Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG v. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Delaware District Court, Case No. 1:15-cv-00048
District Judge Sue L. Robinson, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 13, 2019 at 9:30 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack B. Blumenfeld +1 302 658 9200 jbbefiling@mnat.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Maryellen Noreika +1 302 658 9200 mnoreika@mnat.com
No Logo Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack B. Blumenfeld +1 302 658 9200 jbbefiling@mnat.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Maryellen Noreika +1 302 658 9200 mnoreika@mnat.com
No Logo Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack B. Blumenfeld +1 302 658 9200 jbbefiling@mnat.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Maryellen Noreika +1 302 658 9200 mnoreika@mnat.com
v.
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Defendant
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/23/2015, Entered: None
Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,087,380. (Attachments: # 1 Notice)(fms) (Entered: 04/23/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: None
    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Boehringer Ingelheim International GMBH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. as to Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. and Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. without prejudice (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 04/22/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: None
      Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate CH Boehringer Sohn AG & Co. KG for Boehringer Ingelheim International GMBH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. filed by Boehringer Ingelheim International GMBH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (els) (Entered: 01/20/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: None
        Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,087,380;. (els) (Entered: 01/20/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: None
          Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: 12/9/14. Date of Expiration of Patent: 2/18/18.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 4/19/2018. (els) (Entered: 01/20/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
            Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (els) (Entered: 01/20/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: None
              COMPLAINT filed against Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-1657860.) - filed by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim International GMBH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(els) (Entered: 01/20/2015)
                Request RequestSpace LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 235 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?