Minute Man Products, et al v. MacKarvich, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Georgia Northern District Court, Case No. 1:01-cv-01223
District Judge Julie E. Carnes, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 22, 2017 at 5:41 PM EST (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Minute Man Anchors, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Fred Robert Slotkin, Jr. +1 404 370 1041 bobby@slotkincaiola.com

Represented by Flint & Kim

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cort R. Flint, Jr. +1 864 232 4261

Represented by Strickland Brockington Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frank B. Strickland +1 678 347 2200 +1 678 347 2210 fbs@sbllaw.net
No Logo Minute Man Products, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Fred Robert Slotkin, Jr. +1 404 370 1041 bobby@slotkincaiola.com

Represented by Flint & Kim

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cort R. Flint, Jr. +1 864 232 4261

Represented by Strickland Brockington Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frank B. Strickland +1 678 347 2200 +1 678 347 2210 fbs@sbllaw.net
v.
No Logo Charles J. MacKarvich, Defendant

Represented by Porter & Orrison LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J Alexander Porter +1 404 233 2334 aporter@porterorrison.com

Represented by Porter Orrison & Doster

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Simuel F. Doster, Jr. +1 404 233 2334

Represented by Wyche Burgess Freeman & Parham

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/04/2001, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James C Parham, Jr. +1 864 242 8208 jparham@wyche.com
TERMINATED: 06/04/2001, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marshall Winn +1 864 242 8204 +1 864 235 8900 mwinn@wyche.com
No Logo Tie Down, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Porter & Orrison LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J Alexander Porter +1 404 233 2334 aporter@porterorrison.com

Represented by Porter Orrison & Doster

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Simuel F. Doster, Jr. +1 404 233 2334

Represented by Wyche Burgess Freeman & Parham

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/04/2001, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James C Parham, Jr. +1 864 242 8208 jparham@wyche.com
TERMINATED: 06/04/2001, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marshall Winn +1 864 242 8204 +1 864 235 8900 mwinn@wyche.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1338
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/10/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
CONSENT ORDER by Judge Julie E. Carnes, dismissing complaint and counterclaim w/prejudice (cc) (jph) (Entered: 01/11/2002)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/28/2001, Entered: None
    Attorney appearance for plaintiffs by Frank B. Strickland, Fred Robert Slotkin Jr. (jph) (Entered: 10/01/2001)
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/27/2001, Entered: None
      Application for Cort R. Flint Jr. admission of pro hac vice for plaintiffs (jph) (Entered: 07/03/2001)
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/11/2001, Entered: None
        Response by plaintiffs in opposition to [21-1] motion to consolidate cases, [21-2] motion realignment of parties (jph) (Entered: 06/12/2001)
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/4/2001, Entered: None
          Substitution of Counsel for defendants Charles J. MacKarvich and Tie Down, Inc. Attorneys J. Alexander Porter and Simuel F. Doster Jr. replacing attorney James C. Parham and attorney Marshall Winn (jph) (Entered: 06/05/2001)
            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/31/2001, Entered: None
            ANSWERS TO AMENDED INITIAL DISCLOSURES by defendants (slc) (Entered: 06/04/2001)
              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/24/2001, Entered: None
              ANSWER by defendant Charles J. MacKarvich to complaint [1-1] (slc) (Entered: 05/24/2001)
                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/24/2001, Entered: None
                ANSWER by defendant Tie Down, Inc. to complaint [1-1] Discovery ends 10/21/01 (slc) (Entered: 05/24/2001)
                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/24/2001, Entered: None
                  ANSWERS TO INITIAL DISCLOSURES by defendants (fmm) (Entered: 05/25/2001)
                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/24/2001, Entered: None
                    MOTION by defendants to consolidate cases , and realignment of parties with brief in support. (jph) (Entered: 05/24/2001)
                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/10/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                      Certified copy of ORDER by Judge G. Ross Anderson, Jr. transferring action to the USDC ND GA (filed 5/2/01 in USDC SC) (jph) (Entered: 05/18/2001)
                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/10/2001, Entered: None
                        COMPLAINT filed. (filed in USDC SC on 12/12/00) (jph) (Entered: 05/18/2001)
                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 36 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?