Shaffer v. SB Hotel Associates, LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Southern District Court, Case No. 0:09-cv-62027
District Judge Adalberto Jordan, presiding

Tags
Last Updated January 7, 2019 at 12:35 AM EST (2.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Jerome Shaffer, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by jklawfl.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TTAB Attorney Placeholder emailservice@jklawfl.com
No Logo Sharon Shaffer, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Malin, Haley, Dimaggio & Crosby, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TTAB Attorney Placeholder emailservice@jklawfl.com
v.
No Logo Bayrock Group, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Shutts & Bowen, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Warren Prusaski +1 305 415 9453 +1 305 415 9853 cprusaski@shutts.com
No Logo Corus Construction Ventures, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bilzin Sumberg Baena Price & Axelrod LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David W. Trench +1 305 374 7580 +3512 351 351 2261 dtrench@bilzin.com
Trump, Donald J. Trump, Donald J., Defendant
Officially listed as "Donald J. Trump"
Officer/Director, Riviera Holdings Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Krinzman,Huss and Lubetsky LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lynette Ebeoglu McGuinness +1 305 854 9700 +1 305 854 0508 lem@khllaw.com
Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Federal Deposit Insurance Company"

Toggle Switch Represented by Akerman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Stephen Carver +1 305 982 5572 +1 305 374 5095 christopher.carver@akerman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Evan Otero +1 904 798 3700 +1 904 798 3730 david.otero@akerman.com
No Logo Roy Stillman, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Shutts & Bowen, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Warren Prusaski +1 305 415 9453 +1 305 415 9853 cprusaski@shutts.com
No Logo SB Hotel Associates, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Shutts & Bowen, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Warren Prusaski +1 305 415 9453 +1 305 415 9853 cprusaski@shutts.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
  Entries (25) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER DISMISSING CASE without Prejudice and Closing Case. Signed by Judge Adalberto Jordan on 7/15/2010. (ebs) (Entered: 07/15/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/17/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER Requiring Response to Motion to Dismiss Complaint (Responses due by 6/29/2010). Signed by Judge Adalberto Jordan on 6/17/2010. (ls) (Entered: 06/17/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER denying 14 Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Adalberto Jordan on 6/14/2010. (ail) (Entered: 06/14/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/11/2010, Entered: None
        Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bayrock Group, LLC (Prusaski, Christopher) (Entered: 03/11/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/11/2010, Entered: None
          Corporate Disclosure Statement by SB Hotel Associates, LLC (Prusaski, Christopher) (Entered: 03/11/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/11/2010, Entered: None
            RESPONSE in Opposition re 14 Plaintiff's MOTION Motion to Remand filed by Bayrock Group, LLC, SB Hotel Associates, LLC, Roy Stillman, Donald J. Trump. (Prusaski, Christopher) (Entered: 03/11/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/2/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER granting 18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 14 Plaintiff's MOTION Motion to Remand Responses due by 3/11/2010. Signed by Judge Adalberto Jordan on 3/2/10. (mg) (Entered: 03/02/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/1/2010, Entered: None
                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to 14 Plaintiff's MOTION Motion to Remand by Bayrock Group, LLC, SB Hotel Associates, LLC, Roy Stillman, Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Prusaski, Christopher) (Entered: 03/01/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER granting 16 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond re 14 Plaintiff's MOTION Motion to Remand Responses due by 3/1/2010. Signed by Judge Adalberto Jordan on 2/23/10. (mg) (Entered: 02/23/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/19/2010, Entered: None
                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to 14 Plaintiff's MOTION Motion to Remand by Bayrock Group, LLC, SB Hotel Associates, LLC, Roy Stillman, Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Prusaski, Christopher) (Entered: 02/19/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/3/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER Dismissing Certain Defendants with Prejudice, Corus Bank, N.A., Corus Construction Ventures, LLC and Federal Deposit Insurance Company terminated.. Signed by Judge Adalberto Jordan on 2/3/10. (mg) (Entered: 02/04/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/2/2010, Entered: None
                        Plaintiff's MOTION Motion to Remand by Jerome Shaffer, Sharon Shaffer. (Kline, Jonathan) Event Modified on 6/14/2010 (ail). (Entered: 02/02/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/2/2010, Entered: None
                          STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Claims Against Corus Bank, N.A. by Jerome Shaffer, Sharon Shaffer. (Kline, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/02/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/28/2010, Entered: None
                            Clerks Notice of Docket Correction. Document Filed in Wrong Case; Document restricted and docket text modified. Document refiled in correct case 09cv60157 (mr1) (Entered: 01/28/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/26/2010, Entered: None
                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David W. Trench on behalf of Corus Construction Ventures, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Trench, David) (Entered: 01/26/2010)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/26/2010, Entered: None
                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Warren Prusaski on behalf of Bayrock Group, LLC, SB Hotel Associates, LLC, Roy Stillman (Prusaski, Christopher) (Entered: 01/26/2010)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/22/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORDER granting 6 Unstipulated Motion for Substitution of Counsel for Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, as Receiver for Corus Bank, N.A.. Signed by Judge Adalberto Jordan on 1/22/2010. (mg) (Entered: 01/25/2010)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: None
                                    Clerks Notice to Filer re 6 Stipulation. Wrong Event Selected - Document is a Motion; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. A motion event must always be selected when filing a motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document. (ls) (Entered: 01/25/2010)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/22/2010, Entered: None
                                      DOCUMENT does not belong on this case. (Entered: 01/22/2010)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/21/2010, Entered: None
                                        AGREED Motion for Substitution of Counsel by Federal Deposit Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Trench, David) Modified on 1/25/2010 (ls). (Entered: 01/21/2010)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/20/2010, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lynette Ebeoglu McGuinness on behalf of Donald J. Trump (McGuinness, Lynette) (Entered: 01/20/2010)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/19/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Judge Adalberto Jordan for all further proceedings, accepted and signed on 1/15/10. Judge Patricia A. Seitz no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Patricia A. Seitz on 1/13/2010. (mg) (Entered: 01/19/2010)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/28/2009, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE by Federal Deposit Insurance Company of Pending, Refiled, or Similar Action (Carver, Christopher) (Entered: 12/28/2009)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                Filing fee: For new case $ 350.00, receipt number 1014300 (jcy) (Entered: 12/28/2009)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE OF REMOVAL, filed by Federal Deposit Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Continuation of Complaint, # 2 Continuation of Complaint)(jcy) (Entered: 12/28/2009)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 77 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?