Bear Creek Technologies, Inc. v. Primus Telecommunications, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Delaware District Court, Case No. 1:12-cv-00567
District Judge Gregory M. Sleet, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 27, 2017 at 4:22 PM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo BEAR CREEK TECHNOLOGIES, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooley Manion Jones Hake Kurowski LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/07/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anthony L. Miele +1 617 670 8571 +1 617 570 8771 amiele@cmjlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Deep Ellum Search

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
(Inactive), ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa L. Troutner mtroutner@bna.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Goulston & Storrs, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barbara L. Moore +1 617 574 4135 bmoore@goulstonstorrs.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jennifer Bush Furey

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer Bush Furey

Toggle Switch Represented by Manion Gaynor & Manning LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marc J. Phillips +1 302 657 2100 +1 302 657 2104

Toggle Switch Represented by Ventker & Warman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marissa Marriott Henderson +1 757 625 1192 mhenderson@ventkerlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David N. Ventker +1 757 625 1192 +1 757 625 1476 dventker@ventkerlaw.com
v.
No Logo Lingo, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ashby & Geddes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven J. Balick +1 302 654 1888 +1 302 654 2067 sbalick@ashby-geddes.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Colin Mayo +1 302 654 1888 amayo@ashby-geddes.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Fried, Frank, Harris, Shriver & Jacobson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Richard DeFosse +1 202 508 8000 +1 202 661 7374 jonathan.defosse@friedfrank.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott W Doyle +1 202 639 7277 +1 202 639 7003 scott.doyle@friedfrank.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Michel Elias Souaya

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michel Elias Souaya

Toggle Switch Represented by Williams Mullen, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William R. Poynter +1 757 499 8800 wpoynter@williamsmullen.com
No Logo Primus Telecommunications, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ashby & Geddes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven J. Balick +1 302 654 1888 +1 302 654 2067 sbalick@ashby-geddes.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Colin Mayo +1 302 654 1888 amayo@ashby-geddes.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Fried, Frank, Harris, Shriver & Jacobson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Richard DeFosse +1 202 508 8000 +1 202 661 7374 jonathan.defosse@friedfrank.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott W Doyle +1 202 639 7277 +1 202 639 7003 scott.doyle@friedfrank.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Michel Elias Souaya

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michel Elias Souaya

Toggle Switch Represented by Williams Mullen, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William R. Poynter +1 757 499 8800 wpoynter@williamsmullen.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (56) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 10/29/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE of Change of Address by Marc J. Phillips (Phillips, Marc) (Entered: 10/29/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/5/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE. Case is closed for administrative purposes with leave to reopen if further attention by the Court is required (CASE CLOSED). Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 5/5/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02344-GMS et al.(asw) (Entered: 05/05/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 11/7/2013, Entered: None
      NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Anthony L. Miele as co-counsel.. (Phillips, Marc) (Entered: 11/07/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 11/7/2013, Entered: None
        MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Martin F. Gaynor - filed by Bear Creek Technologies Inc.. (Phillips, Marc) (Entered: 11/07/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
          SO ORDERED, re (84 in 1:12-cv-00565-GMS, 399 in 1:12-cv-00568-GMS, 248 in 1:12-cv-00600-GMS, 54 in 1:11-cv-00724-GMS, 48 in 1:12-cv-00566-GMS, 52 in 1:11-cv-00728-GMS, 66 in 1:11-cv-00729-GMS, 48 in 1:11-cv-00722-GMS, 59 in 1:11-cv-00730-GMS, 58 in 1:11-cv-00727-GMS, 54 in 1:11-cv-00725-GMS, 51 in 1:12-cv-00567-GMS, 54 in 1:11-cv-00726-GMS, 55 in 1:11-cv-00721-GMS, 134 in 1:12-md-02344-GMS, 52 in 1:11-cv-00723-GMS) Proposed Order, filed by 8x8, Inc., Vonage America Inc., RCN Corporation, Mediacom Broadband LLC, Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc., AT&T Corp., Qwest Communications International Inc., Vonage Communications, Inc., CSC Holdings LLC, Charter Communications Inc., Cox Communications Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc., Vonage Holdings Corporation, Comcast Cable Communications LLC, Mediacom Communications Corporation, Vonage Marketing LLC, Verizon Services Corp., MCI Communications Services Inc., Cox Virginia Telecom LLC, Aptela Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Bright House Networks LLC, Primus Telecommunications Inc., Qwest Communications Company LLC. Signed by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 8/6/2013. Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02344-GMS et al.(asw) (Entered: 08/06/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: None
            PROPOSED ORDER Detailing Scope and Limitations of Defendants' Estoppel by 8x8, Inc., MCI Communications Services Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc., Qwest Communications Company LLC, Qwest Communications International Inc., Bright House Networks LLC, Time Warner Cable Inc., AT&T Corp., Aptela Inc., CSC Holdings LLC, Charter Communications Inc., Comcast Cable Communications LLC, Cox Communications Inc., Cox Virginia Telecom LLC, Mediacom Broadband LLC, Mediacom Communications Corporation, Primus Telecommunications Inc., RCN Corporation, SBC Internet Services Inc., Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Services Corp., Vonage America Inc., Vonage Communications, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corporation, Vonage Marketing LLC. (Day, John) (Entered: 07/19/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER in case 1:11-cv-00721-GMS; granting (26) Motion to Stay in case 1:11-cv-00726-GMS; granting (26) Motion to Stay in case 1:11-cv-00725-GMS; granting (20) Motion to Stay in case 1:11-cv-00722-GMS; granting (28) Motion to Stay in case 1:11-cv-00730-GMS; granting (21) Motion to Stay in case 1:11-cv-00724-GMS; granting (36) Motion to Stay in case 1:11-cv-00729-GMS; granting (54) Motion to Stay in case 1:12-md-02344-GMS; granting (57) Motion to Stay in case 1:12-cv-00565-GMS. Signed by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 7/17/2013. Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02344-GMS et al.(asw) (Entered: 07/17/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 6/27/2013, Entered: None
                STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to submit a proposed protective order to July 12, 2013 - filed by Bear Creek Technologies Inc., Bright House Networks LLC, Time Warner Cable Inc., Vonage America Inc., Vonage Holdings Corporation, Vonage Marketing LLC, Cox Communications, Inc., Cox Virginia Telecom LLC, AT&T Corp., SBC Internet Services Inc., Vonage Communications, Inc., Aptela Inc., 8x8, Inc., CSC Holdings LLC, Comcast Cable Communications LLC, T-Mobile USA Inc., RCN Corporation, Mediacom Broadband LLC, Mediacom Communications Corporation, Charter Communications Inc., Qwest Communications Company LLC, Qwest Communications International Inc., Lingo Inc., Primus Telecommunications Inc.. (Day, John) (Entered: 06/27/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: None
                  NOTICE of Appearance by Marc J. Phillips on behalf of Bear Creek Technologies Inc., Bear Creek Technologies Inc. ('722) Patent Litigation, Bear Creek Technologies Inc. (Phillips, Marc) (Entered: 06/26/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/24/2013, Entered: None
                    NOTICE OF SERVICE of Primus Defendants' First Set of Requests for Production by Lingo Inc., Primus Telecommunications Inc..(Mayo, Andrew) (Entered: 06/24/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 6/17/2013, Entered: None
                      SO ORDERED, re (46 in 1:11-cv-00728-GMS, 54 in 1:11-cv-00730-GMS, 78 in 1:12-cv-00565-GMS, 394 in 1:12-cv-00568-GMS, 47 in 1:11-cv-00723-GMS, 48 in 1:11-cv-00725-GMS, 45 in 1:12-cv-00567-GMS, 48 in 1:11-cv-00726-GMS, 60 in 1:11-cv-00729-GMS, 49 in 1:11-cv-00721-GMS, 50 in 1:11-cv-00727-GMS, 43 in 1:11-cv-00722-GMS, 47 in 1:11-cv-00724-GMS, 43 in 1:12-cv-00566-GMS, 120 in 1:12-md-02344-GMS) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to submit a proposed protective order to June 28, 2013 filed by 8x8, Inc., Vonage America Inc., RCN Corporation, Mediacom Broadband LLC, Lingo Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc., Cox Communications, Inc., AT&T Corp., Qwest Communications International Inc., Vonage Communications, Inc., CSC Holdings LLC, Bear Creek Technologies Inc. ('722) Patent Litigation, Charter Communications Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc., Vonage Holdings Corporation, Comcast Cable Communications LLC, Vonage Marketing LLC, Mediacom Communications Corporation, Cox Virginia Telecom LLC, Aptela Inc., Bright House Networks LLC, SBC Internet Services Inc., Primus Telecommunications Inc., Qwest Communications Company LLC Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02344-GMS et al.(mmm) (Entered: 06/17/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 6/12/2013, Entered: None
                        STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to submit a proposed protective order to June 28, 2013 - filed by Bright House Networks LLC, Time Warner Cable Inc., Vonage America Inc., Vonage Holdings Corporation, Vonage Marketing LLC, Cox Communications, Inc., Cox Virginia Telecom LLC, AT&T Corp., SBC Internet Services Inc., 8x8, Inc., Aptela Inc., Bear Creek Technologies Inc. ('722) Patent Litigation, CSC Holdings LLC, Charter Communications Inc., Comcast Cable Communications LLC, Lingo Inc., Mediacom Broadband LLC, Mediacom Communications Corporation, Primus Telecommunications Inc., Qwest Communications Company LLC, Qwest Communications International Inc., RCN Corporation, T-Mobile USA Inc., Vonage Communications, Inc.. (Day, John) (Entered: 06/12/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/11/2013, Entered: None
                          NOTICE OF SERVICE of Bear Creek Technologies, Inc.'s Responses to Defendants' First Set of Interrogatories by Bear Creek Technologies Inc..(Troutner, Melissa) (Entered: 06/11/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/3/2013, Entered: None
                            NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Primus Telecommunications Inc. and Lingo Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-13) and Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Documents and Things (Nos. 1-74) by Lingo Inc., Primus Telecommunications Inc..(Mayo, Andrew) (Entered: 06/03/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                              SO ORDERED, re (101 in 1:12-md-02344-GMS, 243 in 1:12-cv-00600-GMS, 45 in 1:11-cv-00726-GMS, 41 in 1:12-cv-00566-GMS, 390 in 1:12-cv-00568-GMS, 50 in 1:11-cv-00730-GMS, 40 in 1:11-cv-00722-GMS, 41 in 1:11-cv-00728-GMS, 42 in 1:11-cv-00724-GMS, 44 in 1:11-cv-00723-GMS, 74 in 1:12-cv-00565-GMS, 57 in 1:11-cv-00729-GMS, 46 in 1:11-cv-00721-GMS, 45 in 1:11-cv-00725-GMS, 46 in 1:11-cv-00727-GMS, 41 in 1:12-cv-00567-GMS) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to submit proposed protective order to June 12, 2013 filed by 8x8, Inc., Vonage America Inc., RCN Corporation, Mediacom Broadband LLC, Lingo Inc., Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc., AT&T Corp., Qwest Communications International Inc., Vonage Communications, Inc., CSC Holdings LLC, Bear Creek Technologies Inc. ('722) Patent Litigation, Charter Communications Inc., Cox Communications Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc., Vonage Holdings Corporation, Comcast Cable Communications LLC, Mediacom Communications Corporation, Vonage Marketing LLC, Verizon Services Corp., MCI Communications Services Inc., Cox Virginia Telecom LLC, Aptela Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Bright House Networks LLC, Primus Telecommunications Inc., Qwest Communications Company LLC. Signed by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 6/3/13. Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02344-GMS et al.(mmm) (Entered: 06/03/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: None
                                STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to submit proposed protective order to June 12, 2013 - filed by 8x8, Inc., AT&T Corp., Aptela Inc., Bear Creek Technologies Inc. ('722) Patent Litigation, Bright House Networks LLC, CSC Holdings LLC, Charter Communications Inc., Comcast Cable Communications LLC, Cox Communications Inc., Cox Virginia Telecom LLC, Lingo Inc., MCI Communications Services Inc., Mediacom Broadband LLC, Mediacom Communications Corporation, Primus Telecommunications Inc., Qwest Communications Company LLC, Qwest Communications International Inc., RCN Corporation, SBC Internet Services Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc., Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Services Corp., Vonage America Inc., Vonage Communications, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corporation, Vonage Marketing LLC. (Day, John) (Entered: 05/29/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/16/2013, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE OF SERVICE of Bear Creek Technologies, Inc.'s Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Default Standard for Discovery, Including Discovery of Electronically Stored Information ("ESI") by Bear Creek Technologies Inc., Bear Creek Technologies Inc. ('722) Patent Litigation, Bear Creek Technologies Inc..(Troutner, Melissa) (Entered: 05/16/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/14/2013, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Peter J. Faben as co-counsel. Reason for request: No longer employed with Cooley Manion Jones LLP. (Troutner, Melissa) (Entered: 05/14/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None
                                      STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to submit protective order to May 29, 2013 - filed by 8x8, Inc., AT&T Corp., Aptela Inc., Bear Creek Technologies Inc., Bright House Networks LLC, CSC Holdings LLC, Charter Communications Inc., Comcast Cable Communications LLC, Comcast Corporation, Cox Communications Inc., Cox Virginia Telecom LLC, Lingo Inc., Mediacom Broadband LLC, Mediacom Communications Corporation, Primus Telecommunications Inc., Qwest Communications Company LLC, Qwest Communications International Inc., RCN Corporation, SBC Internet Services Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc., Vonage America Inc., Vonage Communications, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corporation, Vonage Marketing LLC. (Lydon, Tiffany) (Entered: 05/13/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures of Defendants Primus Telecommunications, Inc. and Lingo, Inc. by Lingo Inc., Primus Telecommunications Inc..(Mayo, Andrew) (Entered: 05/13/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/7/2013, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE OF SERVICE of Bear Creek Technologies, Inc.'s Initial Disclosures by Bear Creek Technologies Inc., Bear Creek Technologies Inc. ('722) Patent Litigation, Bear Creek Technologies Inc..(Troutner, Melissa) (Entered: 05/07/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            SO ORDERED, re (32 in 1:11-cv-00727-GMS, 33 in 1:12-cv-00566-GMS, 26 in 1:11-cv-00722-GMS, 31 in 1:11-cv-00723-GMS, 32 in 1:11-cv-00725-GMS, 63 in 1:12-cv-00565-GMS, 42 in 1:11-cv-00729-GMS, 381 in 1:12-cv-00568-GMS, 237 in 1:12-cv-00600-GMS, 32 in 1:12-cv-00567-GMS, 64 in 1:12-md-02344-GMS, 34 in 1:11-cv-00730-GMS, 31 in 1:11-cv-00728-GMS, 31 in 1:11-cv-00721-GMS, 27 in 1:11-cv-00724-GMS, 32 in 1:11-cv-00726-GMS) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to file reply brief on motion for stay to April 4, 2013 filed by 8x8, Inc., Vonage America Inc., RCN Corporation, Comcast Corporation, Mediacom Broadband LLC, Lingo Inc., Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc., Qwest Communications International Inc., Vonage Communications, Inc., CSC Holdings LLC, Bear Creek Technologies Inc. ('722) Patent Litigation, Charter Communications Inc., Cox Communications Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc., Vonage Holdings Corporation, Comcast Cable Communications LLC, Mediacom Communications Corporation, Vonage Marketing LLC, Verizon Services Corp., AT&T Teleholdings Inc., MCI Communications Services Inc., Cox Virginia Telecom LLC, Aptela Inc., AT&T Inc., Bright House Networks LLC, Primus Telecommunications Inc., Qwest Communications Company LLC. Signed by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 4/2/2013. Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02344-GMS et al.(asw) (Entered: 04/02/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              MOTION for Scheduling Order - filed by Bear Creek Technologies Inc., Bear Creek Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Letter to Judge Sleet)(Troutner, Melissa) (Entered: 03/29/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa L. Troutner on behalf of Bear Creek Technologies Inc. (Troutner, Melissa) (Entered: 03/28/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                  STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to file reply brief on motion for stay to April 4, 2013 - filed by 8x8, Inc., AT&T Inc., AT&T Teleholdings Inc., Aptela Inc., Bear Creek Technologies Inc. ('722) Patent Litigation, Bright House Networks LLC, CSC Holdings LLC, Charter Communications Inc., Comcast Cable Communications LLC, Comcast Corporation, Cox Communications Inc., Cox Virginia Telecom LLC, Lingo Inc., MCI Communications Services Inc., Mediacom Broadband LLC, Mediacom Communications Corporation, Primus Telecommunications Inc., Qwest Communications Company LLC, Qwest Communications International Inc., RCN Corporation, T-Mobile USA Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc., Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Services Corp., Vonage America Inc., Vonage Communications, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corporation, Vonage Marketing LLC. (Day, John) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Amaryah K. Bocchino on behalf of Bear Creek Technologies Inc. (Bocchino, Amaryah) (Entered: 03/18/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                      Joint STATUS REPORT by Bear Creek Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Bear Creek's Proposed Scheduling Order, # 2 Exhibit B - Defendants' Proposed Scheduling Order)(Faben, Peter) (Entered: 03/12/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                        MOTION to Appoint Counsel as Lead and Liaison Counsel for Bear Creek Technologies, Inc. - filed by Bear Creek Technologies Inc.. (Faben, Peter) (Entered: 03/12/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                          MOTION to Appoint Counsel (Defendants' Submission with Respect to the Appointment of Lead and Liaison Counsel) - filed by AT&T Inc., AT&T Teleholdings Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Mediacom Broadband LLC, Mediacom Communications Corporation, Lingo Inc., Primus Telecommunications Inc.. (Mayo, Andrew) (Entered: 02/01/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Steven J. Balick on behalf of Lingo Inc., Primus Telecommunications Inc. (Balick, Steven) (Entered: 02/01/2013)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                              MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Barbara L. Moore - filed by Bear Creek Technologies Inc.. (Faben, Peter) (Entered: 10/15/2012)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE TO COUNSEL: MDL No. 1:12-md-2344 has been opened and assigned to the Honorable Gregory M. Sleet. Attorneys of record who will be electronically filing documents may use the attached form to register for a CM/ECF login and password. Please see the docket for further entries. (dzs, ) (Entered: 05/04/2012)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                  Record of case transferred in from District of Virginia Eastern; Case Number in Other District: 2:11-cv-00461. Copy of Docket Sheet and original file (Entered: 05/04/2012)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                    MDL TRANSFER ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.c. § 1407, the actions listed on Schedule A and pending outside the District ofDelaware are transferred to the District ofDelaware and, with the consent ofthat court, assigned to the Honorable Gregory M. Sleet for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Signed by Clerk on 5/3/12. (jcow, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/4/2012.] (Entered: 05/03/2012)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/14/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      ORDER granting 20 Motion to Stay; and that all proceedings are hereby STAYED until further order of this Court.. Signed by District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr. on 2/13/12 and filed on 2/14/12. (jcow, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/4/2012.] (Entered: 02/14/2012)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                        Memorandum in Support re 20 MOTION to Stay (Unopposed) filed by Bear Creek Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Miele, Anthony) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/4/2012.] (Entered: 02/07/2012)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                          MOTION to Stay (Unopposed) by Bear Creek Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Miele, Anthony) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/4/2012.] (Entered: 02/07/2012)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                            NOTICE by Bear Creek Technologies, Inc. of Filing Motion for Multi-District Litigation in Related Cases (Miele, Anthony) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/4/2012.] (Entered: 01/26/2012)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Richard DeFosse on behalf of Lingo, Inc., Primus Telecommunications, Inc. (DeFosse, Jonathan) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/4/2012.] (Entered: 11/29/2011)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                Reply to Motion re 14 MOTION to Dismiss Partial filed by Lingo, Inc., Primus Telecommunications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit N)(Poynter, William) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/4/2012.] (Entered: 10/31/2011)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                  Opposition to 15 Memorandum in Support, 14 MOTION to Dismiss Partial filed by Bear Creek Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Miele, Anthony) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/4/2012.] (Entered: 10/25/2011)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                    Memorandum in Support re 14 MOTION to Dismiss Partial filed by Lingo, Inc., Primus Telecommunications, Inc.. (Poynter, William) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/4/2012.] (Entered: 10/11/2011)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss Partial by Lingo, Inc., Primus Telecommunications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Poynter, William) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/4/2012.] (Entered: 10/11/2011)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        ORDER granting 8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Primus Telecommunications, Inc. answer due 10/11/2011. This Order shall not beconstrued as a waiver of any defense or claim on the part of Google, including but not limited to any defense under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Bradford Stillman and filed on 10/11/11. (jcow, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/4/2012.] (Entered: 10/11/2011)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          ORDER granting 11 Motion for Pro hac vice, Appointed Michel Elias Souaya for Lingo, Inc.,Michel Elias Souaya for Primus Telecommunications, Inc.. Signed by District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr. on 10/6/11 and filed on 10/11/11. (jcow, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/4/2012.] (Entered: 10/11/2011)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                            MOTION for Michel E. Souaya to appear Pro hac vice by Lingo, Inc., Primus Telecommunications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Receipt)(jcow, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/4/2012.] (Entered: 10/04/2011)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                              Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Lingo, Inc.. (Poynter, William) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/4/2012.] (Entered: 09/23/2011)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Primus Telecommunications, Inc.. (Poynter, William) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/4/2012.] (Entered: 09/23/2011)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by Lingo, Inc., Primus Telecommunications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Exhibit 1)(Poynter, William) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/4/2012.] (Entered: 09/23/2011)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                    SUMMONSES Returned Executed ; Lingo, Inc. served on 9/6/2011; Primus Telecommunications, Inc. served on 9/6/2011 (jcow, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/4/2012.] (Entered: 09/22/2011)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Summonses with one copy each issued as to Lingo, Inc., Primus Telecommunications, Inc., magistrate judge notice with judge's instructions provided to counsel for plaintiff for service. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement)(jcow, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/4/2012.] (Entered: 08/31/2011)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER granting 4 Motion for Pro hac vice, Appointed Jennifer Bush Furey for Bear Creek Technologies, Inc.. Signed by District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith and filed on 8/30/11. (jcow, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/4/2012.] (Entered: 08/30/2011)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                          MOTION for Jennifer B. Furey to appear Pro hac vice by Bear Creek Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Receipt)(jcow, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/4/2012.] (Entered: 08/29/2011)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Report on the filing of an action regarding patent 7,889,722. (jcow, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/4/2012.] (Entered: 08/19/2011)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Bear Creek Technologies, Inc.. (jcow, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/4/2012.] (Entered: 08/19/2011)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                COMPLAINT against Lingo, Inc., Primus Telecommunications, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 24683012580), filed by Bear Creek Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 exhibit A, # 2 exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 cover letter, # 5 Receipt)(jcow, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/4/2012.] (Entered: 08/19/2011)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 86 times.

                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?