In Re: Bear Creek Technologies Inc. ('722) Patent Litigation
Federal Court Proceeding Delaware District Court, Case No. 1:12-md-02344
District Judge Gregory M. Sleet, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 27, 2017 at 5:50 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo 8x8, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Potter Anderson & Corroon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Ellis Moore +1 302 984 6000 dmoore@potteranderson.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robert J. Crawford

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert J. Crawford
No Logo Mediacom Broadband LLC, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ashby & Geddes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven J. Balick +1 302 654 1888 +1 302 654 2067 sbalick@ashby-geddes.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John G. Day +1 302 654 1888 jday@ashby-geddes.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Colin Mayo +1 302 654 1888 amayo@ashby-geddes.com
No Logo Mediacom Communications Corporation, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ashby & Geddes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven J. Balick +1 302 654 1888 +1 302 654 2067 sbalick@ashby-geddes.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John G. Day +1 302 654 1888 jday@ashby-geddes.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Colin Mayo +1 302 654 1888 amayo@ashby-geddes.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mitchell D. Lukin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mitchell D. Lukin
No Logo Qwest Communications Company LLC, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ashby & Geddes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John G. Day +1 302 654 1888 jday@ashby-geddes.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Richards, Layton & Finger, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Travis Steven Hunter +1 302 651 7564 hunter@rlf.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chad Michael Shandler +1 302 658 6541
Qwest Comunications International, Inc. Qwest Comunications International, Inc., Counter-Claimant
Officially listed as "Qwest Communications International Inc."

Toggle Switch Represented by Ashby & Geddes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John G. Day +1 302 654 1888 jday@ashby-geddes.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jonathan G. Graves

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan G. Graves

Toggle Switch Represented by Phillip E. Morton

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip E. Morton

Toggle Switch Represented by Richards, Layton & Finger, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Travis Steven Hunter +1 302 651 7564 hunter@rlf.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chad Michael Shandler +1 302 658 6541
No Logo SBC Internet Services Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ashby & Geddes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John G. Day +1 302 654 1888 jday@ashby-geddes.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tiffany Geyer Lydon +1 302 654 1888 +1 302 654 2067 tlydon@ashby-geddes.com
No Logo Bear Creek Technologies Inc. ('722) Patent Litigation, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooley Manion Jones Hake Kurowski LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/07/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anthony L. Miele +1 617 670 8571 +1 617 570 8771 amiele@cmjlaw.com
TERMINATED: 11/07/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anthony L. Miele +1 617 670 8571 +1 617 570 8771 amiele@cmjlaw.com
TERMINATED: 11/07/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anthony L. Miele +1 617 670 8571 +1 617 570 8771 amiele@cmjlaw.com
TERMINATED: 11/07/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anthony L. Miele +1 617 670 8571 +1 617 570 8771 amiele@cmjlaw.com
No Logo 8x8, Inc., Notice Only

Toggle Switch Represented by Ashby & Geddes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Colin Mayo +1 302 654 1888 amayo@ashby-geddes.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Potter Anderson & Corroon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Ellis Moore +1 302 984 6000 dmoore@potteranderson.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robert J. Crawford

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert J. Crawford
No Logo Aptela, Inc., Notice Only

Toggle Switch Represented by Ashby & Geddes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John G. Day +1 302 654 1888 jday@ashby-geddes.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Colin Mayo +1 302 654 1888 amayo@ashby-geddes.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jim W. Fang

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jim W. Fang

Toggle Switch Represented by Swidler Berlin, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Christian Bertin +1 202 373 6672 +1 202 373 6001 r.bertin@bingham.com
AT&T Corporation AT&T Corporation, Notice Only
Officially listed as "AT&T Corp."

Toggle Switch Represented by Ashby & Geddes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John G. Day +1 302 654 1888 jday@ashby-geddes.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tiffany Geyer Lydon +1 302 654 1888 +1 302 654 2067 tlydon@ashby-geddes.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Colin Mayo +1 302 654 1888 amayo@ashby-geddes.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Daniel S. Leventhal

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel S. Leventhal

Toggle Switch Represented by Joseph P. Zammit

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph P. Zammit

Toggle Switch Represented by Miriam Quinn

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/29/2012, PRO HAC VICE Miriam Quinn
No Logo BEAR CREEK TECHNOLOGIES, INC., Notice Only

Toggle Switch Represented by Ashley Katherine Long

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ashley Katherine Long

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooley Manion Jones Hake Kurowski LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/07/2013 Anthony L. Miele +1 617 670 8571 +1 617 570 8771 amiele@cmjlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Craig Lee Uhrich

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Craig Lee Uhrich

Toggle Switch Represented by Deep Ellum Search

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
(Inactive), ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa L. Troutner mtroutner@bna.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Goulston & Storrs, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/10/2013, PRO HAC VICE Barbara L. Moore +1 617 574 4135 bmoore@goulstonstorrs.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hawkins Parnell Thackston & Young, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Sheffield Thompson +1 404 614 7522 +1 404 614 7500 rthompson@hplegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jennifer B. Furey

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/10/2013, PRO HAC VICE Jennifer B. Furey

Toggle Switch Represented by Lawrence Keefe Demeo

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence Keefe Demeo

Toggle Switch Represented by Manion Gaynor & Manning LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amaryah K. Bocchino +1 302 657 2100 +1 302 657 2104 abocchino@cmjlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Matthew Horvitz

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/10/2013, PRO HAC VICE Matthew Horvitz

Toggle Switch Represented by Ventker & Warman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marissa Marriott Henderson +1 757 625 1192 mhenderson@ventkerlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David N. Ventker +1 757 625 1192 +1 757 625 1476 dventker@ventkerlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ventker & Warman, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nathaniel Gavin Zaleski +1 757 625 1192

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilbraham Lawler & Buba

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/15/2013 Peter John Faben +1 302 421 9935 +1 302 421 9955 pjf@wlbdeflaw.com
No Logo Bright House Networks, LLC, Notice Only
Unknown Role, New Clearwire CORP

Toggle Switch Represented by Ashby & Geddes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John G. Day +1 302 654 1888 jday@ashby-geddes.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Colin Mayo +1 302 654 1888 amayo@ashby-geddes.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Richards, Layton & Finger, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kelly E. Farnan +1 302 651 7705 farnan@rlf.com
No Logo Charter Communications, Inc., Notice Only

Toggle Switch Represented by Ashby & Geddes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven J. Balick +1 302 654 1888 +1 302 654 2067 sbalick@ashby-geddes.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John G. Day +1 302 654 1888 jday@ashby-geddes.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lauren E. Maguire +1 302 654 1888 lmaguire@ashby-geddes.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Colin Mayo +1 302 654 1888 amayo@ashby-geddes.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jeffrey H. Dean

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey H. Dean

Toggle Switch Represented by Kevin D. Hogg

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin D. Hogg

Toggle Switch Represented by Sarah J. Kalemeris

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/19/2014, PRO HAC VICE Sarah J. Kalemeris

Toggle Switch Represented by Thomas L. Duston

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas L. Duston
No Logo Clerk Jeffery N. Luthi, Notice Only

Toggle Switch Represented by Clerk, MDL Judicial Panel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffery N. Luthi
No Logo Comcast Cable Communications, LLC, Notice Only

Toggle Switch Represented by Ashby & Geddes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John G. Day +1 302 654 1888 jday@ashby-geddes.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Colin Mayo +1 302 654 1888 amayo@ashby-geddes.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Asim M. Bhansali

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Asim M. Bhansali

Toggle Switch Represented by Cody S. Harris

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cody S. Harris

Toggle Switch Represented by David J. Silbert

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David J. Silbert

Toggle Switch Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack B. Blumenfeld +1 302 658 9200 jbbefiling@mnat.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stacy S. Chen

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/21/2014, PRO HAC VICE Stacy S. Chen
Comcast Corporation Comcast Corporation, Notice Only

Toggle Switch Represented by Ashby & Geddes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John G. Day +1 302 654 1888 jday@ashby-geddes.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Colin Mayo +1 302 654 1888 amayo@ashby-geddes.com
No Logo Cox Communications, Inc., Notice Only

Toggle Switch Represented by Ashby & Geddes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John G. Day +1 302 654 1888 jday@ashby-geddes.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Colin Mayo +1 302 654 1888 amayo@ashby-geddes.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Susan A. Cahoon +1 404 815 6325 +1 404 541 3145 scahoon@kilpatricktownsend.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED AUDRA ANN DIAL +1 404 815 6500 +1 404 815 6555 adial@kilpatricktownsend.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ludlam Higgins Taylor +1 919 420 1725 +1 919 510 6141 taludlam@kilpatricktownsend.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael John Turton +1 404 815 6500 +1 404 815 6555 mturton@kilpatricktownsend.com
No Logo Cox Virginia Telecom LLC, Notice Only

Toggle Switch Represented by Ashby & Geddes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John G. Day +1 302 654 1888 jday@ashby-geddes.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Colin Mayo +1 302 654 1888 amayo@ashby-geddes.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Susan A. Cahoon +1 404 815 6325 +1 404 541 3145 scahoon@kilpatricktownsend.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED AUDRA ANN DIAL +1 404 815 6500 +1 404 815 6555 adial@kilpatricktownsend.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ludlam Higgins Taylor +1 919 420 1725 +1 919 510 6141 taludlam@kilpatricktownsend.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael John Turton +1 404 815 6500 +1 404 815 6555 mturton@kilpatricktownsend.com
No Logo Csc Holdings LLC, Notice Only

Toggle Switch Represented by Ashby & Geddes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John G. Day +1 302 654 1888 jday@ashby-geddes.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Colin Mayo +1 302 654 1888 amayo@ashby-geddes.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Benjamin Hershkowitz

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Hershkowitz

Toggle Switch Represented by Richards, Layton & Finger, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frederick L. Cottrell, III +1 302 658 6541 cottrell@rlf.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason James Rawnsley +1 302 651 7550 rawnsley@rlf.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robert Scott Roe

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Scott Roe

Toggle Switch Represented by Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/01/2013 Anne Shea Gaza +1 302 571 6727 agaza@ycst.com
No Logo Lingo, Inc., Notice Only

Toggle Switch Represented by Ashby & Geddes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven J. Balick +1 302 654 1888 +1 302 654 2067 sbalick@ashby-geddes.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John G. Day +1 302 654 1888 jday@ashby-geddes.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Colin Mayo +1 302 654 1888 amayo@ashby-geddes.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Fried, Frank, Harris, Shriver & Jacobson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Richard DeFosse +1 202 508 8000 +1 202 661 7374 jonathan.defosse@friedfrank.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott W Doyle +1 202 639 7277 +1 202 639 7003 scott.doyle@friedfrank.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Williams Mullen, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William R. Poynter +1 757 499 8800 wpoynter@williamsmullen.com
No Logo MCI Communications Services, Inc., Notice Only

Toggle Switch Represented by Ashby & Geddes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John G. Day +1 302 654 1888 jday@ashby-geddes.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Colin Mayo +1 302 654 1888 amayo@ashby-geddes.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED C. Brandon Rash +1 202 408 4000 +1 202 408 4400 brandon.rash@finnegan.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Verizon Communications, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/06/2013 John P. Frantz +1 908 204 3258 john.frantz@verizon.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amy Dunathan Hammer +1 703 351 3079 amy.d.hammer@verizon.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Winston & Strawn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles B. Molster +1 202 282 5988 +1 202 282 5100 cmolster@winston.com
No Logo Media Broadcom, LLC, Notice Only

Toggle Switch Represented by Ashby & Geddes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Colin Mayo +1 302 654 1888 amayo@ashby-geddes.com
No Logo Mediacom Broadband LLC, Notice Only

Toggle Switch Represented by Ashby & Geddes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven J. Balick +1 302 654 1888 +1 302 654 2067 sbalick@ashby-geddes.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Colin Mayo +1 302 654 1888 amayo@ashby-geddes.com
No Logo Mediacom Communications Corporation, Notice Only

Toggle Switch Represented by Ashby & Geddes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven J. Balick +1 302 654 1888 +1 302 654 2067 sbalick@ashby-geddes.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Colin Mayo +1 302 654 1888 amayo@ashby-geddes.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mitchell D. Lukin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mitchell D. Lukin
No Logo Primus Telecommunications, Inc., Notice Only

Toggle Switch Represented by Ashby & Geddes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven J. Balick +1 302 654 1888 +1 302 654 2067 sbalick@ashby-geddes.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John G. Day +1 302 654 1888 jday@ashby-geddes.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Colin Mayo +1 302 654 1888 amayo@ashby-geddes.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Fried, Frank, Harris, Shriver & Jacobson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Richard DeFosse +1 202 508 8000 +1 202 661 7374 jonathan.defosse@friedfrank.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott W Doyle +1 202 639 7277 +1 202 639 7003 scott.doyle@friedfrank.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Michel Elias Souaya

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michel Elias Souaya

Toggle Switch Represented by Williams Mullen, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William R. Poynter +1 757 499 8800 wpoynter@williamsmullen.com
No Logo Qwest Communications Company LLC, Notice Only

Toggle Switch Represented by Ashby & Geddes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Colin Mayo +1 302 654 1888 amayo@ashby-geddes.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Richards, Layton & Finger, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Travis Steven Hunter +1 302 651 7564 hunter@rlf.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chad Michael Shandler +1 302 658 6541
Qwest Comunications International, Inc. Qwest Comunications International, Inc., Notice Only
Officially listed as "Qwest Communications International Inc."

Toggle Switch Represented by Ashby & Geddes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Colin Mayo +1 302 654 1888 amayo@ashby-geddes.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jonathan G. Graves

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan G. Graves

Toggle Switch Represented by Phillip E. Morton

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip E. Morton

Toggle Switch Represented by Richards, Layton & Finger, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Travis Steven Hunter +1 302 651 7564 hunter@rlf.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chad Michael Shandler +1 302 658 6541
No Logo Rcn Corporation, Notice Only

Toggle Switch Represented by Ashby & Geddes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John G. Day +1 302 654 1888 jday@ashby-geddes.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Colin Mayo +1 302 654 1888 amayo@ashby-geddes.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Deep Ellum Search

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/25/2016, LEAD ATTORNEY Rhett Eugene Petcher +1 202 828 3584

Toggle Switch Represented by Richard P. Gilly

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard P. Gilly

Toggle Switch Represented by Vamsi Kakarla

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/25/2016, PRO HAC VICE Vamsi Kakarla
No Logo Rcn Telecom Services, LLC, Notice Only

Toggle Switch Represented by Abrams & Bayliss LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John M. Seaman +1 302 778 1000 +1 302 573 3501 seaman@abramsbayliss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Deep Ellum Search

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/25/2016, LEAD ATTORNEY Rhett Eugene Petcher +1 202 828 3584
No Logo SBC Internet Services Inc., Notice Only

Toggle Switch Represented by Ashby & Geddes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John G. Day +1 302 654 1888 jday@ashby-geddes.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tiffany Geyer Lydon +1 302 654 1888 +1 302 654 2067 tlydon@ashby-geddes.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Colin Mayo +1 302 654 1888 amayo@ashby-geddes.com
T-Mobile USA, Inc. T-Mobile USA, Inc., Notice Only

Toggle Switch Represented by Ashby & Geddes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John G. Day +1 302 654 1888 jday@ashby-geddes.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Colin Mayo +1 302 654 1888 amayo@ashby-geddes.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Duane Morris LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gary William Lipkin +1 302 657 4903 +1 302 657 4901 glipkin@eckertseamans.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matt Neiderman +1 302 657 4900 mneiderman@duanemorris.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard L. Renck +1 302 657 4906 rlrenck@duanemorris.com

Toggle Switch Represented by John R. Gibson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John R. Gibson

Toggle Switch Represented by L. Norwood Jameson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED L. Norwood Jameson

Toggle Switch Represented by Matthew S. Yungwirth

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew S. Yungwirth
No Logo Time Warner Cable Inc., Notice Only
Unknown Role, Clearwire Corp
Unknown Role, Time Warner Cable LLC
Unknown Role, New Clearwire CORP

Toggle Switch Represented by Ashby & Geddes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John G. Day +1 302 654 1888 jday@ashby-geddes.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Colin Mayo +1 302 654 1888 amayo@ashby-geddes.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Daniel Boglioli

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE Daniel Boglioli

Toggle Switch Represented by Daniel L. Reisner

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel L. Reisner

Toggle Switch Represented by David Soofian

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Soofian

Toggle Switch Represented by Kaye Scholer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David S. Benyacar +1 212 836 7763 +1 212 836 8689 dbenyacar@kayescholer.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Richards, Layton & Finger, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kelly E. Farnan +1 302 651 7705 farnan@rlf.com
Verizon Business Network Services Inc. Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Notice Only

Toggle Switch Represented by Ashby & Geddes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John G. Day +1 302 654 1888 jday@ashby-geddes.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Colin Mayo +1 302 654 1888 amayo@ashby-geddes.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED C. Brandon Rash +1 202 408 4000 +1 202 408 4400 brandon.rash@finnegan.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Verizon Communications, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/06/2013 John P. Frantz +1 908 204 3258 john.frantz@verizon.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amy Dunathan Hammer +1 703 351 3079 amy.d.hammer@verizon.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Winston & Strawn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles B. Molster +1 202 282 5988 +1 202 282 5100 cmolster@winston.com
Verizon Services Corporation Verizon Services Corporation, Notice Only
Officially listed as "Verizon Services Corp."

Toggle Switch Represented by Ashby & Geddes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John G. Day +1 302 654 1888 jday@ashby-geddes.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Colin Mayo +1 302 654 1888 amayo@ashby-geddes.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED C. Brandon Rash +1 202 408 4000 +1 202 408 4400 brandon.rash@finnegan.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Verizon Communications, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/06/2013 John P. Frantz +1 908 204 3258 john.frantz@verizon.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amy Dunathan Hammer +1 703 351 3079 amy.d.hammer@verizon.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Winston & Strawn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles B. Molster +1 202 282 5988 +1 202 282 5100 cmolster@winston.com
No Logo Vonage America Inc., Notice Only

Toggle Switch Represented by Ashby & Geddes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John G. Day +1 302 654 1888 jday@ashby-geddes.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Colin Mayo +1 302 654 1888 amayo@ashby-geddes.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Michael J. Summersgill

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael J. Summersgill

Toggle Switch Represented by Ross Aronstam & Moritz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/19/2015 Collins J. Seitz, Jr. +1 302 576 1600 cseitz@seitzross.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 400

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin J. Schladweiler +1 302 576 1600 bschladweiler@ram-llp.com
No Logo Vonage Communications, Inc., Notice Only

Toggle Switch Represented by Ashby & Geddes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John G. Day +1 302 654 1888 jday@ashby-geddes.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Colin Mayo +1 302 654 1888 amayo@ashby-geddes.com
No Logo Vonage Holdings Corporation, Notice Only

Toggle Switch Represented by Ashby & Geddes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John G. Day +1 302 654 1888 jday@ashby-geddes.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Colin Mayo +1 302 654 1888 amayo@ashby-geddes.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nathan R. Speed

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/21/2012, PRO HAC VICE Nathan R. Speed

Toggle Switch Represented by Patrick M. Callahan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/06/2012, PRO HAC VICE Patrick M. Callahan

Toggle Switch Represented by Ross Aronstam & Moritz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/19/2015 Collins J. Seitz, Jr. +1 302 576 1600 cseitz@seitzross.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sean K. Thompson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/19/2016, PRO HAC VICE Sean K. Thompson

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 400

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin J. Schladweiler +1 302 576 1600 bschladweiler@ram-llp.com
No Logo Vonage Marketing LLC, Notice Only

Toggle Switch Represented by Ashby & Geddes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John G. Day +1 302 654 1888 jday@ashby-geddes.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Colin Mayo +1 302 654 1888 amayo@ashby-geddes.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ross Aronstam & Moritz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/19/2015, LEAD ATTORNEY Collins J. Seitz, Jr. +1 302 576 1600 cseitz@seitzross.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 400

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin J. Schladweiler +1 302 576 1600 bschladweiler@ram-llp.com
No Logo Bear Creek Technologies Inc. ('722) Patent Litigation, In Re

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooley Manion Jones Hake Kurowski LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/07/2013 Anthony L. Miele +1 617 670 8571 +1 617 570 8771 amiele@cmjlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Manion Gaynor & Manning LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marc J. Phillips +1 302 657 2100 +1 302 657 2104
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (163) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel by Lingo Inc., Primus Telecommunications Inc. (Maguire, Lauren) (Entered: 01/06/2017)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel by Mediacom Broadband LLC, Mediacom Communications Corporation (Maguire, Lauren) (Entered: 01/06/2017)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel by Charter Communications Inc. (Maguire, Lauren) (Entered: 01/06/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 12/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel by Mediacom Broadband LLC, Mediacom Communications Corporation (Mayo, Andrew) (Entered: 12/30/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 10/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          AMENDED ORDER - re (16 in 1:12-md-02344-GMS, 221 in 1:12-cv-00600-GMS). Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 10/20/2016. (mdb) (Entered: 10/20/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 8/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Amended NOTICE of Change of Address by AT&T Corp., SBC Internet Services Inc. re (157 in 1:12-md-02344-GMS, 72 in 1:11-cv-00729-GMS) Notice of Change of Address (Day, John) (Entered: 08/16/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 8/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              NOTICE of Change of Address by John G. Day (Day, John) (Entered: 08/16/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 7/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                SO ORDERED, re (255 in 1:12-cv-00600-GMS, 155 in 1:12-md-02344-GMS) Stipulation of Dismissal filed by MCI Communications Services Inc., Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Services Corp. Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 7/11/2016. Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02344-GMS, 1:12-cv-00600-GMS(asw) (Entered: 07/11/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 7/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  STIPULATION of Dismissal (Stipulated Order to Dismiss all Claims with Prejudice and Amend Protective Order) by MCI Communications Services Inc., Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Services Corp.. (Lydon, Tiffany) (Entered: 07/11/2016)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 2/24/2016, Entered: None
                    NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Vamsi K. Kakarla and Rhett Petcher as co-counsel. Reason for request: no longer with firm. (Seaman, John) (Entered: 02/24/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: None
                      NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Sean K. Thompson as co-counsel. Reason for request: leaving the firm. (Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 02/19/2016)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 10/29/2015, Entered: None
                        NOTICE of Change of Address by Marc J. Phillips (Phillips, Marc) (Entered: 10/29/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 5/5/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE. Case is closed for administrative purposes with leave to reopen if further attention by the Court is required (CASE CLOSED). Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 5/5/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02344-GMS et al.(asw) (Entered: 05/05/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: None
                            Letter to The Honorable Gregory M. Sleet from Larry K. DeMeo, Esquire regarding Joint Status Update. (Phillips, Marc) (Entered: 05/04/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 3/19/2015, Entered: None
                              NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel - Collins J. Seitz, Jr. by Vonage America Inc., Vonage Holdings Corporation, Vonage Marketing LLC (Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 03/19/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None
                                NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Stacy Chen as co-counsel. Reason for request: No longer with firm. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 11/20/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re T-Mobile USA Inc.: Entry of appearance of attorney Richard L. Renck. Attorney Gary W. Lipkin terminated. (Renck, Richard) (Entered: 10/15/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 9/3/2014, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re T-Mobile USA Inc.: Entry of appearance of attorney Gary William Lipkin. Attorney Matt Neiderman terminated. (Lipkin, Gary) (Entered: 09/03/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None
                                      MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Benjamin T. Horton - filed by Charter Communications Inc.. (Mayo, Andrew) (Entered: 03/31/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel by Charter Communications Inc. (Mayo, Andrew) (Entered: 03/18/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 12/5/2013, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove John P. Frantz as co-counsel.. (Day, John) (Entered: 12/05/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 11/8/2013, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re Bear Creek Technologies Inc. ('722) Patent Litigation: Entry of appearance of attorney Marc J. Phillips. Attorney Jennifer B. Furey, Anthony L. Miele, and Barbara L. Moore terminated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF BEAR CREEK TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S APPLICATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEYS AS LEAD AND LIAISON COUNSEL)(Phillips, Marc) (Entered: 11/08/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 11/7/2013, Entered: None
                                              MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Martin F. Gaynor - filed by Bear Creek Technologies Inc. ('722) Patent Litigation. (Phillips, Marc) (Entered: 11/07/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 11/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Anthony L. Miele as co-counsel.. (Phillips, Marc) (Entered: 11/07/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 9/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Matthew P. Horvitz as co-counsel. Reason for request: Change of Firm. (Phillips, Marc) (Entered: 09/10/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 9/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Jennifer B. Furey as co-counsel. Reason for request: Change of Firm. (Phillips, Marc) (Entered: 09/10/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 9/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Barbara L. Moore as co-counsel. Reason for request: Change of Firm. (Phillips, Marc) (Entered: 09/10/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 8/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        SO ORDERED, re (84 in 1:12-cv-00565-GMS, 399 in 1:12-cv-00568-GMS, 248 in 1:12-cv-00600-GMS, 54 in 1:11-cv-00724-GMS, 48 in 1:12-cv-00566-GMS, 52 in 1:11-cv-00728-GMS, 66 in 1:11-cv-00729-GMS, 48 in 1:11-cv-00722-GMS, 59 in 1:11-cv-00730-GMS, 58 in 1:11-cv-00727-GMS, 54 in 1:11-cv-00725-GMS, 51 in 1:12-cv-00567-GMS, 54 in 1:11-cv-00726-GMS, 55 in 1:11-cv-00721-GMS, 134 in 1:12-md-02344-GMS, 52 in 1:11-cv-00723-GMS) Proposed Order, filed by 8x8, Inc., Vonage America Inc., RCN Corporation, Mediacom Broadband LLC, Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc., AT&T Corp., Qwest Communications International Inc., Vonage Communications, Inc., CSC Holdings LLC, Charter Communications Inc., Cox Communications Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc., Vonage Holdings Corporation, Comcast Cable Communications LLC, Mediacom Communications Corporation, Vonage Marketing LLC, Verizon Services Corp., MCI Communications Services Inc., Cox Virginia Telecom LLC, Aptela Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Bright House Networks LLC, Primus Telecommunications Inc., Qwest Communications Company LLC. Signed by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 8/6/2013. Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02344-GMS et al.(asw) (Entered: 08/06/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE of Withdrawal of Anne Shea Gaza by CSC Holdings LLC (Gaza, Anne) (Entered: 07/31/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                            PROPOSED ORDER Detailing Scope and Limitations of Defendants' Estoppel by 8x8, Inc., MCI Communications Services Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc., Qwest Communications Company LLC, Qwest Communications International Inc., Bright House Networks LLC, Time Warner Cable Inc., AT&T Corp., Aptela Inc., CSC Holdings LLC, Charter Communications Inc., Comcast Cable Communications LLC, Cox Communications Inc., Cox Virginia Telecom LLC, Mediacom Broadband LLC, Mediacom Communications Corporation, Primus Telecommunications Inc., RCN Corporation, SBC Internet Services Inc., Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Services Corp., Vonage America Inc., Vonage Communications, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corporation, Vonage Marketing LLC. (Day, John) (Entered: 07/19/2013)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              ORDER in case 1:11-cv-00721-GMS; granting (26) Motion to Stay in case 1:11-cv-00726-GMS; granting (26) Motion to Stay in case 1:11-cv-00725-GMS; granting (20) Motion to Stay in case 1:11-cv-00722-GMS; granting (28) Motion to Stay in case 1:11-cv-00730-GMS; granting (21) Motion to Stay in case 1:11-cv-00724-GMS; granting (36) Motion to Stay in case 1:11-cv-00729-GMS; granting (54) Motion to Stay in case 1:12-md-02344-GMS; granting (57) Motion to Stay in case 1:12-cv-00565-GMS. Signed by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 7/17/2013. Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02344-GMS et al.(asw) (Entered: 07/17/2013)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 7/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE OF SERVICE of Bear Creek Technologies, Inc.'s Responses to T-Mobile USA, Inc.'s First Set of Requests for Production of Documents (Nos. 1-44) by Bear Creek Technologies Inc. ('722) Patent Litigation, Bear Creek Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Phillips, Marc) (Entered: 07/16/2013)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  Letter to Chief Judge Sleet from Barbara L. Moore regarding Joint Agenda for Protective Order Dispute. (Phillips, Marc) (Entered: 07/15/2013)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                    JOINDER by 8x8, Inc., joining in 54 Motion to Stay,, Joinder and Notice of Subsequent Development Relating to Motion to Stay Pending Reexamination (D.I. 54). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Moore, David) (Entered: 07/10/2013)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                      NOTICE OF SERVICE of Qwest Communications International, Inc. and Qwest Communications Company LLC's First Set of Interrogatories and First Set of Requests for Production to Plaintiff with Certificate of Service by Qwest Communications Company LLC, Qwest Communications International Inc..(Hunter, Travis) (Entered: 07/01/2013)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                        NOTICE OF SERVICE of CSC Holdings, LLC's Second Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff Bear Creek Technologies, Inc. (Nos. 6-16) by CSC Holdings LLC.(Rawnsley, Jason) (Entered: 06/28/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                          NOTICE OF SERVICE of SBC Internet Services, Inc. and AT&T Corp.'s First Set of Interrogatories to Bear Creek Technologies, Inc. by AT&T Corp., SBC Internet Services Inc..(Lydon, Tiffany) (Entered: 06/28/2013)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 6/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                            STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to submit a proposed protective order to July 12, 2013 - filed by Bear Creek Technologies Inc., Bright House Networks LLC, Time Warner Cable Inc., Vonage America Inc., Vonage Holdings Corporation, Vonage Marketing LLC, Cox Communications, Inc., Cox Virginia Telecom LLC, AT&T Corp., SBC Internet Services Inc., Vonage Communications, Inc., Aptela Inc., 8x8, Inc., CSC Holdings LLC, Comcast Cable Communications LLC, T-Mobile USA Inc., RCN Corporation, Mediacom Broadband LLC, Mediacom Communications Corporation, Charter Communications Inc., Qwest Communications Company LLC, Qwest Communications International Inc., Lingo Inc., Primus Telecommunications Inc.. (Day, John) (Entered: 06/27/2013)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Marc J. Phillips on behalf of Bear Creek Technologies Inc., Bear Creek Technologies Inc. ('722) Patent Litigation, Bear Creek Technologies Inc. (Phillips, Marc) (Entered: 06/26/2013)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 6/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                NOTICE OF SERVICE of Primus Defendants' First Set of Requests for Production by Lingo Inc., Primus Telecommunications Inc..(Mayo, Andrew) (Entered: 06/24/2013)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                  NOTICE OF SERVICE of First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-15) by Mediacom Broadband LLC, Mediacom Communications Corporation.(Maguire, Lauren) (Entered: 06/18/2013)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 6/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                    SO ORDERED, re (46 in 1:11-cv-00728-GMS, 54 in 1:11-cv-00730-GMS, 78 in 1:12-cv-00565-GMS, 394 in 1:12-cv-00568-GMS, 47 in 1:11-cv-00723-GMS, 48 in 1:11-cv-00725-GMS, 45 in 1:12-cv-00567-GMS, 48 in 1:11-cv-00726-GMS, 60 in 1:11-cv-00729-GMS, 49 in 1:11-cv-00721-GMS, 50 in 1:11-cv-00727-GMS, 43 in 1:11-cv-00722-GMS, 47 in 1:11-cv-00724-GMS, 43 in 1:12-cv-00566-GMS, 120 in 1:12-md-02344-GMS) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to submit a proposed protective order to June 28, 2013 filed by 8x8, Inc., Vonage America Inc., RCN Corporation, Mediacom Broadband LLC, Lingo Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc., Cox Communications, Inc., AT&T Corp., Qwest Communications International Inc., Vonage Communications, Inc., CSC Holdings LLC, Bear Creek Technologies Inc. ('722) Patent Litigation, Charter Communications Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc., Vonage Holdings Corporation, Comcast Cable Communications LLC, Vonage Marketing LLC, Mediacom Communications Corporation, Cox Virginia Telecom LLC, Aptela Inc., Bright House Networks LLC, SBC Internet Services Inc., Primus Telecommunications Inc., Qwest Communications Company LLC Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02344-GMS et al.(mmm) (Entered: 06/17/2013)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                      NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant T-Mobile USA, Inc.'s First Set of Requests For The Production of Documents to Bear Creek Technologies, Inc. (Nos. 1-44) by T-Mobile USA Inc..(Smyth, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/14/2013)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 6/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                        STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to submit a proposed protective order to June 28, 2013 - filed by Bright House Networks LLC, Time Warner Cable Inc., Vonage America Inc., Vonage Holdings Corporation, Vonage Marketing LLC, Cox Communications, Inc., Cox Virginia Telecom LLC, AT&T Corp., SBC Internet Services Inc., 8x8, Inc., Aptela Inc., Bear Creek Technologies Inc. ('722) Patent Litigation, CSC Holdings LLC, Charter Communications Inc., Comcast Cable Communications LLC, Lingo Inc., Mediacom Broadband LLC, Mediacom Communications Corporation, Primus Telecommunications Inc., Qwest Communications Company LLC, Qwest Communications International Inc., RCN Corporation, T-Mobile USA Inc., Vonage Communications, Inc.. (Day, John) (Entered: 06/12/2013)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 6/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                          NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant T-Mobile USA, Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories to Bear Creek Technologies, Inc. (Nos. 1-9) by T-Mobile USA Inc..(Smyth, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/10/2013)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 6/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                            NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Qwest Communications International, Inc. and Qwest Communications Company LLCs Responses to Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-14); and (2) Qwest Defendants Responses to Plaintiffs First Requests for Documents and Things (Nos. 1-74) by Qwest Communications Company LLC, Qwest Communications International Inc..(Hunter, Travis) (Entered: 06/10/2013)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 6/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                              NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant 8x8, Inc.'s Supplemental Disclosure Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Default Standard for Discovery, Including Discovery of Electronically Stored Information ("ESI") by 8x8, Inc..(Moore, David) (Entered: 06/06/2013)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 6/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Amended and Supplemental Initial Disclosures by Cox Communications Inc., Cox Virginia Telecom LLC.(Ludlam, Taylor) (Entered: 06/05/2013)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                  NOTICE OF SERVICE of DEFENDANT 8X8, INC.'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF BEAR CREEK TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES (NOS. 1-13); and DEFENDANT 8X8, INC.'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF BEAR CREEK TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S FIRST SET OF REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION (NOS. 1-74) by 8x8, Inc..(Moore, David) (Entered: 06/04/2013)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                    NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant 8x8, Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-3); and Defendant 8x8, Inc.'s First Set of Requests for Production to Plaintiff Bear Creek Technologies, Inc. (Nos. 1-3) by 8x8, Inc..(Moore, David) (Entered: 06/04/2013)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 6/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                      NOTICE OF SERVICE of (i) Defendant Bright House Networks, LLC's Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Documents and Things (Nos. 1-74) and (ii) Defendant Bright House Networks, LLC's Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-13) by Bright House Networks LLC.(Farnan, Kelly) (Entered: 06/03/2013)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 6/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                        NOTICE OF SERVICE of (i) Defendant Time Warner Cable Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintif's First Set of Requests for Documents and Things (Nos. 1-74) and (ii) Defendant Time Warner Cable Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-13) by Time Warner Cable Inc..(Farnan, Kelly) (Entered: 06/03/2013)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 6/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                          NOTICE of Service of (i) Defendants Vonage Holdings Corp., Vonage America Inc., and Vonage Marketing LLC's Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Documents and Things (Nos. 1-74) and (ii) Defendants Vonage Holdings Corp., Vonage America Inc., and Vonage Marketing LLC's Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-13) by Vonage America Inc., Vonage Holdings Corporation, Vonage Marketing LLC (Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/03/2013)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 6/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                            NOTICE OF SERVICE of Charter's Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Documents and Things (Nos. 1-74) and Charter's Answers to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-13) by Charter Communications Inc..(Mayo, Andrew) (Entered: 06/03/2013)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 6/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                              NOTICE OF SERVICE of Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-13) and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Documents and Things (Nos. 1-74) by AT&T Corp., SBC Internet Services Inc..(Lydon, Tiffany) (Entered: 06/03/2013)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 6/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                NOTICE OF SERVICE of Mediacom's Answers to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-13) and Mediacom's Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Documents and Things (Nos. 1-74) by Mediacom Broadband LLC, Mediacom Communications Corporation.(Mayo, Andrew) (Entered: 06/03/2013)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 6/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Comcast Cable Communications, LLC's Responses to Bear Creek Technologies, Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-13); and (2) Comcast Cable Communications, LLC's Responses to Bear Creek Technologies, Inc.'s First Set of Requests for Production (Nos. 1-74) by Comcast Cable Communications LLC.(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 06/03/2013)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 6/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendant CSC Holdings, LLC's Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests For Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 1-74) and (2) Defendant CSC Holdings, LLC's Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-13) by CSC Holdings LLC.(Gaza, Anne) (Entered: 06/03/2013)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 6/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Primus Telecommunications Inc. and Lingo Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-13) and Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Documents and Things (Nos. 1-74) by Lingo Inc., Primus Telecommunications Inc..(Mayo, Andrew) (Entered: 06/03/2013)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 6/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant T-Mobile USA, Inc.'s Response and Objections to Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories(Nos. 1-13), and Response and Objection to Plaintiffs First Request for Documents and Things (Nos. 1-74) by T-Mobile USA Inc..(Smyth, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/03/2013)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 6/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          SO ORDERED, re (101 in 1:12-md-02344-GMS, 243 in 1:12-cv-00600-GMS, 45 in 1:11-cv-00726-GMS, 41 in 1:12-cv-00566-GMS, 390 in 1:12-cv-00568-GMS, 50 in 1:11-cv-00730-GMS, 40 in 1:11-cv-00722-GMS, 41 in 1:11-cv-00728-GMS, 42 in 1:11-cv-00724-GMS, 44 in 1:11-cv-00723-GMS, 74 in 1:12-cv-00565-GMS, 57 in 1:11-cv-00729-GMS, 46 in 1:11-cv-00721-GMS, 45 in 1:11-cv-00725-GMS, 46 in 1:11-cv-00727-GMS, 41 in 1:12-cv-00567-GMS) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to submit proposed protective order to June 12, 2013 filed by 8x8, Inc., Vonage America Inc., RCN Corporation, Mediacom Broadband LLC, Lingo Inc., Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc., AT&T Corp., Qwest Communications International Inc., Vonage Communications, Inc., CSC Holdings LLC, Bear Creek Technologies Inc. ('722) Patent Litigation, Charter Communications Inc., Cox Communications Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc., Vonage Holdings Corporation, Comcast Cable Communications LLC, Mediacom Communications Corporation, Vonage Marketing LLC, Verizon Services Corp., MCI Communications Services Inc., Cox Virginia Telecom LLC, Aptela Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Bright House Networks LLC, Primus Telecommunications Inc., Qwest Communications Company LLC. Signed by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 6/3/13. Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02344-GMS et al.(mmm) (Entered: 06/03/2013)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 5/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant CSC Holdings, LLC's First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff Bear Creek Technologies, Inc. (Nos. 1-5) by CSC Holdings LLC.(Gaza, Anne) (Entered: 05/30/2013)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to submit proposed protective order to June 12, 2013 - filed by 8x8, Inc., AT&T Corp., Aptela Inc., Bear Creek Technologies Inc. ('722) Patent Litigation, Bright House Networks LLC, CSC Holdings LLC, Charter Communications Inc., Comcast Cable Communications LLC, Cox Communications Inc., Cox Virginia Telecom LLC, Lingo Inc., MCI Communications Services Inc., Mediacom Broadband LLC, Mediacom Communications Corporation, Primus Telecommunications Inc., Qwest Communications Company LLC, Qwest Communications International Inc., RCN Corporation, SBC Internet Services Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc., Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Services Corp., Vonage America Inc., Vonage Communications, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corporation, Vonage Marketing LLC. (Day, John) (Entered: 05/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant CSC Holdings, LLC's First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff Bear Creek Technologies, Inc. (Nos. 1-5) by CSC Holdings LLC.(Gaza, Anne) (Entered: 05/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 5/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Comcast Cable Communications, LLC's First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-5) to Bear Creek Technologies, Inc. and (2) Comcast Cable Communications, LLC's First Set of Requests for Production (Nos. 1-62) to Bear Creek Technologies, Inc. by Comcast Cable Communications LLC, Comcast Cable Communications LLC.(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 05/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 5/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Amended Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Charter Communications Inc.. (Mayo, Andrew) (Entered: 05/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Time Warner Cable Inc.'s Disclosures Pursuant to Section 3 of the Delaware Default Standard for Discovery by Time Warner Cable Inc..(Farnan, Kelly) (Entered: 05/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Bright House Networks, LLC's Disclosures Pursuant to Section 3 of the Delaware Default Standard for Discovery by Bright House Networks LLC.(Farnan, Kelly) (Entered: 05/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 5/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF SERVICE of Bear Creek Technologies, Inc.'s Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Default Standard for Discovery, Including Discovery of Electronically Stored Information ("ESI") by Bear Creek Technologies Inc., Bear Creek Technologies Inc. ('722) Patent Litigation, Bear Creek Technologies Inc..(Troutner, Melissa) (Entered: 05/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 5/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Peter J. Faben as co-counsel. Reason for request: No longer employed with Cooley Manion Jones LLP. (Troutner, Melissa) (Entered: 05/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to submit protective order to May 29, 2013 - filed by 8x8, Inc., AT&T Corp., Aptela Inc., Bear Creek Technologies Inc., Bright House Networks LLC, CSC Holdings LLC, Charter Communications Inc., Comcast Cable Communications LLC, Comcast Corporation, Cox Communications Inc., Cox Virginia Telecom LLC, Lingo Inc., Mediacom Broadband LLC, Mediacom Communications Corporation, Primus Telecommunications Inc., Qwest Communications Company LLC, Qwest Communications International Inc., RCN Corporation, SBC Internet Services Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc., Vonage America Inc., Vonage Communications, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corporation, Vonage Marketing LLC. (Lydon, Tiffany) (Entered: 05/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF SERVICE of Comcast Cable Communications, LLC's Rule 26(A)(1) Initial Disclosures by Comcast Cable Communications LLC, Comcast Cable Communications LLC.(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 05/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Stacy S. Chen - filed by Comcast Cable Communications LLC, Comcast Cable Communications LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 05/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures of Defendants Primus Telecommunications, Inc. and Lingo, Inc. by Lingo Inc., Primus Telecommunications Inc..(Mayo, Andrew) (Entered: 05/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF SERVICE of Mediacom Communications Corporation and Mediacom Broadband, LLC's Initial Disclosures Pursuant to FRCP 26(a) by Mediacom Broadband LLC, Mediacom Communications Corporation.(Mayo, Andrew) (Entered: 05/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant CSC Holdings, LLC's First Set of Requests for Production to Plaintiff Bear Creek Technologies, Inc. (Nos. 1-60) by CSC Holdings LLC.(Rawnsley, Jason) (Entered: 05/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant RCN Corporation's Rule 26 Disclosures by RCN Corporation.(Seaman, John) (Entered: 05/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 5/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant T-Mobile USA, Inc.'s Disclosures pursuant to Federal Rule Civil Procedure 26(a)(1) and Amended Inital Disclosures by T-Mobile USA Inc..(Lipkin, Gary) (Entered: 05/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 5/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by T-Mobile USA Inc. identifying Corporate Parent T-Mobile US, Inc., Other Affiliate Deutsche Telekom AG, Other Affiliate T-Mobile Global Zwischenholding GmbH, Other Affiliate T Mobile Global Holding GmbH for T-Mobile USA Inc... (Lipkin, Gary) (Entered: 05/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 5/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF SERVICE of Bear Creek Technologies, Inc.'s Initial Disclosures by Bear Creek Technologies Inc., Bear Creek Technologies Inc. ('722) Patent Litigation, Bear Creek Technologies Inc..(Troutner, Melissa) (Entered: 05/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 5/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant 8x8 Inc.'s Initial Disclosures by 8x8, Inc..(Moore, David) (Entered: 05/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 5/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF SERVICE of Bright House Networks, LLC's Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosures by Bright House Networks LLC.(Farnan, Kelly) (Entered: 05/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 5/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF SERVICE of Time Warner Cable Inc.'s Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosures by Time Warner Cable Inc..(Farnan, Kelly) (Entered: 05/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 5/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Qwest Communications International, Inc. and Qwest Communications Company LLC's Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures by Qwest Communications Company LLC, Qwest Communications International Inc..(Hunter, Travis) (Entered: 05/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 5/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures by Charter Communications Inc..(Mayo, Andrew) (Entered: 05/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 5/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosures of Defendants Vonage Holdings Corp., Vonage America, Inc., and Vonage Marketing LLC Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) by Vonage America Inc., Vonage Holdings Corporation, Vonage Marketing LLC (Seitz, Collins) (Entered: 05/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 5/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendant CSC Holdings LLC's Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Default Standard For Discovery, Including Discovery of Electronically Stored Information ("ESI") and (2) Defendant CSC Holdings LLC's Initial Disclosures by CSC Holdings LLC.(Gaza, Anne) (Entered: 05/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 5/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants SBC Internet Services, Inc. and AT&T Corp.'s Initial Disclosures by AT&T Corp., SBC Internet Services Inc..(Lydon, Tiffany) (Entered: 05/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 4/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jim W. Fang - filed by Aptela Inc.. (Day, John) (Entered: 04/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 4/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Shane O. Sondreal of Crawford Maunu PLLC as co-counsel. Reason for request: no longer involved in this case. (Moore, David) (Entered: 04/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      SO ORDERED, re (66 in 1:12-md-02344-GMS, 44 in 1:11-cv-00729-GMS) Stipulation of Dismissal, filed by AT&T Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Bear Creek Technologies Inc., AT&T Teleholdings Inc. Signed by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 4/9/2013. Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02344-GMS, 1:11-cv-00729-GMS(asw) (Entered: 04/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 4/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to Motion re 71 MOTION for Leave to File a Sur-Reply in Opposition to the Moving Defendants' Motion to Stay Pending Reexamination filed by 8x8, Inc., AT&T Inc., AT&T Teleholdings Inc., Aptela Inc., Bright House Networks LLC, CSC Holdings LLC, Charter Communications Inc., Comcast Cable Communications LLC, Comcast Corporation, Cox Communications Inc., Cox Virginia Telecom LLC, Lingo Inc., MCI Communications Services Inc., Mediacom Broadband LLC, Mediacom Communications Corporation, Primus Telecommunications Inc., Qwest Communications Company LLC, Qwest Communications International Inc., RCN Corporation, T-Mobile USA Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc., Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Services Corp., Vonage America Inc., Vonage Communications, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corporation, Vonage Marketing LLC. (Day, John) (Entered: 04/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 4/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File a Sur-Reply in Opposition to the Moving Defendants' Motion to Stay Pending Reexamination - filed by Bear Creek Technologies Inc., Bear Creek Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Sur-Reply in Opposition to the Moving Defendants' Motion to Stay Pending Reexamination, # 2 Exhibit A-1, # 3 Exhibit A-2)(Bocchino, Amaryah) (Entered: 04/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 4/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            PROPOSED ORDER Granting Stay Pending Reexamination re 54 MOTION to Stay Pending Reexamination, 69 Reply Brief,,, by AT&T Inc., AT&T Teleholdings Inc., Bright House Networks LLC, CSC Holdings LLC, Charter Communications Inc., Comcast Cable Communications LLC, Comcast Corporation, Cox Communications Inc., Cox Virginia Telecom LLC, Media Broadcom, LLC, Mediacom Communications Corporation, Qwest Communications Company LLC, Qwest Communications International Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc., Vonage America Inc., Vonage Communications, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corporation, Vonage Marketing LLC. (Day, John) (Entered: 04/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 4/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY BRIEF re 54 MOTION to Stay Pending Reexamination filed by AT&T Inc., AT&T Teleholdings Inc., Bright House Networks LLC, CSC Holdings LLC, Charter Communications Inc., Comcast Cable Communications LLC, Comcast Corporation, Cox Communications Inc., Cox Virginia Telecom LLC, Mediacom Broadband LLC, Mediacom Communications Corporation, Qwest Communications Company LLC, Qwest Communications International Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc., Vonage America Inc., Vonage Communications, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corporation, Vonage Marketing LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 21, part 1, # 2 Exhibit 21, part 2, # 3 Exhibit 21, part 3, # 4 Exhibit 21, part 4, # 5 Exhibit 21, part 5, # 6 Exhibit 21, part 6, # 7 Exhibit 22)(Day, John) (Entered: 04/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                SO ORDERED, re (32 in 1:11-cv-00727-GMS, 33 in 1:12-cv-00566-GMS, 26 in 1:11-cv-00722-GMS, 31 in 1:11-cv-00723-GMS, 32 in 1:11-cv-00725-GMS, 63 in 1:12-cv-00565-GMS, 42 in 1:11-cv-00729-GMS, 381 in 1:12-cv-00568-GMS, 237 in 1:12-cv-00600-GMS, 32 in 1:12-cv-00567-GMS, 64 in 1:12-md-02344-GMS, 34 in 1:11-cv-00730-GMS, 31 in 1:11-cv-00728-GMS, 31 in 1:11-cv-00721-GMS, 27 in 1:11-cv-00724-GMS, 32 in 1:11-cv-00726-GMS) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to file reply brief on motion for stay to April 4, 2013 filed by 8x8, Inc., Vonage America Inc., RCN Corporation, Comcast Corporation, Mediacom Broadband LLC, Lingo Inc., Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc., Qwest Communications International Inc., Vonage Communications, Inc., CSC Holdings LLC, Bear Creek Technologies Inc. ('722) Patent Litigation, Charter Communications Inc., Cox Communications Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc., Vonage Holdings Corporation, Comcast Cable Communications LLC, Mediacom Communications Corporation, Vonage Marketing LLC, Verizon Services Corp., AT&T Teleholdings Inc., MCI Communications Services Inc., Cox Virginia Telecom LLC, Aptela Inc., AT&T Inc., Bright House Networks LLC, Primus Telecommunications Inc., Qwest Communications Company LLC. Signed by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 4/2/2013. Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02344-GMS et al.(asw) (Entered: 04/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 3/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Scheduling Order - filed by Bear Creek Technologies Inc., Bear Creek Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Letter to Judge Sleet)(Troutner, Melissa) (Entered: 03/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Defendants AT&T Inc. and AT&T Teleholdings, Inc. and Substitution of AT&T Corp. in Place of Said Entities by AT&T Inc., AT&T Teleholdings Inc., Bear Creek Technologies Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc.. (Day, John) (Entered: 03/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa L. Troutner on behalf of Bear Creek Technologies Inc. (Troutner, Melissa) (Entered: 03/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to file reply brief on motion for stay to April 4, 2013 - filed by 8x8, Inc., AT&T Inc., AT&T Teleholdings Inc., Aptela Inc., Bear Creek Technologies Inc. ('722) Patent Litigation, Bright House Networks LLC, CSC Holdings LLC, Charter Communications Inc., Comcast Cable Communications LLC, Comcast Corporation, Cox Communications Inc., Cox Virginia Telecom LLC, Lingo Inc., MCI Communications Services Inc., Mediacom Broadband LLC, Mediacom Communications Corporation, Primus Telecommunications Inc., Qwest Communications Company LLC, Qwest Communications International Inc., RCN Corporation, T-Mobile USA Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc., Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Services Corp., Vonage America Inc., Vonage Communications, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corporation, Vonage Marketing LLC. (Day, John) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 3/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Official Transcript of Conference held on 03/19/13 before Judge Sleet. Court Reporter/Transcriber Maurer. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/12/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/22/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/20/2013. (kjm) (Entered: 03/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 54 MOTION to Stay Pending Reexamination filed by Bear Creek Technologies Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 3/28/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Faben, Peter) (Entered: 03/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Amaryah K. Bocchino on behalf of Bear Creek Technologies Inc. (Bocchino, Amaryah) (Entered: 03/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 3/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney M. Andrew Holtman - filed by MCI Communications Services Inc., Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Services Corp.. (Day, John) (Entered: 03/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 3/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint STATUS REPORT by Bear Creek Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Bear Creek's Proposed Scheduling Order, # 2 Exhibit B - Defendants' Proposed Scheduling Order)(Faben, Peter) (Entered: 03/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Appoint Counsel as Lead and Liaison Counsel for Bear Creek Technologies, Inc. - filed by Bear Creek Technologies Inc.. (Faben, Peter) (Entered: 03/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by John G. Day on behalf of MCI Communications Services Inc., Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Services Corp. (Day, John) (Entered: 03/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        JOINDER by Comcast Cable Communications LLC, Comcast Cable Communications LLC, joining in (54 in 1:12-md-02344-GMS, 54 in 1:12-md-02344-GMS) Motion to Stay,, . (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 03/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OPENING BRIEF in Support re 54 MOTION to Stay Pending Reexamination filed by AT&T Inc., AT&T Teleholdings Inc., Bright House Networks LLC, CSC Holdings LLC, Charter Communications Inc., Cox Communications Inc., Cox Virginia Telecom LLC, Media Broadcom, LLC, Mediacom Broadband LLC, Mediacom Communications Corporation, Qwest Communications Company LLC, Qwest Communications International Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc., Vonage America Inc., Vonage Communications, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corporation, Vonage Marketing LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 3/18/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20)(Day, John) (Entered: 03/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Stay Pending Reexamination - filed by AT&T Inc., AT&T Teleholdings Inc., Bright House Networks LLC, CSC Holdings LLC, Charter Communications Inc., Cox Communications Inc., Cox Virginia Telecom LLC, Mediacom Broadband LLC, Mediacom Communications Corporation, Qwest Communications Company LLC, Qwest Communications International Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc., Vonage America Inc., Vonage Communications, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corporation, Vonage Marketing LLC. (Day, John) (Entered: 03/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 2/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David Soofian of Kaye Scholer LLP - filed by Bright House Networks LLC, Time Warner Cable Inc.. (Farnan, Kelly) (Entered: 02/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 2/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Dan Leventhal - filed by AT&T Inc., AT&T Teleholdings Inc., Bear Creek Technologies Inc. ('722) Patent Litigation, SBC Internet Services Inc., Bear Creek Technologies Inc.. (Mayo, Andrew) (Entered: 02/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Appoint Counsel (Defendants' Submission with Respect to the Appointment of Lead and Liaison Counsel) - filed by 8x8, Inc., AT&T Inc., AT&T Teleholdings Inc., Aptela Inc., Bright House Networks LLC, CSC Holdings LLC, Charter Communications Inc., Comcast Cable Communications LLC, Cox Communications Inc., Cox Virginia Telecom LLC, Lingo Inc., MCI Communications Services Inc., Mediacom Communications Corporation, Primus Telecommunications Inc., Qwest Communications Company LLC, Qwest Communications International Inc., RCN Corporation, SBC Internet Services Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc., Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Services Corp., Vonage America Inc., Vonage Holdings Corporation, Vonage Marketing LLC, Media Broadcom, LLC, Comcast Corporation, Vonage Communications, Inc.. (Mayo, Andrew) (Entered: 02/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Steven J. Balick on behalf of Lingo Inc., Primus Telecommunications Inc. (Balick, Steven) (Entered: 02/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Natalie Alfaro and Robinson Vu - filed by Mediacom Broadband LLC, Mediacom Communications Corporation. (Mayo, Andrew) (Entered: 01/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order Setting Scheduling Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 3/19/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4A before Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet. On or before the close of business on 3/12/13, counsel shall file a Joint Status Report addressing each agenda item as therein set forth. Signed by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 1/22/13. (mmm) (Entered: 01/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by CSC Holdings LLC identifying Corporate Parent Cablevision Systems Corporation for CSC Holdings LLC, CSC Holdings LLC.. (Gaza, Anne) (Entered: 12/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Miriam L. Quinn as co-counsel.. (Lydon, Tiffany) (Entered: 11/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to 39 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Bear Creek Technologies Inc..(Faben, Peter) (Entered: 11/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY BRIEF in Opposition to Defendant's "Motion to Supplement Record" Reply Brief filed by Bear Creek Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Miele, Anthony) (Entered: 11/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to Complaint Counterclaims of Defendants Vonage Holding Corp., Vonage America, Inc., and Vonage Marketing LLC by Bear Creek Technologies Inc..(Faben, Peter) (Entered: 11/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 33 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant 8x8, Inc. by Bear Creek Technologies Inc..(Faben, Peter) (Entered: 11/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to 32 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendants Mediacom Communications Corp. and Mediacom Broadband, LLC by Bear Creek Technologies Inc..(Faben, Peter) (Entered: 11/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to 29 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendants Qwest Communications Int'l Inc. and Qwest Communications Co., LLC by Bear Creek Technologies Inc..(Faben, Peter) (Entered: 11/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Bear Creek Technologies Inc. ('722) Patent Litigation by SBC Internet Services Inc..(Lydon, Tiffany) (Entered: 11/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 11/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by AT&T Teleholdings Inc..(Lydon, Tiffany) (Entered: 11/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by AT&T Inc..(Lydon, Tiffany) (Entered: 11/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY BRIEF Motion to Supplement Record of Motion to Dismiss filed by RCN Telecom Services LLC. (Seaman, John) (Main Document 36 replaced on 10/22/2012) (maw). (Entered: 10/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by John M. Seaman on behalf of RCN Telecom Services LLC (Seaman, John) (Main Document 35 replaced on 10/22/2012) (maw). (Entered: 10/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Barbara L. Moore - filed by Bear Creek Technologies Inc.. (Faben, Peter) (Entered: 10/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , COUNTERCLAIM against Bear Creek Technologies Inc. ('722) Patent Litigation by 8x8, Inc..(Moore, David) (Entered: 10/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Bear Creek Technologies Inc. ('722) Patent Litigation by Mediacom Communications Corporation, Mediacom Broadband LLC.(Mayo, Andrew) (Entered: 10/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand to T-Mobile USA, Inc.'s Counterclaims by Bear Creek Technologies Inc..(Faben, Peter) (Entered: 10/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer complaint to November 1, 2012 - filed by AT&T Inc., AT&T Teleholdings Inc., Bear Creek Technologies Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc.. (Lydon, Tiffany) (Entered: 10/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Bear Creek Technologies Inc. ('722) Patent Litigation by Qwest Communications International Inc., Qwest Communications Company LLC.(Hunter, Travis) (Entered: 10/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying (12) Motion to Strike in case 1:11-cv-00727-GMS. Signed by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 9/27/2012. (asw) (Entered: 09/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying (13) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:11-cv-00723-GMS; denying (10) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:11-cv-00725-GMS; denying (9) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:11-cv-00728-GMS; denying (12) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:11-cv-00729-GMS. Signed by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 9/27/2012. Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02344-GMS, 1:11-cv-00723-GMS, 1:11-cv-00725-GMS, 1:11-cv-00728-GMS, 1:11-cv-00729-GMS(asw) (Entered: 09/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/26/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying (13) Motion for More Definite Statement in case 1:11-cv-00726-GMS. Signed by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 9/26/12. Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02344-GMS, 1:11-cv-00726-GMS(mmm) (Entered: 09/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Withdrawal Patrick M. Callahan by Vonage America Inc., Vonage Holdings Corporation, Vonage Marketing LLC (Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/25/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying (17) Motion for Protective Order in case 1:12-md-02344-GMS; denying (222) Motion for Protective Order in case 1:12-cv-00600-GMS. Signed by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 7/25/2012. (asw) (Entered: 07/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/25/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter to the Honorable Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet from Anthony L. Miele regarding response to Mr. Moore's 7/24/12 letter on behalf of 8x8 - re 22 Letter. (Miele, Anthony) (Entered: 07/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter to The Honorable Gregory M. Sleet from David E. Moore, Esquire regarding clarification - re Oral Order,. (Moore, David) (Entered: 07/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re 17 Amended MOTION for Protective Order Exemption (Verizon) filed by Bear Creek Technologies Inc., Bear Creek Technologies Inc. ('722) Patent Litigation. (Miele, Anthony) (Entered: 07/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 17 Amended MOTION for Protective Order Exemption (Verizon) filed by MCI Communications Services Inc., Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Services Corp..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 8/2/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Rash, Charles) (Entered: 07/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/11/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter to the Honorable Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet from Anthony L. Miele regarding Request for an Expedited Hearing - re 17 Amended MOTION for Protective Order Exemption (Verizon). (Miele, Anthony) (Entered: 07/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    OPENING BRIEF in Support re 17 Amended MOTION for Protective Order Exemption (Verizon) filed by Bear Creek Technologies Inc., Bear Creek Technologies Inc. ('722) Patent Litigation.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 7/27/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Anthony L. Miele)(Miele, Anthony) (Entered: 07/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Amended MOTION for Protective Order Exemption (Verizon) - filed by Bear Creek Technologies Inc., Bear Creek Technologies Inc. ('722) Patent Litigation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Rule 7.1.1 Statement)(Miele, Anthony) (Entered: 07/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying (10) Motion for Protective Order in case 1:12-md-02344-GMS; denying (215) Motion for Protective Order in case 1:12-cv-00600-GMS. The teleconference scheduled for Friday, July 6, 2012, at 11:30 a.m. is hereby CANCELED. Signed by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 7/5/12. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-00600-GMS, 1:12-md-02344-GMS(mmm) (Entered: 07/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter to the Honorable Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet from Anthony L. Miele - re Oral Order,,,. (Miele, Anthony) (Entered: 07/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 10 MOTION for Protective Order Modification Related to Verizon filed by MCI Communications Services Inc., Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Services Corp..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 7/12/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11)(Rash, Charles) (Entered: 07/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jonathan G. Graves and Phillip E. Morton - filed by Qwest Communications Company LLC, Qwest Communications International Inc.. (Hunter, Travis) (Entered: 06/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter to Honorable Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet from Anthony L. Miele regarding Request for an Expedited Hearing - re 10 MOTION for Protective Order Modification Related to Verizon, 11 Opening Brief in Support,. (Miele, Anthony) (Entered: 06/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OPENING BRIEF in Support re 10 MOTION for Protective Order Modification Related to Verizon filed by Bear Creek Technologies Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 7/2/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Miele, Anthony) (Entered: 06/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Protective Order Modification Related to Verizon - filed by Bear Creek Technologies Inc.. (Miele, Anthony) (Entered: 06/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Nathan Speed as co-counsel. Reason for request: Attorney is leaving Firm. (Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 05/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Patrick M. Callahan and Sean K. Thompson - filed by Vonage America Inc., Vonage Holdings Corporation, Vonage Marketing LLC. (Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 05/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Samuel Lonergan - filed by Bright House Networks LLC, Time Warner Cable Inc.. (Farnan, Kelly) (Entered: 05/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter to Clerk USDC/ED/VA from Clerk USDC/DE regarding regarding transfer of case to District of Delaware - re 5 Order. (dzs, ) (Entered: 05/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring the following cases to the District of Delaware: ED/VA 1:11-cv-00880-TSE-JFA. (dzs, ) (Entered: 05/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter to Clerk USDC/ND/GA from Clerk USDC/DE regarding transfer of case to District of Delaware - re 1 Order,. (dzs, ) (Entered: 05/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter to Clerk USDC/ED/VA from Clerk USDC/DE regarding transfer of cases to District of Delaware - re 1 Order,. (dzs, ) Modified on 5/3/2012 (dzs, ). (Entered: 05/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE TO COUNSEL: MDL No. 1:12-md-2344 has been opened and assigned to the Honorable Gregory M. Sleet. Attorneys of record who will be electronically filing documents may use the attached form to register for a CM/ECF login and password. Please see the docket for further entries. Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02344-GMS et al.(dzs, ) (Entered: 05/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSFER ORDER from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring the following cases to the District of Delaware: ND/GA 1:11-cv-03784; ED/VA 2:11-cv-00103; ED/VA 2:11-cv-00460; ED/VA 2:11-cv-00461. Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02344; 1:11-cv-00721 through 1:11-cv-00730.(dzs, ) (Entered: 05/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 90 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?