Execware LLC v. AT&T Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Delaware District Court, Case No. 1:14-cv-00229
District Judge Leonard P. Stark, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 15, 2017 at 8:27 PM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Execware, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bayard, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen B. Brauerman +1 302 429 4232 +1 302 658 6395 sbrauerman@bayardlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sara E. Bussiere +1 302 429 4230 sbussiere@bayardlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard D. Kirk +1 302 429 4208 +1 302 658 6395 rkirk@bayardlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Vanessa Ribeiro Tiradentes +1 302 429 4228 vtiradentes@bayardlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Califf T. Cooper

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/11/2016, PRO HAC VICE Califf T. Cooper

Toggle Switch Represented by Larry D. Thompson , Jr.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Larry D. Thompson, Jr.

Toggle Switch Represented by Matthew J. Antonelli

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew J. Antonelli

Toggle Switch Represented by Peter J. Corcoran

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/19/2014, PRO HAC VICE Peter J. Corcoran

Toggle Switch Represented by Zachariah S. Harrington

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Zachariah S. Harrington
v.
AT&T, Inc. AT&T, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Ncr Corp
Unknown Role, At Home Corp
Unknown Role, Net2phone, Inc.
Unknown Role, Mail.com, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Daniel S. Leventhal

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel S. Leventhal

Toggle Switch Represented by Joseph P. Zammit

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph P. Zammit

Toggle Switch Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack B. Blumenfeld +1 302 658 9200 jbbefiling@mnat.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karen Jacobs +1 302 658 9200 kjacobs@mnat.com
AT&T Mobility LLC AT&T Mobility LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack B. Blumenfeld +1 302 658 9200 jbbefiling@mnat.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karen Jacobs +1 302 658 9200 kjacobs@mnat.com
AT&T Services, Inc. AT&T Services, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack B. Blumenfeld +1 302 658 9200 jbbefiling@mnat.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael J. Flynn +1 302 351 9661 +1 302 498 6217 mflynn@mnat.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karen Jacobs +1 302 658 9200 kjacobs@mnat.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (41) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/12/2016, Entered: None
Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,216,139. (ntl) (Entered: 02/12/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/12/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER re 38 Joint MOTION to Dismiss filed by Execware LLC, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/12/16. (ntl) (Entered: 02/12/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/10/2016, Entered: None
      NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Califf Cooper as co-counsel.. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 02/10/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/10/2016, Entered: None
        Joint MOTION to Dismiss - filed by Execware LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 02/10/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/26/2016, Entered: None
          NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant AT&T Services, Inc.'s Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) filed by AT&T Services Inc..(Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 01/26/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/26/2016, Entered: None
            NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) PLAINTIFF EXECWARE, LLC'S INITIAL DISCLOSURES; and (2) this NOTICE OF SERVICE filed by Execware LLC.(Bussiere, Sara) (Entered: 01/26/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/21/2016, Entered: None
              PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY, INCLUDING DISCOVERY OF ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION (ESI) by Execware LLC. (Tiradentes, Vanessa) (Entered: 01/21/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/14/2016, Entered: None
                STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to submit a joint proposal regarding the scope and schedule of production of ESI to January 21, 2016 - filed by OfficeMax North America Inc.. (Lydon, Tiffany) (Entered: 01/14/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/6/2016, Entered: None
                  NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) EXECWARE, LLC'S AMENDED DISCLOSURES PURSUANT TO SECTION 8(a); and (2) this NOTICE OF SERVICE filed by Execware LLC.(Tiradentes, Vanessa) (Entered: 01/06/2016)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/6/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORAL ORDER: On or before January 20, 2016, each party or each party group shallemail to Chief Magistrate Judge Thynge, with a copy to her Judicial Administrator, Cathleen Kennedy, the information requested in the attached Order. Ordered by Judge Thynge on 1/6/16. (Attachments: # 1 Order Requesting Information re: ADR) Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00229-LPS et al.(cak) (Entered: 01/06/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/5/2016, Entered: None
                      NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Execware, LLC's Disclosures Pursuant to Section 8(a); and (2) this Notice of Service filed by Execware LLC.(Bussiere, Sara) (Entered: 01/05/2016)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/16/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                        SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. Discovery due by 3/16/2017. Status Report due by 12/14/2016. Dispositive Motions due by 7/31/2017. An Oral Argument is set for 9/26/2017 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 6B before Judge Leonard P. Stark. A Status and Trial Scheduling Teleconference is set for 10/27/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Claim Construction Opening Brief due by 9/12/2016. Claim Construction Answering Brief due by 10/3/2016. A Markman Hearing is set for 10/31/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6B before Judge Leonard P. Stark. A Final Pretrial Conference is set for 12/8/2017 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 6B before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/28/2017. A 5-day Jury Trial is set for 1/8/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6B before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/15/15. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00229-LPS et al. (ntl) (Entered: 12/16/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                          Official Transcript of Case Management Conference held on December 4, 2015 before Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/5/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/15/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/14/2016.(bpg) (Entered: 12/15/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/11/2015, Entered: None
                            PROPOSED ORDER / [Proposed] Scheduling Order by Execware LLC. (Tiradentes, Vanessa) (Entered: 12/11/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/25/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ORAL ORDER: Regarding the letter request for various counsel to participate telephonically at the Case Management Conference, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the requests are GRANTED. Counsel for Best Buy shall initiate the call to (302) 573-4573. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/25/15. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00229-LPS et al. (ntl) (Entered: 11/25/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/25/2015, Entered: None
                                Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Samantha G. Wilson regarding Defendant BestBuy.com, LLC's request for telephonic participation by pro hac vice counsel in the December 4, 2015 Case Management Conference - re (21 in 1:14-cv-00237-LPS, 17 in 1:14-cv-00230-LPS, 21 in 1:14-cv-00245-LPS, 19 in 1:14-cv-00232-LPS, 34 in 1:14-cv-00240-LPS, 24 in 1:14-cv-00242-LPS, 25 in 1:14-cv-00235-LPS, 22 in 1:14-cv-00246-LPS, 32 in 1:14-cv-00234-LPS, 25 in 1:14-cv-00229-LPS, 18 in 1:14-cv-00239-LPS, 31 in 1:14-cv-00233-LPS, 23 in 1:14-cv-00243-LPS) Order Setting Scheduling Conference,. (Wilson, Samantha) (Entered: 11/25/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/17/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Court will hold a Case Management Conference in Courtroom 6B on December 4, 2015 at 1:30 p.m. No further submissions are needed. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/17/15. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00229-LPS et al. (ntl) (Entered: 11/17/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: None
                                    PROPOSED ORDER / [Proposed] Scheduling Order by Execware LLC. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 11/02/2015)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: None
                                      Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Stephen B. Brauerman, Esquire regarding Proposed Scheduling Order and Checklist Pursuant to the Courts October 2, 2015 Order. (Attachments: # 1 Joint Case Management Checklist)(Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 11/02/2015)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: None
                                        Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent AT&T Inc. for AT&T Services Inc. filed by AT&T Services Inc.. (Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 10/14/2015)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: None
                                          ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by AT&T Services Inc..(Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 10/14/2015)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: None
                                            STIPULATION of Dismissal and [Proposed] Order by AT&T Inc., AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services Inc.. (Jacobs, Karen) (Entered: 10/07/2015)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/2/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and discuss, in person and/or by telephone, each of the matters listed on Chief Judge Stark's Case Management Checklist ("Checklist"). Within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order, the parties shall jointly file the following: (i) a copy of the "Checklist" indicating the names of Lead Counsel and Delaware Counsel for each party; (ii) a proposed Scheduling Order (consistent with the Chief Judge Stark's Revised Patent Form Scheduling Order); and (iii) a letter, not to exceed three pages, that contains the following: (a) a description of what this case is about; (b) the parties' positions regarding the disputes in the proposed Scheduling Order, and (c) a list of the three most significant topics (other than Scheduling Order disputes) discussed during the parties' review of the Checklist items, along with a brief description as to what was discussed as to those topics. Thereafter, the Court will schedule an in-person Case Management Conference/Rule 16 Scheduling Conference to be held with Judge Stark. The Checklist and Revised Patent Form Scheduling Order can be found on this Court's website (www.ded.uscourts.gov/judge/chief-judge-leonard-p-stark). ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/2/15. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00229-LPS et al. (ntl) (Entered: 10/02/2015)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/30/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, for the reasons discussed in the Court's Memorandum Order in the related cases, see Execware v. BJ's Wholesale Club Inc. (C.A. No. 14-233 D.I. 27), Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (C.A. 14-229 D.I. 13; C.A. 14-243 D.I. 12; C.A. 14-246 D.I. 11) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Any renewed motion arguing patent ineligibility under 35 U.S.C. § 101 shall be filed as a summary judgment motion only after claim construction and discovery. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/30/15. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00229-LPS, 1:14-cv-00243-LPS, 1:14-cv-00246-LPS (ntl) (Entered: 09/30/2015)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE of Change of Address by Sara E. Bussiere (Bussiere, Sara) (Entered: 09/05/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                    REPLY BRIEF re 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by AT&T Inc., AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A and B)(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/19/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                      ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Execware LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 6/19/2014. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 06/09/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                        OPENING BRIEF in Support re 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by AT&T Inc., AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/9/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-6)(Jacobs, Karen) (Entered: 05/21/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                          MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by AT&T Inc., AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services Inc.. (Jacobs, Karen) (Entered: 05/21/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                            MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Califf T. Cooper - filed by Execware LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Califf T. Cooper)(Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 05/19/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Peter J. Corcoran, III as co-counsel.. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 05/19/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Richard S. Zembek, Daniel Scott Leventhal, Dan D. Davison and Joseph P. Zammit - filed by AT&T Inc., AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services Inc.. (Jacobs, Karen) (Entered: 04/16/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                  Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Complaint to May 21, 2014 - filed by AT&T Inc., AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services Inc.. (Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 04/15/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                    Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint to April 21, 2014 - filed by AT&T Inc., AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 03/07/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                      MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Zachariah S. Harrington, Matthew J. Antonelli, Larry D. Thompson, Jr., and Peter J. Corcoran, III - filed by Execware LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Zachariah S. Harrington, # 2 Certification of Matthew J. Antonelli, # 3 Certification of Larry D. Thompson, Jr., # 4 Certification of Peter J. Corcoran, III)(Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by Execware LLC. AT&T Mobility LLC served on 2/25/2014, answer due 3/18/2014. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by Execware LLC. AT&T Services Inc. served on 2/25/2014, answer due 3/18/2014. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by Execware LLC. AT&T Inc. served on 2/25/2014, answer due 3/18/2014. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                              Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,216,139;. (cla, ) (Entered: 02/24/2014)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (cla, ) (Entered: 02/24/2014)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                  COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against AT&T Inc., AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-1466204.) - filed by Execware LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(cla, ) (Entered: 02/24/2014)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                    This case has been viewed 117 times.

                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                    Space
                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                     
                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                    Need Password Help?