Purdue Pharma L.P. v. Actavis Laboratories UT Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Delaware District Court, Case No. 1:15-cv-00192
District Judge Sue L. Robinson, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 28, 2016 at 3:38 AM EST (5.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Purdue Pharma LP Purdue Pharma LP, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gasper J. LaRosa

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gasper J. LaRosa

Toggle Switch Represented by John J. Normile

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John J. Normile

Toggle Switch Represented by Kelsey Nix

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kelsey Nix

Toggle Switch Represented by Lynda Q. Nguyen

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/14/2015, PRO HAC VICE Lynda Q. Nguyen

Toggle Switch Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack B. Blumenfeld +1 302 658 9200 jbbefiling@mnat.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Derek James Fahnestock +1 302 658 9200 dfahnestock@mnat.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rodger Dallery Smith, II +1 302 658 9200 rdsefiling@mnat.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sarah A. Geers

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah A. Geers
No Logo Actavis Laboratories Ut, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Phillips, Goldman & Spence, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John C. Phillips, Jr. +1 302 655 4200 +1 302 655 4210 jcp@pgslaw.com
v.
No Logo Actavis Laboratories Ut, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ashlea Raymond Pflug

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ashlea Raymond Pflug

Toggle Switch Represented by Melinda K. Lackey

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melinda K. Lackey

Toggle Switch Represented by Michael K. Nutter

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael K. Nutter

Toggle Switch Represented by Peter E. Perkowski

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/14/2015, PRO HAC VICE Peter E. Perkowski

Toggle Switch Represented by Phillips, Goldman & Spence, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A. Bilson +1 302 655 4200 +1 302 655 4210 dab@pgslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John C. Phillips, Jr. +1 302 655 4200 +1 302 655 4210 jcp@pgslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stephen R. Smerek

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen R. Smerek

Toggle Switch Represented by Tyler G. Johannes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tyler G. Johannes
Purdue Pharma LP Purdue Pharma LP, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack B. Blumenfeld +1 302 658 9200 jbbefiling@mnat.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Derek James Fahnestock +1 302 658 9200 dfahnestock@mnat.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rodger Dallery Smith, II +1 302 658 9200 rdsefiling@mnat.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (86) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: None
NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Purdue Pharma L.P.'s Responses to Defendants' First Set of Requests for Admission (Nos. 1-75); and (2) Purdue Pharma L.P.'s Objections and Responses to Defendants' Second Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 10-29) filed by Purdue Pharma L.P..(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 01/29/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: None
    NOTICE to Take Deposition of Gregg DeRosa on February 11, 2016 filed by Purdue Pharma L.P..(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 01/29/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: None
      NOTICE to Take Deposition of Cherri Petrie on February 5, 2016 filed by Purdue Pharma L.P..(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 01/29/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: None
        NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Watson Laboratories, Inc.'s [Highly Confidential] Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' Notice of Deposition Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6); and (2) Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc.'s [Highly Confidential] Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Notice of Deposition Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) filed by Watson Laboratories Inc., Actavis Laboratories UT Inc., Watson Laboratories Inc..(Bilson, David) (Entered: 01/29/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 1/22/2016, Entered: None
          NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc.'s Response to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Admission (Nos. 1-39); (2) Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc.'s Response to Plaintiff's Second Set of Requests for Admission (No. 40); (3) Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Second Set of Interrogatories (No. 9); (4) Watson Laboratories, Inc.'s Response to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Admission (Nos. 1-39); (5) Watson Laboratories, Inc.'s Response to Plaintiff's Second Set of Requests for Admission (No. 40); and (6) Watson Laboratories, Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Second Set of Interrogatories (No. 9) filed by Watson Laboratories Inc., Actavis Laboratories UT Inc., Watson Laboratories Inc..(Bilson, David) (Entered: 01/22/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 1/15/2016, Entered: None
            NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Purdue Pharma L.P.'s Supplemental Initial Disclosures Pursuant To Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(A)(1)(A); and (2) Purdue Pharma L.P.'s Supplemental Objections And Responses To Watson's First Set Of Interrogatories (Nos. 1, 5, 6, 8, 9) filed by Purdue Pharma L.P..(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 01/15/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 1/15/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER granting (91 in 1:14-cv-01410-SLR-SRF, 98 in 1:14-cv-01227-SLR-SRF, 79 in 1:15-cv-00192-SLR-SRF) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Various Deadlines to Various Dates Listed, Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: ( Fact Discovery completed by 3/4/2016. The time for issuance of the Court's decision on claim construction pursuant to paragraph 4(h) of the Scheduling Order is hereby extended to March 11, 2016.) See order for further details. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 1/15/2016. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-01227-SLR-SRF, 1:14-cv-01410-SLR-SRF, 1:15-cv-00192-SLR-SRF(nmfn) (Entered: 01/15/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 1/15/2016, Entered: None
                STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Various Deadlines to Various Dates Listed - filed by Watson Laboratories Inc., Actavis Laboratories UT Inc., Watson Laboratories Inc.. (Phillips, John) (Entered: 01/15/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 1/13/2016, Entered: None
                  MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Lisamarie LoGiudice and Jason G. Winchester - filed by Purdue Pharma L.P.. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 01/13/2016)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 1/6/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER, Rescheduling Hearings( The In-Person Status Conference is rescheduled for 2/3/2016 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson.) Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 1/6/2016. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-01227-SLR-SRF, 1:14-cv-01410-SLR-SRF, 1:15-cv-00192-SLR-SRF(nmfn) (Entered: 01/06/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 12/17/2015, Entered: None
                      NOTICE OF SERVICE of Purdue Pharma L.P.'s Objections and Responses to Actavis's Notice of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition of Purdue filed by Purdue Pharma L.P..(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 12/17/2015)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 12/16/2015, Entered: None
                        NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendants' Second Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 10-29); and (2) Defendants' First Set of Requests for Admissions (Nos. 1-75) filed by Watson Laboratories Inc., Actavis Laboratories UT Inc., Watson Laboratories Inc..(Phillips, John) (Entered: 12/16/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None
                          NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Purdue's Second Set of Requests for Admission to Watson Laboratories, Inc. (No. 40); and (2) Purdue's Second Set of Requests for Admission to Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc. (No. 40) filed by Purdue Pharma L.P..(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 12/15/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 12/9/2015, Entered: None
                            NOTICE to Take Deposition of Sal Rifaat on January 15, 2016 filed by Purdue Pharma L.P..(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 12/09/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 12/9/2015, Entered: None
                              NOTICE to Take Deposition of Kerri Yan on January 13, 2016 filed by Purdue Pharma L.P..(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 12/09/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 12/9/2015, Entered: None
                                NOTICE to Take Deposition of Hanh Nghiem on January 12, 2016 filed by Purdue Pharma L.P..(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 12/09/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 12/9/2015, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE to Take Deposition of Craig Jones on January 11, 2016 filed by Purdue Pharma L.P..(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 12/09/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 12/9/2015, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE to Take Deposition of Meena Venugopal on January 6, 2016 filed by Purdue Pharma L.P..(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 12/09/2015)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 12/9/2015, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE to Take Deposition of Komal Mulchandani on January 5, 2016 filed by Purdue Pharma L.P..(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 12/09/2015)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 12/9/2015, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE to Take Deposition of Daniel Motto on January 4, 2016 filed by Purdue Pharma L.P..(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 12/09/2015)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 12/9/2015, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE to Take Deposition of Janie Gwinn on December 30, 2015 filed by Purdue Pharma L.P..(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 12/09/2015)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 12/9/2015, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE to Take Deposition of Joyce DelGaudio on December 29, 2015 filed by Purdue Pharma L.P..(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 12/09/2015)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 12/9/2015, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Purdues Second Set Of Interrogatories (No. 9) To Actavis; (2) Purdues Second Set Of Interrogatories (No. 9) To Watson; (3) Purdues First Set Of Requests For Admission To Watson Laboratories, Inc. (Nos. 1-39);And (4) Purdues First Set Of Requests For Admission To Actavis Laboratories Ut, Inc. (Nos. 1-39), filed by Purdue Pharma L.P..(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 12/09/2015)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 12/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE to Take Deposition of Robert F. Kaiko on December 22, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. filed by Watson Laboratories Inc., Actavis Laboratories UT Inc., Watson Laboratories Inc..(Phillips, John) (Entered: 12/03/2015)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 12/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE to Take Deposition of Robert F. Reder on December 23, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. filed by Watson Laboratories Inc., Actavis Laboratories UT Inc., Watson Laboratories Inc..(Phillips, John) (Entered: 12/03/2015)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 12/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE to Take Deposition of 30(b)(6) Deposition of Plaintiff on January 6, 2016 filed by Watson Laboratories Inc., Actavis Laboratories UT Inc..(Phillips, John) (Entered: 12/03/2015)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 12/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE to Take Deposition of Paul D. Goldenheim on December 21, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. filed by Watson Laboratories Inc., Actavis Laboratories UT Inc..(Phillips, John) (Entered: 12/03/2015)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 12/1/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        ORDER, Rescheduling Hearings (The Markman Hearing is rescheduled for 12/8/2015 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson.) Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 12/1/2015. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-01227-SLR-SRF, 1:14-cv-01410-SLR-SRF, 1:15-cv-00192-SLR-SRF(nmfn) (Entered: 12/01/2015)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 11/25/2015, Entered: None
                                                          REDACTED VERSION of (57 in 1:15-cv-00192-SLR-SRF, 76 in 1:14-cv-01227-SLR-SRF, 69 in 1:14-cv-01410-SLR-SRF) Notice (Other) by Purdue Pharma L.P.. (Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 11/25/2015)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 11/25/2015, Entered: None
                                                            [SEALED] NOTICE of Subpoena (Third Party) by Purdue Pharma L.P. (Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 11/25/2015)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 11/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Watson Laboratories, Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-8); and (2) Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-8) filed by Watson Laboratories Inc., Actavis Laboratories UT Inc., Actavis plc, Watson Laboratories Inc..(Bilson, David) (Entered: 11/16/2015)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                Joint APPENDIX For Claim Construction Briefing by Watson Laboratories Inc., Actavis Laboratories UT Inc., Watson Laboratories Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Part 1, # 2 Part 2, # 3 Part 3)(Bilson, David) Modified on 11/2/2015 (lih). (Entered: 10/30/2015)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                  DECLARATION of John C. Phillips, Jr., Esquire re (52 in 1:15-cv-00192-SLR-SRF) Claim Construction Surreply Brief, (64 in 1:14-cv-01410-SLR-SRF) Claim Construction Surreply Brief, (71 in 1:14-cv-01227-SLR-SRF) Claim Construction Surreply Brief by Watson Laboratories Inc., Actavis Laboratories UT Inc., Watson Laboratories Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Bilson, David) Modified on 11/2/2015 (lih). (Entered: 10/30/2015)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                    DECLARATION of Russell Owen Potts, Ph.D.
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                      CLAIM CONSTRUCTION SURREPLY BRIEF re 42 Claim Construction Answering Brief filed by Actavis Laboratories UT Inc.. (Bilson, David) (Entered: 10/30/2015)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                        REDACTED VERSION of (65 in 1:14-cv-01227-SLR-SRF, 46 in 1:15-cv-00192-SLR-SRF, 58 in 1:14-cv-01410-SLR-SRF) Notice to Take Deposition by Purdue Pharma L.P.. (Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 10/28/2015)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                          REDACTED VERSION of (57 in 1:14-cv-01410-SLR-SRF, 64 in 1:14-cv-01227-SLR-SRF, 45 in 1:15-cv-00192-SLR-SRF) Notice to Take Deposition by Purdue Pharma L.P.. (Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 10/28/2015)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                            DECLARATION of Lawrence L. Fleckenstein, PHARM.D. re (48 in 1:15-cv-00192-SLR-SRF) Claim Construction Reply Brief, (60 in 1:14-cv-01410-SLR-SRF) Claim Construction Reply Brief, (67 in 1:14-cv-01227-SLR-SRF) Claim Construction Reply Brief by Purdue Pharma L.P.. (Smith, Rodger) Modified on 10/26/2015 (lih). (Entered: 10/23/2015)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                              CLAIM CONSTRUCTION REPLY BRIEF re 37 Claim Construction Opening Brief filed by Purdue Pharma L.P.. (Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 10/23/2015)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Purdue's First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-8) to Watson; and (2) Purdue's First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-8) to Actavis filed by Purdue Pharma L.P..(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 10/16/2015)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                  [SEALED] NOTICE to Take Deposition filed by Purdue Pharma L.P..(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 10/16/2015)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                    [SEALED] NOTICE to Take Deposition filed by Purdue Pharma L.P..(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 10/16/2015)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                      DECLARATION of John C. Phillips, Jr., Esq. re (42 in 1:15-cv-00192-SLR-SRF) Claim Construction Answering Brief, (61 in 1:14-cv-01227-SLR-SRF) Claim Construction Answering Brief, (54 in 1:14-cv-01410-SLR-SRF) Claim Construction Answering Brief by Watson Laboratories Inc., Actavis Laboratories UT Inc., Watson Laboratories Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Phillips, John) Modified on 10/13/2015 (lih). (Entered: 10/09/2015)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                        DECLARATION of Russell Owen Potts, Ph.D re (42 in 1:15-cv-00192-SLR-SRF) Claim Construction Answering Brief, (61 in 1:14-cv-01227-SLR-SRF) Claim Construction Answering Brief, (54 in 1:14-cv-01410-SLR-SRF) Claim Construction Answering Brief by Watson Laboratories Inc., Actavis Laboratories UT Inc., Watson Laboratories Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A, # 2 Appendix B)(Phillips, John) Modified on 10/13/2015 (lih). (Entered: 10/09/2015)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                          CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ANSWERING BRIEF filed by Actavis Laboratories UT Inc.. (Phillips, John) (Entered: 10/09/2015)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                            Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Rodger D. Smith II regarding response to Chambers September 22, 2015 request to submit a joint letter on the status of fact discovery. (Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 09/28/2015)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                              NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Watson Laboratories, Inc.s Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs Second Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 95-97); and (2) Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc.s Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs Second Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 86-88) filed by Watson Laboratories Inc., Actavis Laboratories UT Inc., Watson Laboratories Inc..(Bilson, David) (Entered: 09/18/2015)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                DECLARATION of Sarah A. Geers, Esq. re (49 in 1:14-cv-01410-SLR-SRF) Claim Construction Opening Brief, (56 in 1:14-cv-01227-SLR-SRF) Claim Construction Opening Brief, (37 in 1:15-cv-00192-SLR-SRF) Claim Construction Opening Brief by Purdue Pharma L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-3, # 2 Exhibits 4-5)(Smith, Rodger) Modified on 9/15/2015 (lih). (Entered: 09/14/2015)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Lawrence L. Fleckenstein re (49 in 1:14-cv-01410-SLR-SRF) Claim Construction Opening Brief, (56 in 1:14-cv-01227-SLR-SRF) Claim Construction Opening Brief, (37 in 1:15-cv-00192-SLR-SRF) Claim Construction Opening Brief by Purdue Pharma L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Smith, Rodger) Modified on 9/15/2015 (lih). (Entered: 09/14/2015)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                    CLAIM CONSTRUCTION OPENING BRIEF filed by Purdue Pharma L.P.. (Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 09/14/2015)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                      NOTICE OF SERVICE of Purdue Pharma L.P.'s Objections and Responses to Defendants' Second Set of Requests for Production (Nos. 75-77) filed by Purdue Pharma L.P..(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 09/11/2015)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                        STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Plaintiff Purdue Pharma L.P. to file its Opening Claim Construction Brief to September 14, 2015 - filed by Purdue Pharma L.P.. (Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 09/10/2015)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                          REDACTED VERSION of (52 in 1:14-cv-01227-SLR-SRF, 33 in 1:15-cv-00192-SLR-SRF, 45 in 1:14-cv-01410-SLR-SRF) Notice by Purdue Pharma L.P.. (Smith, Rodger) Modified on 9/2/2015 (lih). (Entered: 09/02/2015)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                            [SEALED] NOTICE of Subpoena to Third Party by Purdue Pharma L.P. (Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 09/02/2015)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                              NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Purdue's Second Set of Requests to Actavis for the Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 86-88); and (2) Purdue's Second Set of Requests to Watson for the Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 95-97) filed by Purdue Pharma L.P..(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 08/19/2015)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Second Set of Requests for Production to Plaintiff (Nos. 75-77) filed by Watson Laboratories Inc., Actavis Laboratories UT Inc., Watson Laboratories Inc..(Phillips, John) (Entered: 08/12/2015)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Joint Claim Construction Statement by Purdue Pharma L.P.. (Smith, Rodger) Modified on 8/10/2015 (lih). (Entered: 08/07/2015)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Substantial Completion of Document Production to August 21, 2015 - filed by Watson Laboratories Inc., Actavis Laboratories UT Inc., Watson Laboratories Inc.. (Phillips, John) (Entered: 08/06/2015)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Peter E. Perkowski as co-counsel. Reason for request: No Longer Affiliated with Winston & Strawn LLP. (Bilson, David) (Entered: 07/14/2015)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Withdrawal by Purdue Pharma L.P. (Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 07/10/2015)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Identification of Claim Construction Terms and Proposed Constructions filed by Watson Laboratories Inc., Actavis Laboratories UT Inc., Watson Laboratories Inc..(Bilson, David) (Entered: 07/02/2015)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF SERVICE of Purdue Pharma L.P.'s Proposed Claim Terms for Construction and Their Proposed Constructions filed by Purdue Pharma L.P..(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 07/02/2015)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Donald H. Mahoney, III - filed by Actavis Laboratories UT Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Donald H. Mahoney, III)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Bilson, David) (Entered: 06/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Amended Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Allergan plc (f/k/a Actavis plc) for Actavis Laboratories UT Inc. filed by Actavis Laboratories UT Inc.. (Phillips, John) (Entered: 06/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  PROPOSED Amended Scheduling Order re Scheduling Conference by Purdue Pharma L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson)(Smith, Rodger) Modified on 5/15/2015 (lih). (Entered: 05/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF SERVICE of Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 1-85) filed by Actavis Laboratories UT Inc..(Bilson, David) (Entered: 05/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Preliminary Infringement Contentions to Actavis Regarding U.S. Patent Nos. RE41,408, RE41,489, and RE41,571 filed by Purdue Pharma L.P..(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 05/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Rodger D. Smith II regarding proposed schedule for discussion at May 6, 2015 conference - re (28 in 1:14-cv-01410-SLR-SRF, 35 in 1:14-cv-01227-SLR-SRF, 15 in 1:15-cv-00192-SLR) Letter. (Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 05/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF SERVICE of Purdue's First Set of Requests to Actavis for the Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 1-85) filed by Purdue Pharma L.P..(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 04/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION and Order as to Conduct of Discovery by Purdue Pharma L.P.. (Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 04/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              Order Setting Scheduling Conference: An In-Person Scheduling Conference is set for 5/6/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 4/17/2015. (fms) (Entered: 04/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Rodger D. Smith II regarding request for Rule 16 Scheduling Conference. (Attachments: # 1 Amended Proposed Scheduling Order)(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 04/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David P. Dalke and Tyler G. Johannes - filed by Actavis Laboratories UT Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of David P. Dalke, # 2 Certification of Tyler G. Johannes)(Bilson, David) (Entered: 04/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Peter E. Perkowski, Ashlea Raymond Pflug, Michael K. Nutter, Melinda K. Lackey and Stephen R. Smerek - filed by Actavis Laboratories UT Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Peter E. Perkowski, # 2 Certification of Ashlea Raymond Pflug, # 3 Certification of Michael K. Nutter, # 4 Certification of Melinda K. Lackey, # 5 Certification of Stephen R. Smerek)(Bilson, David) (Entered: 04/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      PROPOSED ORDER -- Protective Order -- by Purdue Pharma L.P.. (Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 04/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to 6 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim -- Plaintiff's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Defendant's Counterclaims -- by Purdue Pharma L.P..(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 04/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Actavis Laboratories, UT, Inc.'s Initial Disclosures Under Paragraph 3(A) of the Default Standard for Discovery; and (2) Actavis Laboratories, UT, Inc.'s Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Actavis Laboratories UT Inc..(Bilson, David) (Entered: 04/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John J. Normile, Kelsey I. Nix, Gasper J. LaRosa, Lynda Q. Nguyen, and Sarah A. Geers - filed by Purdue Pharma L.P.. (Fahnestock, Derek) (Entered: 03/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION as to Jurisdiction, Venue, and Certain Discovery by Purdue Pharma L.P.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 03/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Actavis plc for Actavis Laboratories UT Inc. filed by Actavis Laboratories UT Inc.. (Phillips, John) (Entered: 03/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to 1 Complaint Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Purdue Pharma L.P. by Actavis Laboratories UT Inc..(Phillips, John) (Entered: 03/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/27/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (aah) (Entered: 03/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate Purdue Holdings L.P. for Purdue Pharma L.P. filed by Purdue Pharma L.P.. (aah) (Entered: 03/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) RE41,408 E; RE41,489 E; RE41,571 E; (aah) (Entered: 03/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: 1/29/2015. Date of Expiration of Patent: 9/29/2017.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 7/29/2017. (aah) (Entered: 03/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT filed against Actavis Laboratories UT Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-1682720.) - filed by Purdue Pharma L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-C, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(aah) (Entered: 03/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 194 times.

                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?