Execware LLC v. BestBuy.com LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Delaware District Court, Case No. 1:14-cv-00232
District Judge Leonard P. Stark, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 15, 2017 at 8:27 PM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Execware, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bayard, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen B. Brauerman +1 302 429 4232 +1 302 658 6395 sbrauerman@bayardlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sara E. Bussiere +1 302 429 4230 sbussiere@bayardlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard D. Kirk +1 302 429 4208 +1 302 658 6395 rkirk@bayardlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Vanessa Ribeiro Tiradentes +1 302 429 4228 vtiradentes@bayardlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Califf T. Cooper

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/10/2016, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Califf T. Cooper

Toggle Switch Represented by Larry D. Thompson , Jr.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Larry D. Thompson, Jr.

Toggle Switch Represented by Matthew J. Antonelli

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew J. Antonelli

Toggle Switch Represented by Peter J. Corcoran

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/19/2014, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter J. Corcoran

Toggle Switch Represented by Zachariah S. Harrington

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Zachariah S. Harrington
v.
Best Buy Company, Inc. Best Buy Company, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Best Buy Co. Inc."

Toggle Switch Represented by Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anne Shea Gaza +1 302 571 6727 agaza@ycst.com
No Logo Bestbuy.com, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bryan J. Mechell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bryan J. Mechell

Toggle Switch Represented by Christopher K. Larus

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher K. Larus

Toggle Switch Represented by Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anne Shea Gaza +1 302 571 6727 agaza@ycst.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Samantha G. Wilson +1 302 571 5018 swilson@ycst.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (35) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/26/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
ORAL ORDER: After having been advised by Plaintiff(s) and Defendant(s) of their inability to resolve a discovery matter, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a teleconference is scheduled for March 11, 2016 at 11:00 a.m. Counsel for the party seeking relief shall initiate the teleconference call to 302-573-4571. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that not later than March 2, 2016, any party seeking relief shall file with the Court a letter, not to exceed three (3) pages, outlining the issues in dispute and its position on those issues. Not later than March 4, 2016, any party opposing the application for relief may file a letter, not to exceed three (3) pages, outlining that party's reasons for its opposition. Each party shall submit to the Court two (2) courtesy copies of its discovery letter and any attachments. Should the Court find further briefing necessary upon conclusion of the telephone conference, the Court will order it. Alternatively, the Court may choose to resolve the dispute prior to the telephone conference and will, in that event, cancel the conference. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/26/16. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00230-LPS et al. (ntl) (Entered: 02/26/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/23/2016, Entered: None
    Joint Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Defendants' counsel regarding request for discovery teleconference re PO. (Anderson, Jeremy) (Entered: 02/23/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/18/2016, Entered: None
      NOTICE OF SERVICE of (i) Defendants' First Set of Common Requests for Production to Plaintiff Execware, LLC (Nos. 1-75) and (ii) Defendants' First Set of Common Interrogatories to Plaintiff (Nos. 1-8) filed by OfficeMax North America Inc..(Lydon, Tiffany) (Entered: 02/18/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/12/2016, Entered: None
        STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to submit a joint proposed protective order to February 23, 2016 - filed by OfficeMax North America Inc.. (Lydon, Tiffany) (Entered: 02/12/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/10/2016, Entered: None
          NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Califf Cooper as co-counsel.. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 02/10/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: None
            NOTICE of Change of Firm Name and E-Mail Address of Pro Hac Vice Counsel by BestBuy.com, LLC (Wilson, Samantha) (Entered: 02/08/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/26/2016, Entered: None
              NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant BestBuy.com, LLC's Initial Disclosures filed by BestBuy.com, LLC.(Wilson, Samantha) (Entered: 01/26/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/26/2016, Entered: None
                NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) PLAINTIFF EXECWARE, LLC'S INITIAL DISCLOSURES; and (2) this NOTICE OF SERVICE filed by Execware LLC.(Bussiere, Sara) (Entered: 01/26/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/21/2016, Entered: None
                  PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY, INCLUDING DISCOVERY OF ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION (ESI) by Execware LLC. (Tiradentes, Vanessa) (Entered: 01/21/2016)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/14/2016, Entered: None
                    STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to submit a joint proposal regarding the scope and schedule of production of ESI to January 21, 2016 - filed by OfficeMax North America Inc.. (Lydon, Tiffany) (Entered: 01/14/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/6/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORAL ORDER: On or before January 20, 2016, each party or each party group shallemail to Chief Magistrate Judge Thynge, with a copy to her Judicial Administrator, Cathleen Kennedy, the information requested in the attached Order. Ordered by Judge Thynge on 1/6/16. (Attachments: # 1 Order Requesting Information re: ADR) Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00229-LPS et al.(cak) (Entered: 01/06/2016)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/16/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                        SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. Discovery due by 3/16/2017. Status Report due by 12/14/2016. Dispositive Motions due by 7/31/2017. An Oral Argument is set for 9/26/2017 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 6B before Judge Leonard P. Stark. A Status and Trial Scheduling Teleconference is set for 10/27/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Claim Construction Opening Brief due by 9/12/2016. Claim Construction Answering Brief due by 10/3/2016. A Markman Hearing is set for 10/31/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6B before Judge Leonard P. Stark. A Final Pretrial Conference is set for 12/8/2017 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 6B before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/28/2017. A 5-day Jury Trial is set for 1/8/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6B before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/15/15. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00229-LPS et al. (ntl) (Entered: 12/16/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                          Official Transcript of Case Management Conference held on December 4, 2015 before Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/5/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/15/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/14/2016.(bpg) (Entered: 12/15/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/11/2015, Entered: None
                            PROPOSED ORDER / [Proposed] Scheduling Order by Execware LLC. (Tiradentes, Vanessa) (Entered: 12/11/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/25/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ORAL ORDER: Regarding the letter request for various counsel to participate telephonically at the Case Management Conference, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the requests are GRANTED. Counsel for Best Buy shall initiate the call to (302) 573-4573. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/25/15. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00229-LPS et al. (ntl) (Entered: 11/25/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/25/2015, Entered: None
                                Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Samantha G. Wilson regarding Defendant BestBuy.com, LLC's request for telephonic participation by pro hac vice counsel in the December 4, 2015 Case Management Conference - re (21 in 1:14-cv-00237-LPS, 17 in 1:14-cv-00230-LPS, 21 in 1:14-cv-00245-LPS, 19 in 1:14-cv-00232-LPS, 34 in 1:14-cv-00240-LPS, 24 in 1:14-cv-00242-LPS, 25 in 1:14-cv-00235-LPS, 22 in 1:14-cv-00246-LPS, 32 in 1:14-cv-00234-LPS, 25 in 1:14-cv-00229-LPS, 18 in 1:14-cv-00239-LPS, 31 in 1:14-cv-00233-LPS, 23 in 1:14-cv-00243-LPS) Order Setting Scheduling Conference,. (Wilson, Samantha) (Entered: 11/25/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/17/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Court will hold a Case Management Conference in Courtroom 6B on December 4, 2015 at 1:30 p.m. No further submissions are needed. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/17/15. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00229-LPS et al. (ntl) (Entered: 11/17/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: None
                                    PROPOSED ORDER / [Proposed] Scheduling Order by Execware LLC. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 11/02/2015)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: None
                                      Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Stephen B. Brauerman, Esquire regarding Proposed Scheduling Order and Checklist Pursuant to the Courts October 2, 2015 Order. (Attachments: # 1 Joint Case Management Checklist)(Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 11/02/2015)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/2/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and discuss, in person and/or by telephone, each of the matters listed on Chief Judge Stark's Case Management Checklist ("Checklist"). Within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order, the parties shall jointly file the following: (i) a copy of the "Checklist" indicating the names of Lead Counsel and Delaware Counsel for each party; (ii) a proposed Scheduling Order (consistent with the Chief Judge Stark's Revised Patent Form Scheduling Order); and (iii) a letter, not to exceed three pages, that contains the following: (a) a description of what this case is about; (b) the parties' positions regarding the disputes in the proposed Scheduling Order, and (c) a list of the three most significant topics (other than Scheduling Order disputes) discussed during the parties' review of the Checklist items, along with a brief description as to what was discussed as to those topics. Thereafter, the Court will schedule an in-person Case Management Conference/Rule 16 Scheduling Conference to be held with Judge Stark. The Checklist and Revised Patent Form Scheduling Order can be found on this Court's website (www.ded.uscourts.gov/judge/chief-judge-leonard-p-stark). ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/2/15. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00229-LPS et al. (ntl) (Entered: 10/02/2015)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/5/2014, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE of Change of Address by Sara E. Bussiere (Bussiere, Sara) (Entered: 09/05/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/24/2014, Entered: None
                                            MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christopher K. Larus and Attorney Bryan J. Mechell - filed by BestBuy.com, LLC. (Wilson, Samantha) (Entered: 06/24/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/24/2014, Entered: None
                                              Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate Best Buy Stores, L.P. for BestBuy.com, LLC filed by BestBuy.com, LLC. (Wilson, Samantha) (Entered: 06/24/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Best Buy Co. Inc., BestBuy.com, LLC.(Gaza, Anne) (Entered: 06/20/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                  STIPULATION /Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Dismissal of Best Buy Co., Inc. and Substitution of BestBuy.com, LLC by Execware LLC. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 06/20/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to \Unopposed Motion to Extend Time for Defendant Best Buy Co., Inc. to Respond to Complaint - filed by Execware LLC. (Bussiere, Sara) (Entered: 05/19/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                      MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Califf T. Cooper - filed by Execware LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Califf T. Cooper)(Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 05/19/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                        NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Peter J. Corcoran, III as co-counsel.. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 05/19/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to \Unopposed Motion to Extend Time for Best Buy Co., Inc. to Respond to Complaint - filed by Execware LLC. (Bussiere, Sara) (Entered: 04/18/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to \Unopposed Motion to Extend Time for Best Buy Co., Inc. to Respond to Complaint - filed by Execware LLC. (Bussiere, Sara) (Entered: 03/20/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                              AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Best Buy Co., Inc. on February 25, 2014, filed by Execware LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Tiradentes, Vanessa) (Entered: 03/10/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Zachariah S. Harrington, Matthew J. Antonelli, Larry D. Thompson, Jr., and Peter J. Corcoran, III - filed by Execware LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Zachariah S. Harrington, # 2 Certification of Matthew J. Antonelli, # 3 Certification of Larry D. Thompson, Jr., # 4 Certification of Peter J. Corcoran, III)(Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                  Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,216,139;. (cla, ) (Entered: 02/24/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (cla, ) (Entered: 02/24/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                      COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Best Buy Co. Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-1466221.) - filed by Execware LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(cla, ) (Entered: 02/24/2014)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                        Statistics

                                                                        This case has been viewed 89 times.

                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                        Space
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                         
                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                        Need Password Help?