Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. et al v. Impax Laboratories Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Delaware District Court, Case No. 1:14-cv-01384
District Judge Richard G. Andrews, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 2, 2017 at 3:47 PM EST (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Blake B. Greene

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Blake B. Greene

Toggle Switch Represented by Harmon, Edward

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/20/2015 Julia Heaney +1 302 658 9200

Toggle Switch Represented by Joseph J. Gribbin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph J. Gribbin

Toggle Switch Represented by Julie Latsko

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julie Latsko

Toggle Switch Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack B. Blumenfeld +1 302 658 9200 jbbefiling@mnat.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen J. Kraftschik +1 302 351 9378 skraftschik@mnat.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sharon K. Gagliardi

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sharon K. Gagliardi
Mallinckrodt LLC Mallinckrodt LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Harmon, Edward

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/20/2015 Julia Heaney +1 302 658 9200

Toggle Switch Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack B. Blumenfeld +1 302 658 9200 jbbefiling@mnat.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen J. Kraftschik +1 302 351 9378 skraftschik@mnat.com
No Logo Impax Laboratories, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Phillips, Goldman & Spence, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Megan C. Haney +1 302 655 4200 mch@pgslaw.com
No Logo ThoRx Laboratories Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Phillips, Goldman & Spence, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Megan C. Haney +1 302 655 4200 mch@pgslaw.com
v.
No Logo Impax Laboratories, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kevin E. Warner

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin E. Warner

Toggle Switch Represented by Lesley M. Hamming

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/26/2016, PRO HAC VICE Lesley M. Hamming

Toggle Switch Represented by Maureen L. Rurka

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Maureen L. Rurka

Toggle Switch Represented by Phillips, Goldman & Spence, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A. Bilson +1 302 655 4200 +1 302 655 4210 dab@pgslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Megan C. Haney +1 302 655 4200 mch@pgslaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John C. Phillips, Jr. +1 302 655 4200 +1 302 655 4210 jcp@pgslaw.com
No Logo ThoRx Laboratories Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Phillips, Goldman & Spence, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A. Bilson +1 302 655 4200 +1 302 655 4210 dab@pgslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Megan C. Haney +1 302 655 4200 mch@pgslaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John C. Phillips, Jr. +1 302 655 4200 +1 302 655 4210 jcp@pgslaw.com
No Logo Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Harmon, Edward

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/20/2015 Julia Heaney +1 302 658 9200

Toggle Switch Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack B. Blumenfeld +1 302 658 9200 jbbefiling@mnat.com
Mallinckrodt LLC Mallinckrodt LLC, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Harmon, Edward

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/20/2015 Julia Heaney +1 302 658 9200

Toggle Switch Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack B. Blumenfeld +1 302 658 9200 jbbefiling@mnat.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (99) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 2/26/2016, Entered: None
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Endo's Second Supplemental Response and Objections to Defendants' Joint Interrogatory No. 1 filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 02/26/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 2/26/2016, Entered: None
    NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Lesley M. Hamming as co-counsel. Reason for request: No Longer Affiliated with Winston & Strawn LLP. (Haney, Megan) (Entered: 02/26/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 2/14/2016, Entered: None
      NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Mallinckodt LLC's First Supplemental Responses and Objections to Defendants' First Set of Joint Interrogatories (Nos. 1-2, 4, 6, 8-9); and (2) Endo's Second Supplemental Responses and Objections to Defendants' First Set of Joint Interrogatories (Nos. 2, 4, 6) filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC.(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 02/14/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 2/5/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
        PARTIAL JUDGMENT (see Judgment for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/5/2016. (nms) (Entered: 02/05/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 2/5/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
          SO ORDERED, re 94 Stipulation and Order Dismissing Endo's Claim for Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 8,808,737 and Requesting Entry of Partial Judgment. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/5/2016. (nms) (Entered: 02/05/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 2/4/2016, Entered: None
            STIPULATION of Dismissal of Infringement Claims ('737 Patent) and Entry of Partial Judgment, by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC. (Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 2/5/2016 (nms). (Entered: 02/04/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 2/3/2016, Entered: None
              NOTICE OF SERVICE of Endo's First Supplemental Responses and Objections to Defendants' First Set of Joint Interrogatories (Nos. 12, 4, 6, 8-9) filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 02/03/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: None
                NOTICE of Subpoenas to Siegfried USA, LLC by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 01/29/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 1/26/2016, Entered: None
                  NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Amended Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(A) filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 01/26/2016)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 1/12/2016, Entered: None
                    REDACTED VERSION of 89 Letter, by Impax Laboratories Inc., ThoRx Laboratories Inc., Impax Laboratories Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A)(Phillips, John) Modified on 1/12/2016 (nms). (Entered: 01/12/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 1/5/2016, Entered: None
                      [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from John C. Phillips, Jr. regarding Defendant Impax's Response to Plaintiffs' December 21, 2015 Letter. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A)(Phillips, John) Modified on 1/6/2016 (nms). (Entered: 01/05/2016)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 12/28/2015, Entered: None
                        REDACTED VERSION of 86 Letter, by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC. (Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 1/4/2016 (nms). (Entered: 12/28/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 12/28/2015, Entered: None
                          REDACTED VERSION of 85 Letter, by Impax Laboratories Inc., ThoRx Laboratories Inc., Impax Laboratories Inc.. (Phillips, John) Modified on 1/4/2016 (nms). (Entered: 12/28/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 12/21/2015, Entered: None
                            [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding response to Defendants' letters dated 12/17/2015. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 12/21/2015 (nms). (Entered: 12/21/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 12/17/2015, Entered: None
                              [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from John C. Phillips, Jr. regarding Impax's Response to the Court's Request During the December 3 Hearing on the Motion to Stay. (Phillips, John) (Entered: 12/17/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 12/10/2015, Entered: None
                                NOTICE OF SERVICE of Impax and ThoRx's Supplemental Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories to Defendants (No. 5 and 6) filed by Impax Laboratories Inc., ThoRx Laboratories Inc..(Haney, Megan) (Entered: 12/10/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 12/6/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  Official Transcript of Defendants' Motion to Stay Proceedings held on 12-03-15 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/28/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/6/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/7/2016. (lad) (Entered: 12/06/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 12/3/2015, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Admission (Nos. 1-10) filed by Impax Laboratories Inc., ThoRx Laboratories Inc..(Haney, Megan) (Entered: 12/03/2015)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 11/4/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ORAL ORDER: Per the parties advisement and request "that no terms of the patents-in-suit require construction," the Markman Hearing scheduled for 3/23/2016, is now CANCELED. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/4/2015. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-01381-RGA, 1:14-cv-01383-RGA, 1:14-cv-01384-RGA, 1:14-cv-01386-RGA, 1:14-cv-01387-RGA(nms) (Entered: 11/04/2015)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: None
                                        Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Stephen J. Kraftschik on behalf of all parties regarding claim construction - re (42 in 1:14-cv-01384-RGA, 34 in 1:14-cv-01387-RGA, 41 in 1:14-cv-01383-RGA, 44 in 1:14-cv-01386-RGA, 30 in 1:14-cv-01381-RGA) Scheduling Order,,. (Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 11/03/2015)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 10/28/2015, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Admission to Defendants filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC.(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 10/28/2015)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 10/27/2015, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Impax's and ThoRx Laboratories, Inc.'s Proposed Terms for Construction filed by Impax Laboratories Inc., ThoRx Laboratories Inc., Impax Laboratories Inc..(Haney, Megan) (Entered: 10/27/2015)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 10/26/2015, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' List of Proposed Terms for Construction filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC.(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 10/26/2015)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 10/26/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ORAL ORDER: Oral argument on the MOTION to Stay Proceedings is set for 12/3/2015, at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/26/2015. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-01384-RGA, 1:14-cv-01383-RGA, 1:14-cv-01386-RGA, 1:14-cv-01387-RGA(nms) (Entered: 10/26/2015)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 10/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                  MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Scott R. Samay - filed by Impax Laboratories Inc., ThoRx Laboratories Inc., Impax Laboratories Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Scott R. Samay)(Haney, Megan) (Entered: 10/22/2015)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 10/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Impax and ThoRx's Initial Invalidity Contentions filed by Impax Laboratories Inc., ThoRx Laboratories Inc., Impax Laboratories Inc..(Haney, Megan) (Entered: 10/16/2015)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 10/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                      DECLARATION of Myoka Kim Goodin re 72 Reply Brief, by Impax Laboratories Inc., ThoRx Laboratories Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Certificate of Service)(Phillips, John) Modified on 10/19/2015 (nms). (Entered: 10/16/2015)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 10/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                        REPLY BRIEF re 64 MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by Impax Laboratories Inc., ThoRx Laboratories Inc.. (Phillips, John) (Entered: 10/16/2015)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 10/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                          DECLARATION of Blake B. Greene re 70 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 10/6/2015 (nms). (Entered: 10/05/2015)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 10/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                            ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 64 MOTION to Stay, filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 10/16/2015. (Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 10/6/2015 (nms). (Entered: 10/05/2015)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 10/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Impax and ThoRx's Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' Second Set of Requests for Documents and Things (Nos. 126-133) filed by Impax Laboratories Inc., ThoRx Laboratories Inc..(Haney, Megan) (Entered: 10/01/2015)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 9/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Substantial Completion of Document Production to October 16, 2015 - filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC. (Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 9/28/2015 (nms). (Entered: 09/28/2015)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 9/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                  STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Invalidity Contentions to October 16, 2015 - filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC. (Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 9/28/2015 (nms). (Entered: 09/28/2015)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                                    7.1.1 Certification re 65 Opening Brief in Support, by Impax Laboratories Inc., ThoRx Laboratories Inc., Impax Laboratories Inc.. (Phillips, John) Modified on 9/21/2015 (nms). (Entered: 09/18/2015)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                                      OPENING BRIEF in Support re 64 MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by Impax Laboratories Inc., ThoRx Laboratories Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/5/2015. (Phillips, John) (Entered: 09/18/2015)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                                        MOTION to Stay Proceedings - filed by Impax Laboratories Inc., ThoRx Laboratories Inc., Impax Laboratories Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Phillips, John) Modified on 9/21/2015 (nms). (Entered: 09/18/2015)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          ORDER: The Plaintiffs' request to change the schedule as to Amneal and Teva is DENIED. The suggestion of the remaining defendants for a stay will be considered if it submitted as a motion (and will almost certainly be granted if it is submitted as a stipulation with Plaintiffs). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/17/2015. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-01381-RGA et al.(nms) (Entered: 09/17/2015)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                            Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Francis J. Murphy regarding the effect of the SDNY decision on the Delaware cases. (Phillips, John) (Entered: 09/16/2015)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 9/9/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              ORAL ORDER: Defendants are requested within one week to submit a letter with their views on the impact (if any) of the SDNY decision on the Delaware cases. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/9/2015. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-01381-RGA et al.(nms) (Entered: 09/09/2015)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding recent developments relevant to these actions. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-D)(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 09/08/2015)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 9/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                  NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Endo's Objections and Responses to Defendants' First Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Things to Plaintiff Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Nos. 1-214) filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 09/02/2015)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 9/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                    NOTICE OF SERVICE of Mallinckrodt LLC's Objections and Responses to Defendants Impax and ThoRx's First Set of Requests for Production (Nos. 1-214) filed by Mallinckrodt LLC.(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 09/02/2015)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                      NOTICE OF SERVICE of Impax and ThoRx's Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories to Defendants (Nos. 1-10) filed by Impax Laboratories Inc., ThoRx Laboratories Inc..(Haney, Megan) (Entered: 08/31/2015)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                        NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Second Set of Requests for Documents and Things to Defendants filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC.(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 08/28/2015)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                          NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Julia Heaney as co-counsel. Reason for request: No longer with firm. (Heaney, Julia) (Entered: 08/20/2015)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                            NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Initial Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions for U.S. Patent Nos. 8,808,737 and 8,871,779 filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC.(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 08/14/2015)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                              NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Impax and Thorx's First Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Things to Plaintiffs (Nos. 1-214) filed by Impax Laboratories Inc., ThoRx Laboratories Inc., Impax Laboratories Inc..(Haney, Megan) (Entered: 08/03/2015)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories to Defendants filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC.(Heaney, Julia) (Entered: 07/31/2015)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                  NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Endo's Responses and Objection to Defendants' First Set of Joint Interrogatories to Plaintiffs (Nos. 1-9) and (2) Mallinckrodt LLC's Responses and Objection to Defendants' First Set of Joint Interrogatories to Plaintiffs (Nos. 1-9) filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC.(Heaney, Julia) (Entered: 07/30/2015)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                    NOTICE OF SERVICE of Impax and ThoRx's Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Documents and Things (Nos. 1-125) filed by Impax Laboratories Inc., ThoRx Laboratories Inc..(Haney, Megan) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                      NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' First Set of Joint Interrogatories to Plaintiffs (Nos. 1-9) filed by Actavis Inc., Actavis South Atlantic LLC, Barr Laboratories Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., Impax Laboratories Inc., ThoRx Laboratories Inc., Roxane Laboratories Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York LLC.(Matterer, Mary) (Entered: 06/26/2015)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                        NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Documents and Thngs to Defendants filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC.(Heaney, Julia) (Entered: 06/19/2015)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                          NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiff Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(A) and (2) Plaintiff Mallinckrodt LLC's Initial Disclosures filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC.(Heaney, Julia) (Entered: 06/16/2015)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                            NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Impax Laboratories and ThoRx Laboratories' Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Federal Rule 26(a)(1) filed by Impax Laboratories Inc., ThoRx Laboratories Inc., Impax Laboratories Inc..(Phillips, John) (Entered: 06/16/2015)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              SO ORDERED re (43 in 14-cv-1383-RGA, 44 in 14-cv-1384-RGA) Proposed Protective Order, filed by Mallinckrodt LLC, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/15/2015. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-01383-RGA, 1:14-cv-01384-RGA(nms) (Entered: 06/15/2015)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                PROPOSED Protective Order, by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC. (Heaney, Julia) Modified on 6/11/2015 (nms). (Entered: 06/11/2015)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  ORAL ORDER: On or before June 24, 2015, each party or each party group shall email to Chief Magistrate Judge Thynge, with a copy to her Judicial Administrator, Cathleen Kennedy, the information requested in the attached Order. Ordered by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 6/3/15. (Attachments: # 1 Order requesting information) (cak) Modified on 6/17/2015 (kjk). (Entered: 06/03/2015)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. Joinder of Parties due by 3/15/2016. Amended Pleadings due by 3/15/2016. Fact Discovery due by 5/13/2016. Joint Claim Construction Brief due by 3/4/2016. A Markman Hearing is set for 3/23/2016, at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. A Pretrial Conference is set for 2/10/2017, at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. A Bench Trial is set for 2/21/2017, at 8:30 AM before Judge Richard G. Andrews (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/1/2015. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-01381-RGA, 1:14-cv-01383-RGA, 1:14-cv-01384-RGA, 1:14-cv-01386-RGA, 1:14-cv-01387-RGA(nms) (Entered: 06/01/2015)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      PROPOSED Scheduling Order, by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC. (Heaney, Julia) Modified on 6/1/2015 (nms). (Entered: 05/29/2015)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                        Official Transcript of Scheduling Conference held on 05-11-15 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/2/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/12/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/10/2015. (lad) (Entered: 05/12/2015)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          PROPOSED Scheduling Order, by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Heaney, Julia) Modified on 5/8/2015 (nms). (Entered: 05/08/2015)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Sharon K. Gagliardi, Julie Latsko and Joseph Gribbin - filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC. (Heaney, Julia) (Entered: 05/05/2015)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/1/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              Order Setting Rule 16(b) Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 5/11/2015 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/1/2015. (ksr, ) (Entered: 05/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/28/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                ORAL ORDER: The oral argument scheduled for 5/11/2015, is CANCELED per the Notice of Withdrawal of Defendants' Motion to Transfer Action to Southern District of New York (see D.I. 34 in 14-cv-1384-RGA, D.I. 34 in 14-cv-1384-RGA). Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/28/2015. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-01383-RGA, 1:14-cv-01384-RGA(nms) (Entered: 04/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Withdrawal of Defendants' Motion to Transfer Action to Southern District of New York (D.I. 15 ), by Impax Laboratories Inc., ThoRx Laboratories Inc., Impax Laboratories Inc.. (Phillips, John) Modified on 4/28/2015 (nms). (Entered: 04/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORAL ORDER: The Court will hear oral argument on the Motions to Transfer Case to Southern District of New York (see 13 in 14-cv-1383-RGA, 14 in 14-cv-1382-RGA, 20 in 14-cv-1386-RGA, 15 in 14-cv-1384-RGA, 16 in 14-cv-1389-RGA, 14 in 14-cv-1387-RGA) on 5/11/2015, at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/26/2015. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-01382-RGA et al.(nms) (Entered: 03/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      REDACTED VERSION of 29 Exhibit E to Declaration of Julia Heaney, by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC. (Heaney, Julia) Modified on 3/18/2015 (nms). (Entered: 03/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        REDACTED VERSION of 25 Answer to Counterclaim by Mallinckrodt LLC. (Heaney, Julia) (Entered: 03/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          REDACTED VERSION of 24 Answer to Counterclaim by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Heaney, Julia) (Entered: 03/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Bilson on behalf of Impax Laboratories Inc., ThoRx Laboratories Inc. (Bilson, David) (Entered: 03/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              [SEALED] EXHIBIT E re 28 Declaration, by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC. (Heaney, Julia) Modified on 3/11/2015 (nms). (Entered: 03/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Julia Heaney re 26 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-I - Part 1, # 2 Exhibits A-I - Part 2)(Heaney, Julia) Modified on 3/11/2015 (nms). (Entered: 03/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Robert D. Rhoad re 26 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-3)(Heaney, Julia) Modified on 3/11/2015 (nms). (Entered: 03/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 15 MOTION to Transfer Case to Southern District of New York filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 3/20/2015. (Heaney, Julia) (Entered: 03/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      [SEALED] ANSWER to 12 Answer to Complaint, and Counterclaims, by Mallinckrodt LLC.(Heaney, Julia) Modified on 3/6/2015 (nms). (Entered: 03/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        [SEALED] ANSWER to 12 Answer to Complaint, and Counterclaims by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC.(Heaney, Julia) Modified on 3/6/2015 (nms). (Entered: 03/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Plaintiffs to Respond to Motion to Transfer and Defendant to File Reply Brief to March 10, 2015 and April 28, 2015, respectively - filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC. (Heaney, Julia) (Entered: 03/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kevin E. Warner - filed by Impax Laboratories Inc., ThoRx Laboratories Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Kevin E. Warner)(Haney, Megan) (Entered: 02/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Lesley M. Hamming and Maureen L. Rurka - filed by Impax Laboratories Inc., ThoRx Laboratories Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Lesley M. Hamming, # 2 Certification of Maureen L. Rurka)(Haney, Megan) (Entered: 02/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Plaintiffs to answer Defendants' counterclaims to March 6, 2015 - filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC. (Heaney, Julia) Modified on 2/5/2015 (nms). (Entered: 02/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jeffrey J. Toney, Marcus A. Barber, Rodney R. Miller and Paul G. Williams of KASOWITZ, BENSON, TORRES AND FRIEDMAN LLP - filed by Endo Phamaceuticals Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC. (Heaney, Julia) (Entered: 02/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    REDACTED VERSION of 12 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Impax Laboratories Inc., ThoRx Laboratories Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Haney, Megan) (Entered: 01/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION re 15 MOTION to Transfer Case to Southern District of New York by Impax Laboratories Inc., ThoRx Laboratories Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14)(Phillips, John) (Entered: 01/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support re 15 MOTION to Transfer Case to Southern District of New York filed by Impax Laboratories Inc., ThoRx Laboratories Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 2/9/2015. (Phillips, John) (Entered: 01/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Transfer Case to Southern District of New York - filed by Impax Laboratories Inc., ThoRx Laboratories Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Phillips, John) (Entered: 01/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent IMPAX Laboratories, Inc. for ThoRx Laboratories Inc. filed by ThoRx Laboratories Inc.. (Haney, Megan) (Entered: 01/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Impax Laboratories Inc.. (Haney, Megan) (Entered: 01/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                [SEALED] ANSWER to 1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Endo Phamaceuticals Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC by Impax Laboratories Inc., ThoRx Laboratories Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Haney, Megan) (Entered: 01/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Complaint to January 20, 2015 - filed by Impax Laboratories Inc., ThoRx Laboratories Inc.. (Phillips, John) (Entered: 01/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Blake B. Greene - filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC. (Heaney, Julia) (Entered: 12/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jonathan D. J. Loeb, Martin J. Black, Robert D. Rhoad and Brian M. Goldberg - filed by Endo Phamaceuticals Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC. (Heaney, Julia) (Entered: 12/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Complaint to January 12, 2015 - filed by Impax Laboratories Inc., ThoRx Laboratories Inc.. (Phillips, John) (Entered: 11/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Mailing Summons, Complaint and related papers to ThoRx Laboratories, Inc. by Endo Phamaceuticals Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A & B)(Heaney, Julia) (Entered: 11/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mallinckrodt LLC, Endo Phamaceuticals Inc.. Impax Laboratories Inc. served on 11/10/2014, answer due 12/1/2014. (Heaney, Julia) (Entered: 11/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Mallinckrodt plc, Other Affiliate Mallinckrodt Inc. for Mallinckrodt LLC filed by Endo Phamaceuticals Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC. (aah) (Entered: 11/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Endo International PLC for Endo Phamaceuticals Inc. filed by Endo Phamaceuticals Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC. (aah) (Entered: 11/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 8,808,737 B2; 8,871,779 B2; (aah) (Entered: 11/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (aah, ) (Entered: 11/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT filed against All Defendants - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-1622591.) - filed by Mallinckrodt LLC, Endo Phamaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-B, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(aah) (Entered: 11/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 120 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?