Morris Schneider Wittstadt, LLC et al v. Apollo Jets, LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Georgia Northern District Court, Case No. 1:16-cv-00395
District Judge Eleanor L. Ross, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 29, 2017 at 12:47 AM EST (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Landcastle Acquisition Corp., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Smith Gambrell & Russell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward D. Burch, Jr. +1 404 815 3500 +1 404 685 6884 eburch@sgrlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David C. Newman +1 404 815 3500 dnewman@sgrlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED W. Parker Sanders +1 404 815 3684 +1 404 815 3509 psanders@sgrlaw.com
No Logo Morris Schneider Wittstadt, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Smith Gambrell & Russell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward D. Burch, Jr. +1 404 815 3500 +1 404 685 6884 eburch@sgrlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David C. Newman +1 404 815 3500 dnewman@sgrlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED W. Parker Sanders +1 404 815 3684 +1 404 815 3509 psanders@sgrlaw.com
v.
No Logo Apollo Jets, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Brandt, Achim

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen Wagner +1 212 586 5800

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Tauber Spievack & Wagner, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jackson S. Davis +1 212 586 5800

Toggle Switch Represented by Stites & Harbison, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Gerard Durdaller +1 404 739 8844 +1 404 739 8870 pdurdaller@stites.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stites & Harbison, PLLC-Atlanta

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Valerie Kay Richmond +1 404 739 8814 +1 404 332 0241 vrichmond@stites.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/15/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER GRANTING 11 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED that the time by which Plaintiffs must respond to the Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is hereby extended through and including April 7, 2016 and that the time by which Defendant may file a reply is hereby extended through and including April 25, 2016. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 3/15/16. (kdw) (Entered: 03/15/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/15/2016, Entered: None
    MOTION for Extension of Time re: 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Landcastle Acquisition Corp., Morris Schneider Wittstadt, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burch, Edward) (Entered: 03/15/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: None
      MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Apollo Jets, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Brief, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Brief)(Durdaller, Paul) (Entered: 03/07/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/24/2016, Entered: None
        APPLICATION for Admission of Jackson S. Davis Pro Hac Vice by Apollo Jets, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Durdaller, Paul) (Entered: 02/24/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/24/2016, Entered: None
          APPLICATION for Admission of Stephen Wagner Pro Hac Vice by Apollo Jets, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Durdaller, Paul) (Entered: 02/24/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER GRANTING 3 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Apollo Jets, LLC Answer due March 7, 2016. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 2/22/16. (kdw) (Entered: 02/22/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: None
              DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Morris Schneider Wittstadt, LLC. (Burch, Edward) (Entered: 02/19/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/18/2016, Entered: None
                APPLICATION for Admission of Jackson S. Davis Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-6298332)by Apollo Jets, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Verified Application, # 2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Exhibit C - Proposed Order)(Durdaller, Paul) (Entered: 02/18/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/18/2016, Entered: None
                  APPLICATION for Admission of Stephen Wagner Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-6298314)by Apollo Jets, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Verified Application, # 2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Durdaller, Paul) (Entered: 02/18/2016)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/18/2016, Entered: None
                    MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Apollo Jets, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Durdaller, Paul) (Entered: 02/18/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/10/2016, Entered: None
                      NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. Parties are advised to go to the district court's website at www.gand.uscourts.gov/case-prep-judge-ross. Here, the Court has provided its Standing Order Regarding Civil Litigants. The Parties shall abide by this Standing Order throughout the processing of this case. (mdy) (Entered: 02/10/2016)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/9/2016, Entered: None
                        NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Apollo Jets, LLC.. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113E-6280550) (Attachments: # 1 Ex. -A - State Court Pleadings, # 2 Ex. - B - Declaration - J. Davis, # 3 Ex. - C - Notice of Filing, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 02/10/2016)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 331 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?