Astellas Pharma Inc. et al v. Fresenius Kabi USA LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Delaware District Court, Case No. 1:15-cv-00080
District Judge Leonard P. Stark, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 30, 2016 at 1:18 AM EST (5.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Astellas Pharma Inc., Plaintiff
Officer/Director, Astellas Us Holding, Inc.
Officer/Director, Ruby Acqusition, Inc.
Officer/Director, Oncogene Science, Inc.
Officer/Director, Fibrogen, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack B. Blumenfeld +1 302 658 9200 jbbefiling@mnat.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Maryellen Noreika +1 302 658 9200 mnoreika@mnat.com
No Logo Astellas Pharma US, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack B. Blumenfeld +1 302 658 9200 jbbefiling@mnat.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Maryellen Noreika +1 302 658 9200 mnoreika@mnat.com
No Logo Astellas Us LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack B. Blumenfeld +1 302 658 9200 jbbefiling@mnat.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Maryellen Noreika +1 302 658 9200 mnoreika@mnat.com
No Logo Fresenius Kabi Usa, LLC, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Phillips, Goldman & Spence, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John C. Phillips, Jr. +1 302 655 4200 +1 302 655 4210 jcp@pgslaw.com
v.
No Logo Fresenius Kabi Usa, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cynthia L Hardman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cynthia L Hardman

Toggle Switch Represented by Daniel P. Margolis

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel P. Margolis

Toggle Switch Represented by Daryl L. Wiesen

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daryl L. Wiesen

Toggle Switch Represented by Kenneth L Mueller

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth L Mueller

Toggle Switch Represented by Phillips, Goldman & Spence, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A. Bilson +1 302 655 4200 +1 302 655 4210 dab@pgslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John C. Phillips, Jr. +1 302 655 4200 +1 302 655 4210 jcp@pgslaw.com
No Logo Astellas Pharma Inc., Counter-Defendant
Officer/Director, Astellas Us Holding, Inc.
Officer/Director, Ruby Acqusition, Inc.
Officer/Director, Oncogene Science, Inc.
Officer/Director, Fibrogen, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack B. Blumenfeld +1 302 658 9200 jbbefiling@mnat.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Maryellen Noreika +1 302 658 9200 mnoreika@mnat.com
No Logo Astellas Pharma US, Inc., Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack B. Blumenfeld +1 302 658 9200 jbbefiling@mnat.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Maryellen Noreika +1 302 658 9200 mnoreika@mnat.com
No Logo Astellas Us LLC, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack B. Blumenfeld +1 302 658 9200 jbbefiling@mnat.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Maryellen Noreika +1 302 658 9200 mnoreika@mnat.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (38) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
SO ORDERED, re 37 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME regarding Markman Proceedings to various (see Stipulation) -- Claim Construction Answering Brief due by 5/13/2016. Claim Construction Opening Brief due by 4/15/2016. A Markman Hearing is set for 6/21/2016 at 1:00 PM in Courtroom 6B before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/29/16. (ntl) (Entered: 02/29/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/26/2016, Entered: None
    STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME regarding Markman Proceedings to various (see Stipulation) - filed by Astellas Pharma Inc., Astellas Pharma US Inc., Astellas US LLC. (Noreika, Maryellen) (Entered: 02/26/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/15/2016, Entered: None
      STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Various Deadlines to See Stipulation for Specific Dates - filed by Fresenius Kabi USA LLC. (Phillips, John) (Entered: 02/15/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/3/2016, Entered: None
        NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Fresenius Kabi USA, LLC's Second Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things to Plaintiffs (Nos. 52-54) filed by Fresenius Kabi USA LLC.(Bilson, David) (Entered: 02/03/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/11/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER Setting Mediation Conference: A Telephone Conference is set for 2/1/2016 at 10:15 AM before Judge Christopher J. Burke. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 1/11/2016. (dlk) (Entered: 01/11/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
            SO ORDERED, re 32 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME Regarding Markman Proceedings -- Claim Construction Answering Brief due by 3/18/2016. Claim Construction Opening Brief due by 2/19/2016. A Markman Hearing is set for 5/9/2016 at 1:00 PM in Courtroom 6B before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/7/16. (ntl) (Entered: 01/08/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/6/2016, Entered: None
              STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Regarding Markman Proceedings to February 19, 2016 (Initial claim construction briefs), March 18, 2016 (Answering/responsive claim construction briefs) and May 2016 (Claim construction hearing) - filed by Astellas Pharma Inc., Astellas Pharma US Inc., Astellas US LLC. (Noreika, Maryellen) (Entered: 01/06/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/24/2015, Entered: None
                Joint APPENDIX re 30 Claim Construction Chart by Astellas Pharma Inc., Astellas Pharma US Inc., Astellas US LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A & B)(Noreika, Maryellen) (Entered: 11/24/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/24/2015, Entered: None
                  CLAIM Construction Chart by Astellas Pharma Inc., Astellas Pharma US Inc., Astellas US LLC. (Noreika, Maryellen) (Entered: 11/24/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/6/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER Setting Mediation Conferences: A Telephone Conference is set for 10/26/2015 at 10:15 AM before Judge Christopher J. Burke.Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 10/6/2015. (dlk) (Entered: 10/06/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/23/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER Setting Mediation Conference: A Telephone Conference is set for 10/5/2015 at 10:30 AM before Judge Christopher J. Burke.Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 9/23/2015. (dlk) (Entered: 09/23/2015)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/14/2015, Entered: None
                        NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Fresenius Kabi USA, LLC's Initial Invalidity Contentions and accompanying document production filed by Fresenius Kabi USA LLC.(Bilson, David) (Entered: 09/14/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: None
                          NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Fresenius Kabi USA, LLC's Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-5) and Defendant Fresenius Kabi USA, LLC's Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 1-31) filed by Fresenius Kabi USA LLC.(Bilson, David) (Entered: 09/04/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/3/2015, Entered: None
                            NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiffs' Objections and Responses to Fresenius Kabi USA, LLC's First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-6) and (2) Plaintiffs' Objections and Responses to Fresenius Kabi USA, LLC's First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 1-51) filed by Astellas Pharma Inc., Astellas Pharma US Inc., Astellas US LLC.(Noreika, Maryellen) (Entered: 09/03/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: None
                              NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Initial Infringement Claim Charts filed by Astellas Pharma Inc., Astellas Pharma US Inc., Astellas US LLC.(Noreika, Maryellen) (Entered: 08/12/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: None
                                NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories and (2) Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things filed by Astellas Pharma Inc., Astellas Pharma US Inc., Astellas US LLC.(Noreika, Maryellen) (Entered: 08/05/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Fresenius Kabi USA, LLC's First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-6) and Defendant Fresenius Kabi USA LLC's First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things to Plaintiffs (Nos. 1-51) filed by Fresenius Kabi USA LLC.(Bilson, David) (Entered: 08/04/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None
                                    PROPOSED ORDER -- Stipulated Protective Order -- by Astellas Pharma Inc., Astellas Pharma US Inc., Astellas US LLC. (Noreika, Maryellen) (Entered: 07/02/2015)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ORDER Setting Mediation Conference: A Telephone Conference is set for 9/14/2015 at 10:30 AM before Judge Christopher J. Burke.Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 6/29/2015. (dlk) (Entered: 06/29/2015)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ORDER Setting Mediation Conference: A Telephone Conference is set for 6/29/2015 at 11:00 AM before Judge Christopher J. Burke. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 6/17/2015. (dlk) (Entered: 06/17/2015)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiffs' Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures and (2) Plaintiffs' Default Standard Disclosures filed by Astellas Pharma Inc., Astellas Pharma US Inc., Astellas US LLC.(Noreika, Maryellen) (Entered: 06/11/2015)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE OF SERVICE of [Confidential] Initial Disclosures of Defendant Fresenius Kabi USA, LLC Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) and [Confidential] Fresenius's Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Delaware Default Standard for Discovery filed by Fresenius Kabi USA LLC.(Phillips, John) (Entered: 06/11/2015)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/10/2015, Entered: None
                                              STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Submit Proposed Protective Order to July 2, 2015 - filed by Fresenius Kabi USA LLC. (Phillips, John) (Entered: 06/10/2015)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                Amended Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: December 15, 2014. Date of Expiration of Patent: March 16, 2019 & January 8, 2021.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 6/15/2017. (Noreika, Maryellen) (Entered: 05/12/2015)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. Discovery due by 6/3/2016. Status Report due by 3/11/2016. Claim Construction Opening Brief due by 1/19/2016. Claim Construction Answering Brief due by 2/17/2016. A Markman Hearing is set for 4/4/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6B before Judge Leonard P. Stark. A Final Pretrial Conference is set for 11/22/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6B before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/15/2016. A 4-day Bench Trial is set for 12/5/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6B before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/11/15. (ntl) (Entered: 05/12/2015)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                    PROPOSED ORDER -- [Proposed] Scheduling Order -- by Astellas Pharma Inc., Astellas Pharma US Inc., Astellas US LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark)(Noreika, Maryellen) (Entered: 05/05/2015)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/21/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall confer regarding proposed dates in the scheduling order and shall submit a proposal, including a proposal for the length and timing of trial, to the Court no later than May 5, 2015. The parties are to review the Court's form scheduling order, which is posted at http://www.ded.uscourts.gov (see Chambers, Judge Stark, New Patent Procedures). ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/21/15. (ntl) (Entered: 04/21/2015)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                        ANSWER to 7 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Astellas Pharma Inc., Astellas Pharma US Inc., Astellas US LLC.(Noreika, Maryellen) (Entered: 03/09/2015)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                          MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert L. Baechtold, John D. Murnane, Simon D. Roberts, and Erin J.D. Austin - filed by Astellas Pharma Inc., Astellas Pharma US Inc., Astellas US LLC. (Noreika, Maryellen) (Entered: 03/04/2015)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                            MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Daryl L. Wiesen, Kenneth L. Mueller, Cynthia Lambert Hardman and Daniel P. Margolis - filed by Fresenius Kabi USA LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Wiesen Pro Hac Certification, # 2 Mueller Pro Hac Certification, # 3 Hardman Pro Hac Certification, # 4 Margolis Pro Hac Certification)(Bilson, David) (Entered: 02/13/2015)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                              Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Fresenius SE & Co. KGaA for Fresenius Kabi USA LLC filed by Fresenius Kabi USA LLC. (Phillips, John) (Entered: 02/13/2015)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                ANSWER to 1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Astellas Pharma Inc., Astellas Pharma US Inc., Astellas US LLC by Fresenius Kabi USA LLC.(Phillips, John) (Entered: 02/13/2015)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Astellas US LLC, Astellas Pharma Inc., Astellas Pharma US Inc.. Fresenius Kabi USA LLC served on 1/26/2015, answer due 2/17/2015. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 01/27/2015)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                    Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate Astellas US Holding Inc. for Astellas Pharma Inc., Astellas Pharma US Inc. filed by Astellas Pharma Inc., Astellas Pharma US Inc.. (els) (Entered: 01/26/2015)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                      Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,107,458; 6,774,104 B1;. (els) (Entered: 01/26/2015)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                        Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: 12/16/14. Date of Expiration of Patent: 3/16/19 and 1/8/21.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 6/16/2017. (els) (Entered: 01/26/2015)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (els) (Entered: 01/26/2015)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                            COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed against Fresenius Kabi USA LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-1662075.) - filed by Astellas US LLC, Astellas Pharma Inc., Astellas Pharma US Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-B, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(els) (Entered: 01/26/2015)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                              Statistics

                                                                              This case has been viewed 67 times.

                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                              Space
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                               
                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                              Need Password Help?