Jones, et al v. Trump, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:95-cv-01269
District Judge Peter C. Dorsey, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 4, 2017 at 11:16 PM DT (4.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Charles Jones, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by CHARLES JONES

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space CHARLES JONES +1 443 413 1397
v.
No Logo Ann Ogletree, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Harold James Pickerstein +1 203 209 3456 jpicker@optonline.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Zeldes, Needle & Cooper, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marie A. Casper +1 203 333 9441 +1 203 333 1489 mcasper@znclaw.com
No Logo Brian Higgins, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by New York Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brigitte Duffy +1 212 788 1027

Toggle Switch Represented by Torok, Jeremy

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Hogrogian +1 212 788 1027
City of New York City of New York, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by New York Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brigitte Duffy +1 212 788 1027

Toggle Switch Represented by Torok, Jeremy

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Hogrogian +1 212 788 1027
No Logo Dominic Pezzo, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Harold James Pickerstein +1 203 209 3456 jpicker@optonline.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Zeldes, Needle & Cooper, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marie A. Casper +1 203 333 9441 +1 203 333 1489 mcasper@znclaw.com
Trump, Donald J. Trump, Donald J., Defendant
Officially listed as "Donald J. Trump"
Officer/Director, Riviera Holdings Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Harold James Pickerstein +1 203 209 3456 jpicker@optonline.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Zeldes, Needle & Cooper, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marie A. Casper +1 203 333 9441 +1 203 333 1489 mcasper@znclaw.com
No Logo Doreen Klein, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by District Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Morrie I. Kleinbart
No Logo Janie Elder Porco, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Harold James Pickerstein +1 203 209 3456 jpicker@optonline.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Zeldes, Needle & Cooper, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marie A. Casper +1 203 333 9441 +1 203 333 1489 mcasper@znclaw.com
No Logo Jay Goldberg, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Harold James Pickerstein +1 203 209 3456 jpicker@optonline.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Zeldes, Needle & Cooper, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marie A. Casper +1 203 333 9441 +1 203 333 1489 mcasper@znclaw.com
No Logo Trump, Marla Maples, Defendant
Officially listed as "Marla Maples Trump"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Harold James Pickerstein +1 203 209 3456 jpicker@optonline.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Zeldes, Needle & Cooper, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marie A. Casper +1 203 333 9441 +1 203 333 1489 mcasper@znclaw.com
No Logo Matthew Calamari, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Harold James Pickerstein +1 203 209 3456 jpicker@optonline.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Zeldes, Needle & Cooper, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marie A. Casper +1 203 333 9441 +1 203 333 1489 mcasper@znclaw.com
No Logo Michael Berger, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Harold James Pickerstein +1 203 209 3456 jpicker@optonline.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Zeldes, Needle & Cooper, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marie A. Casper +1 203 333 9441 +1 203 333 1489 mcasper@znclaw.com
No Logo Plaza Hotel, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Harold James Pickerstein +1 203 209 3456 jpicker@optonline.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Zeldes, Needle & Cooper, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marie A. Casper +1 203 333 9441 +1 203 333 1489 mcasper@znclaw.com
No Logo Richard Fields, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Harold James Pickerstein +1 203 209 3456 jpicker@optonline.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Zeldes, Needle & Cooper, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marie A. Casper +1 203 333 9441 +1 203 333 1489 mcasper@znclaw.com
No Logo Robert Gianetta, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by New York Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brigitte Duffy +1 212 788 1027

Toggle Switch Represented by Torok, Jeremy

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Hogrogian +1 212 788 1027
Trump Organization, Inc. Trump Organization, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Trump Organization"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Harold James Pickerstein +1 203 209 3456 jpicker@optonline.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Zeldes, Needle & Cooper, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marie A. Casper +1 203 333 9441 +1 203 333 1489 mcasper@znclaw.com
No Logo William Lynch, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by New York Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brigitte Duffy +1 212 788 1027
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
  Entries (113) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 7/7/2003, Entered: None
MANDATE OF USCA (certified copy) dated 7/16/96 dismissing [110-1] appeal ( Lange, Clerk) (admin) (Entered: 07/08/2003)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 7/19/1996, Entered: None
    ACKNOWLEDGED receipt of Record on Appeal at USCA on 7/15/96 received re: [110-1] appeal by Charles Jones USCA Number: 96-7758 (Villano, P.) (Entered: 07/19/1996)
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 7/8/1996, Entered: None
      Scheduling Order from USCA regarding [110-1] appeal by Charles Jones USCA Number: 96-7758 Appeal Record due 7/8/96 (Villano, P.) (Entered: 07/09/1996)
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 6/13/1996, Entered: None
        NOTICE OF APPEAL of [108-1] order by Charles Jones Certified Copy of Appeal and Docket mailed to USCA Appeal record due on 7/23/96 (Villano, P.) (Entered: 06/14/1996)
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 5/28/1996, Entered: None
          REPLY by Charles Jones to response to [99-1] motion for Reconsideration of order dated 11/20/95 by Charles Jones (Former Employee) (Entered: 05/28/1996)
            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 5/28/1996, Entered: None Court Filing
            RULING denying [105-1] motion for Reconsideration of [104-1] order dated 3/27/96; See ruling for details (signed by Chief Judge Peter C. Dorsey) (Former Employee) (Entered: 05/28/1996)
              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 5/2/1996, Entered: None Court Filing
              Acknowledgement of Receipt from White Plains, New York of Case; 96civ2995, Judge Scheindlin (Former Employee) (Entered: 05/10/1996)
                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 5/8/1996, Entered: None
                MEMORANDUM by Donald J. Trump, Marla Maples Trump, Plaza Hotel, Janie Elder Porco, Richard Fields, Ann Ogletree, Dominic Pezzo, Matthew Calamari, Trump Organization, Michael Berger, Jay Goldberg in opposition to Plaintiff's [105-1] motion for Reconsideration of [104-1] order dated 3/27/96 (Former Employee) (Entered: 05/09/1996)
                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 4/22/1996, Entered: None
                  MOTION by Charles Jones for Reconsideration of [104-1] order dated 3/27/96 re: [71-1] motion to Dismiss by Doreen Klein, [58-1] motion to Dismiss by William Lynch, Brian Higgins, Robert Gianetta, City of New York, [31-1] motion to Dismiss by defendants (Brief Due 5/13/96 ) (Former Employee) (Entered: 04/23/1996)
                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 3/27/1996, Entered: None Court Filing
                    RULING granting in part, denying in part [71-1] motion to Dismiss, [58-1] motion to Dismiss and [31-1] motion to Dismiss; The defamation claims are dismissed for lack of personal jurisdiction. All the claims are transferred to the Southern District of N.Y. See Ruling for details ( signed by Chief Judge Peter C. Dorsey ) (Former Employee) (Entered: 03/28/1996)
                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 3/21/1996, Entered: None
                      SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM of Law by Charles Jones in opposition to [71-1] motion to Dismiss by Doreen Klein, [58-1] motion to Dismiss by William Lynch, Brian Higgins, Robert Gianetta, City of New York, [31-1] motion to Dismiss by defendants (Former Employee) (Entered: 03/21/1996)
                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 3/18/1996, Entered: None
                        MOTION by Charles Jones for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum of Law (Former Employee) (Entered: 03/19/1996)
                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 1/3/1996, Entered: None
                          AFFIDAVIT of Brigitte Duffy by City of New York, Robert Gianetta, Brian Higgins, William Lynch Re [100-1] motion to Continue the conference scheduled for 1/10/96 by William Lynch, Brian Higgins, Robert Gianetta, City of New York (Former Employee) (Entered: 01/04/1996)
                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 1/3/1996, Entered: None
                            MOTION by City of New York, Robert Gianetta, Brian Higgins, William Lynch to Continue the conference scheduled for 1/10/96 (Brief Due 1/24/96 ) (Former Employee) (Entered: 01/04/1996)
                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 11/30/1995, Entered: None
                              MOTION by Charles Jones for Reconsideration of order dated 11/20/95 re: [94-1] motion for Order requiring Plaintiff to Comply with Local Rule 2(c)(1) by William Lynch, Brian Higgins, Robert Gianetta, City of New York & for Order for Clerk's office to Comply with same (Brief Due 12/21/95 ) (Former Employee) Modified on 01/26/1996 (Entered: 11/30/1995)
                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 11/27/1995, Entered: None
                                MOTION by Charles Jones for Reconsideration of [93-1] cross motion to Strike Defendant's letter to supplement pleadings by Charles Jones (Brief Due 12/18/95 ) (Former Employee) (Entered: 11/28/1995)
                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 11/20/1995, Entered: None
                                  REVISED Reply Memorandum of Law to [91-1] response by Charles Jones (Former Employee) (Entered: 11/21/1995)
                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 11/20/1995, Entered: None
                                    MOTION by Charles Jones for Reconsideration of order to strike dated 11/8/95 re: [91-1] response by Charles Jones (Brief Due 12/11/95 ) (Former Employee) (Entered: 11/21/1995)
                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 11/15/1995, Entered: None
                                      AFFIDAVIT of Brigitte Duffy by City of New York, Robert Gianetta, Brian Higgins, William Lynch Re [94-1] motion for Order requiring Plaintiff to Comply with Local Rule 2(c)(1) by William Lynch, Brian Higgins, Robert Gianetta, City of New York (Former Employee) (Entered: 11/16/1995)
                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 11/15/1995, Entered: None
                                        MOTION by City of New York, Robert Gianetta, Brian Higgins, William Lynch for Order requiring Plaintiff to Comply with Local Rule 2(c)(1) (Former Employee) (Entered: 11/16/1995)
                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 11/9/1995, Entered: None
                                          OPPOSITION by Charles Jones to [92-1] motion to Strike [91-1] response by Charles Jones by defendants (Former Employee) (Entered: 11/13/1995)
                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 11/6/1995, Entered: None
                                            MOTION by Donald J. Trump, Marla Maples Trump, Plaza Hotel, Janie Elder Porco, Richard Fields, Ann Ogletree, Dominic Pezzo, Matthew Calamari, Trump Organization, Michael Berger, Jay Goldberg to Strike [91-1] response by Charles Jones (Brief Due 11/27/95 ) (Former Employee) (Entered: 11/06/1995)
                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 10/31/1995, Entered: None
                                              REPLY MEMORANDUM of LAW, by Chuck Jones, to the Defendant's improper request to Supplement the Pleadings, which the Defendant's have not submitted (Former Employee) (Entered: 10/31/1995)
                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 9/29/1995, Entered: None
                                                SUREREPLY by Charles Jones to response to [31-1] motion to Dismiss by defendants; The Trump Group (Former Employee) (Entered: 10/24/1995)
                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 9/29/1995, Entered: None
                                                  SUREREPLY by Charles Jones to response to [31-1] motion to Dismiss by defendants (Former Employee) (Entered: 10/24/1995)
                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 9/20/1995, Entered: None
                                                    REPLY by Donald J. Trump, Marla Maples Trump, Plaza Hotel, Janie Elder Porco, Richard Fields, Ann Ogletree, Dominic Pezzo, Matthew Calamari, Trump Organization, Michael Berger, Jay Goldberg to response to their [31-1] motion to Dismiss (Lopez, B.) (Entered: 09/28/1995)
                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 9/25/1995, Entered: None
                                                      REQUEST by Charles Jones for Permission to File Surreply to Defendant Trump Group's Reply (Former Employee) (Entered: 09/26/1995)
                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 9/18/1995, Entered: None
                                                        MOTION by Charles Jones for Reconsideration of [82-1] order dated 9/7/95 re: Lynch's Motion to Set Aside doc. # 61-1 (Brief Due 10/9/95 ) (Former Employee) (Entered: 09/19/1995)
                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 9/13/1995, Entered: None
                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Charles Jones Re [84-1] his opposition memorandum to [71-1] motion to Dismiss by Doreen Klein, [58-1] motion to Dismiss by Lynch, Brian Higgins, Robert Gianetta, City of New York, [58-2] motion to Transfer Case by William Lynch, Brian Higgins, Robert Gianetta, City of New York, [58-3] motion Stay the Proceeding by William Lynch, Brian Higgins, Robert Gianetta, City of New York (Lopez, B.) (Entered: 09/25/1995)
                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 9/13/1995, Entered: None
                                                            MEMORANDUM by Charles Jones in opposition to [71-1] motion to Dismiss by Doreen Klein, [58-1] motion to Dismiss by William Lynch, Brian Higgins, Robert Gianetta, City of New York, [58-2] motion to Transfer Case by William Lynch, Brian Higgins, Robert Gianetta, City of New York, [58-3] motion to Stay the Proceeding by William Lynch, Brian Higgins, Robert Gianetta, City of New York (Lopez, B.) (Entered: 09/25/1995)
                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 9/13/1995, Entered: None
                                                              MEMORANDUM by Charles Jones in opposition to [31-1] motion to Dismiss by Donald Trump, et al (Former Employee) (Entered: 09/21/1995)
                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 9/7/1995, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                ORDER: GRANTING [78-1] motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis; VACATING [11-1] order re: Bond; DENYING [63-1] motion to Dismiss Pursuant to L.R. re: Posting of Bond; VACATING [73-1] order; DENYING [80-1] motion for Reconsideration: DENYING [76-1] motion to Modify [11-1] order; GRANTING [61-1] motion to Set Aside Default; DENYING [70-1] motion for Entry of Default Judgment as to William Lynch; GRANTING [67-1] motion to Stay Discovery; DENYING [31-2] motion to Strike Portions of [1-1] complaint; DENYING [58-2] motion Transfer Case; DENYING [58-3] motion to Stay the Proceeding; DENYING [74-1] motion to Extend Time until September 22, 1995 to hold a meeting in compliance with Local Rule 38; Brief due by 9/18/95 [31-1] motion to Dismiss; Brief due by 9/21/95 [58-1] motion to Dismiss; Brief due by 9/27/95 [71-1] motion to Dismiss ( signed by Chief Judge Peter C. Dorsey ) (Lopez, B.) (Entered: 09/07/1995)
                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 9/1/1995, Entered: None
                                                                  MEMORANDUM by Charles Jones in support of his [80-1] motion for Reconsideration of [73-1] order dated 08/28/95 DENYING [71-1] motion to Dismiss by Doreen Klein, [67-1] motion to Stay Discovery by defendants, [66-1] motion to Extend Time 21 days after the Court rules on the their motion to Dismiss to respond to plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment by defendants, GRANTING [63-1] motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Local Rules re: Posting of Bond by defendants, DENYING [61-1] motion to Set Aside Default by William Lynch, [58-1] motion to Dismiss by William Lynch, Brian Higgins, Robert Gianetta, City of New York, [58-2] motion to Transfer Case by William Lynch, Brian Higgins, Robert Gianetta, City of New York, [58-3] motion to Stay the Proceeding by William Lynch, Brian Higgins, Robert Gianetta, City of New York, [70-1] motion for Entry of Default Judgment as to William Lynch by Charles Jones, [46-1] motion for Order to impose reasonable conditions upon the filing of any pleadings by the Plaintiff by defendants, [31-1] motion to Dismiss by defendants, [31-2] motion to Strike Portions of [1-1] complaint by defendants, [21-1] motion Partial for Summary Judgment by Charles Jones (Lopez, B.) (Entered: 09/01/1995)
                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 8/31/1995, Entered: None
                                                                    MOTION by Charles Jones for Reconsideration of [73-1] order dated 08/28/95 DENYING [71-1] motion to Dismiss by Doreen Klein, [67-1] motion to Stay Discovery by defendants, [66-1] motion to Extend Time 21 days after the Court rules on the their motion to Dismiss to respond to plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment by defendants, GRANTING [63-1] motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Local Rules re: Posting of Bond by defendants, DENYING [61-1] motion to Set Aside Default by William Lynch, [58-1] motion to Dismiss by William Lynch, Brian Higgins, Robert Gianetta, City of New York, [58-2] motion to Transfer Case by William Lynch, Brian Higgins, Robert Gianetta, City of New York, [58-3] motion to Stay the Proceeding by William Lynch, Brian Higgins, Robert Gianetta, City of New York, [70-1] motion for Entry of Default Judgment as to William Lynch by Charles Jones, [46-1] motion for Order to impose reasonable conditions upon the filing of any pleadings by the Plaintiff by defendants, [31-1] motion to Dismiss by defendants, [31-2] motion to Strike Portions of [1-1] complaint by defendants, [21-1] motion Partial for Summary Judgment by Charles Jones (Lopez, B.) (Entered: 09/01/1995)
                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 8/28/1995, Entered: None
                                                                      MEMORANDUM of Law by Charles Jones in opposition to [61-1] motion to Set Aside Default and (B) Imposition of Conditions (Former Employee) (Entered: 08/30/1995)
                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 8/28/1995, Entered: None
                                                                        APPLICATION by Charles Jones to Proceed in Forma Pauperis supporting Documentation and Order (Former Employee) (Entered: 08/29/1995)
                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 8/28/1995, Entered: None
                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Charles Jones in support of his [76-1] opposition memorandum Re [63-1] motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Local Rules re; Posting of Bond by defendants (Former Employee) (Entered: 08/30/1995)
                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 8/28/1995, Entered: None
                                                                            MOTION by Charles Jones to Modify [11-1] order to post security; Part of the Cross Motion in opposition to Motion to Dismiss for failure to post same. (Former Employee) (Entered: 08/29/1995)
                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 8/28/1995, Entered: None
                                                                              AFFIDAVIT of Brigitte Duffy by City of New York, Robert Gianetta, Brian Higgins, William Lynch Re [74-1] motion to Extend Time until September 22, 1995 to hold a meeting in compliance with Local Rule 38 by William Lynch, Brian Higgins, Robert Gianetta, City of New York (Former Employee) (Entered: 08/29/1995)
                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 8/28/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                MOTION by City of New York, Robert Gianetta, Brian Higgins, William Lynch to Extend Time until September 22, 1995 to hold a meeting in compliance with Local Rule 38 (Former Employee) (Entered: 08/29/1995)
                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 8/28/1995, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  ORDER denying [71-1] motion to Dismiss, denying [67-1] motion to Stay Discovery, denying [66-1] motion to Extend Time 21 days after the Court rules on the their motion to Dismiss to respond to plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment, granting [63-1] motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Local Rules re; Posting of Bond, denying [61-1] motion to Set Aside Default, denying [58-1] motion to Dismiss, denying [58-2] motion to Transfer Case, denying [58-3] motion to Stay the Proceeding, denying [70-1] motion for Entry of Default Judgment as to William Lynch, denying [46-1] motion for Order to impose reasonable conditions upon the filing of any pleadings by the Plaintiff, denying [31-1] motion to Dismiss, denying [31-2] motion to Strike Portions of [1-1] complaint, denying [21-1] motion Partial for Summary Judgment ( signed by Chief Judge Peter C. Dorsey ) (Former Employee) (Entered: 08/28/1995)
                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 8/25/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                    MEMORANDUM of LAW by Doreen Klein in support of [71-1] motion to Dismiss by Doreen Klein (Former Employee) (Entered: 08/25/1995)
                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/25/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                      MOTION by Doreen Klein to Dismiss (Brief Due 9/15/95 ) (Former Employee) (Entered: 08/25/1995)
                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 8/18/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                        MOTION to RENEW by Charles Jones for Entry of Default Judgment as to William Lynch for whatever relief the Court finds just and proper (Brief Due 9/8/95 ) (Former Employee) (Entered: 08/25/1995)
                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 8/23/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                          OBJECTION by Donald J. Trump, Marla Maples Trump, Plaza Hotel, Janie Elder Porco, Richard Fields, Ann Ogletree, Dominic Pezzo, Matthew Calamari, Trump Organization, Michael Berger, Jay Goldberg to [68-1] report of parties' planning meeting (Lopez, B.) (Entered: 08/24/1995)
                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 8/24/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                            REPORT of Parties' Planning Meeting (Lopez, B.) (Entered: 08/24/1995)
                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 8/23/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                              MOTION by Donald J. Trump, Marla Maples Trump, Plaza Hotel, Janie Elder Porco, Richard Fields, Ann Ogletree, Dominic Pezzo, Matthew Calamari, Trump Organization, Michael Berger, Jay Goldberg to Stay Discovery (Brief Due 9/13/95) (Lopez, B.) (Entered: 08/24/1995)
                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 8/23/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                Renewed MOTION by Donald J. Trump, Marla Maples Trump, Plaza Hotel, Janie Elder Porco, Richard Fields, Ann Ogletree, Dominic Pezzo, Matthew Calamari, Trump Organization, Michael Berger, Jay Goldberg to Extend Time 21 days after the Court rules on the their motion to Dismiss to respond to plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment (Lopez, B.) (Entered: 08/24/1995)
                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 8/23/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                  SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIDAVIT of Morrie I. Kleinbart by Doreen Klein Re [48-1] motion for Stay of Discovery by Doreen Klein, [43-1] motion to Extend Time by Doreen Klein (Former Employee) (Entered: 08/23/1995)
                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 8/23/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                    APPEARANCE of Attorney for Doreen Klein -- Morrie I. Kleinbart (Former Employee) (Entered: 08/23/1995)
                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 8/22/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                      MOTION by Donald J. Trump, Marla Maples Trump, Plaza Hotel, Janie Elder Porco, Richard Fields, Ann Ogletree, Dominic Pezzo, Matthew Calamari, Trump Organization, Michael Berger, Jay Goldberg to Dismiss Pursuant to Local Rules re; Posting of Bond (Brief Due 9/12/95 ) (Former Employee) (Entered: 08/22/1995)
                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 8/21/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of Brigitte Duffy by William Lynch Re [61-1] motion to Set Aside Default by William Lynch (Former Employee) (Entered: 08/22/1995)
                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 8/21/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                          MOTION by William Lynch to Set Aside Default (Former Employee) (Entered: 08/22/1995)
                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/21/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT of Brigitte Duffy by City of New York, Robert Gianetta, Brian Higgins, William Lynch Re [58-1] motion to Dismiss by William Lynch, Brian Higgins, Robert Gianetta, City of New York, [58-2] motion to Transfer Case by William Lynch, Brian Higgins, Robert Gianetta, City of New York, [58-3] motion to Stay the Proceeding by William Lynch, Brian Higgins, Robert Gianetta, City of New York (Former Employee) (Entered: 08/22/1995)
                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/21/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM by City of New York, Robert Gianetta, Brian Higgins, William Lynch in support of [58-1] motion to Dismiss by William Lynch, Brian Higgins, Robert Gianetta, City of New York, [58-2] motion to Transfer Case by William Lynch, Brian Higgins, Robert Gianetta, City of New York, [58-3] motion to Stay the Proceeding by William Lynch, Brian Higgins, Robert Gianetta, City of New York (Former Employee) (Entered: 08/22/1995)
                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/21/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                MOTION by City of New York, Robert Gianetta, Brian Higgins, William Lynch to Dismiss , or in the alternative to Transfer Case , or to Stay the Proceeding (Brief Due 9/11/95 ) (Former Employee) (Entered: 08/22/1995)
                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/7/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  APPEARANCE of Attorney for City of New York, Robert Gianetta, Brian Higgins -- Brigette Duffy (Former Employee) (Entered: 08/21/1995)
                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/16/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Brigitte Duffy by William Lynch Re [55-1] motion to Extend Time until August 21, 1995 to respond to Complaint by William Lynch (Former Employee) (Entered: 08/21/1995)
                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/16/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      MOTION by William Lynch to Extend Time until August 21, 1995 to respond to Complaint (Former Employee) (Entered: 08/21/1995)
                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/16/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        APPEARANCE of Attorney for City of New York, Robert Gianetta, Brian Higgins, William Lynch -- Brigitte Duffy (Former Employee) (Entered: 08/21/1995)
                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/17/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM by Charles Jones in opposition to [43-1] motion to Extend Time to file a responsive document until August 29, 1995 by Doreen Klein, [51-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to Plaintiff's Motion for partial Summary Judgment to (21) twenty-one days after the Court rules on the Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by defendants (Former Employee) Modified on 08/28/1995 (Entered: 08/21/1995)
                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/17/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM of LAW by Charles Jones in opposition to [48-1] motion for Stay of Discovery by Doreen Klein (Former Employee) (Entered: 08/18/1995)
                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/14/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              MOTION by Donald J.Trump,Marla Maples Trump, Plaza Hotel, Janie Elder Porco, Richard Fields, Ann Ogletree, Dominic Pezzo, Matthew Calamari, Trump Organization, Michael Berger, Jay Goldberg to Extend Time within which to respond to Plaintiff's Motion for partial Summary Judgment to (21) twenty-one days after the Court rules on the Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Former Employee) (Entered: 08/16/1995)
                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/11/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                MOTION by Charles Jones to Extend Time to respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss until September 8, 1995 (Former Employee) (Entered: 08/16/1995)
                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/16/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM by Doreen Klein in support of [48-1] motion for Stay of Discovery by Doreen Klein (Former Employee) (Entered: 08/16/1995)
                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/16/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    MOTION by Doreen Klein for Stay of Discovery (Brief Due 9/6/95 ) (Former Employee) (Entered: 08/16/1995)
                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/15/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM by Donald J. Trump, Marla Maples Trump, Plaza Hotel, Janie Elder Porco, Richard Fields, Ann Ogletree, Dominic Pezzo, Matthew Calamari, Trump Organization, Michael Berger, Jay Goldberg, City of New York, Doreen Klein, Robert Gianetta, Brian Higgins, William Lynch in support of [46-1] motion for Order to impose reasonable conditions upon the filing of any pleadings by the Plaintiff by defendants (Former Employee) (Entered: 08/15/1995)
                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/15/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        MOTION by Donald J.Trump, Marla Maples Trump, Plaza Hotel, Janie Elder Porco, Richard Fields, Ann Ogletree, Dominic Pezzo, Matthew Calamari, Trump Organization, Michael Berger, Jay Goldberg, City of New York, Doreen Klein, Robert Gianetta, Brian Higgins, William Lynch for Order to impose reasonable conditions upon the filing of any pleadings by the Plaintiff (Former Employee) (Entered: 08/15/1995)
                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/15/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          MOTION by Charles Jones for Entry of Default as to William Lynch (Brief Due 9/5/95 ) (Former Employee) (Entered: 08/15/1995)
                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/15/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT of Morrie I. Kleinbart by Doreen Klein Re [43-1] motion to Extend Time to file a responsive document until August 29, 1995 by Doreen Klein (Former Employee) (Entered: 08/15/1995)
                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/15/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              MOTION by Doreen Klein to Extend Time to file a responsive document until August 29, 1995 (Former Employee) (Entered: 08/15/1995)
                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/11/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed on 7/20/95 as to William Lynch, copies left at his place of business (Former Employee) (Entered: 08/15/1995)
                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/11/1995, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  RULING and ORDER denying [34-1] cross motion for Leave of Court to Serve Purusant to F.R.Cv.P. 36(a), a Request for Admissions, denying [34-2] cross motion for an Order Permitting Limited Discovery of defendants on jurisdiction, denying without prejudice [18-1] motion for Stay of Discovery until defendant's motion to dismiss is decided on. Doc. # 35, Memorandum of Law in Support of Cross-Motion is to be SEALED ( signed by Chief Judge Peter C. Dorsey ) (Lopez, B.) (Entered: 08/11/1995)
                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/10/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM by Charles Jones in opposition to [29-1] motion to Strike Exhibit C to the plaintiff's request for admissions by defendantssssssssss (Former Employee) (Entered: 08/10/1995)
                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/8/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by Charles Jones for Entry of Default as to William Lynch (Brief Due 8/29/95 ) (Former Employee) (Entered: 08/08/1995)
                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/8/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM by Donald J. Trump, Marla Maples Trump, Plaza Hotel, Janie Elder Porco, Richard Fields, Ann Ogletree, Dominic Pezzo, Matthew Calamari, Trump Organization, Michael Berger, Jay Goldberg, City of New York, Doreen Klein, Robert Gianetta, Brian Higgins, William Lynch in support of [31-1] motion to Dismiss by defendantssssssssss, [31-2] motion to Strike Portions of [1-1] complaint by defendantssssssssss (Former Employee) (Entered: 08/08/1995)
                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/4/1995, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM & ORDER overruling [25-1] opposition memorandum ( signed by Chief Judge Peter C. Dorsey ) (Lopez, B.) (Entered: 08/04/1995)
                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/4/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT of Charles Jones in Support of his [34-1] cross motion for Leave of Court to Serve Purusant to F.R.Cv.P. 36(a), a Request for Admissions, [34-2] cross motion for an Order Permitting Limited Discovery of defendants on jurisdiction & [34-1] objection (Lopez, B.) (Entered: 08/04/1995)
                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/4/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              (FILED UNDER SEAL) MEMORANDUM by Charles Jones in support of his [34-1] cross motion for Leave of Court to Serve Purusant to F.R.Cv.P. 36(a), a Request for Admissions, [34-2] cross motion for an Order Permitting Limited Discovery of defendants on jurisdiction & [34-1] objection (Lopez, B.) Modified on 08/11/1995 (Entered: 08/04/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/4/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                CROSS MOTION by Charles Jones for Leave of Court to Serve Purusant to F.R.Cv.P. 36(a), a Request for Admissions & for an Order Permitting Limited Discovery of defendants on jurisdiction (Lopez, B.) (Entered: 08/04/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/4/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by Donald J. Trump, Marla Maples Trump, Plaza Hotel, Janie Elder Porco, Richard Fields, Ann Ogletree, Dominic Pezzo, Matthew Calamari, Trump Organization, Michael Berger, Jay Goldberg for Leave to File Memorandum in Support of their motion to dismiss in Excess of 40 pages (Lopez, B.) (Entered: 08/04/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/4/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Harold James Pickerstein, Esq., o/b/o Donald J. Trump, Marla Maples Trump, Plaza Hotel, Janie Elder Porco, Richard Fields, Ann Ogletree, Dominic Pezzo, Matthew Calamari, Trump Organization, Michael Berger, Jay Goldberg in Support of their [31-1] motion to Dismiss by & [31-2] motion to Strike Portions of [1-1] complaint (Lopez, B.) (Entered: 08/04/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/4/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by Donald J. Trump, Marla Maples Trump, Plaza Hotel, Janie Elder Porco, Richard Fields, Ann Ogletree, Dominic Pezzo, Matthew Calamari, Trump Organization, Michael Berger, Jay Goldberg to Dismiss and/or to Strike Portions of [1-1] complaint (Brief Due 8/25/95) (Lopez, B.) (Entered: 08/04/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/3/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by Donald J. Trump, Marla Maples Trump, Plaza Hotel, Janie Elder Porco, Richard Fields, Ann Ogletree, Dominic Pezzo, Matthew Calamari, Trump Organization, Michael Berger, Jay Goldberg to Extend Time 21 days after the court rules on the defendants' motion to dismiss (Lopez, B.) (Entered: 08/03/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/2/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by Donald J. Trump, Marla Maples Trump, Plaza Hotel, Janie Elder Porco, Richard Fields, Ann Ogletree, Dominic Pezzo, Matthew Calamari, Trump Organization, Michael Berger, Jay Goldberg to Strike Exhibit C to the plaintiff's request for admissions & to Seal Exhibit C to the plaintiff's request for admission (Brief Due 8/23/95) (Lopez, B.) (Entered: 08/03/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/31/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT of Charles Jones in Support of his [26-1] motion for Entry of Default as to William Lynch (Lopez, B.) (Entered: 08/03/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/31/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM by Charles Jones in support of his [26-1] motion for Entry of Default as to William Lynch (Lopez, B.) (Entered: 08/03/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/31/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by Charles Jones for Entry of Default as to William Lynch & for Hearing to determine the award as to damages against defendant William Lynch (Brief Due 8/21/95) (Lopez, B.) (Entered: 08/03/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/31/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM by Charles Jones in opposition to [13-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to complaint to 9/13/95 by Brian Higgins, Robert Gianetta, City of New York (Lopez, B.) (Entered: 08/03/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/27/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Charles Jones in Support of his [21-1] motion Partial for Summary Judgment (Lopez, B.) (Entered: 08/03/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/27/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      STATEMENT pursuant to Rule 9(c)(1) by Charles Jones in Support of his [21-1] motion Partial for Summary Judgment (Lopez, B.) (Entered: 08/03/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/27/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM by Charles Jones in support of his [21-1] motion Partial for Summary Judgment (Lopez, B.) (Entered: 08/03/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/27/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by Charles Jones Partial for Summary Judgment (Brief Due 8/17/95) (Lopez, B.) (Entered: 08/03/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/26/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT of Harold James Pickerstein, Esq. o/b/o Donald J. Trump, Marla Maples Trump, Plaza Hotel, Janie Elder Porco, Richard Fields, Ann Ogletree, Dominic Pezzo, Matthew Calamari, Trump Organization, Michael Berger, Jay Goldberg in Support of their [18-1] motion for Stay of Discovery until defendant's motion to dismiss is decided on (Lopez, B.) (Entered: 07/27/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/26/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM by Donald J. Trump, Marla Maples Trump, Plaza Hotel, Janie Elder Porco, Richard Fields, Ann Ogletree, Dominic Pezzo, Matthew Calamari, Trump Organization, Michael Berger, Jay Goldberg in support of their [18-1] motion for Stay of Discovery until defendant's motion to dismiss is decided on (Lopez, B.) (Entered: 07/27/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/26/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by Donald J. Trump, Marla Maples Trump, Plaza Hotel, Janie Elder Porco, Richard Fields, Ann Ogletree, Dominic Pezzo, Matthew Calamari, Trump Organization, Michael Berger, Jay Goldberg for Stay of Discovery until defendant's motion to dismiss is decided on (Brief Due 8/16/95) (Lopez, B.) (Entered: 07/27/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/25/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by Donald J. Trump, Marla Maples Trump, Plaza Hotel, Janie Elder Porco, Richard Fields, Ann Ogletree, Dominic Pezzo, Matthew Calamari, Trump Organization, Michael Berger, Jay Goldberg for Morrie I. Kleinbart to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Jefferson, V.) (Entered: 07/27/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/26/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by City of New York for Brigitte Duffy to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Jefferson, V.) (Entered: 07/27/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/26/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM by Charles Jones in opposition to motion for extension of time (attributed to Doreen Klein, not filed with court) (Former Employee) (Entered: 07/26/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/26/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of Brigitte Duffy by City of New York, Robert Gianetta, Brian Higgins Re [13-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to complaint to 9/13/95 by Brian Higgins, Robert Gianetta, City of New York (Former Employee) (Entered: 07/26/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/26/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by City of New York, Robert Gianetta, Brian Higgins to Extend Time to respond to complaint to 9/13/95 (Former Employee) (Entered: 07/26/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/26/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPEARANCE of Attorney for City of New York, Robert Gianetta, Brian Higgins -- John Hogrogian (Former Employee) (Entered: 07/26/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/21/1995, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting in part, [7-1] [4-1] motion for Security for Costs. Plaintiff shall post with Clerk a cash deposit/bond with recognized corporate surety in the sum of $500.00 as Security for Costs as to each named defendant on or before 8/21/95. ( signed by Chief Judge Peter C. Dorsey ) (Former Employee) (Entered: 07/24/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/18/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by Charles Jones for Order requiring the defendants to waive any defense of statute of limitations or personal jurisdiction (Lopez, B.) (Entered: 07/27/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/11/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPEARANCE of Attorney for Donald J. Trump, Marla Maples Trump, Plaza Hotel, Janie Elder Porco, Richard Fields, Ann Ogletree, Dominic Pezzo, Matthew Calamari, Trump Organization, Michael Berger, Jay Goldberg -- Marie A. Casper (Former Employee) (Entered: 07/12/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/10/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by Donald J. Trump, Marla Maples Trump, Plaza Hotel, Janie Elder Porco, Richard Fields, Ann Ogletree, Dominic Pezzo, Matthew Calamari, Trump Organization, Michael Berger, Jay Goldberg to Extend Time for (20) days to Respond to Complaint (Former Employee) Modified on 10/04/1995 (Entered: 07/11/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/10/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REQUEST by Ann Ogletree, Dominic Pezzo for Security for Costs requiring Plaintiff post a cash deposit or bond with recognized corp. surety in the amount of $500.00 with respect to both Defendants in the total amount of $1,000.00 (Brief Due 7/31/95 ) (Former Employee) Modified on 10/05/1995 (Entered: 07/11/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/10/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPEARANCE of Attorney for Ann Ogletree, Dominic Pezzo -- Harold James Pickerstein (Former Employee) (Entered: 07/11/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/6/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OBJECTIONS by Charles Jones to [4-1] motion for Security for Costs by defendants (Former Employee) (Entered: 07/06/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/29/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REQUEST by Donald J. Trump, Marla Maples Trump, Plaza Hotel, Janie Elder Porco, Richard Fields, Matthew Calamari, Trump Organization, Michael Berger, Jay Goldberg for Security for Costs (Brief Due 7/20/95 ) (Former Employee) (Entered: 06/29/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/29/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPEARANCE of Attorney for Donald J. Trump, Marla Maples Trump, Plaza Hotel, Janie Elder Porco, Richard Fields, Matthew Calamari, Trump Organization, Michael Berger, Jay Goldberg -- Harold James Pickerstein (Former Employee) (Entered: 06/29/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/26/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER on Pretrial Deadlines handed to counsel. Discovery cutoff 12/26/95 ; Dispositive Motions due 1/25/96 Amended Pleadings due 8/26/95 Motions to Dismiss due 9/26/95 (Kolesnikoff, D.) (Entered: 06/27/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/26/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT Filing Fee $ 120.00 Receipt # 145096 (Kolesnikoff, D.) (Entered: 06/27/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space Space

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 214 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?