Papst Licensing Gmbh v. Benq Corp, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:02-cv-05485
District Judge Amy J. St. Eve, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 6, 2017 at 10:43 PM EST (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Papst Licensing Gmbh & Co. KG, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Partridge Ip Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John L. Ambrogi +1 312 634 9506 +1 312 275 7503 JLA@partridgeiplaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Welsh & Katz, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Wayne Salmon +1 312 655 1500 jsalmon@freebornpeters.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JEROLD B. SCHNAYER, ESQ +1 312 655 1500
v.
No Logo Benq Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Arnstein & Lehr, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Ming Kuo +1 312 876 7151 jmkuo@arnstein.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Connie Robinson for City Council

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Seymour Rothstein +1 312 580 1180

Toggle Switch Represented by Hanson Bridgett Marcus Vlahos & Rudy Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael A. Duncheon +1 415 541 9366

Toggle Switch Represented by Hanson Bridgett, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE TTAB Attorney Placeholder +1 415 777 3200 +1 415 541 9366 gweng@hansonbridgett.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sedgwick LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/21/2002 Anthony John Anscombe +1 312 849 1955 +1 312 641 9530 anthony.anscombe@sedgwicklaw.com
TERMINATED: 01/21/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael B Satz +1 312 641 9050
No Logo Benq Incorporated, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Arnstein & Lehr, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Ming Kuo +1 312 876 7151 jmkuo@arnstein.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Connie Robinson for City Council

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Seymour Rothstein +1 312 580 1180

Toggle Switch Represented by Hanson Bridgett Marcus Vlahos & Rudy Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael A. Duncheon +1 415 541 9366

Toggle Switch Represented by Hanson Bridgett, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE TTAB Attorney Placeholder +1 415 777 3200 +1 415 541 9366 gweng@hansonbridgett.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sedgwick LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/21/2002 Anthony John Anscombe +1 312 849 1955 +1 312 641 9530 anthony.anscombe@sedgwicklaw.com
TERMINATED: 01/21/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael B Satz +1 312 641 9050
No Logo D & H Distributing Co. Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Arnstein & Lehr, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Ming Kuo +1 312 876 7151 jmkuo@arnstein.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Connie Robinson for City Council

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Seymour Rothstein +1 312 580 1180

Toggle Switch Represented by Hanson Bridgett Marcus Vlahos & Rudy Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael A. Duncheon +1 415 541 9366

Toggle Switch Represented by Hanson Bridgett, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE TTAB Attorney Placeholder +1 415 777 3200 +1 415 541 9366 gweng@hansonbridgett.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sedgwick LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/21/2002 Anthony John Anscombe +1 312 849 1955 +1 312 641 9530 anthony.anscombe@sedgwicklaw.com
TERMINATED: 01/21/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael B Satz +1 312 641 9050
Ingram Micro Ingram Micro, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Arnstein & Lehr, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Ming Kuo +1 312 876 7151 jmkuo@arnstein.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Connie Robinson for City Council

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Seymour Rothstein +1 312 580 1180

Toggle Switch Represented by Hanson Bridgett Marcus Vlahos & Rudy Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael A. Duncheon +1 415 541 9366

Toggle Switch Represented by Hanson Bridgett, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE TTAB Attorney Placeholder +1 415 777 3200 +1 415 541 9366 gweng@hansonbridgett.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sedgwick LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/21/2002 Anthony John Anscombe +1 312 849 1955 +1 312 641 9530 anthony.anscombe@sedgwicklaw.com
TERMINATED: 01/21/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael B Satz +1 312 641 9050
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (37) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: None
MINUTE ORDER of 1/22/04 by Hon. Amy J. St. Eve : Parties have reached a settlement. Case dismissed, with leave to reinstate by or on 02/23/04. This Court retains jurisdiction to enforce the terms of the settlement. Status hearing set for 01/27/04 is stricken. Any other pending dates are stricken. Any pending motions are denied as moot. terminating case Mailed notice (jmp) Modified on 01/26/2004 (Entered: 01/23/2004)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/22/2003, Entered: None
    MINUTE ORDER of 12/22/03 by Hon. Amy J. St. Eve : Status hearing held and continued to 01/27/04 at 8:45 a.m. Enter agreed order for protection. Joint claim construction set for 02/11/04. No notice (hp) (Entered: 12/24/2003)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/2/2003, Entered: None
      MINUTE ORDER of 12/2/03 by Hon. Amy J. St. Eve : Status hearing held and continued to 8:45 a.m. 12/22/03. Fact discovery to close 03/26/04. First phase expert reports due 04/26/04. Rebuttal expert reports due 05/26/04. Expert discovery to closed 06/25/04. Parties are to meet pursuant to Rule 26(f) and exhaust all settlement possibilities prior to the next status hearing. Mailed notice (jmp) (Entered: 12/03/2003)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/20/2003, Entered: None
        MINUTE ORDER of 10/20/03 by Hon. Amy J. St. Eve : Status hearing reset from 10/21/03 at 8:45 a.m. to 8:45 a.m. on 11/4/03. Plaintiff's agreed motion to reschedule 10/21/03 status hearing is granted [33-1] and the status is reset to 11/04/03 at 8:45 a.m. (Entered Agreed Order). Mailed notice (jmp) (Entered: 10/21/2003)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/20/2003, Entered: None
          AGREED MOTION by plaintiff to reschedule 10/21/03 status hearing (Attachments); Notice. (jmp) (Entered: 10/21/2003)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/23/2003, Entered: None
            MINUTE ORDER of 9/23/03 by Hon. Amy J. St. Eve : Status hearing reset from 09/25/03 at 9:00 a.m. to 9:00 a.m. on 10/07/03. Papst's agreed motion to reschedule 09/25/03 status hearing is granted [31-1]. Sh reset from 09/24/03 at 9:00 a.m o 10/07/03 at 900 a.m. Status hearing on 09/25/03 is stricken and reset to 10/07/03 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (jmp) (Entered: 09/24/2003)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/19/2003, Entered: None
              AGREED MOTION by plaintiff to reschedule 09/25/03 status hearing (Attachments); Notice. (jmp) (Entered: 09/24/2003)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/8/2003, Entered: None
                ANSWER by defendants to plaintiff's first amended complaint for patent [27-1]; jury demand; Notice. (jmp) (Entered: 08/11/2003)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/30/2003, Entered: None
                  MINUTE ORDER of 7/30/03 by Hon. Amy J. St. Eve : Status hearing held and continued to 8:45 a.m. on 09/25/03. Defendant to answer or otherwise plead by or on 08/08/03. Rule 26(a)(1) supplemental disclosures due 08/22/03. Fact discovery to close 02/27/04. First phase expert reports due 03/26/04. Rebuttal experts due 04/23/04 Expert discovery to close 05/26/04. Mailed notice (jmp) Modified on 07/31/2003 (Entered: 07/31/2003)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/15/2003, Entered: None
                    MINUTE ORDER of 7/15/03 by Hon. Amy J. St. Eve : Status hearing held and continued to 8:45 a.m. on 07/30/03. Plaintiff's oral motion for leave to [26-1], file a first amended complaint is granted [26-2]. Proposed joint revisions to the scheduling order due 07/28/03. Mailed notice (jmp) (Entered: 07/16/2003)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/15/2003, Entered: None
                      FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT for patent infringement [1-1] by plaintiff; jury demand (Attachments). (jmp) (Entered: 07/16/2003)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/15/2003, Entered: None
                        MOTION by plaintiff for leave to file a first amended complaint . (jmp) (Entered: 07/16/2003)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/28/2003, Entered: None
                          MINUTE ORDER of 4/28/03 by Hon. Amy J. St. Eve : Enter protective order pursuant to hearing held on 04/24/03. Defendants' agreed motion for entry of a protective order is granted [24-1]. Parties need leave of court prior to filing any documents under seal. Parties to file a motion to retrieve any documents filed under seal within 60 days after the close of this case. If a party fails to file a motion, any documents under seal will become part f the public record. (Entered Protecvtive Order). Mailed notice (jmp) (Entered: 04/29/2003)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/25/2003, Entered: None
                            AGREED MOTION by defendant for entry of a protective order ; Notice. (jmp) (Entered: 04/29/2003)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/25/2003, Entered: None
                              AMENDED joint report by plaintiff and defendants advising the court of the parties' contentions about the limitations of the claims of the patent in suit that are in dispute; Notice. (jmp) (Entered: 04/28/2003)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/24/2003, Entered: None
                                MINUTE ORDER of 4/24/03 by Hon. Amy J. St. Eve : Status hearing held and continued to 8:45 a.m. on 07/15/03. Plaintiff's agreed motion for entry of a protective order is granted [21-1]. Agreed Protective Order to be submitted to chambers with the changes as indicated in open court. Mailed notice (jmp) (Entered: 04/25/2003)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/17/2003, Entered: None
                                  AGREED MOTION by plaintiff for entry of a protective order (Attachment); Notice. (jmp) Modified on 04/25/2003 (Entered: 04/25/2003)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/16/2003, Entered: None
                                    JOINT REPORT by parties, advising the court of the parties contentions about the limitations of the claims of the patent in suit that are in dispute (Attachment). (jmp) (Entered: 04/21/2003)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/21/2003, Entered: None
                                      MINUTE ORDER of 1/21/03 by Hon. Amy J. St. Eve : Defendants' unopposed motion to substitute attorneys Michael B. Satz and Anthony J. is granted [18-1]. Michael B. Staz and Anthony J. Anscombe are hereby withdrawn as counsel for defendants and the law firm of Hanson, Bridgett, Marcus, Vlahos & Rudy and Michael A Duncheon and Garner K. Weng are granted leave to appear as counsel for defendants and Seymour Rothstein and Joseph M. Kuo of the law firm of Olson & Hierl, Ltd. are granted leave to appear as local counsel for defendants BenQ Corporation and Benq Incorporated, D&H Distributing Co., Inc. and Ingram Micro. Mailed notice (jmp) Modified on 02/07/2003 (Entered: 01/22/2003)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/15/2003, Entered: None
                                        MOTION by defendants to substitute attorneys Michael B. Satz and Anthony J. Anscombe ; Notice (jmp) (Entered: 01/22/2003)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/15/2003, Entered: None
                                          ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION by defendants. (jmp) (Entered: 01/22/2003)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/19/2002, Entered: None
                                            APPLICATION for leave to appear pro hac vice for defendant by Michael A. Duncheon; Order entered granting leave by Hon. Amy J. St. Eve. (jmp) (Entered: 12/27/2002)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/19/2002, Entered: None
                                              APPLICATION for leave to appear pro hac vice for defendant by Garner K. Weng; Order entered granting leave by Hon. Amy J. St. Eve. (jmp) (Entered: 12/27/2002)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/20/2002, Entered: None
                                                NOTIFICATION by defendant of affiliates - disclosure statemeent under LR3.2 and Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1. (jmp) (Entered: 12/26/2002)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/20/2002, Entered: None
                                                  ANSWER by defendants to complaint for patent infringement [1-1]; Notice. (jmp) (Entered: 12/26/2002)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/17/2002, Entered: None
                                                    MINUTE ORDER of 12/17/02 by Hon. Amy J. St. Eve : All written fact discovery to be issued by 04/25/03. All fact discover to close 10/01/03. All parties to make disclosures pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1) by 02/28/03. Each party to serve expert reports pursuant to Rule 26(a)(2)(B) on the issue of claim interpretation, First Phase Expert Reports, by 11/01/03. Each party shall serve rebuttal First Phase Expert Reports by 12/01/03. Depositions of experts concerning First Phase Expert Reports if any, to be conducted by 01/01/04. (Entered Joint Proposed Scheduling Order Pursuant to Rule 26(F)). Mailed notice (jmp) Modified on 12/23/2002 (Entered: 12/18/2002)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/16/2002, Entered: None
                                                      ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendants Benq Inc, D&H Dist Co Inc, Ingram Micro by Michael A. Duncheon and Gerner K. Weng (rmm) (Entered: 12/17/2002)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/14/2002, Entered: None
                                                        ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendants Benq Inc, D&H Dist Co Inc, Ingram Micro by Joseph Ming Kuo, Seymour Rothstein; Notice (rmm) (Entered: 12/17/2002)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/5/2002, Entered: None
                                                          MINUTE ORDER of 12/5/02 by Hon. Amy J. St. Eve: (Entered Request for International Assistance.) Mailed notice (air) (Entered: 12/06/2002)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/2/2002, Entered: None
                                                            STIPULATION regarding service of process on Beng Corporation; Notice (yap) (Entered: 12/04/2002)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/7/2002, Entered: None
                                                              RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to defendants Benq Inc, on 09/30/02 and executed as to defendants D&H Dist Co Inc, and Ingram Micro on 09/27/02 (Documents 7-1 through 7-3). (jmp) (Entered: 10/08/2002)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/2/2002, Entered: None
                                                                MINUTE ORDER of 10/2/02 by Hon. Amy J. St. Eve : Status hearing held and continued to 9:00 a.m. on 12/17/02. Enter appearance of Michael Satz and Anthony Anscombe as counsel for defendant. Defendant's oral motion for an extension of time to answer or otherwise plead is granted. Defendant to answer or otherwise plead by 12/02/02. Mailed notice (jmp) (Entered: 10/03/2002)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/2/2002, Entered: None
                                                                  ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendants by Michael B Satz, and Anthony J. Anscombe. (jmp) (Entered: 10/03/2002)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/30/2002, Entered: None
                                                                    STATUS REPORT by plaintiff. (jmp) (Entered: 10/01/2002)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/16/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      MINUTE ORDER of 9/16/02 by Hon. Amy J. St. Eve : Status hearing set for 10:45 a.m. on 10/02/02. Enter Initial Status Order. (Entered Order Setting Status Report for Cases Newly Assigned to Judge St. Eve.) Mailed notice by judge's staff (jmp) (Entered: 09/17/2002)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/2/2002, Entered: None
                                                                        NOTICE by plaintiff of claims involving patents pursuant to Local Rule 3.4. (jmp) (Entered: 08/08/2002)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/2/2002, Entered: None
                                                                          COMPLAINT; jury demand - Civil cover sheet - Appearance(s) of Jerold B. Schnayer, John L. Ambrogi, Jeffrey Wayne Salmon as attorney(s) for plaintiff ( Four originals and four copies summons(es) issued.) ( Documents: 1-1 through 1-3) (jmp) (Entered: 08/05/2002)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                            Statistics

                                                                            This case has been viewed 49 times.

                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                            Space
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                             
                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                            Need Password Help?