Bear Creek Technologies Inc. v. 8x8, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Delaware District Court, Case No. 1:11-cv-00728
District Judge Gregory M. Sleet, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 25, 2016 at 1:38 PM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo BEAR CREEK TECHNOLOGIES, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Anthony L. Miele

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/07/2013, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anthony L. Miele

Toggle Switch Represented by Deep Ellum Search

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
(Inactive), ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa L. Troutner mtroutner@bna.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jennifer B. Furey

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer B. Furey

Toggle Switch Represented by Manion Gaynor & Manning LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marc J. Phillips +1 302 657 2100 +1 302 657 2104

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilbraham Lawler & Buba

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/15/2013, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter John Faben +1 302 421 9935 +1 302 421 9955 pjf@wlbdeflaw.com
No Logo 8x8, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Potter Anderson & Corroon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Ellis Moore +1 302 984 6000 dmoore@potteranderson.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robert J. Crawford

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert J. Crawford
v.
No Logo 8x8, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ashby & Geddes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John G. Day +1 302 654 1888 jday@ashby-geddes.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Potter Anderson & Corroon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Ellis Moore +1 302 984 6000 dmoore@potteranderson.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robert J. Crawford

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert J. Crawford
No Logo BEAR CREEK TECHNOLOGIES, INC., Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Anthony L. Miele

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/07/2013, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anthony L. Miele

Toggle Switch Represented by Jennifer B. Furey

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer B. Furey

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilbraham Lawler & Buba

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/15/2013, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter John Faben +1 302 421 9935 +1 302 421 9955 pjf@wlbdeflaw.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (57) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 10/29/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE of Change of Address by Marc J. Phillips (Phillips, Marc) (Entered: 10/29/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/5/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE. Case is closed for administrative purposes with leave to reopen if further attention by the Court is required (CASE CLOSED). Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 5/5/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02344-GMS et al.(asw) (Entered: 05/05/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 11/7/2013, Entered: None
      MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Martin F. Gaynor - filed by Bear Creek Technologies Inc.. (Phillips, Marc) (Entered: 11/07/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 11/7/2013, Entered: None
        NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Anthony L. Miele as co-counsel.. (Phillips, Marc) (Entered: 11/07/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
          SO ORDERED, re (84 in 1:12-cv-00565-GMS, 399 in 1:12-cv-00568-GMS, 248 in 1:12-cv-00600-GMS, 54 in 1:11-cv-00724-GMS, 48 in 1:12-cv-00566-GMS, 52 in 1:11-cv-00728-GMS, 66 in 1:11-cv-00729-GMS, 48 in 1:11-cv-00722-GMS, 59 in 1:11-cv-00730-GMS, 58 in 1:11-cv-00727-GMS, 54 in 1:11-cv-00725-GMS, 51 in 1:12-cv-00567-GMS, 54 in 1:11-cv-00726-GMS, 55 in 1:11-cv-00721-GMS, 134 in 1:12-md-02344-GMS, 52 in 1:11-cv-00723-GMS) Proposed Order, filed by 8x8, Inc., Vonage America Inc., RCN Corporation, Mediacom Broadband LLC, Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc., AT&T Corp., Qwest Communications International Inc., Vonage Communications, Inc., CSC Holdings LLC, Charter Communications Inc., Cox Communications Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc., Vonage Holdings Corporation, Comcast Cable Communications LLC, Mediacom Communications Corporation, Vonage Marketing LLC, Verizon Services Corp., MCI Communications Services Inc., Cox Virginia Telecom LLC, Aptela Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Bright House Networks LLC, Primus Telecommunications Inc., Qwest Communications Company LLC. Signed by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 8/6/2013. Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02344-GMS et al.(asw) (Entered: 08/06/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: None
            PROPOSED ORDER Detailing Scope and Limitations of Defendants' Estoppel by 8x8, Inc., MCI Communications Services Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc., Qwest Communications Company LLC, Qwest Communications International Inc., Bright House Networks LLC, Time Warner Cable Inc., AT&T Corp., Aptela Inc., CSC Holdings LLC, Charter Communications Inc., Comcast Cable Communications LLC, Cox Communications Inc., Cox Virginia Telecom LLC, Mediacom Broadband LLC, Mediacom Communications Corporation, Primus Telecommunications Inc., RCN Corporation, SBC Internet Services Inc., Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Services Corp., Vonage America Inc., Vonage Communications, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corporation, Vonage Marketing LLC. (Day, John) (Entered: 07/19/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER in case 1:11-cv-00721-GMS; granting (26) Motion to Stay in case 1:11-cv-00726-GMS; granting (26) Motion to Stay in case 1:11-cv-00725-GMS; granting (20) Motion to Stay in case 1:11-cv-00722-GMS; granting (28) Motion to Stay in case 1:11-cv-00730-GMS; granting (21) Motion to Stay in case 1:11-cv-00724-GMS; granting (36) Motion to Stay in case 1:11-cv-00729-GMS; granting (54) Motion to Stay in case 1:12-md-02344-GMS; granting (57) Motion to Stay in case 1:12-cv-00565-GMS. Signed by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 7/17/2013. Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02344-GMS et al.(asw) (Entered: 07/17/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None
                NOTICE OF SERVICE of Bear Creek Technologies, Inc.'s Responses to 8x8, Inc.'s First Set of Requests for Production (Nos. 1-3) and First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-3) by Bear Creek Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Phillips, Marc) (Entered: 07/01/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 6/27/2013, Entered: None
                  STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to submit a proposed protective order to July 12, 2013 - filed by Bear Creek Technologies Inc., Bright House Networks LLC, Time Warner Cable Inc., Vonage America Inc., Vonage Holdings Corporation, Vonage Marketing LLC, Cox Communications, Inc., Cox Virginia Telecom LLC, AT&T Corp., SBC Internet Services Inc., Vonage Communications, Inc., Aptela Inc., 8x8, Inc., CSC Holdings LLC, Comcast Cable Communications LLC, T-Mobile USA Inc., RCN Corporation, Mediacom Broadband LLC, Mediacom Communications Corporation, Charter Communications Inc., Qwest Communications Company LLC, Qwest Communications International Inc., Lingo Inc., Primus Telecommunications Inc.. (Day, John) (Entered: 06/27/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: None
                    NOTICE of Appearance by Marc J. Phillips on behalf of Bear Creek Technologies Inc., Bear Creek Technologies Inc. ('722) Patent Litigation, Bear Creek Technologies Inc. (Phillips, Marc) (Entered: 06/26/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/17/2013, Entered: None
                      SO ORDERED, re (46 in 1:11-cv-00728-GMS, 54 in 1:11-cv-00730-GMS, 78 in 1:12-cv-00565-GMS, 394 in 1:12-cv-00568-GMS, 47 in 1:11-cv-00723-GMS, 48 in 1:11-cv-00725-GMS, 45 in 1:12-cv-00567-GMS, 48 in 1:11-cv-00726-GMS, 60 in 1:11-cv-00729-GMS, 49 in 1:11-cv-00721-GMS, 50 in 1:11-cv-00727-GMS, 43 in 1:11-cv-00722-GMS, 47 in 1:11-cv-00724-GMS, 43 in 1:12-cv-00566-GMS, 120 in 1:12-md-02344-GMS) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to submit a proposed protective order to June 28, 2013 filed by 8x8, Inc., Vonage America Inc., RCN Corporation, Mediacom Broadband LLC, Lingo Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc., Cox Communications, Inc., AT&T Corp., Qwest Communications International Inc., Vonage Communications, Inc., CSC Holdings LLC, Bear Creek Technologies Inc. ('722) Patent Litigation, Charter Communications Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc., Vonage Holdings Corporation, Comcast Cable Communications LLC, Vonage Marketing LLC, Mediacom Communications Corporation, Cox Virginia Telecom LLC, Aptela Inc., Bright House Networks LLC, SBC Internet Services Inc., Primus Telecommunications Inc., Qwest Communications Company LLC Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02344-GMS et al.(mmm) (Entered: 06/17/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 6/12/2013, Entered: None
                        STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to submit a proposed protective order to June 28, 2013 - filed by Bright House Networks LLC, Time Warner Cable Inc., Vonage America Inc., Vonage Holdings Corporation, Vonage Marketing LLC, Cox Communications, Inc., Cox Virginia Telecom LLC, AT&T Corp., SBC Internet Services Inc., 8x8, Inc., Aptela Inc., Bear Creek Technologies Inc. ('722) Patent Litigation, CSC Holdings LLC, Charter Communications Inc., Comcast Cable Communications LLC, Lingo Inc., Mediacom Broadband LLC, Mediacom Communications Corporation, Primus Telecommunications Inc., Qwest Communications Company LLC, Qwest Communications International Inc., RCN Corporation, T-Mobile USA Inc., Vonage Communications, Inc.. (Day, John) (Entered: 06/12/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 6/6/2013, Entered: None
                          NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant 8x8, Inc.'s Supplemental Disclosure Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Default Standard for Discovery, Including Discovery of Electronically Stored Information ("ESI") by 8x8, Inc..(Moore, David) (Entered: 06/06/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: None
                            NOTICE OF SERVICE of DEFENDANT 8X8, INC.'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF BEAR CREEK TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES (NOS. 1-13); and DEFENDANT 8X8, INC.'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF BEAR CREEK TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S FIRST SET OF REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION (NOS. 1-74) by 8x8, Inc..(Moore, David) (Entered: 06/04/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: None
                              NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant 8x8, Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-3); and Defendant 8x8, Inc.'s First Set of Requests for Production to Plaintiff Bear Creek Technologies, Inc. (Nos. 1-3) by 8x8, Inc..(Moore, David) (Entered: 06/04/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                SO ORDERED, re (101 in 1:12-md-02344-GMS, 243 in 1:12-cv-00600-GMS, 45 in 1:11-cv-00726-GMS, 41 in 1:12-cv-00566-GMS, 390 in 1:12-cv-00568-GMS, 50 in 1:11-cv-00730-GMS, 40 in 1:11-cv-00722-GMS, 41 in 1:11-cv-00728-GMS, 42 in 1:11-cv-00724-GMS, 44 in 1:11-cv-00723-GMS, 74 in 1:12-cv-00565-GMS, 57 in 1:11-cv-00729-GMS, 46 in 1:11-cv-00721-GMS, 45 in 1:11-cv-00725-GMS, 46 in 1:11-cv-00727-GMS, 41 in 1:12-cv-00567-GMS) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to submit proposed protective order to June 12, 2013 filed by 8x8, Inc., Vonage America Inc., RCN Corporation, Mediacom Broadband LLC, Lingo Inc., Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc., AT&T Corp., Qwest Communications International Inc., Vonage Communications, Inc., CSC Holdings LLC, Bear Creek Technologies Inc. ('722) Patent Litigation, Charter Communications Inc., Cox Communications Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc., Vonage Holdings Corporation, Comcast Cable Communications LLC, Mediacom Communications Corporation, Vonage Marketing LLC, Verizon Services Corp., MCI Communications Services Inc., Cox Virginia Telecom LLC, Aptela Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Bright House Networks LLC, Primus Telecommunications Inc., Qwest Communications Company LLC. Signed by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 6/3/13. Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02344-GMS et al.(mmm) (Entered: 06/03/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: None
                                  STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to submit proposed protective order to June 12, 2013 - filed by 8x8, Inc., AT&T Corp., Aptela Inc., Bear Creek Technologies Inc. ('722) Patent Litigation, Bright House Networks LLC, CSC Holdings LLC, Charter Communications Inc., Comcast Cable Communications LLC, Cox Communications Inc., Cox Virginia Telecom LLC, Lingo Inc., MCI Communications Services Inc., Mediacom Broadband LLC, Mediacom Communications Corporation, Primus Telecommunications Inc., Qwest Communications Company LLC, Qwest Communications International Inc., RCN Corporation, SBC Internet Services Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc., Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Services Corp., Vonage America Inc., Vonage Communications, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corporation, Vonage Marketing LLC. (Day, John) (Entered: 05/29/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/16/2013, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE OF SERVICE of Bear Creek Technologies, Inc.'s Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Default Standard for Discovery, Including Discovery of Electronically Stored Information ("ESI") by Bear Creek Technologies Inc., Bear Creek Technologies Inc. ('722) Patent Litigation, Bear Creek Technologies Inc..(Troutner, Melissa) (Entered: 05/16/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/14/2013, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Peter J. Faben as co-counsel. Reason for request: No longer employed with Cooley Manion Jones LLP. (Troutner, Melissa) (Entered: 05/14/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None
                                        STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to submit protective order to May 29, 2013 - filed by 8x8, Inc., AT&T Corp., Aptela Inc., Bear Creek Technologies Inc., Bright House Networks LLC, CSC Holdings LLC, Charter Communications Inc., Comcast Cable Communications LLC, Comcast Corporation, Cox Communications Inc., Cox Virginia Telecom LLC, Lingo Inc., Mediacom Broadband LLC, Mediacom Communications Corporation, Primus Telecommunications Inc., Qwest Communications Company LLC, Qwest Communications International Inc., RCN Corporation, SBC Internet Services Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc., Vonage America Inc., Vonage Communications, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corporation, Vonage Marketing LLC. (Lydon, Tiffany) (Entered: 05/13/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/7/2013, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE OF SERVICE of Bear Creek Technologies, Inc.'s Initial Disclosures by Bear Creek Technologies Inc., Bear Creek Technologies Inc. ('722) Patent Litigation, Bear Creek Technologies Inc..(Troutner, Melissa) (Entered: 05/07/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/7/2013, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant 8x8 Inc.'s Initial Disclosures by 8x8, Inc..(Moore, David) (Entered: 05/07/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/16/2013, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Shane O. Sondreal of Crawford Maunu PLLC as co-counsel. Reason for request: no longer involved in this case. (Moore, David) (Entered: 04/16/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                SO ORDERED, re (32 in 1:11-cv-00727-GMS, 33 in 1:12-cv-00566-GMS, 26 in 1:11-cv-00722-GMS, 31 in 1:11-cv-00723-GMS, 32 in 1:11-cv-00725-GMS, 63 in 1:12-cv-00565-GMS, 42 in 1:11-cv-00729-GMS, 381 in 1:12-cv-00568-GMS, 237 in 1:12-cv-00600-GMS, 32 in 1:12-cv-00567-GMS, 64 in 1:12-md-02344-GMS, 34 in 1:11-cv-00730-GMS, 31 in 1:11-cv-00728-GMS, 31 in 1:11-cv-00721-GMS, 27 in 1:11-cv-00724-GMS, 32 in 1:11-cv-00726-GMS) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to file reply brief on motion for stay to April 4, 2013 filed by 8x8, Inc., Vonage America Inc., RCN Corporation, Comcast Corporation, Mediacom Broadband LLC, Lingo Inc., Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc., Qwest Communications International Inc., Vonage Communications, Inc., CSC Holdings LLC, Bear Creek Technologies Inc. ('722) Patent Litigation, Charter Communications Inc., Cox Communications Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc., Vonage Holdings Corporation, Comcast Cable Communications LLC, Mediacom Communications Corporation, Vonage Marketing LLC, Verizon Services Corp., AT&T Teleholdings Inc., MCI Communications Services Inc., Cox Virginia Telecom LLC, Aptela Inc., AT&T Inc., Bright House Networks LLC, Primus Telecommunications Inc., Qwest Communications Company LLC. Signed by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 4/2/2013. Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02344-GMS et al.(asw) (Entered: 04/02/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  MOTION for Scheduling Order - filed by Bear Creek Technologies Inc., Bear Creek Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Letter to Judge Sleet)(Troutner, Melissa) (Entered: 03/29/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa L. Troutner on behalf of Bear Creek Technologies Inc. (Troutner, Melissa) (Entered: 03/28/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                      STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to file reply brief on motion for stay to April 4, 2013 - filed by 8x8, Inc., AT&T Inc., AT&T Teleholdings Inc., Aptela Inc., Bear Creek Technologies Inc. ('722) Patent Litigation, Bright House Networks LLC, CSC Holdings LLC, Charter Communications Inc., Comcast Cable Communications LLC, Comcast Corporation, Cox Communications Inc., Cox Virginia Telecom LLC, Lingo Inc., MCI Communications Services Inc., Mediacom Broadband LLC, Mediacom Communications Corporation, Primus Telecommunications Inc., Qwest Communications Company LLC, Qwest Communications International Inc., RCN Corporation, T-Mobile USA Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc., Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Services Corp., Vonage America Inc., Vonage Communications, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corporation, Vonage Marketing LLC. (Day, John) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Amaryah K. Bocchino on behalf of Bear Creek Technologies Inc. (Bocchino, Amaryah) (Entered: 03/18/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                          Joint STATUS REPORT by Bear Creek Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Bear Creek's Proposed Scheduling Order, # 2 Exhibit B - Defendants' Proposed Scheduling Order)(Faben, Peter) (Entered: 03/12/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                            MOTION to Appoint Counsel as Lead and Liaison Counsel for Bear Creek Technologies, Inc. - filed by Bear Creek Technologies Inc.. (Faben, Peter) (Entered: 03/12/2013)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                              STATEMENT DEFENDANTS' SUBMISSION WITH RESPECT TO THE APPOINTMENT OF LEAD AND LIAISON COUNSEL by 8x8, Inc.. (Moore, David) (Entered: 02/01/2013)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                ANSWER to 24 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant by Bear Creek Technologies Inc..(Faben, Peter) (Entered: 11/05/2012)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                  MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Barbara L. Moore - filed by Bear Creek Technologies Inc.. (Faben, Peter) (Entered: 10/15/2012)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                    ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with JURY DEMAND , COUNTERCLAIM against Bear Creek Technologies Inc. by 8x8, Inc..(Moore, David) (Entered: 10/11/2012)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      ORDER denying (13) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:11-cv-00723-GMS; denying (10) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:11-cv-00725-GMS; denying (9) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:11-cv-00728-GMS; denying (12) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:11-cv-00729-GMS. Signed by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 9/27/2012. Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02344-GMS, 1:11-cv-00723-GMS, 1:11-cv-00725-GMS, 1:11-cv-00728-GMS, 1:11-cv-00729-GMS(asw) (Entered: 09/27/2012)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                        NOTICE TO COUNSEL: MDL No. 1:12-md-2344 has been opened and assigned to the Honorable Gregory M. Sleet. Attorneys of record who will be electronically filing documents may use the attached form to register for a CM/ECF login and password. Please see the docket for further entries. Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02344-GMS et al.(dzs, ) (Entered: 05/03/2012)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                          TRANSFER ORDER from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring the following cases to the District of Delaware: ND/GA 1:11-cv-03784; ED/VA 2:11-cv-00103; ED/VA 2:11-cv-00460; ED/VA 2:11-cv-00461. Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02344; 1:11-cv-00721 through 1:11-cv-00730.(dzs, ) (Entered: 05/03/2012)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                            NOTICE of Withdrawal of Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Stay by 8x8, Inc. re 17 Answering Brief in Opposition, 18 Exhibit to a Document (Moore, David) (Entered: 04/11/2012)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                              REPLY BRIEF re 15 MOTION to Stay filed by Bear Creek Technologies Inc.. (Faben, Peter) (Entered: 03/19/2012)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                EXHIBIT re 17 Answering Brief in Opposition [MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS] by 8x8, Inc.. (Moore, David) WITHDRAWN - SEE D.I. 20 Notice of Withdrawal (Entered: 03/09/2012)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                  ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 15 MOTION to Stay [MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS] filed by 8x8, Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 3/19/2012. (Moore, David) WITHDRAWN - SEE D.I. 20 (Entered: 03/09/2012)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                    OPENING BRIEF in Support re 15 MOTION to Stay filed by Bear Creek Technologies Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 3/9/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Faben, Peter) (Entered: 02/21/2012)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                      MOTION to Stay - filed by Bear Creek Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Rule 7.1.1 Certification)(Faben, Peter) (Entered: 02/21/2012)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        Letter to Honorable Chief Judge Sleet from Peter J. Faben regarding Motions and Stipulations to Stay Bear Creek Cases. (Faben, Peter) (Entered: 02/21/2012)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                          MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert J. Crawford and Shane O. Sondreal of Crawford Maunu PLLC - filed by 8x8, Inc.. (Moore, David) (Entered: 01/13/2012)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                            REPLY BRIEF re 9 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Failure to State A Claim Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by 8x8, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Moore, David) (Entered: 11/07/2011)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                              ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 9 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Failure to State A Claim Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Bear Creek Technologies Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 11/7/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Faben, Peter) (Entered: 10/28/2011)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Support re 9 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Failure to State A Claim Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by 8x8, Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/28/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B-D)(Moore, David) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Failure to State A Claim Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6), MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by 8x8, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Moore, David) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                    MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Anthony L. Miele - filed by Bear Creek Technologies Inc.. (Faben, Peter) (Entered: 09/28/2011)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                      STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to October 11, 2011 - filed by 8x8, Inc.. (Moore, David) (Entered: 09/01/2011)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                        MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jennifer B. Furey - filed by Bear Creek Technologies Inc.. (Faben, Peter) (Entered: 08/31/2011)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bear Creek Technologies Inc.. 8x8, Inc. served on 8/18/2011, answer due 9/8/2011. (Faben, Peter) (Entered: 08/19/2011)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Bear Creek Technologies Inc.. (dzs, ) (Entered: 08/18/2011)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,889,722;. (dzs, ) (Entered: 08/18/2011)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/17/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction (dzs, ) (Entered: 08/18/2011)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against 8x8, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0311-933277.) - filed by Bear Creek Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(dzs, ) (Entered: 08/18/2011)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 63 times.

                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?