Cadence Pharmaceuticals Inc. et al v. Agila Specialties Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Delaware District Court, Case No. 1:14-cv-01499
District Judge Leonard P. Stark, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 1, 2017 at 5:45 AM EST (5.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Cadence Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas C. Grimm +1 302 658 9200 +1 302 658 3989 tcgefiling@mnat.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeremy Alexander Tigan +1 302 351 9106 jtigan@mnat.com
Mallinckrodt Ip Mallinckrodt Ip, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas C. Grimm +1 302 658 9200 +1 302 658 3989 tcgefiling@mnat.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeremy Alexander Tigan +1 302 351 9106 jtigan@mnat.com
No Logo Scr Pharmatop, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas C. Grimm +1 302 658 9200 +1 302 658 3989 tcgefiling@mnat.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeremy Alexander Tigan +1 302 351 9106 jtigan@mnat.com
No Logo Agila Specialties Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Phillips, Goldman & Spence, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A. Bilson +1 302 655 4200 +1 302 655 4210 dab@pgslaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John C. Phillips, Jr. +1 302 655 4200 +1 302 655 4210 jcp@pgslaw.com
No Logo Agila Specialties Private Limited Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Deepro R. Mukerjee

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Deepro R. Mukerjee

Toggle Switch Represented by James C. Grant

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James C. Grant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jonathan D. Parente

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan D. Parente

Toggle Switch Represented by Lance A Soderstrom

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lance A Soderstrom

Toggle Switch Represented by Phillips, Goldman & Spence, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A. Bilson +1 302 655 4200 +1 302 655 4210 dab@pgslaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John C. Phillips, Jr. +1 302 655 4200 +1 302 655 4210 jcp@pgslaw.com
v.
No Logo Agila Specialties Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Phillips, Goldman & Spence, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A. Bilson +1 302 655 4200 +1 302 655 4210 dab@pgslaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John C. Phillips, Jr. +1 302 655 4200 +1 302 655 4210 jcp@pgslaw.com
No Logo Agila Specialties Private Limited Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Deepro R. Mukerjee

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Deepro R. Mukerjee

Toggle Switch Represented by James C. Grant

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James C. Grant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jonathan D. Parente

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan D. Parente

Toggle Switch Represented by Lance A Soderstrom

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lance A Soderstrom

Toggle Switch Represented by Phillips, Goldman & Spence, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A. Bilson +1 302 655 4200 +1 302 655 4210 dab@pgslaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John C. Phillips, Jr. +1 302 655 4200 +1 302 655 4210 jcp@pgslaw.com
Mylan Laboratories Ltd. Mylan Laboratories Ltd., Defendant
Officially listed as "Mylan Laboratories Limited"

Toggle Switch Represented by Deepro R. Mukerjee

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Deepro R. Mukerjee

Toggle Switch Represented by James C. Grant

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James C. Grant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jonathan D. Parente

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan D. Parente

Toggle Switch Represented by Lance A Soderstrom

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lance A Soderstrom

Toggle Switch Represented by Phillips, Goldman & Spence, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A. Bilson +1 302 655 4200 +1 302 655 4210 dab@pgslaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John C. Phillips, Jr. +1 302 655 4200 +1 302 655 4210 jcp@pgslaw.com
No Logo Cadence Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas C. Grimm +1 302 658 9200 +1 302 658 3989 tcgefiling@mnat.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeremy Alexander Tigan +1 302 351 9106 jtigan@mnat.com
Mallinckrodt Ip Mallinckrodt Ip, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas C. Grimm +1 302 658 9200 +1 302 658 3989 tcgefiling@mnat.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeremy Alexander Tigan +1 302 351 9106 jtigan@mnat.com
No Logo Scr Pharmatop, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas C. Grimm +1 302 658 9200 +1 302 658 3989 tcgefiling@mnat.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeremy Alexander Tigan +1 302 351 9106 jtigan@mnat.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (59) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/25/2016, Entered: None
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Mylan Laboratories Ltd.and Agila Specialties Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiffs (Nos. 1-8) filed by Agila Specialties Inc., Mylan Laboratories Limited.(Bilson, David) (Entered: 02/25/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORAL ORDER: At the request of counsel, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the discovery teleconference scheduled for February 5, 2016 is CANCELLED. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/29/16. (ntl) (Entered: 01/29/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/22/2016, Entered: None
      Joint Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Thomas C. Grimm regarding interim status report - re 19 Scheduling Order,,. (Grimm, Thomas) (Entered: 01/22/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/21/2016, Entered: None
        NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Supplemental Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' Interrogatories (Nos. 1-14) filed by Agila Specialties Inc., Mylan Laboratories Limited.(Bilson, David) (Entered: 01/21/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/20/2016, Entered: None
          MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Daniel G. Brown - filed by Cadence Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mallinckrodt IP. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 01/20/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/19/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORAL ORDER: After having been advised by Plaintiff(s) and Defendant(s) of their inability to resolve a discovery matter, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a teleconference is scheduled for February 5, 2016 at 4:15 p.m. Counsel for the party seeking relief shall initiate the teleconference call to 302-573-4571. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that not later than January 26, 2016, any party seeking relief shall file with the Court a letter, not to exceed three (3) pages, outlining the issues in dispute and its position on those issues. Not later than January 28, 2016, any party opposing the application for relief may file a letter, not to exceed three (3) pages, outlining that party's reasons for its opposition. Each party shall submit to the Court two (2) courtesy copies of its discovery letter and any attachments. Should the Court find further briefing necessary upon conclusion of the telephone conference, the Court will order it. Alternatively, the Court may choose to resolve the dispute prior to the telephone conference and will, in that event, cancel the conference. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/19/16. (ntl) (Entered: 01/19/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 1/12/2016, Entered: None
              Joint Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Thomas C. Grimm regarding request for a discovery dispute teleconference. (Grimm, Thomas) (Entered: 01/12/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 11/25/2015, Entered: None
                Joint STIPULATION and Proposed Order Regarding Production of Samples by Cadence Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mallinckrodt IP, SCR Pharmatop. (Grimm, Thomas) (Entered: 11/25/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 11/20/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER Setting Mediation Conference: A Mediation Conference is set for 1/20/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2A before Judge Christopher J. Burke. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 11/20/2015. (dlk) (Entered: 11/20/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/26/2015, Entered: None
                    NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' Third Set of Interrogatories (No. 14) filed by Agila Specialties Inc., Mylan Laboratories Limited.(Bilson, David) (Entered: 10/26/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/8/2015, Entered: None
                      NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Objections and Responses to Defendants Mylan Laboratories Ltd. and Agila Specialties Inc.'s First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things to Plaintiffs (Nos. 1-35) filed by Cadence Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mallinckrodt IP, SCR Pharmatop.(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/08/2015)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/1/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER Setting Mediation Conference: A Telephone Conference is set for 11/16/2015 at 10:45 AM before Judge Christopher J. Burke.. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 10/1/2015. (dlk) (Entered: 10/01/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 9/30/2015, Entered: None
                          NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Mylan Laboratories Ltd. and Agila Specialties Inc.'s Initial Invalidity Contentions filed by Agila Specialties Inc., Mylan Laboratories Limited.(Bilson, David) (Entered: 09/30/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/30/2015, Entered: None
                            NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' [Confidential] Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' Second Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 12-13) filed by Agila Specialties Inc., Mylan Laboratories Limited.(Bilson, David) (Entered: 09/30/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: None
                              NOTICE OF SERVICE of Mylan's Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' Second Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 88-91) filed by Mylan Laboratories Limited.(Bilson, David) (Entered: 09/25/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: None
                                NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Third Set of Interrogatories (No. 14) filed by Cadence Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mallinckrodt IP, SCR Pharmatop.(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/25/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Mylan Laboratories Ltd. and Agila Specialties Inc.'s First Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Things to Plaintiffs (Nos. 1-35) filed by Agila Specialties Inc., Mylan Laboratories Limited.(Bilson, David) (Entered: 09/08/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Disclosure of ESI Search Terms Pursuant to Delaware Default Standard Paragraph 5.b. filed by Cadence Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mallinckrodt IP, SCR Pharmatop.(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/04/2015)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/2/2015, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Mylan Laboratories Ltd. and Agila Specialties Inc.'s Supplemental Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Default Standard for Discovery filed by Agila Specialties Inc., Mylan Laboratories Limited.(Bilson, David) (Entered: 09/02/2015)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Supplemental Disclosure of ESI Custodians and Other Non-Custodial ESI Sources That Will be Searched filed by Cadence Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mallinckrodt IP, SCR Pharmatop.(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 08/31/2015)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Second Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 12-13) filed by Cadence Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mallinckrodt IP, SCR Pharmatop.(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 08/31/2015)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Disclosure of Initial Claim Charts Pursuant to Delaware Default Standard Paragraph 5.c. filed by Cadence Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mallinckrodt IP, SCR Pharmatop.(Grimm, Thomas) (Entered: 08/31/2015)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/26/2015, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Second Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 88-91) filed by Cadence Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mallinckrodt IP, SCR Pharmatop.(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 08/26/2015)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/25/2015, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Corrected Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 1-87) filed by Agila Specialties Inc., Mylan Laboratories Limited.(Bilson, David) (Entered: 08/25/2015)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendants' Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-11); and (2) Defendants' Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 1-87) filed by Agila Specialties Inc., Mylan Laboratories Limited.(Bilson, David) (Entered: 08/21/2015)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                    Amended Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Mylan N.V. for Agila Specialties Inc., Mylan Laboratories Limited filed by Agila Specialties Inc., Mylan Laboratories Limited. (Phillips, John) (Entered: 08/19/2015)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Stephen P. Swinton as co-counsel. Reason for request: no longer with firm. (Grimm, Thomas) (Entered: 08/12/2015)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                        MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Melissa A. Brand - filed by Cadence Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mallinckrodt IP. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 08/03/2015)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                          MOTION Unopposed Motion to Change Name of Defendant Agila Specialties Private Ltd. - filed by Agila Specialties Inc., Agila Specialties Private Limited Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Phillips, John) (Entered: 07/30/2015)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-11) and (2) Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 1-87) filed by Cadence Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mallinckrodt IP, SCR Pharmatop.(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 07/22/2015)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiffs' Initial Disclosures Identifying Defendants' Accused Products and Asserted Patents and (2) Plaintiff's Disclosure of ESI Custodians and other Non-Custodial ESI Sources that will be Searched filed by Cadence Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mallinckrodt IP, SCR Pharmatop.(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 07/17/2015)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Agila Specialties Private Limited, Inc. and Agila Specialties Inc.'s Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Default Standard for Discovery filed by Agila Specialties Inc., Agila Specialties Private Limited Inc..(Bilson, David) (Entered: 07/17/2015)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  ORDER Setting Mediation Conference: A Telephone Conference is set for 9/28/2015 at 10:45 AM before Judge Christopher J. Burke.. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 7/14/2015. (dlk) (Entered: 07/14/2015)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                    STIPULATION regarding e-discovery re 19 Scheduling Order,, by Cadence Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mallinckrodt IP, SCR Pharmatop. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 07/13/2015)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                      ANSWER to 23 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim - Plaintiffs' Answer and Defenses to Defendants' Counterclaims by Cadence Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mallinckrodt IP, SCR Pharmatop.(Grimm, Thomas) (Entered: 07/06/2015)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/25/2015, Entered: None
                                                                        PROPOSED ORDER - Stipulated Protective Order by Cadence Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mallinckrodt IP, SCR Pharmatop. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/25/2015)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                          Amended ANSWER to 1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Cadence Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mallinckrodt IP, SCR Pharmatop by Agila Specialties Inc., Agila Specialties Private Limited Inc..(Phillips, John) (Entered: 06/19/2015)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER Setting Mediation Conference: A Telephone Conference is set for 7/13/2015 at 10:30 AM before Judge Christopher J. Burke.Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 6/18/2015. (dlk) (Entered: 06/18/2015)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                              NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Initial Disclosures filed by Cadence Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mallinckrodt IP, SCR Pharmatop.(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/16/2015)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Agila Specialties Private Limited, Inc. and Agila Specialties Inc.'s Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) filed by Agila Specialties Inc., Agila Specialties Private Limited Inc..(Bilson, David) (Entered: 06/16/2015)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. Discovery due by 8/12/2016. Status Report due by 1/22/2016. Claim Construction Opening Brief due by 4/22/2016. Claim Construction Answering Brief due by 5/20/2016. A Markman Hearing is set for 6/27/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6B before Judge Leonard P. Stark. A Final Pretrial Conference is set for 12/22/2016 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 6B before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/12/2016. A 4-day Bench Trial is set for 1/9/2017 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6B before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/10/15. (ntl) (Entered: 06/11/2015)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                    STIPULATION Regarding Defendants' Amended Answer by Agila Specialties Inc., Agila Specialties Private Limited Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Phillips, John) (Main Document 18 replaced on 6/16/2015) (ntl). (Entered: 06/01/2015)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                      MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Stephen P. Swinton, Kenneth G. Schuler, Darryl H. Steensma, Marc N. Zubick, Emily C. Melvin, Parker M. Tresemer, and Matthew C. Darch - filed by Cadence Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mallinckrodt IP, SCR Pharmatop. (Grimm, Thomas) (Entered: 05/06/2015)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                        PROPOSED ORDER Scheduling Order by Agila Specialties Inc., Agila Specialties Private Limited Inc.. (Phillips, John) (Entered: 04/10/2015)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/25/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall confer regarding proposed dates in the scheduling order and shall submit a proposal, including a proposal for the length and timing of trial, to the Court no later than April 10, 2015. The parties are to review the Court's form scheduling order, which is posted at http://www.ded.uscourts.gov (see Chambers, Judge Stark, New Patent Procedures). ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/25/15. (ntl) (Entered: 03/25/2015)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                            MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James C. Grant, Deepro R. Mukerjee, Lance A. Soderstrom and Jonathan D. Parente - filed by Agila Specialties Inc., Agila Specialties Private Limited Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of James C. Grant, # 2 Certification of Deepro R. Mukerjee, # 3 Certification of Lance A. Soderstrom, # 4 Certification of Jonathan D. Parente)(Bilson, David) (Entered: 03/02/2015)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                              Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Mylan Inc. for Agila Specialties Inc., Agila Specialties Private Limited Inc. filed by Agila Specialties Inc., Agila Specialties Private Limited Inc.. (Phillips, John) (Entered: 02/13/2015)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                ANSWER to 1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses by Agila Specialties Inc., Agila Specialties Private Limited Inc..(Phillips, John) (Entered: 02/12/2015)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                  STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Complaint to February 12, 2015 - filed by Agila Specialties Inc., Agila Specialties Private Limited Inc.. (Bilson, David) (Entered: 02/06/2015)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                    STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Complaint to February 9, 2015 - filed by Agila Specialties Inc., Agila Specialties Private Limited Inc.. (Phillips, John) (Entered: 01/22/2015)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, and related papers served on Agila Specialties Privated Limited, Inc. on January 15, 2015, filed by Cadence Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mallinckrodt IP, SCR Pharmatop. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-B)(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 01/15/2015)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by SCR Pharmatop, Cadence Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mallinckrodt IP. Agila Specialties Inc. served on 1/7/2015, answer due 1/28/2015. (Grimm, Thomas) (Entered: 01/08/2015)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Mallinckrodt plc for Mallinckrodt IP filed by Mallinckrodt IP. (dmp, ) (Entered: 12/22/2014)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by SCR Pharmatop. (dmp, ) (Entered: 12/22/2014)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Mallinckrodt plc for Cadence Pharmaceuticals Inc. filed by Cadence Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (dmp, ) (Entered: 12/22/2014)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,028,222; 6,992,218 B2;. (dmp, ) (Entered: 12/22/2014)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: 11/13/2014. Date of Expiration of Patent: SEE ATTACHED.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 5/13/2017. (dmp, ) (Entered: 12/22/2014)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (dmp, ) (Entered: 12/22/2014)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed against Agila Specialties Inc., Agila Specialties Private Limited Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 311-1644473.) - filed by SCR Pharmatop, Cadence Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mallinckrodt IP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-B, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(dmp, ) (Entered: 12/22/2014)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 105 times.

                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?