Unknown
Federal Civil Lawsuit Delaware District Court, Case No. 1:14-cv-00244
District Judge Leonard P. Stark, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 15, 2017 at 3:24 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Execware, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bayard, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen B. Brauerman +1 302 429 4232 +1 302 658 6395 sbrauerman@bayardlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sara E. Bussiere +1 302 429 4230 sbussiere@bayardlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard D. Kirk +1 302 429 4208 +1 302 658 6395 rkirk@bayardlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Vanessa Ribeiro Tiradentes +1 302 429 4228 vtiradentes@bayardlaw.com
v.
No Logo Target Brands, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Target Corp., Defendant
No Logo Target.Com, Defendant
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: None
Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,216,139. (ntl) (Entered: 02/28/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None
    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Execware LLC (Bussiere, Sara) (Entered: 02/27/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None
      Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,216,139;. (jeb, ) (Entered: 02/24/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
        Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (jeb, ) (Entered: 02/24/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None
          COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Target Corp., Target Brands Inc., Target.Com - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-1466249.) - filed by Execware LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(jeb, ) (Entered: 02/24/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 26 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?