/23/1991, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by defendant Peter L Ross to motion to extend time to respond to dft's motion to dismiss, motion to strike, motion to disqualify [14-1] (mn) (Entered: 09/26/1991)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/20/1991, Entered: None
MOTION by defendant Peter L Ross to expedite disposition of dft's motion to disqualify counsel for pf, motion to dismiss and motion to strike (mn) (Entered: 09/25/1991)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/25/1991, Entered: None
MOTION by plaintiff Creek Co Ltd to extend time to respond to dft's motion to dismiss, motion to strike, and motion to disqualify (mn)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/9/1991, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Bruce Jones regarding motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction [7-1] (al) (Entered: 09/10/1991)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/9/1991, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Chris Terry regarding motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction [7-1] (al) (Entered: 09/10/1991)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/9/1991, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Linda Manning regarding motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction [7-1] (al) (Entered: 09/10/1991)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/9/1991, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Julie Scott regarding motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction [7-1] (al) (Entered: 09/10/1991)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/9/1991, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Dorothy Stoneman regarding motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction [7-1] (al) (Entered: 09/10/1991)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/9/1991, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM of points and authorities by defendant in support of motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction [7-1], of motion to strike certain portions of the complaint as immaterial [7-2] (al) (Entered: 09/10/1991)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/9/1991, Entered: None
MOTION by defendant Peter L Ross to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction ,and motion to strike certain portions of the complaint as immaterial (al) (Entered: 09/10/1991)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/9/1991, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Bruce C. Jones (al) (Entered: 09/10/1991)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/9/1991, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM of points and authorities by defendant in support of motion to disqualify counsel for plaintiff [4-1] (al) (Entered: 09/10/1991)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/9/1991, Entered: None
MOTION by defendant Peter L Ross to disqualify counsel for plaintiff (al) (Entered: 09/10/1991)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/29/1991, Entered: None
RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS executed upon defendant Peter L Ross on 8/20/91 (al)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/3/1991, Entered: None
DEMAND for jury trial by plaintiff Creek Co Ltd (al) (Entered: 07/10/1991)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/3/1991, Entered: None
COMPLAINT (Summons(es) issued) (consent notice issued/furnished) (al) (Entered: 07/10/1991)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 34 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?