Acorda Therapeutics Inc. et al v. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Delaware District Court, Case No. 1:14-cv-00941
District Judge Leonard P. Stark, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 22, 2017 at 12:58 AM EST (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Acorda Therapeutics Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Aaron Stiefel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Aaron Stiefel

Toggle Switch Represented by Daniel P. DiNapoli

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel P. DiNapoli

Toggle Switch Represented by Jinbiotech Company, Ltd

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Martin

Toggle Switch Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack B. Blumenfeld +1 302 658 9200 jbbefiling@mnat.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Maryellen Noreika +1 302 658 9200 mnoreika@mnat.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Soumitra Deka

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Soumitra Deka
No Logo Alkermes Pharma Ireland Ltd., Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Alkermes Pharma Ireland Limited"

Toggle Switch Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack B. Blumenfeld +1 302 658 9200 jbbefiling@mnat.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Maryellen Noreika +1 302 658 9200 mnoreika@mnat.com
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Phillips, Goldman & Spence, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John C. Phillips, Jr. +1 302 655 4200 +1 302 655 4210 jcp@pgslaw.com
v.
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by George C. Lombardi

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George C. Lombardi

Toggle Switch Represented by Jason Pesick

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason Pesick

Toggle Switch Represented by Phillips, Goldman & Spence, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A. Bilson +1 302 655 4200 +1 302 655 4210 dab@pgslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Megan C. Haney +1 302 655 4200 mch@pgslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John C. Phillips, Jr. +1 302 655 4200 +1 302 655 4210 jcp@pgslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Reid Smith

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Reid Smith

Toggle Switch Represented by Samuel S. Park

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Samuel S. Park

Toggle Switch Represented by Sharick Naqi

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sharick Naqi
No Logo Acorda Therapeutics Inc., Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack B. Blumenfeld +1 302 658 9200 jbbefiling@mnat.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Maryellen Noreika +1 302 658 9200 mnoreika@mnat.com
No Logo Alkermes Pharma Ireland Ltd., Counter-Defendant
Officially listed as "Alkermes Pharma Ireland Limited"

Toggle Switch Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack B. Blumenfeld +1 302 658 9200 jbbefiling@mnat.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Maryellen Noreika +1 302 658 9200 mnoreika@mnat.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (27) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/27/2015, Entered: None
Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Maryellen Noreika regarding denial of inter partes review. (Attachments: # 1 PTAB Decisions)(Noreika, Maryellen) (Entered: 08/27/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
    SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. These case are CONSOLIDATED for all purposes and all papers shall be filed in Civil Action No. 14-882-LPS. Discovery due by 12/18/2015. Status Report due by 8/3/2015. Claim Construction Opening Brief due by 11/9/2015. Claim Construction Answering Brief due by 1/15/2016. A Markman Hearing is set for 3/7/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6B before Judge Leonard P. Stark. A Final Pretrial Conference is set for 9/1/2016 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6B before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/22/2016. A 5-day Bench Trial is set for 9/19/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6B before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/21/15. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00882-LPS et al. (ntl) (Entered: 04/22/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/21/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
      Official Transcript of Telephone Conference held on April 1, 2015 before Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/12/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/22/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/20/2015. (bpg) (Entered: 04/21/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: None
        PROPOSED ORDER -- Scheduling Order -- re (25 in 1:14-cv-00932-LPS, 23 in 1:14-cv-00917-LPS, 22 in 1:14-cv-00922-LPS, 23 in 1:14-cv-00909-LPS, 53 in 1:14-cv-00935-LPS, 15 in 1:15-cv-00077-LPS, 22 in 1:14-cv-00941-LPS, 27 in 1:14-cv-00882-LPS, 23 in 1:14-cv-00955-LPS) Oral Order,,, by Acorda Therapeutics Inc., Alkermes Pharma Ireland Limited. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 04/17/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/15/2015, Entered: None
          NOTICE OF SERVICE of Teva Pharmaceuticals U.S.A. Inc.'s Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc..(Bilson, David) (Entered: 04/15/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORAL ORDER: Having reviewed the parties' letter of April 8 (C.A. No. 14-882 D.I. 26), and having had a trial slot in September 2016 open up (subsequent to the scheduling call held on April 1), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: (1) a five-day bench trial will begin on September 19, 2016; (2) the pretrial conference will be held on September 1, 2016 at 2:00 p.m.; (3) the proposed final pretrial order shall be submitted by August 22, 2016; (4) the Markman hearing will be held on March 7, 2016 beginning at 9:00 a.m.; (5) no motions for summary judgment will be permitted without leave of the Court; and (6) the parties shall submit a proposed scheduling order consistent with the terms of this order no later than April 20, 2015. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/13/15. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00882-LPS et al. (ntl) (Entered: 04/13/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/8/2015, Entered: None
              Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Jeremy A. Tigan regarding the parties' respective positions regarding the scheduling of Markman hearing and trial - re Scheduling Conference. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 04/08/2015)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/17/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a Rule 16 scheduling teleconference has been scheduled for April 1, 2015 at 4:00 p.m. Plaintiffs' counsel shall initiate the teleconference call to 302-573-4573. No further submissions are needed. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/17/15. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00882-LPS et al. (ntl) (Entered: 03/17/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: None
                  NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Bilson on behalf of Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc. (Bilson, David) (Entered: 03/13/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/27/2015, Entered: None
                    PROPOSED ORDER /Proposed Scheduling Order by Acorda Therapeutics Inc., Alkermes Pharma Ireland Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Letter)(Noreika, Maryellen) (Entered: 02/27/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/10/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall confer regarding proposed dates in the scheduling order and shall submit a proposal, including a proposal for the length and timing of trial, to the Court no later than February 27, 2015. The parties are to review the Court's form scheduling order, which is posted at http://www.ded.uscourts.gov (see Chambers, Judge Stark, New Patent Procedures). ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/10/15. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00882-LPS et al. (ntl) (Entered: 02/10/2015)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: None
                        MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Reid Smith - filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Reid Smith)(Haney, Megan) (Entered: 02/09/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None
                          NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove James F. Hurst as co-counsel. Reason for request: Attorney is no longer with Winston & Strawn LLP. (Phillips, John) (Entered: 12/22/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/13/2014, Entered: None
                            Amended Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Associates, Inc., Other Affiliate FMR, LLC, Other Affiliate Wellington Management Company, LLP for Alkermes Pharma Ireland Limited filed by Alkermes Pharma Ireland Limited. (Noreika, Maryellen) (Entered: 10/13/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/13/2014, Entered: None
                              MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Aaron Stiefel, Daniel P. DiNapoli, Benjamin C. Hsing, Soumitra Deka, Jeffrey Martin, and Sylvia M. Becker - filed by Acorda Therapeutics Inc.. (Noreika, Maryellen) (Entered: 10/13/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/8/2014, Entered: None
                                MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney George C. Lombardi - filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.. (Haney, Megan) (Entered: 10/08/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None
                                  ANSWER to 8 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Acorda Therapeutics Inc., Alkermes Pharma Ireland Limited.(Noreika, Maryellen) (Entered: 09/12/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/4/2014, Entered: None
                                    MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James F. Hurst, Maureen L. Rurka, Samuel S. Park, Sharick Naqi, and Jason Pesick - filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of James F. Hurst, # 2 Certification of Maureen L. Rurka, # 3 Certification of Samuel S. Park, # 4 Certification of Sharick Naqi, # 5 Certification of Jason Pesick)(Haney, Megan) (Entered: 09/04/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: None
                                      Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. for Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc. filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.. (Phillips, John) (Entered: 08/22/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: None
                                        ANSWER to 1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Acorda Therapeutics Inc., Alkermes Pharma Ireland Limited by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc..(Phillips, John) (Entered: 08/22/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/6/2014, Entered: None
                                          STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Move, Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint (D.I. 1) to August 22, 2014 - filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.. (Phillips, John) (Entered: 08/06/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/18/2014, Entered: None
                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alkermes Pharma Ireland Limited, Acorda Therapeutics Inc.. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc. served on 7/17/2014, answer due 8/7/2014. (Noreika, Maryellen) (Entered: 07/18/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: None
                                              Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Alkermes plc for Alkermes Pharma Ireland Limited filed by Acorda Therapeutics Inc., Alkermes Pharma Ireland Limited. (snb, ) (Entered: 07/18/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 5,540,938; 8,007,826 B2; 8,354,437 B2; 8,440,703 B2; 8,663,685 B2. (snb, ) (Entered: 07/18/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                  Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: 7/14/2014. Date of Expiration of Patent: See Attached.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 7/22/2017. (snb, ) (Entered: 07/18/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (snb, ) (Entered: 07/18/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                      COMPLAINT filed against Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0311-1555158.) - filed by Alkermes Pharma Ireland Limited, Acorda Therapeutics Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-E, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(snb, ) (Entered: 07/18/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                        Statistics

                                                        This case has been viewed 95 times.

                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                        Space
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                         
                                                        PlainSite
                                                        Sign Up
                                                        Need Password Help?