Bear Creek Technologies, Inc. v. Aptela, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Delaware District Court, Case No. 1:12-cv-00566
District Judge Gregory M. Sleet, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 27, 2017 at 8:11 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo BEAR CREEK TECHNOLOGIES, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooley Manion Jones Hake Kurowski LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/07/2013, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anthony L. Miele +1 617 670 8571 +1 617 570 8771 amiele@cmjlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Deep Ellum Search

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
(Inactive), ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa L. Troutner mtroutner@bna.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Goulston & Storrs, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barbara L. Moore +1 617 574 4135 bmoore@goulstonstorrs.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jennifer Bush Furey

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer Bush Furey

Toggle Switch Represented by Manion Gaynor & Manning LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marc J. Phillips +1 302 657 2100 +1 302 657 2104

Toggle Switch Represented by Ventker & Warman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marissa Marriott Henderson +1 757 625 1192 mhenderson@ventkerlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David N. Ventker +1 757 625 1192 +1 757 625 1476 dventker@ventkerlaw.com
v.
No Logo Aptela, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jim W. Fang

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jim W. Fang

Toggle Switch Represented by Swidler Berlin, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Christian Bertin +1 202 373 6672 +1 202 373 6001 r.bertin@bingham.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (53) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/29/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE of Change of Address by Marc J. Phillips (Phillips, Marc) (Entered: 10/29/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/5/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE. Case is closed for administrative purposes with leave to reopen if further attention by the Court is required (CASE CLOSED). Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 5/5/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02344-GMS et al.(asw) (Entered: 05/05/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 11/7/2013, Entered: None
      NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Anthony L. Miele as co-counsel.. (Phillips, Marc) (Entered: 11/07/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 11/7/2013, Entered: None
        MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Martin F. Gaynor - filed by Bear Creek Technologies Inc.. (Phillips, Marc) (Entered: 11/07/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
          SO ORDERED, re (84 in 1:12-cv-00565-GMS, 399 in 1:12-cv-00568-GMS, 248 in 1:12-cv-00600-GMS, 54 in 1:11-cv-00724-GMS, 48 in 1:12-cv-00566-GMS, 52 in 1:11-cv-00728-GMS, 66 in 1:11-cv-00729-GMS, 48 in 1:11-cv-00722-GMS, 59 in 1:11-cv-00730-GMS, 58 in 1:11-cv-00727-GMS, 54 in 1:11-cv-00725-GMS, 51 in 1:12-cv-00567-GMS, 54 in 1:11-cv-00726-GMS, 55 in 1:11-cv-00721-GMS, 134 in 1:12-md-02344-GMS, 52 in 1:11-cv-00723-GMS) Proposed Order, filed by 8x8, Inc., Vonage America Inc., RCN Corporation, Mediacom Broadband LLC, Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc., AT&T Corp., Qwest Communications International Inc., Vonage Communications, Inc., CSC Holdings LLC, Charter Communications Inc., Cox Communications Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc., Vonage Holdings Corporation, Comcast Cable Communications LLC, Mediacom Communications Corporation, Vonage Marketing LLC, Verizon Services Corp., MCI Communications Services Inc., Cox Virginia Telecom LLC, Aptela Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Bright House Networks LLC, Primus Telecommunications Inc., Qwest Communications Company LLC. Signed by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 8/6/2013. Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02344-GMS et al.(asw) (Entered: 08/06/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: None
            PROPOSED ORDER Detailing Scope and Limitations of Defendants' Estoppel by 8x8, Inc., MCI Communications Services Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc., Qwest Communications Company LLC, Qwest Communications International Inc., Bright House Networks LLC, Time Warner Cable Inc., AT&T Corp., Aptela Inc., CSC Holdings LLC, Charter Communications Inc., Comcast Cable Communications LLC, Cox Communications Inc., Cox Virginia Telecom LLC, Mediacom Broadband LLC, Mediacom Communications Corporation, Primus Telecommunications Inc., RCN Corporation, SBC Internet Services Inc., Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Services Corp., Vonage America Inc., Vonage Communications, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corporation, Vonage Marketing LLC. (Day, John) (Entered: 07/19/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER in case 1:11-cv-00721-GMS; granting (26) Motion to Stay in case 1:11-cv-00726-GMS; granting (26) Motion to Stay in case 1:11-cv-00725-GMS; granting (20) Motion to Stay in case 1:11-cv-00722-GMS; granting (28) Motion to Stay in case 1:11-cv-00730-GMS; granting (21) Motion to Stay in case 1:11-cv-00724-GMS; granting (36) Motion to Stay in case 1:11-cv-00729-GMS; granting (54) Motion to Stay in case 1:12-md-02344-GMS; granting (57) Motion to Stay in case 1:12-cv-00565-GMS. Signed by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 7/17/2013. Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02344-GMS et al.(asw) (Entered: 07/17/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 6/27/2013, Entered: None
                STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to submit a proposed protective order to July 12, 2013 - filed by Bear Creek Technologies Inc., Bright House Networks LLC, Time Warner Cable Inc., Vonage America Inc., Vonage Holdings Corporation, Vonage Marketing LLC, Cox Communications, Inc., Cox Virginia Telecom LLC, AT&T Corp., SBC Internet Services Inc., Vonage Communications, Inc., Aptela Inc., 8x8, Inc., CSC Holdings LLC, Comcast Cable Communications LLC, T-Mobile USA Inc., RCN Corporation, Mediacom Broadband LLC, Mediacom Communications Corporation, Charter Communications Inc., Qwest Communications Company LLC, Qwest Communications International Inc., Lingo Inc., Primus Telecommunications Inc.. (Day, John) (Entered: 06/27/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: None
                  NOTICE of Appearance by Marc J. Phillips on behalf of Bear Creek Technologies Inc., Bear Creek Technologies Inc. ('722) Patent Litigation, Bear Creek Technologies Inc. (Phillips, Marc) (Entered: 06/26/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/17/2013, Entered: None
                    SO ORDERED, re (46 in 1:11-cv-00728-GMS, 54 in 1:11-cv-00730-GMS, 78 in 1:12-cv-00565-GMS, 394 in 1:12-cv-00568-GMS, 47 in 1:11-cv-00723-GMS, 48 in 1:11-cv-00725-GMS, 45 in 1:12-cv-00567-GMS, 48 in 1:11-cv-00726-GMS, 60 in 1:11-cv-00729-GMS, 49 in 1:11-cv-00721-GMS, 50 in 1:11-cv-00727-GMS, 43 in 1:11-cv-00722-GMS, 47 in 1:11-cv-00724-GMS, 43 in 1:12-cv-00566-GMS, 120 in 1:12-md-02344-GMS) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to submit a proposed protective order to June 28, 2013 filed by 8x8, Inc., Vonage America Inc., RCN Corporation, Mediacom Broadband LLC, Lingo Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc., Cox Communications, Inc., AT&T Corp., Qwest Communications International Inc., Vonage Communications, Inc., CSC Holdings LLC, Bear Creek Technologies Inc. ('722) Patent Litigation, Charter Communications Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc., Vonage Holdings Corporation, Comcast Cable Communications LLC, Vonage Marketing LLC, Mediacom Communications Corporation, Cox Virginia Telecom LLC, Aptela Inc., Bright House Networks LLC, SBC Internet Services Inc., Primus Telecommunications Inc., Qwest Communications Company LLC Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02344-GMS et al.(mmm) (Entered: 06/17/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/12/2013, Entered: None
                      STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to submit a proposed protective order to June 28, 2013 - filed by Bright House Networks LLC, Time Warner Cable Inc., Vonage America Inc., Vonage Holdings Corporation, Vonage Marketing LLC, Cox Communications, Inc., Cox Virginia Telecom LLC, AT&T Corp., SBC Internet Services Inc., 8x8, Inc., Aptela Inc., Bear Creek Technologies Inc. ('722) Patent Litigation, CSC Holdings LLC, Charter Communications Inc., Comcast Cable Communications LLC, Lingo Inc., Mediacom Broadband LLC, Mediacom Communications Corporation, Primus Telecommunications Inc., Qwest Communications Company LLC, Qwest Communications International Inc., RCN Corporation, T-Mobile USA Inc., Vonage Communications, Inc.. (Day, John) (Entered: 06/12/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                        SO ORDERED, re (101 in 1:12-md-02344-GMS, 243 in 1:12-cv-00600-GMS, 45 in 1:11-cv-00726-GMS, 41 in 1:12-cv-00566-GMS, 390 in 1:12-cv-00568-GMS, 50 in 1:11-cv-00730-GMS, 40 in 1:11-cv-00722-GMS, 41 in 1:11-cv-00728-GMS, 42 in 1:11-cv-00724-GMS, 44 in 1:11-cv-00723-GMS, 74 in 1:12-cv-00565-GMS, 57 in 1:11-cv-00729-GMS, 46 in 1:11-cv-00721-GMS, 45 in 1:11-cv-00725-GMS, 46 in 1:11-cv-00727-GMS, 41 in 1:12-cv-00567-GMS) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to submit proposed protective order to June 12, 2013 filed by 8x8, Inc., Vonage America Inc., RCN Corporation, Mediacom Broadband LLC, Lingo Inc., Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc., AT&T Corp., Qwest Communications International Inc., Vonage Communications, Inc., CSC Holdings LLC, Bear Creek Technologies Inc. ('722) Patent Litigation, Charter Communications Inc., Cox Communications Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc., Vonage Holdings Corporation, Comcast Cable Communications LLC, Mediacom Communications Corporation, Vonage Marketing LLC, Verizon Services Corp., MCI Communications Services Inc., Cox Virginia Telecom LLC, Aptela Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Bright House Networks LLC, Primus Telecommunications Inc., Qwest Communications Company LLC. Signed by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 6/3/13. Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02344-GMS et al.(mmm) (Entered: 06/03/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: None
                          STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to submit proposed protective order to June 12, 2013 - filed by 8x8, Inc., AT&T Corp., Aptela Inc., Bear Creek Technologies Inc. ('722) Patent Litigation, Bright House Networks LLC, CSC Holdings LLC, Charter Communications Inc., Comcast Cable Communications LLC, Cox Communications Inc., Cox Virginia Telecom LLC, Lingo Inc., MCI Communications Services Inc., Mediacom Broadband LLC, Mediacom Communications Corporation, Primus Telecommunications Inc., Qwest Communications Company LLC, Qwest Communications International Inc., RCN Corporation, SBC Internet Services Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc., Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Services Corp., Vonage America Inc., Vonage Communications, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corporation, Vonage Marketing LLC. (Day, John) (Entered: 05/29/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/16/2013, Entered: None
                            NOTICE OF SERVICE of Bear Creek Technologies, Inc.'s Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Default Standard for Discovery, Including Discovery of Electronically Stored Information ("ESI") by Bear Creek Technologies Inc., Bear Creek Technologies Inc. ('722) Patent Litigation, Bear Creek Technologies Inc..(Troutner, Melissa) (Entered: 05/16/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/14/2013, Entered: None
                              NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Peter J. Faben as co-counsel. Reason for request: No longer employed with Cooley Manion Jones LLP. (Troutner, Melissa) (Entered: 05/14/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None
                                STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to submit protective order to May 29, 2013 - filed by 8x8, Inc., AT&T Corp., Aptela Inc., Bear Creek Technologies Inc., Bright House Networks LLC, CSC Holdings LLC, Charter Communications Inc., Comcast Cable Communications LLC, Comcast Corporation, Cox Communications Inc., Cox Virginia Telecom LLC, Lingo Inc., Mediacom Broadband LLC, Mediacom Communications Corporation, Primus Telecommunications Inc., Qwest Communications Company LLC, Qwest Communications International Inc., RCN Corporation, SBC Internet Services Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc., Vonage America Inc., Vonage Communications, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corporation, Vonage Marketing LLC. (Lydon, Tiffany) (Entered: 05/13/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/18/2013, Entered: None
                                  MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jim W. Fang - filed by Aptela Inc.. (Day, John) (Entered: 04/18/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    SO ORDERED, re (32 in 1:11-cv-00727-GMS, 33 in 1:12-cv-00566-GMS, 26 in 1:11-cv-00722-GMS, 31 in 1:11-cv-00723-GMS, 32 in 1:11-cv-00725-GMS, 63 in 1:12-cv-00565-GMS, 42 in 1:11-cv-00729-GMS, 381 in 1:12-cv-00568-GMS, 237 in 1:12-cv-00600-GMS, 32 in 1:12-cv-00567-GMS, 64 in 1:12-md-02344-GMS, 34 in 1:11-cv-00730-GMS, 31 in 1:11-cv-00728-GMS, 31 in 1:11-cv-00721-GMS, 27 in 1:11-cv-00724-GMS, 32 in 1:11-cv-00726-GMS) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to file reply brief on motion for stay to April 4, 2013 filed by 8x8, Inc., Vonage America Inc., RCN Corporation, Comcast Corporation, Mediacom Broadband LLC, Lingo Inc., Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc., Qwest Communications International Inc., Vonage Communications, Inc., CSC Holdings LLC, Bear Creek Technologies Inc. ('722) Patent Litigation, Charter Communications Inc., Cox Communications Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc., Vonage Holdings Corporation, Comcast Cable Communications LLC, Mediacom Communications Corporation, Vonage Marketing LLC, Verizon Services Corp., AT&T Teleholdings Inc., MCI Communications Services Inc., Cox Virginia Telecom LLC, Aptela Inc., AT&T Inc., Bright House Networks LLC, Primus Telecommunications Inc., Qwest Communications Company LLC. Signed by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 4/2/2013. Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02344-GMS et al.(asw) (Entered: 04/02/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      MOTION for Scheduling Order - filed by Bear Creek Technologies Inc., Bear Creek Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Letter to Judge Sleet)(Troutner, Melissa) (Entered: 03/29/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa L. Troutner on behalf of Bear Creek Technologies Inc. (Troutner, Melissa) (Entered: 03/28/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None
                                          STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to file reply brief on motion for stay to April 4, 2013 - filed by 8x8, Inc., AT&T Inc., AT&T Teleholdings Inc., Aptela Inc., Bear Creek Technologies Inc. ('722) Patent Litigation, Bright House Networks LLC, CSC Holdings LLC, Charter Communications Inc., Comcast Cable Communications LLC, Comcast Corporation, Cox Communications Inc., Cox Virginia Telecom LLC, Lingo Inc., MCI Communications Services Inc., Mediacom Broadband LLC, Mediacom Communications Corporation, Primus Telecommunications Inc., Qwest Communications Company LLC, Qwest Communications International Inc., RCN Corporation, T-Mobile USA Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc., Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Services Corp., Vonage America Inc., Vonage Communications, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corporation, Vonage Marketing LLC. (Day, John) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Amaryah K. Bocchino on behalf of Bear Creek Technologies Inc. (Bocchino, Amaryah) (Entered: 03/18/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/12/2013, Entered: None
                                              Joint STATUS REPORT by Bear Creek Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Bear Creek's Proposed Scheduling Order, # 2 Exhibit B - Defendants' Proposed Scheduling Order)(Faben, Peter) (Entered: 03/12/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                MOTION to Appoint Counsel as Lead and Liaison Counsel for Bear Creek Technologies, Inc. - filed by Bear Creek Technologies Inc.. (Faben, Peter) (Entered: 03/12/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                  MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Barbara L. Moore - filed by Bear Creek Technologies Inc.. (Faben, Peter) (Entered: 10/15/2012)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE TO COUNSEL: MDL No. 1:12-md-2344 has been opened and assigned to the Honorable Gregory M. Sleet. Attorneys of record who will be electronically filing documents may use the attached form to register for a CM/ECF login and password. Please see the docket for further entries. (dzs, ) (Entered: 05/07/2012)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                      Record of case transferred in from District of Virginia Eastern; Case Number in Other District: 2:11-cv-00460. Copy of Docket Sheet and original file (Entered: 05/07/2012)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                        MDL TRANSFER ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.c. § 1407, the actions listed on Schedule A and pending outside the District of Delaware are transferred to the District of Delaware and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Gregory M. Sleet for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Signed by Clerk on 5/3/2012. (bnew) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/7/2012.] (Entered: 05/04/2012)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/31/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          ORDER granting 22 Motion to Stay - The Court ORDERS that all proceedings in this matter are hereby STAYED and that all deadlines in this action are VACATED pending a transfer decision by the JPMDL. Signed by District Judge Robert G. Doumar and filed on 1/31/2012. (bnew) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/7/2012.] (Entered: 01/31/2012)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE by Bear Creek Technologies, Inc. re 23 Memorandum in Support to Attach Exhibits (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Miele, Anthony) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/7/2012.] (Entered: 01/30/2012)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                              Memorandum in Support re 22 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending a Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (Unopposed) filed by Bear Creek Technologies, Inc.. (Miele, Anthony) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/7/2012.] (Entered: 01/27/2012)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending a Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (Unopposed) by Bear Creek Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Miele, Anthony) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/7/2012.] (Entered: 01/27/2012)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                  NOTICE by Bear Creek Technologies, Inc. of Filing Motion for Multi-District Litigation in Related Cases (Miele, Anthony) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/7/2012.] (Entered: 01/26/2012)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/16/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    Rule 16(b) SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/20/2012 at 11:00 AM in Norfolk Grand Jury Courtroom; Jury Trial set for 7/31/2012 at 10:00 AM in Norfolk Grand Jury Courtroom; Markman Hearing set for 3/28/2012 at 10:00 AM in Norfolk Grand Jury Courtroom, all before District Judge Robert G. Doumar. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tommy E. Miller on 12/12/11 and filed 12/16/11. (lbax, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/7/2012.] (Entered: 12/20/2011)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                      CERTIFICATE of Service re 18 NOTICE by Anthony L. Miele on behalf of Bear Creek Technologies, Inc. (Miele, Anthony) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/7/2012.] (Entered: 12/05/2011)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                        NOTICE by Bear Creek Technologies, Inc. Joint Statement Regarding Claim Construction (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Miele, Anthony) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/7/2012.] (Entered: 12/05/2011)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          RULE 26(f) PRETRIAL ORDER: Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference set for 12/12/2011 at 11:00 AM in Norfolk Conference Room 3. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tommy E. Miller on November 22, 2011 and filed on November 23, 2011. (sche) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/7/2012.] (Entered: 11/23/2011)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER that the parties to confer in an effort to prepare and submit a joint statement by Monday, December 5,2011, at 12:00p.m. to apprise this Court of the portions of the '722 patent, if any, that are actually in dispute. The Court DIRECTS both parties to contact the Courtroom Deputy by Monday, November 21, 2011, to schedule an Initial Pretrial Conference in this matter. Signed by District Judge Robert G. Doumar on 11/1/2011 and filed on 11/2/2011. (rsim) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/7/2012.] (Entered: 11/02/2011)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                              MOTION for Jeffrey Thomas Hantson to appear Pro hac vice by Aptela, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Receipt)(mwin, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/7/2012.] (Entered: 10/31/2011)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re 10 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Aptela, Inc.. (Bertin, Robert) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/7/2012.] (Entered: 10/17/2011)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                  Opposition to 10 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Bear Creek Technologies, Inc.. (Miele, Anthony) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/7/2012.] (Entered: 10/11/2011)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    ORDER granting 6 Motion for Jennifer Bush Furey to appear Pro hac vice for Bear Creek Technologies, Inc. Signed by District Judge Robert G. Doumar and filed on 9/29/11. (mwin, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/7/2012.] (Entered: 09/30/2011)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                      BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 10 Motion to Dismiss by Aptela, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Bertin, Robert) Modified on 9/28/2011 to change "MOTION" TO "BRIEF" and to link to the motion. (mwin, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/7/2012.] (Entered: 09/27/2011)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Aptela, Inc.. (Bertin, Robert) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/7/2012.] (Entered: 09/27/2011)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                          FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Aptela, Inc. Rule 7.1 Statement (Bertin, Robert) Modified on 9/28/2011 to change event from "Notice" to "Financial Disclosure Statement" (mwin, ). [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/7/2012.] (Entered: 09/27/2011)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Christian Bertin on behalf of Aptela, Inc. (Bertin, Robert) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/7/2012.] (Entered: 09/27/2011)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Aptela, Inc. served on 9/6/2011 (ecav, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/7/2012.] (Entered: 09/26/2011)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                Corrected MOTION for Jennifer Bush Furey to appear Pro hac vice on behalf of Bear Creek Technologies, Inc. (Corrected Motion was filed as directed. Fee was paid 8/29/11 with original motion, document #5.) (mwin, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/7/2012.] (Entered: 09/13/2011)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                  MOTION for Jennifer Bush Furey to appear Pro hac vice for Bear Creek Technologies, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Receipt)(mwin, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/7/2012.] (Entered: 08/29/2011)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Report on the filing of an action regarding patent 7,889,722.. (ldab, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/7/2012.] (Entered: 08/19/2011)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      One Summons with two copies issued as to Aptela, Inc. and mailed to counsel (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Magistrate Judge Notice and Judge's Information)(ldab, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/7/2012.] (Entered: 08/19/2011)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Bear Creek Technologies, Inc.. (ldab, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/7/2012.] (Entered: 08/19/2011)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                          COMPLAINT against Aptela, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 24683012578.), filed by Bear Creek Technologies, Inc. with Jury Demand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Receipt, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Letter)(ldab, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/7/2012.] (Entered: 08/19/2011)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 58 times.

                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                             
                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                            Need Password Help?