Milardo v. Kerlikowske
Federal Court Proceeding Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:16-mc-00099

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 6, 2019 at 5:59 PM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Arnaldo Giammarco, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Jerome N. Frank Legal Services Organization

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED A. Nicole Hallett +1 203 432 4800 +1 203 432 1426 nicole.hallett@yale.edu
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason Parkin +1 203 432 8294 +1 203 432 1426 jason.parkin@yale.edu

Toggle Switch Represented by Yale Law School

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Joel Wishnie +1 203 432 4800 +1 203 432 1426 michael.wishnie@yale.edu
No Logo Paolina Milardo, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Carmalt Law LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED A. Nicole Hallett +1 203 432 4800 +1 203 432 1426 nicole.hallett@yale.edu

Toggle Switch Represented by Jerome N. Frank Legal Services Organization

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason Parkin +1 203 432 8294 +1 203 432 1426 jason.parkin@yale.edu

Toggle Switch Represented by Yale Law School

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Joel Wishnie +1 203 432 4800 +1 203 432 1426 michael.wishnie@yale.edu
v.
No Logo Jeh Johnson, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by U.S. Attorney's Office-HFD

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carolyn Aiko Ikari +1 860 760 7953 +1 860 760 7979 carolyn.ikari@usdoj.gov
No Logo Loretta E. Lynch, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by U.S. Attorney's Office-HFD

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carolyn Aiko Ikari +1 860 760 7953 +1 860 760 7979 carolyn.ikari@usdoj.gov
No Logo R. GIL KERLIKOWSKE, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by U.S. Attorney's Office-HFD

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carolyn Aiko Ikari +1 860 760 7953 +1 860 760 7979 carolyn.ikari@usdoj.gov
No Logo Sarah Saldana, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by U.S. Attorney's Office-HFD

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carolyn Aiko Ikari +1 860 760 7953 +1 860 760 7979 carolyn.ikari@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 2241
Nature of Suit 990 - Other
  Entries (25) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/1/2016, Entered: 4/1/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting Respondents' 17 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. See attached Memorandum of Decision. The Clerk is directed to close this file. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 4/1/2016. (Nadler, S.)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/30/2016, Entered: 3/30/2016 Unknown Document Type
    STATUS REPORT re video link assistance by Jeh Johnson, R. Gil Kerlikowske, Loretta E. Lynch, Sarah Saldana. (Ikari, Carolyn)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/29/2016, Entered: None Show Cause Hearing
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/28/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant: Show Cause Hearing held on 3/28/2016. Total Time: 1 hours and 35 minutes(Court Reporter M. Endlerin.) (Fernandez, C.) (Entered: 03/29/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/29/2016, Entered: 3/29/2016 Unknown Document Type
          EXHIBIT Supplemental Declaration of Rep. Tong & Sen. Coleman by Arnaldo Giammarco, Paolina Milardo re 15 Response to Order to Show Cause, 1 Application for Writ, 12 Order to Show Cause,. (Wishnie, Michael)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/28/2016, Entered: 3/28/2016 Unknown Document Type
            PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 3/28/2016 2:00:38 AM ]. File Size [ 22748 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:34:47 ]. (admin).
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/28/2016, Entered: 3/28/2016 Unknown Document Type
              RESPONSE re 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim; Response to Emergency Petition filed by Arnaldo Giammarco, Paolina Milardo. (Wishnie, Michael)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/25/2016, Entered: 3/25/2016 Unknown Document Type
                MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim; Response to Emergency Petition by Jeh Johnson, R. Gil Kerlikowske, Loretta E. Lynch, Sarah Saldana.Responses due by 4/15/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2)(Ikari, Carolyn)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/24/2016, Entered: 3/24/2016 Unknown Document Type
                  NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Joanne Stevens on behalf of Jeh Johnson, R. Gil Kerlikowske, Loretta E. Lynch, Sarah Saldana (Stevens, Elizabeth)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/23/2016, Entered: None Response to Order to Show Cause
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/22/2016, Entered: None
                      RESPONSE TO 12 Order to Show Cause, by Arnaldo Giammarco, Paolina Milardo filed by Arnaldo Giammarco, Paolina Milardo. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Joint Declaration of Representative William Tong and Senator Eric Coleman)(Wishnie, Michael) (Entered: 03/22/2016)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/18/2016, Entered: 3/18/2016 Unknown Document Type
                        NOTICE of Appearance by Sherease Rosalyn Pratt on behalf of Jeh Johnson, R. Gil Kerlikowske, Loretta E. Lynch, Sarah Saldana (Pratt, Sherease)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/18/2016, Entered: 3/18/2016 Unknown Document Type
                          NOTICE of Appearance by Carolyn Aiko Ikari on behalf of Jeh Johnson, R. Gil Kerlikowske, Loretta E. Lynch, Sarah Saldana as local counsel (Ikari, Carolyn)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/17/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: By 3/22/2016, the parties are ORDERED to show cause why the State of Connecticut or an entity thereof need not be joined as a necessary party to this action. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 3/17/2016.(Nadler, S.) (Entered: 03/17/2016)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/17/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                              Docket Entry Correction re 9 Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause. ORDER granting in part and denying in part Petitioners' 5 Motion for Order to Show Cause. See [Dkt. #10]. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 3/16/2016. (Fernandez, C.) (Entered: 03/17/2016)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/16/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: On or before 3/25/2016, Respondents are ORDERED to show cause why Petitioners' Emergency Petition for Writs of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum should not be granted.NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Show Cause Hearing set for 3/28/2016 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom Three, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 3/16/2016.(Nadler, S.) (Entered: 03/16/2016)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/16/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORDER granting in part and denying in part Petitioners' 5 Motion for Order to Show Cause. See [Dkt. #10]. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 3/16/2016. (Nadler, S.) Modified on 3/17/16 to correct mistake (Fernandez, C.). (Entered: 03/16/2016)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/16/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    ORDER granting 6 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 03/16/16. (Fernandez, C.) (Entered: 03/16/2016)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/16/2016, Entered: 3/16/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 3/16/2016.(Anastasio, F.)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/16/2016, Entered: 3/16/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                        MOTION for Leave for Law Student Interns to Appear by Arnaldo Giammarco, Paolina Milardo. (Anastasio, F.)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/16/2016, Entered: 3/16/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                          MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Arnaldo Giammarco, Paolina Milardo. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Anastasio, F.)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/16/2016, Entered: 3/16/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Parkin on behalf of Arnaldo Giammarco, Paolina Milardo (Anastasio, F.)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/16/2016, Entered: 3/16/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Amber Nicole Hallett on behalf of Arnaldo Giammarco, Paolina Milardo (Anastasio, F.)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/16/2016, Entered: 3/16/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Wishnie on behalf of Arnaldo Giammarco, Paolina Milardo (Anastasio, F.)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/16/2016, Entered: 3/16/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                  EMERGENCY PETITION for Writs of of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum by Arnaldo Giammarco, Paolina Milardo. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Memorandum in Support)(Anastasio, F.)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                    Statistics

                                                    This case has been viewed 44 times.

                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                    Space
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                     
                                                    PlainSite
                                                    Sign Up
                                                    Need Password Help?