Fraserside IP LLC v. Maciej Madon and Maciej Madon et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit Iowa Northern District Court, Case No. 3:11-cv-03048
District Judge Mark W Bennett, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Mark W Bennett
Last Updated December 23, 2016 at 3:14 AM EST (8.3 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Fraserside Ip LLC, Plaintiff

Represented by Attorney at Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chad Lorin Belville +1 480 203 5861 +1 602 297 6953 cbelville@azbar.org
v.
No Logo John Doe Companies 1 - 100, Defendant
No Logo John Does 1-100, Defendant
No Logo Maciej Madon and Maciej Madon, Defendant
Attributes
Citation Section 17 U.S.C. § 101
Nature of Suit 820 - Property Rights: Copyright
Timeline
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 10 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Mailing of AO 120 Trademark form mailed to Director of the US Patent and Trademark Office in Alexandria, VA (kfs) (Entered: 05/04/2012)
LREF
Blank 9 Filed: 5/3/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Fraserside IP LLC (Belville, Chad) (Entered: 05/03/2012)
LREF
Blank 8 Filed: 2/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER - granting 7 MOTION for Extension of Time for Scheduling Order filed by Fraserside IP LLC. Scheduling Report now due by 4/30/2012. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Paul A Zoss on 02/02/2012. (src) (Entered: 02/02/2012)
LREF
Blank 7 Filed: 2/1/2012, Entered: None
MOTION for Extension of Time for Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Fraserside IP LLC (Belville, Chad) Modified text on 2/2/2012 (djs). (Entered: 02/01/2012)
LREF
Blank 6 Filed: 10/2/2011, Entered: None
PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Fraserside IP LLC (Belville, Chad) (Entered: 10/02/2011)
LREF
Blank 5 Filed: 9/21/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Mailing of AO121 to Register of Copyrights in Washington, DC with copy of complaint. (djs) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
LREF
Blank 4 Filed: 9/21/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Mailing of AO 120 Trademark form mailed to Director of the US Patent and Trademark Office in Alexandria, VA with copy of complaint. (djs) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
LREF
Blank 3 Filed: 9/21/2011, Entered: None
Summons Issued as to Contact Privacy, John Doe Companies 1 - 100, John Does 1 - 100. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: # 1 New Civil Case Packet) (djs) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
LREF
Blank 2 Filed: 9/20/2011, Entered: None
COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0862-1275222.), filed by Fraserside IP LLC. Dismissal Deadline 1/31/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit) (Belville, Chad) Modified on 9/20/2011 to add text (djs). (Entered: 09/20/2011)
LREF
Blank 1 Filed: 9/16/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of New Case Filing by Plaintiff Fraserside IP LLC: No conflicts identified as to judges, parties or attorney (kfs) (Entered: 09/16/2011)
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 58 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?