Machinefabriek Meyn, et al v. Stork PMT B.V., et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Georgia Northern District Court, Case No. 2:95-cv-00099
District Judge William C. O'Kelley, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 13, 2017 at 4:56 AM EST (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Machinefabriek Meyn B.v., Plaintiff

Represented by Dority & Manning, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen Edward Bondura +1 864 271 1592 +1 864 233 7342 seb@dority-manning.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julian William Dority +1 864 271 1592 +1 864 233 7342 jwd@dority-manning.com

Represented by Strickland Brockington Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anne W. Lewis +1 678 347 2200 +1 678 347 2210 awl@sbllaw.net
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frank B. Strickland +1 678 347 2200 +1 678 347 2210 fbs@sbllaw.net
No Logo Meyn U.S.A., Plaintiff

Represented by Dority & Manning, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen Edward Bondura +1 864 271 1592 +1 864 233 7342 seb@dority-manning.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julian William Dority +1 864 271 1592 +1 864 233 7342 jwd@dority-manning.com

Represented by Strickland Brockington Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anne W. Lewis +1 678 347 2200 +1 678 347 2210 awl@sbllaw.net
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frank B. Strickland +1 678 347 2200 +1 678 347 2210 fbs@sbllaw.net
v.
No Logo Stork Gamco Inc.,, Defendant

Represented by Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Henry Boice +1 404 815 6464 +1 404 541 3134 bboice@kilpatricktownsend.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John S Pratt +1 404 815 6500 +1 404 541 3348 jpratt@kilpatrickstockton.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mitchell L. Stockwell +1 404 815 6500 +1 404 815 6555 mstockwell@kilpatrickstockton.com
No Logo Stork Pmt B.v., Defendant

Represented by Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Henry Boice +1 404 815 6464 +1 404 541 3134 bboice@kilpatricktownsend.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John S Pratt +1 404 815 6500 +1 404 541 3348 jpratt@kilpatrickstockton.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mitchell L. Stockwell +1 404 815 6500 +1 404 815 6555 mstockwell@kilpatrickstockton.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1338
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (42) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/23/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
Stipulation GRANTING [41-1] joint motion to dismiss with prejudice by Machinefabriek Meyn, Meyn U.S.A., Stork PMT B.V., Stork Gamco, Inc. approved by Judge William C. O'Kelley. (cc) (js) (Entered: 01/23/1998)
    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/23/1998, Entered: None
    Joint MOTION by Machinefabriek Meyn, Meyn U.S.A., Stork PMT B.V., Stork Gamco, Inc. to dismiss with prejudice w/proposed order. (WCO) (js) (Entered: 01/23/1998)
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/25/1997, Entered: None
      Notice to take deposition of Albert Tris, Evert Kikstra, Rikus Koops, Tom Jansen, Kees de Heer, William Brussell, Kees Boukes and Siem Bakker by Stork Gamco, Inc. (js) (Entered: 11/25/1997)
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/20/1997, Entered: None
        Stipulation extending time for pltf to respond to discovery requests by Machinefabriek Meyn, Meyn U.S.A., Stork PMT B.V., Stork Gamco, Inc. (orig & dup to Court Dep. for approval) (js) (Entered: 11/20/1997)
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/23/1997, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER by Judge William C. O'Kelley APPROVING [37-1] joint motion to modify scheduling order by Stork Gamco, Inc., Stork PMT B.V., Meyn U.S.A., Machinefabriek Meyn, Discovery ends 3/16/98 (cc) (js) (Entered: 10/23/1997)
            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/21/1997, Entered: None
            Joint MOTION by parties to modify scheduling order w/proposed order. (WCO) (js) (Entered: 10/21/1997)
              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/26/1997, Entered: None
              PROTECTIVE ORDER ENTERED. (cc) (js) (Entered: 09/30/1997)
                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/26/1997, Entered: None Court Filing
                TELE-CONFERENCE HELD before Judge William C. O'Kelley re: proposed protective order . (js) (Entered: 09/30/1997)
                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/17/1997, Entered: None
                  Joint MOTION by parties for entry of stipulated protective order w/protective order. (WCO) (js) (Entered: 09/17/1997)
                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/17/1997, Entered: None
                    Joint MOTION by parties to lift stay , and to modify scheduling order w/proposed scheduling order. (WCO) (js) (Entered: 09/17/1997)
                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/27/1997, Entered: None
                      NOTICE, status conference set for 10:00 7/10/97 . (js) (Entered: 06/30/1997)
                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/21/1997, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER continuing the stay until further order of the court and pltf's cnsl to advise the court of developments concerning the matter before the patent office in writing by the end of May, 1997, and every two (2) months thereafter by Judge William C. O'Kelley (cc) (js) (Entered: 02/21/1997)
                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/13/1996, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER DENYING motion for limited participation in the reexamination proceedings by dfts [22-1] by Judge William C. O'Kelley. cc. (fmr emp) (Entered: 09/16/1996)
                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/23/1996, Entered: None
                            Citation of new authority & request to modify their motion for limited participation in reexamination proceedings by defts. (js) (Entered: 07/23/1996)
                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/17/1996, Entered: None
                              SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE by pltf Meyn U.S.A. to motion for limited participation in the reexamination proceedings by Stork Gamco, Inc., Stork PMT B.V. [22-1] (js) (Entered: 06/17/1996)
                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/11/1996, Entered: None
                                SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY MEMORANDUM by defts Stork PMT B.V., and Stork Gamco, Inc. IN SUPPORT OF motion for limited participation in the reexamination proceedings by Stork Gamco, Inc., Stork PMT B.V. [22-1] (js) (Entered: 06/11/1996)
                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/16/1996, Entered: None
                                  REPLY BRIEF by dfts in support of their mot.for limited participation in the reexamination proceedings [22-1]. (ddm) (Entered: 05/16/1996)
                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/16/1996, Entered: None
                                    MOTION by pltf Machinefabriek Meyn and Meyn U.S.A. for admission of pro hac vice of Julian W. Dority with proposed order. (WCO) (js) (Entered: 05/16/1996)
                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/3/1996, Entered: None
                                      APPLICATION by pltfs for admission of pro hac vice of Stephen E. Bondura with proposed order. (WCO) (js) (Entered: 05/03/1996)
                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/29/1996, Entered: None
                                        RESPONSE by plas in OPPOSITION to dfts' mot.for limited participation in reexamination proceedings [22-1]. (ddm) (Entered: 04/29/1996)
                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/11/1996, Entered: None
                                          MOTION by defts Stork PMT B.V. and Stork Gamco, Inc. for limited participation in the reexamination proceedings with brief in support. (js) (Entered: 04/11/1996)
                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/21/1996, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            ORDER denying as moot the motion to stay proceedings as to Stork Gamco, Inc. [7-2] by Stork Gamco, Inc., denying as moot the motion to dismiss [7-1] by Stork Gamco, Inc., denying as moot the motion to stay discovery ... until mots. pending here and in D.C. re jurisdiction are decided [14-1] by Stork Gamco, Inc., GRANTING motion to stay discovery pending outcome of reexamination of U.S. Patent 5,269,721 by Machinefabriek Meyn [19-1] by Judge William C. O'Kelley. (cc) (js) (Entered: 02/23/1996)
                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/25/1996, Entered: None
                                              SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE by pltf Machinefabriek Meyn to motion to dismiss by Stork Gamco, Inc. [7-1], to stay proceedings as to Stork Gamco, Inc. by Stork Gamco, Inc. [7-2] (js) (Entered: 01/25/1996)
                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/11/1996, Entered: None
                                                MOTION by pltf Machinefabriek Meyn to stay discovery pending outcome of reexamination of U.S. Patent 5,269,721 with brief in support and proposed order. (orig. order to WCO) (js) (Entered: 01/11/1996)
                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/26/1995, Entered: None
                                                  RESPONSE by plf Machinefabriek Meyn, plaintiff Meyn U.S.A. to motion to stay discovery ... until mots. pending here and in D.C. re jurisdiction are decided by Stork Gamco Inc. [14-1] (js) (Entered: 12/26/1995)
                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/22/1995, Entered: None
                                                    SUPPLEMENT by deft Stork Gamco, Inc. to motion to dismiss, or in the alternative, to stay by Stork Gamco, Inc. [7-1] (js) (Entered: 12/22/1995)
                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/22/1995, Entered: None
                                                      ANSWERS TO MANDATORY INTERROGATORIES by Stork PMT B.V. (js) (Entered: 12/22/1995)
                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/14/1995, Entered: None
                                                        SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE by plas' to their 11/16/95 response [11-1] to dft Stork Gamco, Inc.'s mot. to dismiss [7-1] or to stay proceedings as to Stork Gamco, Inc. [7-2]. (ddm) (Entered: 12/14/1995)
                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/8/1995, Entered: None
                                                          MOTION by dft Stork Gamco, Inc. to stay discovery ... until mots. pending here and in D.C. re jurisdiction are decided w/brief in support and proposed order. (ddm) (Entered: 12/11/1995)
                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/7/1995, Entered: None
                                                            ANSWER to complaint [1-1] by Stork PMT B.V. . (js) (Entered: 12/07/1995)
                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/4/1995, Entered: None
                                                              Reply memorandum in support of motion to dismiss by Stork Gamco, Inc. [7-1], motion to stay proceedings as to Stork Gamco, Inc. by Stork Gamco, Inc. [7-2] by defendant Stork Gamco, Inc. . (js) (Entered: 12/05/1995)
                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/16/1995, Entered: None
                                                                RESPONSE by plaintiff Machinefabriek Meyn, plaintiff Meyn U.S.A. to motion to dismiss by Stork Gamco, Inc. [7-1], motion to stay proceedings as to Stork Gamco, Inc. by Stork Gamco, Inc. [7-2] (js) (Entered: 11/16/1995)
                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/9/1995, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  Stipulation extending time thru 12/7/95 for deft. Stork PMT, B.V. to respond to complaint [1-1] by plaintiff Machinefabriek Meyn, Meyn U.S.A., defendant Stork PMT B.V. approved by Judge William C. O'Kelley .(cc) (js) (Entered: 11/13/1995)
                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/3/1995, Entered: None
                                                                    Certification of Consent to Substitution of Counsel for defendant Stork Gamco, Inc. . replacing Bruce W. Baber of the firm of King & Spalding. (js) (Entered: 11/03/1995)
                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/2/1995, Entered: None
                                                                      Amendment to answer interrogatory(s) [2-1] by plaintiff Machinefabriek Meyn, plaintiff Meyn U.S.A. . (js) (Entered: 11/02/1995)
                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/1/1995, Entered: None
                                                                        MOTION by defendant Stork Gamco, Inc. to dismiss , or to stay proceedings as to Stork Gamco, Inc. with brief in support. (js) (Entered: 11/02/1995)
                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/27/1995, Entered: None
                                                                          Certificate of interested persons. (to judge) (js) (Entered: 10/27/1995)
                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/23/1995, Entered: None
                                                                            ANSWERS TO MANDATORY INTERROGATORIES by Stork Gamco, Inc. (js) (Entered: 10/23/1995)
                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/6/1995, Entered: None
                                                                              ANSWER to complaint [1-1] by Stork Gamco, Inc. . (js) (Entered: 10/06/1995)
                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/11/1995, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                CONSENT ORDER extending time for dft to answer complaint [1-1] through 10/6/95 by Judge William C. O'Kelley. cc (ddm) (Entered: 09/12/1995)
                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/9/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                  ANSWERS TO MANDATORY INTERROGATORIES by Machinefabriek Meyn, Meyn U.S.A. (js) (Entered: 08/10/1995)
                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/9/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                    COMPLAINT filed summons issued. Consent form to proceed before U.S. magistrate and pretrial instructions given to attorney.; jury demand FILING FEE $ 120.00 RECEIPT # 219301 (js) (Entered: 08/10/1995)
                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                      This case has been viewed 74 times.

                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                      Space
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                       
                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                      Need Password Help?