Lennon Image Technologies LLC v. Conde Nast Publications Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Delaware District Court, Case No. 1:12-cv-00905
District Judge Sue L. Robinson, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 23, 2017 at 11:15 PM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Lennon Image Technologies LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bayard, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen B. Brauerman +1 302 429 4232 +1 302 658 6395 sbrauerman@bayardlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard D. Kirk +1 302 429 4208 +1 302 658 6395 rkirk@bayardlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Christopher M. Joe

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher M. Joe

Toggle Switch Represented by Morris James LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/30/2012, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Laurence Dorsney +1 302 888 6855 +1 302 571 1750 kdorsney@morrisjames.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Niknaz Bukovcan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Niknaz Bukovcan
No Logo Advance Magazine Publishers Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Richards, Layton & Finger, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kelly E. Farnan +1 302 651 7705 farnan@rlf.com
No Logo Conde Nast Americas LC, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Richards, Layton & Finger, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kelly E. Farnan +1 302 651 7705 farnan@rlf.com
No Logo Conde Nast Digital, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Richards, Layton & Finger, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kelly E. Farnan +1 302 651 7705 farnan@rlf.com
Conde Nast Publications, Inc. Conde Nast Publications, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Richards, Layton & Finger, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kelly E. Farnan +1 302 651 7705 farnan@rlf.com
v.
No Logo Advance Magazine Publishers Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Richards, Layton & Finger, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kelly E. Farnan +1 302 651 7705 farnan@rlf.com
No Logo Conde Nast Americas LC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Richards, Layton & Finger, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kelly E. Farnan +1 302 651 7705 farnan@rlf.com
No Logo Conde Nast Digital, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Richards, Layton & Finger, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kelly E. Farnan +1 302 651 7705 farnan@rlf.com
No Logo Conde Nast Digital Limited, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Richards, Layton & Finger, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kelly E. Farnan +1 302 651 7705 farnan@rlf.com
Conde Nast Publications, Inc. Conde Nast Publications, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Aaron M. Frankel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2013, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Aaron M. Frankel

Toggle Switch Represented by Randy Lipsitz

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2013, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Randy Lipsitz

Toggle Switch Represented by Richards, Layton & Finger, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kelly E. Farnan +1 302 651 7705 farnan@rlf.com
No Logo Lennon Image Technologies LLC, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bayard, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen B. Brauerman +1 302 429 4232 +1 302 658 6395 sbrauerman@bayardlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard D. Kirk +1 302 429 4208 +1 302 658 6395 rkirk@bayardlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Christopher M. Joe

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher M. Joe

Toggle Switch Represented by Morris James LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/30/2012, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Laurence Dorsney +1 302 888 6855 +1 302 571 1750 kdorsney@morrisjames.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Niknaz Bukovcan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Niknaz Bukovcan
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (54) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: None
Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,624,843. (Attachments: # 1 stipulation)(fms) (Entered: 05/08/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/6/2013, Entered: None
    STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Conde Nast Digital Limited by Conde Nast Digital Limited. (Farnan, Kelly) (Entered: 05/06/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: None
      STIPULATION of Dismissal / Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Defendants Conde Nast Publications, Inc., Conde Nast Digital d/b/a Conde Nast, Advance Magazine Publishers Inc. and Conde Nast Americas, LC by Lennon Image Technologies LLC. (Kirk, Richard) (Entered: 04/17/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/21/2013, Entered: None
        PROPOSED ORDER /Agreed [ Proposed] Protective Order by Lennon Image Technologies LLC. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 03/21/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 3/21/2013, Entered: None
          (DEFICIENCY ISSUED - RE-FILED AT D.I. 51) PROPOSED ORDER /Agreed [Proposed] Protective Order by Lennon Image Technologies LLC. (Brauerman, Stephen) Modified on 3/21/2013 (fms). (Entered: 03/21/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: None
            NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) PLAINTIFF'S THIRD SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANTS (NO. 13) and (2) this NOTICE OF SERVICE by Lennon Image Technologies LLC.(Tiradentes, Vanessa) (Entered: 02/25/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/21/2013, Entered: None
              FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Advance Magazine Publishers Inc., Conde Nast Americas LC, Conde Nast Digital, Conde Nast Publications Inc., Conde Nast Digital Limited- filed by Lennon Image Technologies LLC.(fms) (Entered: 02/21/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/19/2013, Entered: None
                MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Eric W. Buether - filed by Lennon Image Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Eric W. Buether)(Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 02/19/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None
                  STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING LENNON IMAGE TECHNOLOGIES, LLCS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Advance Magazine Publishers Inc., Conde Nast Americas LC, Conde Nast Digital, Conde Nast Publications Inc.. (Farnan, Kelly) (Entered: 02/15/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None
                    NOTICE OF SERVICE of Cond Nast Defendants Second Set Of Interrogatories (13-18) To Lennon Image Technologies, LLC by Advance Magazine Publishers Inc., Conde Nast Americas LC, Conde Nast Digital, Conde Nast Publications Inc..(Farnan, Kelly) (Entered: 02/15/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None
                      NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoena to Modiface, Inc. by Lennon Image Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 02/15/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/11/2013, Entered: None
                        MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint - filed by Lennon Image Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Proposed First Amended Complaint), # 2 Exhibit B (redlined version showing changes))(Kirk, Richard) (Entered: 02/11/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/7/2013, Entered: None
                          NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) PLAINTIFF LENNON IMAGE TECHNOLOGIES, LLC'S SECOND SET OF REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION TO ALL DEFENDANTS; (2) PLAINTIFF'S SECOND SET OF COMMON INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANTS (NOS. 11-12) and (3) this NOTICE OF SERVICE by Lennon Image Technologies LLC.(Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 02/07/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None
                            REPLY BRIEF re 36 Joint MOTION to Stay DEFENDANTS JOINT MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING REEXAMINATION OF U.S. PATENT NO. 6,624,843 Defendants' Reply Brief In Support Of Their Joint Motion To Stay Proceedings Pending Reexamination Of U.S. Patent 6,624,843 filed by Advance Magazine Publishers Inc., Conde Nast Americas LC, Conde Nast Digital, Conde Nast Publications Inc.. (Farnan, Kelly) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: None
                              ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 36 Joint MOTION to Stay DEFENDANTS JOINT MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING REEXAMINATION OF U.S. PATENT NO. 6,624,843 filed by Lennon Image Technologies LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 2/4/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(Kirk, Richard) (Entered: 01/25/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None
                                NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Initial Invalidity Contentions pursuant to Section 4(d) of the Default Standard for Discovery by Advance Magazine Publishers Inc., Conde Nast Americas LC, Conde Nast Digital, Conde Nast Publications Inc..(Farnan, Kelly) (Entered: 01/14/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None
                                  DECLARATION re (24 in 1:12-cv-00903-SLR, 24 in 1:12-cv-00904-SLR, 36 in 1:12-cv-00905-SLR) Joint MOTION to Stay DEFENDANTS JOINT MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING REEXAMINATION OF U.S. PATENT NO. 6,624,843 DECLARATION OF RANDY LIPSITZ, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING REEXAMINATION OF U.S. PATENT NO. 6,624,843 by Advance Magazine Publishers Inc., Conde Nast Americas LC, Conde Nast Digital, Conde Nast Publications Inc., Skullcandy Inc., Forevermark US Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-G)(Farnan, Kelly) (Entered: 01/08/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None
                                    Joint OPENING BRIEF in Support re 36 Joint MOTION to Stay DEFENDANTS JOINT MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING REEXAMINATION OF U.S. PATENT NO. 6,624,843 filed by Advance Magazine Publishers Inc., Conde Nast Americas LC, Conde Nast Digital, Conde Nast Publications Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 1/25/2013. (Farnan, Kelly) (Entered: 01/08/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None
                                      Joint MOTION to Stay DEFENDANTS JOINT MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING REEXAMINATION OF U.S. PATENT NO. 6,624,843 - filed by Advance Magazine Publishers Inc., Conde Nast Americas LC, Conde Nast Digital, Conde Nast Publications Inc., Skullcandy Inc., Forevermark US Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 7.1.1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Farnan, Kelly) (Entered: 01/08/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/14/2012, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) PLAINTIFF'S DISCLOSURE OF ASSERTED CLAIMS AND INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS and (2) this NOTICE OF SERVICE by Lennon Image Technologies LLC.(Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 12/14/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/30/2012, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re Lennon Image Technologies LLC: Entry of appearance of attorney Richard D. Kirk. Attorney Kenneth L. Dorsney terminated. (Kirk, Richard) (Entered: 11/30/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/19/2012, Entered: None
                                            MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jerry S. Birenz and Michael J. Anderson of Sabin, Bermant & Gould LLP - filed by Advance Magazine Publishers Inc., Conde Nast Americas LC, Conde Nast Digital, Conde Nast Publications Inc.. (Farnan, Kelly) (Entered: 11/19/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/14/2012, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Supplemental Initial Disclosures Pursuant To FRCP 26(a)(1)(A) by Advance Magazine Publishers Inc., Conde Nast Americas LC, Conde Nast Digital, Conde Nast Publications Inc..(Farnan, Kelly) (Entered: 11/14/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Disclosures Pursuant to Section 4(b) of the Delaware Default Standard for Discovery by Advance Magazine Publishers Inc., Conde Nast Americas LC, Conde Nast Digital, Conde Nast Publications Inc..(Farnan, Kelly) (Entered: 11/14/2012)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Responses and Objections to Lennon Image Technologies LLC's First Set of Requests for Production (1-46) by Advance Magazine Publishers Inc., Conde Nast Americas LC, Conde Nast Digital, Conde Nast Publications Inc..(Farnan, Kelly) (Entered: 11/09/2012)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Responses and Objections to Lennon Image Technologies LLC's First Set of Interrogatories (1-10) by Advance Magazine Publishers Inc., Conde Nast Americas LC, Conde Nast Digital, Conde Nast Publications Inc..(Farnan, Kelly) (Entered: 11/09/2012)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE OF SERVICE of (i) Plaintiff's Objections and Responses to Conde Nast's First Set of Requests for Production; and (ii) Plaintiff's Objections and Responses to Conde Nast's First Set of Interrogatories by Lennon Image Technologies LLC.(Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 11/08/2012)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                        NOTICE OF SERVICE of (i) Plaintiff's Rule 26 Initial Disclosures; (ii) Plaintiff's Section 4(a) Disclosures; and (iii) Plaintiff's Section 3 Disclosures by Lennon Image Technologies LLC.(Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 10/15/2012)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures Pursuant To FRCP 26(a)(1)(a) by Advance Magazine Publishers Inc., Conde Nast Americas LC, Conde Nast Digital, Conde Nast Publications Inc..(Farnan, Kelly) (Entered: 10/11/2012)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE OF SERVICE of Disclosures Pursuant to Section 3 of the Delaware Default Standard for Discovery by Advance Magazine Publishers Inc., Conde Nast Americas LC, Conde Nast Digital, Conde Nast Publications Inc..(Farnan, Kelly) (Entered: 10/11/2012)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE OF SERVICE of Conde Nast Defendants' First Set of Requests for Production to Lennon Image Technologies by Advance Magazine Publishers Inc., Conde Nast Americas LC, Conde Nast Digital, Conde Nast Publications Inc..(Farnan, Kelly) (Entered: 10/09/2012)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE OF SERVICE of Conde Nast Defendants' First Set of Interrogatories (1-12) to Lennon Image Technologies by Advance Magazine Publishers Inc., Conde Nast Americas LC, Conde Nast Digital, Conde Nast Publications Inc..(Farnan, Kelly) (Entered: 10/09/2012)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                  ANSWER to 16 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Lennon Image Technologies LLC.(Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 10/05/2012)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    ORDER Setting Teleconference: Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the call. A Telephone Conference is set for 12/17/2012 at 04:00 PM before Judge Sherry R. Fallon to discuss ADR. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 10/4/2012. (lih) (Entered: 10/04/2012)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                      NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories to Defendants (Nos. 1-10); and (2) Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Production to Defendants by Lennon Image Technologies LLC.(Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 10/01/2012)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                        PROPOSED ORDER - Joint [Proposed] Scheduling Order by Advance Magazine Publishers Inc., Conde Nast Americas LC, Conde Nast Digital, Conde Nast Publications Inc., Lennon Image Technologies LLC, Skullcandy Inc., Mattel Inc., Forevermark US Inc., Swatch Group (US) Inc., Tissot USA Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 10/01/2012)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                          MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Randy Lipsitz and Aaron Frankel of Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel LLP - filed by Advance Magazine Publishers Inc., Conde Nast Americas LC, Conde Nast Digital, Conde Nast Publications Inc.. (Farnan, Kelly) (Entered: 09/20/2012)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                            Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Advance Magazine Publishers Inc., Conde Nast Americas LC, Conde Nast Digital, Conde Nast Publications Inc.. (Farnan, Kelly) (Entered: 09/13/2012)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                              ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Lennon Image Technologies LLC by Advance Magazine Publishers Inc., Conde Nast Digital, Conde Nast Publications Inc., Conde Nast Americas LC.(Farnan, Kelly) (Entered: 09/13/2012)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                PROPOSED ORDER - Joint [Proposed] Scheduling Order re (10 in 1:12-cv-00901-SLR, 11 in 1:12-cv-00902-SLR, 10 in 1:12-cv-00900-SLR, 11 in 1:12-cv-00904-SLR, 12 in 1:12-cv-00905-SLR, 12 in 1:12-cv-00903-SLR) Order Setting Scheduling Conference by Advance Magazine Publishers Inc., Conde Nast Americas LC, Conde Nast Digital, Conde Nast Publications Inc., Lennon Image Technologies LLC, Skullcandy Inc., Mattel Inc., Forevermark US Inc., Boucheron Joaillerie USA Inc., Swatch Group (US) Inc., Tissot USA Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/13/2012)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                  STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Answer Complaint to September 13, 2012 (Unopposed Motion to Extend Time) - filed by Lennon Image Technologies LLC. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/05/2012)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Conde Nast Americas, LC on July 19, 2012, filed by Lennon Image Technologies LLC. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 08/27/2012)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      Order Setting Telephonic Scheduling Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 9/14/2012 at 09:00 AM before Judge Sue L. Robinson. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 8/23/2012. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-00900-SLR et al.(nmfn) (Entered: 08/23/2012)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                        Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Kenneth L. Dorsney regarding coordinated discovery and Markman proceedings - re (10 in 1:12-cv-00903-SLR, 10 in 1:12-cv-00903-SLR, 9 in 1:12-cv-00904-SLR, 9 in 1:12-cv-00904-SLR, 8 in 1:12-cv-00900-SLR, 8 in 1:12-cv-00900-SLR, 10 in 1:12-cv-00905-SLR, 10 in 1:12-cv-00905-SLR, 9 in 1:12-cv-00902-SLR, 9 in 1:12-cv-00902-SLR, 8 in 1:12-cv-00901-SLR, 8 in 1:12-cv-00901-SLR) Order, Set Deadlines,,. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 08/15/2012)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/15/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          ORDER, Counsel for plaintiff shall inform the court as to whether the need for coordinated discovery and/or Markman proceedings is anticipated as to the above cases and, if so, when a joint scheduling conference might most efficiently be conducted. ORDER, Setting Deadlines: ( Notice of Compliance deadline set for 8/29/2012.). Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 8/15/2012. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-00900-SLR et al.(nmfn) (Entered: 08/15/2012)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint (Unopposed) - filed by Lennon Image Technologies LLC. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 08/06/2012)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                              MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christopher M. Joe and Attorney Niky Bukovcan - filed by Lennon Image Technologies LLC. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 07/31/2012)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lennon Image Technologies LLC. Conde Nast Publications Inc. served on 7/17/2012, answer due 8/7/2012. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 07/18/2012)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lennon Image Technologies LLC. Conde Nast Digital served on 7/17/2012, answer due 8/7/2012. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 07/18/2012)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lennon Image Technologies LLC. Advance Magazine Publishers Inc. served on 7/17/2012, answer due 8/7/2012. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 07/18/2012)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Lennon Image Technologies LLC. (dmp, ) (Entered: 07/17/2012)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,624,843;. (dmp, ) (Entered: 07/17/2012)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction (dmp, ) (Entered: 07/17/2012)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                            COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement filed with Jury Demand against Advance Magazine Publishers Inc., Conde Nast Americas LC, Conde Nast Digital, Conde Nast Publications Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 311-1106661.) - filed by Lennon Image Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(dmp, ) (Entered: 07/17/2012)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 51 times.

                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                               
                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                              Need Password Help?