Acorda Therapeutics Inc. v. Alkem Laboratories Ltd.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Delaware District Court, Case No. 1:14-cv-00917
District Judge Leonard P. Stark, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 4, 2018 at 2:30 AM EST (3.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Acorda Therapeutics Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Aaron Stiefel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Aaron Stiefel

Toggle Switch Represented by Daniel P. DiNapoli

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel P. DiNapoli

Toggle Switch Represented by Jinbiotech Company, Ltd

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Martin

Toggle Switch Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack B. Blumenfeld +1 302 658 9200 jbbefiling@mnat.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Maryellen Noreika +1 302 658 9200 mnoreika@mnat.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Soumitra Deka

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Soumitra Deka
No Logo Alkermes Pharma Ireland Ltd., Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Alkermes Pharma Ireland Limited"

Toggle Switch Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack B. Blumenfeld +1 302 658 9200 jbbefiling@mnat.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Maryellen Noreika +1 302 658 9200 mnoreika@mnat.com
No Logo Alkem Laboratories Ltd., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Phillips, Goldman & Spence, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John C. Phillips, Jr. +1 302 655 4200 +1 302 655 4210 jcp@pgslaw.com
v.
No Logo Alkem Laboratories Ltd., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by A. Taylor Corbitt

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED A. Taylor Corbitt

Toggle Switch Represented by Alison L. Maddeford

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/09/2016, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alison L. Maddeford

Toggle Switch Represented by Imron T. Aly

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Imron T. Aly

Toggle Switch Represented by Phillips, Goldman & Spence, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A. Bilson +1 302 655 4200 +1 302 655 4210 dab@pgslaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Megan C. Haney +1 302 655 4200 mch@pgslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John C. Phillips, Jr. +1 302 655 4200 +1 302 655 4210 jcp@pgslaw.com
No Logo Ascend Laboratories LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Phillips, Goldman & Spence, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John C. Phillips, Jr. +1 302 655 4200 +1 302 655 4210 jcp@pgslaw.com
No Logo Acorda Therapeutics Inc., Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack B. Blumenfeld +1 302 658 9200 jbbefiling@mnat.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Maryellen Noreika +1 302 658 9200 mnoreika@mnat.com
No Logo Alkermes Pharma Ireland Ltd., Counter-Defendant
Officially listed as "Alkermes Pharma Ireland Limited"

Toggle Switch Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack B. Blumenfeld +1 302 658 9200 jbbefiling@mnat.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Maryellen Noreika +1 302 658 9200 mnoreika@mnat.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (29) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/5/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
CONSENT JUDGMENT (See document for further details), ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/5/16. (ntl) (Entered: 08/05/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/4/2016, Entered: None
    PROPOSED CONSENT JUDGMENT by Acorda Therapeutics Inc., Alkermes Pharma Ireland Limited. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 08/04/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/27/2015, Entered: None
      Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Maryellen Noreika regarding denial of inter partes review. (Attachments: # 1 PTAB Decisions)(Noreika, Maryellen) (Entered: 08/27/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
        SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. These case are CONSOLIDATED for all purposes and all papers shall be filed in Civil Action No. 14-882-LPS. Discovery due by 12/18/2015. Status Report due by 8/3/2015. Claim Construction Opening Brief due by 11/9/2015. Claim Construction Answering Brief due by 1/15/2016. A Markman Hearing is set for 3/7/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6B before Judge Leonard P. Stark. A Final Pretrial Conference is set for 9/1/2016 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6B before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/22/2016. A 5-day Bench Trial is set for 9/19/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6B before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/21/15. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00882-LPS et al. (ntl) (Entered: 04/22/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/21/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
          Official Transcript of Telephone Conference held on April 1, 2015 before Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/12/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/22/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/20/2015. (bpg) (Entered: 04/21/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: None
            PROPOSED ORDER -- Scheduling Order -- re (25 in 1:14-cv-00932-LPS, 23 in 1:14-cv-00917-LPS, 22 in 1:14-cv-00922-LPS, 23 in 1:14-cv-00909-LPS, 53 in 1:14-cv-00935-LPS, 15 in 1:15-cv-00077-LPS, 22 in 1:14-cv-00941-LPS, 27 in 1:14-cv-00882-LPS, 23 in 1:14-cv-00955-LPS) Oral Order,,, by Acorda Therapeutics Inc., Alkermes Pharma Ireland Limited. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 04/17/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORAL ORDER: Having reviewed the parties' letter of April 8 (C.A. No. 14-882 D.I. 26), and having had a trial slot in September 2016 open up (subsequent to the scheduling call held on April 1), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: (1) a five-day bench trial will begin on September 19, 2016; (2) the pretrial conference will be held on September 1, 2016 at 2:00 p.m.; (3) the proposed final pretrial order shall be submitted by August 22, 2016; (4) the Markman hearing will be held on March 7, 2016 beginning at 9:00 a.m.; (5) no motions for summary judgment will be permitted without leave of the Court; and (6) the parties shall submit a proposed scheduling order consistent with the terms of this order no later than April 20, 2015. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/13/15. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00882-LPS et al. (ntl) (Entered: 04/13/2015)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/8/2015, Entered: None
                Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Jeremy A. Tigan regarding the parties' respective positions regarding the scheduling of Markman hearing and trial - re Scheduling Conference. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 04/08/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/17/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a Rule 16 scheduling teleconference has been scheduled for April 1, 2015 at 4:00 p.m. Plaintiffs' counsel shall initiate the teleconference call to 302-573-4573. No further submissions are needed. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/17/15. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00882-LPS et al. (ntl) (Entered: 03/17/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: None
                    NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Bilson on behalf of Alkem Laboratories Ltd. (Bilson, David) (Entered: 03/13/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/27/2015, Entered: None
                      PROPOSED ORDER /Proposed Scheduling Order by Acorda Therapeutics Inc., Alkermes Pharma Ireland Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Letter)(Noreika, Maryellen) (Entered: 02/27/2015)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/10/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall confer regarding proposed dates in the scheduling order and shall submit a proposal, including a proposal for the length and timing of trial, to the Court no later than February 27, 2015. The parties are to review the Court's form scheduling order, which is posted at http://www.ded.uscourts.gov (see Chambers, Judge Stark, New Patent Procedures). ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/10/15. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00882-LPS et al. (ntl) (Entered: 02/10/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None
                          MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Alison L. Maddeford, Imron T. Aly and A. Taylor Corbitt - filed by Alkem Laboratories Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Alison L. Maddeford, # 2 Certification of Imron T. Aly, # 3 Certification of A. Taylor Corbitt)(Haney, Megan) (Entered: 01/12/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/30/2014, Entered: None
                            NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Nimita L. Parekh as co-counsel. Reason for request: No Longer Affiliated with Shiff Hardin LLP. (Phillips, John) (Entered: 12/30/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/13/2014, Entered: None
                              Amended Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Associates, Inc., Other Affiliate FMR LLC, Other Affiliate Wellington Management Company, LLP for Alkermes Pharma Ireland Limited filed by Alkermes Pharma Ireland Limited. (Noreika, Maryellen) (Entered: 10/13/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/13/2014, Entered: None
                                MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Aaron Stiefel, Daniel P. DiNapoli, Benjamin C. Hsing, Soumitra Deka, Jeffrey Martin, and Sylvia M. Becker - filed by Acorda Therapeutics Inc.. (Noreika, Maryellen) (Entered: 10/13/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/6/2014, Entered: None
                                  MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Nimita L. Parekh and Sailesh K. Patel - filed by Alkem Laboratories Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Parekh Pro Hac Certification, # 2 Patel Pro Hac Certification)(Haney, Megan) (Entered: 10/06/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: None
                                    ANSWER to 9 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, Acorda Therapeutics, Inc. and Alkermes Pharma Ireland Limited Answer to the Counterclaims of Alkem Laboratories Ltd. by Acorda Therapeutics Inc., Alkermes Pharma Ireland Limited.(Noreika, Maryellen) (Entered: 08/22/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/8/2014, Entered: None
                                      STIPULATION Regarding Voluntary Dismissal of Ascend Laboratories, LLC Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(A) by Acorda Therapeutics Inc., Alkermes Pharma Ireland Limited. (Noreika, Maryellen) (Entered: 08/08/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/1/2014, Entered: None
                                        Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Alkem Laboratories Ltd.. (Phillips, John) (Entered: 08/01/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/1/2014, Entered: None
                                          ANSWER to 1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM to Plaintiffs' Complaint for Patent Infringement against Acorda Therapeutics Inc., Alkermes Pharma Ireland Limited by Alkem Laboratories Ltd..(Phillips, John) (Entered: 08/01/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/1/2014, Entered: None
                                            STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Complaint to August 8, 2014 - filed by Alkem Laboratories Ltd., Ascend Laboratories LLC. (Phillips, John) (Entered: 08/01/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None
                                              DECLARATION of Mailing of Complaint on Ascend Laboratories, LLC on 7/11/14 by Acorda Therapeutics Inc., Alkermes Pharma Ireland Limited. (Noreika, Maryellen) (Entered: 07/15/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alkermes Pharma Ireland Limited, Acorda Therapeutics Inc.. Alkem Laboratories Ltd. served on 7/11/2014, answer due 8/1/2014. (Noreika, Maryellen) (Entered: 07/15/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                  Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate Alkermes plc for Alkermes Pharma Ireland Limited filed by Acorda Therapeutics Inc., Alkermes Pharma Ireland Limited. (dmp, ) (Entered: 07/11/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                    Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 5,540,938; 8,007,826; 8,354,437; 8,440,703; 8,663,685;. (dmp, ) (Entered: 07/11/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                      Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: 07/02/2014. Date of Expiration of Patent: See attached.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 7/22/2017. (dmp, ) (Entered: 07/11/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (dmp, ) (Entered: 07/11/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                          COMPLAINT filed against Alkem Laboratories Ltd., Ascend Laboratories LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 311-1551845.) - filed by Alkermes Pharma Ireland Limited, Acorda Therapeutics Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - E, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(dmp, ) (Entered: 07/11/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                            Statistics

                                                            This case has been viewed 142 times.

                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                            Space
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                             
                                                            PlainSite
                                                            Sign Up
                                                            Need Password Help?