Parallel Networks, LLC v. A10 Networks Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Delaware District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-01943
District Judge Leonard P. Stark, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 19, 2017 at 3:50 PM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Parallel Networks, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Brian A. Carpenter

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian A. Carpenter

Toggle Switch Represented by Christopher M. Joe

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher M. Joe

Toggle Switch Represented by Eric W. Buether

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric W. Buether

Toggle Switch Represented by Mark D. Perantie

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark D. Perantie

Toggle Switch Represented by Michael Ricketts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Ricketts

Toggle Switch Represented by Monte Terrell Squire

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Monte Terrell Squire +1 302 571 6713 +1 302 576 3515

Toggle Switch Represented by Niknaz Bukovcan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Niknaz Bukovcan

Toggle Switch Represented by Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory J. Brodzik +1 267 767 8417 gbrodzik@ycst.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam Wyatt Poff +1 302 571 6600 apoff@ycst.com
No Logo A10 Networks Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas C. Grimm +1 302 658 9200 +1 302 658 3989 tcgefiling@mnat.com
v.
No Logo A10 Networks Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lisa K. Nguyen

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lisa K. Nguyen

Toggle Switch Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas C. Grimm +1 302 658 9200 +1 302 658 3989 tcgefiling@mnat.com
No Logo Parallel Networks, LLC, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Brian A. Carpenter

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian A. Carpenter

Toggle Switch Represented by Christopher M. Joe

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher M. Joe

Toggle Switch Represented by Eric W. Buether

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric W. Buether

Toggle Switch Represented by Mark D. Perantie

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark D. Perantie

Toggle Switch Represented by Michael Ricketts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Ricketts

Toggle Switch Represented by Monte Terrell Squire

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Monte Terrell Squire +1 302 571 6713 +1 302 576 3515

Toggle Switch Represented by Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory J. Brodzik +1 267 767 8417 gbrodzik@ycst.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam Wyatt Poff +1 302 571 6600 apoff@ycst.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (77) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: None
Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,571,217; 8,352,570. (ntl) (Entered: 06/05/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: None
    STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Parallel Networks, LLC. (Brodzik, Gregory) (Entered: 06/05/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None
      DECLARATION re 74 Reply to Response to Motion -- Declaration of Andrew Fossum -- by A10 Networks Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/15/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None
        REPLY to Response to Motion re 58 MOTION for Leave to File - Defendant A10 Network, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to File Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement filed by A10 Networks Inc.. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/15/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None
          MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Niknaz "Niky" Bukovcan - filed by Parallel Networks, LLC. (Brodzik, Gregory) (Entered: 05/15/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: None
            REDACTED VERSION of 68 Declaration re 67 Response to Motion - Declaration of Gregory J. Brodzik by Parallel Networks, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-N)(Brodzik, Gregory) (Entered: 05/12/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: None
              REDACTED VERSION of 67 Response to Motion for Leave to File Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement by Parallel Networks, LLC. (Brodzik, Gregory) (Entered: 05/12/2015)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: None
                NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Parallel Networks, LLC's Deposition Notice to Ali Golshan Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 30(b)(1) filed by Parallel Networks, LLC.(Squire, Monte) (Entered: 05/12/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 5/6/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that each side will be allocated 1.5 hours for argument at the Markman Hearing scheduled for June 8, 2015. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/6/15. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-01943-LPS, 1:13-cv-02001-LPS (ntl) (Entered: 05/06/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 5/5/2015, Entered: None
                    [SEALED] DECLARATION re 67 Response to Motion - Declaration of Gregory J. Brodzik - by Parallel Networks, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-I, # 2 Exhibit J-N)(Brodzik, Gregory) (Entered: 05/05/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 5/5/2015, Entered: None
                      [SEALED] RESPONSE to Motion re 58 MOTION for Leave to File - Defendant A10 Network, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to File Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement filed by Parallel Networks, LLC. (Brodzik, Gregory) (Entered: 05/05/2015)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: None
                        STATEMENT [Defendants A10 Networks, Inc. and F5 Networks, Inc.'s Comments on Plaintiff Parallel Networks, LLC's Tutorial Describing the Technology and Matters in Issue] by A10 Networks Inc.. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 04/30/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: None
                          CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ANSWERING BRIEF re 54 Claim Construction Opening Brief filed by A10 Networks Inc.. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 04/30/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: None
                            Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Gregory J. Brodzik regarding the Claim Construction Hearing. (Brodzik, Gregory) (Entered: 04/30/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: None
                              STATEMENT - Plaintiff Parallel Networks, LLC's Comments on Defendants' Technology Tutorial - by Parallel Networks, LLC. (Brodzik, Gregory) (Entered: 04/30/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: None
                                CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ANSWERING BRIEF re 55 Claim Construction Opening Brief, filed by Parallel Networks, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-C)(Brodzik, Gregory) (Entered: 04/30/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None
                                  Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Plaintiff to respond to Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement (D.I. 58) to May 5, 2015 - filed by Parallel Networks, LLC. (Brodzik, Gregory) (Entered: 04/29/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 4/23/2015, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendant A10 Networks, Inc.s Written Objections to Plaintiff Parallel Networks, LLC Final Deposition Notice Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 30(b)(6); and (2) Defendant A10 Networks, Inc.s Written Objections to Plaintiffs First Notice of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition filed by A10 Networks Inc..(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 04/23/2015)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: None
                                      [SEALED] DECLARATION of Andrew Fossum re 58 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement by A10 Networks Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-3, # 2 Exhibits 4-5) (ntl) (Entered: 04/20/2015)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: None
                                        MOTION for Leave to File - Defendant A10 Network, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to File Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement - filed by A10 Networks Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Grimm, Thomas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/20/2015: # 2 motion for summary judgment, # 3 opening brief, # 4 Ali Golshan declaration) (ntl). (Entered: 04/13/2015)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant A10 Networks, Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiff Parallel Networks, LLC's Second Requests for Production to Defendant A10 Networks, Inc. (Nos. 44-45) filed by A10 Networks Inc..(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 04/06/2015)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: None
                                            MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew J. Fossum - filed by A10 Networks Inc.. (Grimm, Thomas) (Entered: 04/06/2015)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: None
                                              [SEALED] CLAIM CONSTRUCTION OPENING BRIEF filed by A10 Networks Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Grimm, Thomas) (Entered: 03/26/2015)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                CLAIM CONSTRUCTION OPENING BRIEF filed by Parallel Networks, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A and B, # 2 Exhibit C and D, # 3 Exhibit E)(Brodzik, Gregory) (Entered: 03/26/2015)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE of Lodging of Plaintiff Parallel Networks, LLC's Technology Tutorial by Parallel Networks, LLC (Brodzik, Gregory) (Entered: 03/26/2015)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                    Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from David M. Fry regarding Enclosure of Discs Containing A10 Networks, Inc. and F5 Networks, Inc.'s Technology Tutorial. (Fry, David) (Entered: 03/26/2015)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Parallel Networks, LLC's Deposition Notice to Defendant A10 Networks, Inc. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 30(b)(6) filed by Parallel Networks, LLC.(Squire, Monte) (Entered: 03/23/2015)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 3/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                        NOTICE to Take Deposition of Kendyl Roman on March 11, 2015 filed by F5 Networks Inc., A10 Networks Inc..(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 03/10/2015)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 3/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Parallel Networks, LLC's Second Requests for Production of Documents to Defendant A10 Networks, Inc. (Nos. 44-45) filed by Parallel Networks, LLC.(Brodzik, Gregory) (Entered: 03/06/2015)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                            CLAIM Construction Chart by Parallel Networks, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Part 1, # 2 Exhibit A, Part 2, # 3 Exhibit A, Part 3-Section 1, # 4 Exhibit A, Part 3-Section 2, # 5 Exhibit A, Part 3-Section 3, # 6 Exhibit A, Part 3, Section 4, # 7 Exhibit A, Part 3, Section 5, # 8 Exhibit A, Part 3, Section 6, # 9 Exhibit A, Part 4, # 10 Exhibit B, Part 1, # 11 Exhibit B, Part 2, # 12 Exhibit B, Part 3, Section 1, # 13 Exhibit B, Part 3, Section 2, # 14 Exhibit B, Part 3, Section 3, # 15 Exhibit B, Part 4)(Brodzik, Gregory) (Main Document 48 replaced on 1/23/2015) (ntl). (Entered: 01/22/2015)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Parallel Networks, LLC's preliminary claim constructions, including intrinsic and extrinsic evidence, and descriptions of proposed expert witness testimony filed by Parallel Networks, LLC.(Brodzik, Gregory) (Entered: 01/13/2015)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Preliminary Claim Constructions filed by F5 Networks Inc., Riverbed Technology Inc., Brocade Communications Systems Inc., Barracuda Networks Inc., Cisco Systems Inc., A10 Networks Inc., Citrix Systems Inc..(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 01/12/2015)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                  NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendants' Preliminary Claim Constructions filed by F5 Networks Inc..(O'Byrne, Stephanie) (Entered: 12/19/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                    NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Parallel Networks, LLC's Disclosure of Claim Terms and Proposed Constructions filed by Parallel Networks, LLC.(Brodzik, Gregory) (Entered: 12/18/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                      Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Monte T. Squire regarding the parties' joint Interim Status Report. (Squire, Monte) (Entered: 12/11/2014)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                        NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant A10 Networks, Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiff Parallel Networks, LLC's Second Set of Individual Interrogatories (No. 3) filed by A10 Networks Inc..(Grimm, Thomas) (Entered: 11/24/2014)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                          NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Parallel Networks, LLC's Supplemental Answers and Objections to Defendants' First Set of Common Interrogatories (Nos. 1-7) filed by Parallel Networks, LLC.(Squire, Monte) (Entered: 11/24/2014)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                            NOTICE OF SERVICE of Supplemental Objections and Responses to Plaintiff Parallel Networks, LLC's First Set of Common Interrogatories (Nos. 2-9) filed by A10 Networks Inc..(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 11/14/2014)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                              NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Parallel Networks, LLC's Supplemental Objections and Responses to Defendant A10 Networks, Inc.'s First Set of Request for Production (Nos. 1-56) filed by Parallel Networks, LLC.(Brodzik, Gregory) (Entered: 11/10/2014)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Parallel Networks, LLC's Second Set of Individual Interrogatories (No. 3) to Defendant A10 Networks, Inc filed by Parallel Networks, LLC.(Squire, Monte) (Entered: 10/23/2014)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                  NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Parallel Networks, LLC's Answers and Objections to Defendants' First Set of Common Interrogatories (Nos. 1-7) filed by Parallel Networks, LLC.(Brodzik, Gregory) (Entered: 10/14/2014)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                    NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Initial Invalidity Contentions Pursuant to Paragraph 4(d) of the Default Standard for Discovery filed by A10 Networks Inc..(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 10/06/2014)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                      NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Parallel Networks, LLC's Disclosure of Initial Claim Charts Relating Each Accused Product to the Asserted Claims filed by Parallel Networks, LLC.(Brodzik, Gregory) (Entered: 09/09/2014)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                        NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' First Set of Common Interrogatories to Plaintiff Parallel Networks, LLC (Nos. 1-7) filed by Cisco Systems Inc..(Townsend, Ethan) (Entered: 08/25/2014)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                          STIPULATION - [Proposed] Stipulated Protective Order - by Parallel Networks, LLC. (Brodzik, Gregory) (Entered: 08/05/2014)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/31/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            ORAL ORDER: After having reviewed the parties' letters (D.I. 25, 26) regarding the disputed provisions of the proposed protective order, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: (1) with regard to export control requirements, Defendants' proposal reasonably articulates the parties' responsibilities to comply with federal law and is adopted; (2) with regard to the prosecution bar, Defendants' proposal, which is warranted by the risks and the balance of interests and is more reasonable than Plaintiff's proposal, is adopted; (3) with regard to the source code log, Defendants' proposal is reasonable and not unduly burdensome except with regard to the time and duration requirements (which appear to interfere with work product protection) and is therefore adopted except that the words "time, and duration" are to be stricken; and (4) the parties shall submit a revised version of the protective order, incorporating the Court's rulings and any other modifications the parties agreed upon, no later than August 5, 2014. The teleconference scheduled for August 1, 2014 at 3:00 p.m. to address these disputes is CANCELLED. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/31/14. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-01412-LPS et al. (ntl) (Entered: 07/31/2014)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                              NOTICE OF SERVICE of Objections and Responses to Plaintiff Parallel Networks, LLC's First Requests for Production to Defendant A10 Networks, Inc. (Nos. 1-43) filed by A10 Networks Inc..(Grimm, Thomas) (Entered: 07/25/2014)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Ethan H. Townsend regarding Defendants responsive letter brief regarding the disputed provisions of the proposed protective order - re (25 in 1:13-cv-01412-LPS, 31 in 1:13-cv-02085-LPS, 25 in 1:13-cv-01413-LPS, 29 in 1:13-cv-01943-LPS, 23 in 1:13-cv-01481-LPS, 25 in 1:13-cv-01414-LPS, 25 in 1:13-cv-02051-LPS, 29 in 1:13-cv-01476-LPS, 28 in 1:13-cv-02001-LPS, 24 in 1:13-cv-01477-LPS) Letter. (Townsend, Ethan) (Entered: 07/25/2014)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Monte T. Squire regarding Plaintiff's positions on disputed protective order issues. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-D)(Squire, Monte) (Entered: 07/24/2014)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    ORAL ORDER: After having been advised by Plaintiff and Defendants of their inability to resolve a discovery matter, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a teleconference is scheduled for August 1, 2014 at 3:00 p.m. Counsel for the party seeking relief shall initiate the teleconference call to 302-573-4571. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that not later than July 24, 2014 at 3:00 p.m., any party seeking relief shall file with the Court a letter, not to exceed three (3) pages, outlining the issues in dispute and its position on those issues. Not later than July 25, 2014 at 3:00 p.m., any party opposing the application for relief may file a letter, not to exceed three (3) pages, outlining that party's reasons for its opposition. Should any document(s) be filed under seal, a courtesy copy of the sealed document(s) must be provided to the Court within one (1) hour of e-filing the document(s). Should the Court find further briefing necessary upon conclusion of the telephone conference, the Court will order it. Alternatively, the Court may choose to resolve the dispute prior to the telephone conference and will, in that event, cancel the conference. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/21/14. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-01412-LPS et al. (ntl) (Entered: 07/21/2014)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                      NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Parallel Networks, LLC's Objections and Responses to Defendant A10 Networks, Inc.'s First Set of Request for Production (Nos. 1-56) filed by Parallel Networks, LLC.(Squire, Monte) (Entered: 07/15/2014)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                        NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant A10 Networks, Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiff Parallel Networks, LLC's First Set of Common Interrogatories (Nos. 1-9) and Individual Interrogatories (Nos. 1-2) filed by A10 Networks Inc..(Grimm, Thomas) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                          NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Plaintiff Parallel Networks, LLC's Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(1) and Paragraph 3 of the District of Delaware Default Standard for Discovery, Including Discovery of Electronically Stored Information ("ESI"), and 2) Plaintiff Parallel Networks, LLC's Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 4(a) of the District of Delaware Default Standard for Discovery, Including Discovery of Electronically Stored Information ("ESI") filed by Parallel Networks, LLC.(Brodzik, Gregory) (Entered: 07/08/2014)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                            NOTICE OF SERVICE of A10 Networks, Inc.'s Initial Disclosures filed by A10 Networks Inc..(Grimm, Thomas) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                              STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME and [Proposed] Order for the Parties to Submit Their Proposed Protective Order to June 27, 2014 - filed by Parallel Networks, LLC. (Squire, Monte) (Entered: 06/26/2014)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Parallel Networks, LLC's First Requests for Production to Defendant A10 Networks, Inc. (Nos. 1-43) filed by Parallel Networks, LLC.(Brodzik, Gregory) (Entered: 06/20/2014)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. Discovery due by 7/17/2015. Status Report due by 12/11/2014. Claim Construction Opening Brief due by 3/26/2015. Claim Construction Answering Brief due by 4/30/2015. A Markman Hearing is set for 6/8/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6B before Judge Leonard P. Stark. A Pretrial Conference is set for 5/27/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6B before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/18/2016. A 10-day Jury Trial is set for 6/13/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6B before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/16/14. (Attachment: # 1 Form of Pretrial Order) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-01412-LPS et al. (ntl) (Entered: 06/16/2014)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    Official Transcript of Telephone Conference held on June 5, 2014 before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Deanna Warner of Hawkins Reporting Service, Telephone (302) 658-6697. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/7/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/14/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/11/2014. (bpg) (Entered: 06/13/2014)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant A10 Networks, Inc.'s First Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 1-56) to Plaintiff filed by A10 Networks Inc..(Grimm, Thomas) (Entered: 06/11/2014)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Parallel Networks, LLC's First Set of Common Interrogatories (Nos. 1-9) and Individual Interrogatories (Nos. 1-2) to Defendant A10 Networks, Inc. filed by Parallel Networks, LLC.(Squire, Monte) (Entered: 06/10/2014)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          PROPOSED ORDER [Proposed] Scheduling Order by Parallel Networks, LLC. (Squire, Monte) (Entered: 06/10/2014)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Lisa K. Nguyen - filed by A10 Networks Inc.. (Grimm, Thomas) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a Rule 16 scheduling teleconference has been scheduled for June 5, 2014 at 3:45 p.m. Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the teleconference call to 302-573-4571. No further submissions are needed. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/28/14. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-01412-LPS et al. (ntl) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Monte T. Squire, Esquire regarding The Parties Proposed Scheduling Order - re (12 in 1:13-cv-01414-LPS, 12 in 1:13-cv-01477-LPS, 16 in 1:13-cv-01476-LPS, 17 in 1:13-cv-02085-LPS, 12 in 1:13-cv-01412-LPS, 12 in 1:13-cv-01943-LPS, 12 in 1:13-cv-01481-LPS, 12 in 1:13-cv-01413-LPS, 11 in 1:13-cv-02051-LPS, 14 in 1:13-cv-02001-LPS) Order,. (Attachments: # 1 [Proposed] Scheduling Order)(Squire, Monte) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Dean G. Dunlavey - filed by A10 Networks Inc.. (Grimm, Thomas) (Entered: 05/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall confer regarding proposed dates in the scheduling order and shall submit a proposal, including a proposal for the length and timing of trial, to the Court no later than May 14, 2014. The parties are to review the Court's form scheduling order, which is posted at http://www.ded.uscourts.gov (see Chambers, Judge Stark, Forms). ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/30/14. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-01412-LPS et al. (ntl) (Entered: 04/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Monte T. Squire regarding plaintiff's request for a joint Rule 16 scheduling conference. (Squire, Monte) (Entered: 04/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to 8 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim - Plaintiff Parallel Networks, LLC's Answer to Defendant A10 Networks, Inc.'s Counterclaims - by Parallel Networks, LLC.(Brodzik, Gregory) (Entered: 02/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by A10 Networks Inc.. (Grimm, Thomas) (Entered: 01/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Parallel Networks, LLC by A10 Networks Inc..(Grimm, Thomas) (Entered: 01/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer, or otherwise plead in response to Plaintiff's Complaint for Patent Infringement to January 13, 2014 - filed by A10 Networks Inc., Parallel Networks, LLC. (Grimm, Thomas) (Entered: 12/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Mailing as to service on Defendant A10 Networks, Inc. on November 21, 2013 by Parallel Networks, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A and B)(Brodzik, Gregory) (Entered: 11/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Eric W. Buether, Attorney Christopher M. Joe, Attorney Brian A. Carpenter, Attorney Mark D. Perantie and Attorney Michael D. Ricketts - filed by Parallel Networks, LLC. (Brodzik, Gregory) (Entered: 11/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Parallel Networks, LLC. (dmp, ) (Entered: 11/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 7,571,217 B1; US 8,352,570 B2;. (dmp, ) (Entered: 11/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (dmp, ) (Entered: 11/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against A10 Networks Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 311-1411637.) - filed by Parallel Networks, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-2, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(dmp, ) (Entered: 11/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 82 times.

                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?