Schloss v. Scott
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:16-cv-03164

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 3, 2018 at 3:28 PM EST (3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 2254
Nature of Suit Prisoner: Habeas Corpus
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: None Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/20/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Alter Judgment
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/4/2017, Entered: None Alter Judgment
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 9/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: Petitioner's habeas corpus petition 1 is denied on the merits. Petitioner's motion to expand the record and introduce newly discovered evidence 33 is denied. Any pending motions are denied as moot. T he Court declines to issue a certificate of appealability. The Clerk is instructed to enter a judgment in favor of Respondent and against Petitioner. Civil Case Terminated. Signed by the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 9/13/2017. Mailed notice(vcf, )
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/24/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/27/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/27/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/4/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/29/2016, Entered: None extension of time
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/16/2016, Entered: None extension of time
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/16/2016, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/2/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/14/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/14/2016, Entered: None Order
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/9/2016, Entered: None Strike
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/2/2016, Entered: None extension of time
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/28/2016, Entered: None Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/28/2016, Entered: None Order
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/15/2016, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/15/2016, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/15/2016, Entered: None Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                              Statistics

                                              This case has been viewed 3 times.

                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                              Space
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                               
                                              PlainSite
                                              Sign Up
                                              Need Password Help?