David Shupak v. Debra L. Reed
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:16-cv-01723

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 15, 2018 at 2:47 AM ST (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo David Shupak, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lionel Zevi Glancy +1 310 201 9150 +1 310 201 9160 lglancy@glancylaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert V. Prongay +1 310 201 9150 +1 310 201 9160 rprongay@glancylaw.com
v.
No Logo Alan L. Boeckmann, Defendant
No Logo Debra L. Reed, Defendant
No Logo Dennis V. Arriola, Defendant
No Logo Doug Schneider, Defendant
No Logo George Minter, Defendant
No Logo Jack T. Taylor, Defendant
No Logo James C. Yardley, Defendant
No Logo James G. Brocksmith, Jr., Defendant
No Logo Jimmie I. Cho, Defendant
No Logo Joseph A. Householder, Defendant
No Logo Justin C. Bird, Defendant
No Logo Kathleen L. Brown, Defendant
No Logo Lynn Schenk, Defendant
No Logo Michael M. Schneider, Defendant
No Logo Pablo A. Ferrero, Defendant
No Logo Scott Furgerson, Defendant
No Logo Sempra Energy, Defendant
No Logo Southern California Gas Company, Defendant
No Logo Steven D. Davis, Defendant
No Logo William C. Rusnack, Defendant
No Logo William D. Jones, Defendant
No Logo William G. Ouchi, Defendant
No Logo William P. Rutledge, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 160 - Contract: Stockholders' Suits
  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff David Shupak. Dismissal is Without Prejudice. (Prongay, Robert) (Entered: 04/18/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/1/2016, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Manuel L. Real: granting 16 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney J. Brandon Walker on behalf of Plaintiff, designating Lionel Z. Glancy as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 04/01/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/28/2016, Entered: 3/28/2016 Unknown Document Type
        Amended APPLICATION for attorney Todd H. Henderson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV FEE PAID.) filed by plaintiff David Shupak. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit - Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Proposed Order) (Glancy, Lionel) Modified on 4/1/2016 (lt).
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/28/2016, Entered: 3/28/2016 Unknown Document Type
          Amended APPLICATION for attorney J. Brandon Walker to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV FEE PAID.) filed by plaintiff David Shupak. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit - Certificates of Good Standing, # 2 Proposed Order) (Glancy, Lionel) Modified on 4/1/2016 (lt).
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/25/2016, Entered: None Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Clerk RE: Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed 3/23/2016 11 , 12 . The document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected document by 12 P.M. PST of 3/28/2016. Counsel shall re-file in compliance with Local Rules. Counsel is directed to review the Notice of Deficiencies (Dckt No. 13). (gk) (Entered: 03/25/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/24/2016, Entered: 3/24/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                ORDER RE: NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Manuel L. Real. READ CAREFULLY - FAILURE TO COMPLY MAY LEAD TO SANCTIONS. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (cch)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: APPLICATION for attorney J. Brandon Walker to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-17518788 paid.) 12 , APPLICATION for attorney Todd H. Henderson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-17518613 paid.) 11 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below: No signature on Application. Applicants failed to sign the applications. See LR 11-1. See Instructions for Applicants (1) note that electronic signatures are not accepted. (G-64). In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lt) (Entered: 03/24/2016)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/23/2016, Entered: 3/23/2016 Unknown Document Type
                    * STRICKEN * APPLICATION for attorney J. Brandon Walker to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-17518788 paid.) filed by plaintiff David Shupak. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit - Certificates of Good Standing, # 2 Proposed Order) (Glancy, Lionel) ** DOCUMENT STRICKEN PURSUANT TO THE RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS FILED 3/24/2016 15 ** Modified on 3/25/2016 (gk).
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/23/2016, Entered: 3/23/2016 Unknown Document Type
                      * STRICKEN * APPLICATION for attorney Todd H. Henderson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-17518613 paid.) filed by plaintiff David Shupak. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit - Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Proposed Order) (Glancy, Lionel) ** DOCUMENT STRICKEN PURSUANT TO THE RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS FILED 3/24/2016 15 ** Modified on 3/25/2016 (gk).
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/17/2016, Entered: 3/17/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 14-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Ronald S.W. Lew to Judge Manuel L. Real for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:16-cv-01723 R(GJSx). (rn)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/15/2016, Entered: None
                          NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Todd H Henderson for Plaintiff David Shupak. Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application;no filing fee is required. You have been removed as counsel of record from this case for failure to submit this filing fee. (ghap) (Entered: 03/15/2016)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/15/2016, Entered: None
                            NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney J Brandon Walker for Plaintiff David Shupak. Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application;no filing fee is required. You have been removed as counsel of record from this case for failure to submit this filing fee. (ghap) (Entered: 03/15/2016)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/15/2016, Entered: None
                              21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 as to Defendants Dennis V. Arriola, Justin C. Bird, Alan L. Boeckmann, James G. Brocksmith, Jr., Kathleen L. Brown, Jimmie I. Cho, Steven D. Davis, Pablo A. Ferrero, Scott Furgerson, Joseph A. Householder, William D. Jones, George Minter, William G. Ouchi, Debra L. Reed, William C. Rusnack, William P. Rutledge, Lynn Schenk, Doug Schneider, Michael M. Schneider, Sempra Energy, Southern California Gas Company, Jack T. Taylor, James C. Yardley. (ghap) (Entered: 03/15/2016)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/15/2016, Entered: 3/15/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/15/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Ronald S. W. Lew and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (ghap) (Entered: 03/15/2016)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff David Shupak, (Prongay, Robert) (Entered: 03/14/2016)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: 3/14/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                      CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff David Shupak. (Prongay, Robert)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None
                                        Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Plaintiff David Shupak. (Prongay, Robert) (Entered: 03/14/2016)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Blank 1 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None
                                          COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-17456827 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff David Shupak. (Attorney Robert Vincent Prongay added to party David Shupak(pty:pla))(Prongay, Robert) (Entered: 03/14/2016)
                                            LREF

                                            Statistics

                                            This case has been viewed 37 times.

                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                            Space
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                             
                                            PlainSite
                                            Sign Up
                                            Need Password Help?